Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 562 Today
» 1212 Yesterday
» 562 Week
» 28953 Month
» 154430 Year
» 231017 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Classes of the North Eastern Railway

Designer Class Pre Grouping Class Wheels Year Pre Grouping Big 4 BR Power Class Number Range First Last # Thumbnail
Raven A2   4-6-2 1922 NER LNER   2400 - 2404 12/1922 21/05/1937 5
Worsdell/Raven A6 NER class 'W' 4-6-2T 1907 NER LNER 4P 69791 - 69799 12/1907 30/03/1953 10
Worsdell/Raven A7 NER class 'Y' 4-6-2T 1910 NER LNER 5F 69770 - 69789 10/1910 16/12/1957 20
Worsdell B13 NER class 'S' 4-6-0 1899 NER LNER     06/1899 22/02/1951 40
Worsdell B14   4-6-0 1900 NER LNER     12/1900 14/04/1931 5
Raven B15   4-6-0 1911 NER LNER     12/1911 27/12/1947 20
Raven B16   4-6-0 1919 NER LNER   61400 - 61478 12/1919 21/07/1964 70
Worsdell C6 NER class 'V/09' 4-4-2 1903 NER LNER 3P 62933 - 62937 06/1904 12/03/1948 20
Worsdell C6 NER class 'V' 4-4-2 1903 NER LNER 3P 62933 - 62937 06/1904 12/03/1948 20
Raven C7 NER class 'Z' 4-4-2 1911 NER LNER 3P 62954 - 62995 07/1911 26/06/1954 50
Worsdell C8 NER class '4CC' 4-4-2 1906 NER LNER         0
Worsdell D17   4-4-0 1892 NER LNER   62111 - 62112 06/1896 07/02/1948 50
Worsdell D18 NER class 'Q1' 4-4-0 1896 NER LNER         0
Worsdell D19 NER class 'M' 4-4-0 1897 NER LNER         0
Worsdell D19 NER class '3CC' 4-4-0 1897 NER LNER         0
Worsdell D20   4-4-0 1899 NER LNER 2P 62340 - 62397 08/1899 12/1957 50
Worsdell D21 NER class 'R1' 4-4-0 1908 NER LNER     11/1908 09/02/1946 10
Worsdell D22 NER class 'F-T' 4-4-0 1886 NER LNER         0
Worsdell D23 NER class 'G-T' 4-4-0 1887 NER LNER         0
Worsdell F8 NER class 'A' 2-4-2T 1886 NER LNER     03/1886 04/1938 60
Worsdell G5   0-4-4T 1894 NER LNER   67240 - 67349 05/1894 12/1958 110
Fletcher G6   0-4-4T 1876 NER LNER     04/1874   124
Raven H1 NER class 'D' 4-4-4T 1910 NER LNER     10/1913 24/06/1960 45
Worsdell J21 NER class 'C' 0-6-0 1886 NER LNER 2F 65025 - 65123 08/1886 23/04/1962 201
Worsdell J21 NER class 'C' 0-6-0 1886 NER LNER 2F 65025 - 65123 08/1886 23/04/1962 201
Worsdell J21 NER class 'C1' 0-6-0 1886 NER LNER 2F 65025 - 65123 08/1886 23/04/1962 201
Worsdell/Raven J24   0-6-0 1894 NER LNER   65600 - 65644   25/11/1950 34
Worsdell/Raven J25 NER class 'P1' 0-6-0 1898 NER LNER   65645 - 65728 05/1898 18/06/1962 120
Worsdell J26   0-6-0 1904 NER LNER   65730 - 65779 06/1904 18/06/1962 50
Worsdell/Raven J27 NER class 'P3' 0-6-0 1906 NER LNER   65780 - 65894 04/1906 09/1967 115
Worsdell J71 NER class 'E' 0-6-0T 1886 NER LNER 0F 68230 - 68316 11/1886 02/1961 120
Worsdell J72 NER class 'E1' 0-6-0T 1898 NER LNER   68670 - 69028 12/1898 10/1964 113
Worsdell J73 NER class 'L' 0-6-0T 1891 NER LNER   68355 - 68364   10/1960 10
Tennant J74 NER class '8' 0-6-0T 1885 NER LNER         8
Fletcher J76 NER class '124' 0-6-0T 1881 NER LNER         12
Fletcher/Worsdell J77 NER class '290' 0-6-0T 1899 NER LNER   68390 - 68441   10/1960 46
Worsdell/Worsdell Crane Engines NER class 'H1' 0-6-0T 1888 NER LNER         2
Worsdell J79 NER class 'H2' 0-6-0T 1897 NER LNER         3
Fletcher 44 NER class '44' 0-6-0ST 1881 NER LNER         0
Worsdell N8 NER class 'B' 0-6-2T 1886 NER LNER   69371 - 69401 06/1886 10/1956 62
Worsdell N9 NER class 'N' 0-6-2T 1893 NER LNER 3MT 69410 - 69429 05/1893 07/1955 20
Worsdell N10 NER class 'U' 0-6-2T 1902 NER LNER 3F 69090 - 69109 10/1902 09/04/1962 20
Worsdell Q5 NER class 'T1' 0-8-0 1901 NER LNER 6F 63250 - 63339 08/1901 06/10/1951 90
Worsdell Q5 NER class 'T' 0-8-0 1901 NER LNER 6F 63250 - 63339 08/1901 06/10/1951 90
Raven Q6 NER class 'T2' 0-8-0 1913 NER LNER 6F 63340 - 63459 02/1913 09/09/1967 120
Raven Q7 NER class 'T3' 0-8-0 1919 NER LNER 7F 63460 - 63474 10/1919 17/12/1962 15
Worsdell T1 NER class 'X' 4-8-0T 1909 NER LNER 7F 69910 - 69922 09/1909 06/1961 15
Worsdell Y7   0-4-0T 1888 NER LNER   68088 - 68089   12/1952 2
Worsdell Y8   0-4-0T 1890 NER LNER   68090 - 68091   15/11/1948 2