Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 175 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1083 Week
» 22065 Month
» 164019 Year
» 1048400 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Classes with Wheel Arrangement 0-4-0ST

Designer Class Pre Grouping Class Wheels Year Pre Grouping Big 4 BR Power Class Number Range First Last # Thumbnail
  PM-2   0-4-0ST               0
  PM-1   0-4-0ST               0
Sharp Stewart   FR class 'C2' 0-4-0ST 1864 FR LMS         6
Sharp Stewart   FR class 'C1' 0-4-0ST 1864 FR LMS         6
  Y5 GER class 'Class 209' 0-4-0ST 1874 GER LNER     05/1874 15/04/1948 8
Connor 502 CR class '502' 0-4-0ST 1876 CR LMS         14
Smellie 218 GSWR class '218' 0-4-0ST 1881 GSWR LMS         2
  Y9   0-4-0ST 1882 NBR LNER   68092 - 68124   29/12/1962 33
  Y2 MSLR class '4' 0-4-0ST 1883 MSLR LNER   6460 - 6461 03/1883 08/07/1931 2
Drummond 264 CR class '264' 0-4-0ST 1885 CR LMS         34
Aspinall 21   0-4-0ST 1886 LYR LMS 0F 51202 - 51253 11/1891 09/1964 23
  Dock Engines   0-4-0ST 1890   SR   30458 07/1890 06/1954 1
Johnson 0F   0-4-0ST 1890   LMS 0F 41509 - 41523 03/1890 02/1958 4
Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock 781 CR class '781' 0-4-0ST 1897 CR LMS         1
  Unclassified   0-4-0ST 1898 CarR GWR   1338 05/1898 09/1963 2
  Unclassified YR class 'Unclass' 0-4-0ST 1900 YR GWR   1 01/01/1900 01/01/1954 1
Maunsell S   0-4-0ST 1900   SR   31685 06/1900 10/1951 1
Webb 1F   0-4-0ST 1901 LNWR LMS   47862 - 47865 10/1901 03/11/1956 2
Whitelegg 735 GSWR class '735' 0-4-0ST 1904 GSWR LMS     1904 1930 1
  Unclassified SHT class 'Unclass' 0-4-0ST 1905 SHT GWR   701 04/1905 05/1958 1
  Unclassified SHT class 'Unclass' 0-4-0ST 1906 SHT GWR   929 - 1098 06/1906 16/11/1960 3
  Unclassified SHT class 'Unclass' 0-4-0ST 1909 SHT GWR   974 07/1909 01/1960 1
  Unclassified SHT class 'Unclass' 0-4-0ST 1911 SHT GWR   943 06/1911 11/1959 1
  Unclassified CorR class 'Unclass' 0-4-0ST 1921 CorR GWR   4 01/01/1921 10/1948 1
  0F   0-4-0ST 1932   LMS 0F 47000 - 47009 11/1932 12/1966 10