Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 2 Today
» 944 Yesterday
» 3234 Week
» 27195 Month
» 190249 Year
» 266836 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Classes of the Great Northern Railway

Designer Class Pre Grouping Class Wheels Year Pre Grouping Big 4 BR Power Class Number Range First Last # Thumbnail
Gresley A3   4-6-2 1922 GNR LNER   60035 - 60112 22/08/1928 04/12/1965 27
Ivatt C1 GNR class 'C1' 4-4-2 1902 GNR LNER 2P 62808 - 62885 06/1904 27/11/1950 94
Ivatt C2 GNR class 'C1' 4-4-2 1898 GNR LNER         0
Ivatt C12 GNR class 'C2' 4-4-2T 1898 GNR LNER   67350 - 67399 02/1898 12/1958 60
Ivatt D1 GNR class 'D1' 4-4-0 1911 GNR LNER 1P 62203 - 62215 03/1911 11/1950 15
Ivatt D2 GNR class 'D1' 4-4-0 1898 GNR LNER   62150 - 62199 06/1898 06/1951 70
Ivatt D2 GNR class '1321' 4-4-0 1898 GNR LNER   62150 - 62199 06/1898 06/1951 70
Ivatt D3 GNR class 'D3' 4-4-0 1896 GNR LNER   62000 - 62151     0
Ivatt D4 GNR class 'D2' 4-4-0 1896 GNR LNER 1P   12/1896 10/1951 51
Stirling G1   0-4-4T 1889 GNR LNER     12/1889 02/1927 29
Stirling G2   0-4-4T 1881 GNR LNER     10/1881 04/1926 16
Ivatt J1 GNR class 'J21' 0-6-0 1908 GNR LNER 2MT 65002 - 65014 08/1908 22/11/1954 15
Ivatt J2 GNR class 'J21' 0-6-0 1912 GNR LNER 2MT   08/1912 07/1954 10
Ivatt/Gresley J3   0-6-0 1896 GNR LNER   64105 - 64163   12/1954 0
Ivatt J4   0-6-0 1873 GNR LNER   64109 - 64167   25/11/1950 315
Ivatt J5 GNR class 'J22' 0-6-0 1909 GNR LNER 3F 65480 - 65499 10/1909 12/1955 20
Ivatt/Gresley J6 GNR class 'J22' 0-6-0 1911 GNR LNER 3F 64170 - 64279 08/1911 20/06/1962 110
Gresley J50 GNR class 'J23' 0-6-0T 1922 GNR LNER   68890 - 68991 10/1922 09/1963 72
Gresley J51 GNR class 'J23' 0-6-0T 1913 GNR LNER     12/1913 05/1965 30
Stirling J52 GNR class 'J13' 0-6-0ST 1894 GNR LNER   68757 - 68889 08/1897 03/1961 85
Ivatt J53 GNR class 'J14' 0-6-0ST 1892 GNR LNER     12/1892 07/1958 52
Stirling J55   0-6-0ST 1874 GNR LNER   68317 - 68319   24/12/1948 0
Stirling J57   0-6-0ST 1882 GNR LNER     12/1882 06/1938 8
Gresley K2 GNR class 'H3' 2-6-0 1913 GNR LNER 4MT 61720 - 61794 04/1914 22/06/1962 65
Gresley K3 GNR class 'H4' 2-6-0 1920 GNR LNER   61800 - 61992 03/1920 16/09/1963 193
Gresley K1 GNR class 'H2' 2-6-0 1912 GNR LNER 4MT   08/1912 06/12/1960 10
Ivatt N1   0-6-2T 1907 GNR LNER   69430 - 69485 04/1907 04/1959 56
Gresley N2   0-6-2T 1920 GNR LNER 3MT 69490 - 69596 12/1920 23/09/1962 107
Gresley O2   2-8-0 1918 GNR LNER 8F 63921 - 63987 05/1918 03/11/1963 67
Gresley O3 GNR class 'O1' 2-8-0 1913 GNR LNER   63475 - 63494 12/1913 16/12/1952 20
Ivatt Q1 GNR class 'K1' 0-8-0 1901 GNR LNER     02/1901 10/02/1937 50
Ivatt Q2 GNR class 'K1' 0-8-0 1902 GNR LNER     10/1909 02/1934 5
Ivatt/Gresley Q3 GNR class 'K2' 0-8-0 1914 GNR LNER         0