Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 149 Today
» 1241 Yesterday
» 6995 Week
» 18542 Month
» 418224 Year
» 494811 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

British Railways Standard Locomotive Classes

Designer Class Pre Grouping Class Wheels Year Pre Grouping Big 4 BR Power Class Number Range First Last # Thumbnail
Riddles Britannia   4-6-2 1951       70000 - 70054 05/01/1951 17/08/1968 55
Riddles Duke   4-6-2 1954       71000 05/1954 24/11/1962 1
Riddles Clan   4-6-2 1951       72000 - 72009 12/1951 21/05/1966 10
Riddles Standard Class 5   4-6-0 1951       73000 - 73171 04/1951 08/1968 172
Riddles Standard Class 4   4-6-0 1951       75000 - 75079 05/1951 08/1968 80
Riddles Standard Class 4   2-6-0 1952       76000 - 76114 12/1952 12/1967 115
Riddles Standard Class 3   2-6-0 1954     3MT 77000 - 77019 09/02/1954 09/07/1967 20
Riddles Standard Class 2   2-6-0 1952       78000 - 78064 12/1952 05/1967 65
Riddles Standard Class 4 Tank   2-6-4T 1951       80000 - 80154 10/07/1951 09/07/1967 155
Riddles Standard Class 3 Tank   2-6-2T 1952       82000 - 82044 04/04/1952 09/07/1967 45
Riddles Standard Class 2 Tank   2-6-2T 1953       84000 - 84029 04/07/1953 11/12/1965 30
Riddles Standard Class 9F   2-10-0 1954       92000 - 92250 31/01/1954 06/1968 251