Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 246 Today
» 1018 Yesterday
» 5418 Week
» 16989 Month
» 265282 Year
» 1149663 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Classes of the Great Eastern Railway

Designer Class Pre Grouping Class Wheels Year Pre Grouping Big 4 BR Power Class Number Range First Last # Thumbnail
Holden F5 GER class 'M15 Rbt.' 2-4-2T   GER LNER   67188 - 67217     0
  Y5 GER class 'Class 209' 0-4-0ST 1874 GER LNER     05/1874 15/04/1948 8
Holden J15   0-6-0 1883 GER LNER   65350 - 65479 07/1883 16/09/1962 289
Worsdell Y6   0-4-0T 1883 GER LNER   68082 - 68083     2
Holden F4 GER class 'M15' 2-4-2T 1884 GER LNER   67151 - 67187 07/1884 05/1958 160
Holden J66 GER class 'T18' 0-6-0T 1886 GER LNER 2F 68370 - 68389 05/1886 10/1955 50
Holden D13 GER class 'T19 Rbt' 4-4-0 1886 GER LNER         0
Holden J65 GER class 'E22' 0-6-0T 1889 GER LNER 0F 68211 - 68215 02/1889 10/1956 20
Holden J67 GER class 'R24' 0-6-0T 1890 GER LNER   68490 - 68628 03/1890 16/09/1962 140
Holden J67 GER class 'R24 RBT' 0-6-0T 1890 GER LNER   68490 - 68628 03/1890 16/09/1962 140
Holden J69 GER class 'S56' 0-6-0T 1890 GER LNER   68491 - 68636 05/1904 16/09/1962 20
Holden E4 GER class 'T26' 2-4-0 1891 GER LNER 1MT 62780 - 62797 02/1891 12/1959 100
Holden F3 GER class 'C32' 2-4-2T 1893 GER LNER 1P 67114 - 67150 04/1893 08/04/1953 50
Holden G4   0-4-4T 1898 GER LNER     12/1898 12/1938 40
Holden D15   4-4-0 1900 GER LNER     12/1903 02/1960 70
Holden D14 GER class 'S46' 4-4-0 1900 GER LNER     03/1900 03/1960 41
Holden J17   0-6-0 1900 GER LNER   65500 - 65589 04/1905 16/09/1962 30
Holden J16 GER class 'F48' 0-6-0 1900 GER LNER     09/1900 16/09/1962 60
Holden J70 GER class 'C53' 0-6-0T 1903 GER LNER   68216 - 68226 10/1903 02/08/1955 12
Holden F6 GER class 'G69' 2-4-2T 1904 GER LNER   67218 - 67239 04/1911 05/1958 20
Holden F7 GER class 'Y65' 2-4-2T 1909 GER LNER   67093 - 67094 06/1909 08/11/1948 12
Holden B12 GER class 'S69' 4-6-0 1911 GER LNER   61500 - 61580 12/1911 20/09/1961 81
Hill J68 GER class 'C72' 0-6-0T 1912 GER LNER 3F 68638 - 68666 06/1912 09/1961 30
Hill Y4 GER class 'B74' 0-4-0T 1913 GER LNER 0F 68125 - 68129 07/1913 12/1963 5
Hill N7 GER class 'L77' 0-6-2T 1915 GER LNER   69600 - 69733 01/1915 16/09/1962 134
Hill/Gresley J19   0-6-0 1916 GER LNER   64640 - 64674   16/09/1962 60
Hill J20   0-6-0 1920 GER LNER   64675 - 64699 04/1920 16/09/1962 25