Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 216 Today
» 839 Yesterday
» 1055 Week
» 17034 Month
» 212488 Year
» 1096869 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Classes of the Midland Railway

Designer Class Pre Grouping Class Wheels Year Pre Grouping Big 4 BR Power Class Number Range First Last # Thumbnail
Kirtley 690 MR class '690' 0-4-4T 1869 MR LMS     06/1869 08/1934 6
Kirtley 780 MR class '780' 0-4-4T 1870 MR LMS     1870 11/1935 20
Johnson 1142 MR class 'B' 0-6-0 1875 MR LMS 2F 58114 - 58187 02/1875 28/01/1964 120
Johnson 1142 MR class '1142' 0-6-0 1875 MR LMS 2F 58114 - 58187 02/1875 28/01/1964 120
Johnson 6 MR class '6' 0-4-4T 1875 MR LMS 1P   06/1875 31/12/1938 10
Johnson 1142 MR class '28' 0-6-0 1875 MR LMS 2F 58114 - 58187 02/1875 28/01/1964 120
Johnson 1262 MR class '1262' 0-4-4T 1875 MR LMS 1P 58030 - 58038 11/1875 19/06/1954 30
Johnson 1357 MR class 'H' 0-6-0 1878 MR LMS   58188 - 58228 01/01/1885 13/06/1959 20
Johnson 1F   0-6-0T 1878 MR LMS   41660 - 41895 05/1878 12/1966 95
Johnson 1357 MR class '1357' 0-6-0 1878 MR LMS   58188 - 58228 01/01/1885 13/06/1959 20
Johnson 1357 MR class '37' 0-6-0 1878 MR LMS   58188 - 58228 01/01/1885 13/06/1959 20
Johnson 1532 MR class '1532' 0-4-4T 1881 MR LMS 1P   08/1881 31/10/1959 115
Johnson 2228 MR class '2228' 0-4-4T 1895 MR LMS 1P   02/1895 13/08/1960 50
Whitelegg Tilbury Tanks   4-4-2T 1897 LTSR LMS   41928 - 41978 03/1897 03/12/1960 51
Whitelegg Tilbury tanks   0-6-2T 1903 LTSR LMS   41980 - 41993 06/1903 18/06/1962 14
Fowler 4F MR class 'Class 4' 0-6-0 1911 MR LMS   44027 - 44606 04/1922 10/1966 580