Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 176 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1084 Week
» 22066 Month
» 164020 Year
» 1048401 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Classes with Wheel Arrangement 0-6-0T

Designer Class Pre Grouping Class Wheels Year Pre Grouping Big 4 BR Power Class Number Range First Last # Thumbnail
  J58   0-6-0T     LNER         0
  J61   0-6-0T   MSLR LNER         0
  J92   0-6-0T     LNER   68667 - 68669     3
  7   0-6-0T     LNER         0
Marsh WCP   0-6-0T     GWR   5 - 6     0
Stroudley Black Tanks   0-6-0T 1865   SR   32097 - 32694 14/09/1865 07/1961 27
Sharp Stewart   FR class 'G1' 0-6-0T 1867 FR LMS 2F       6
Stroudley R HR class 'R' 0-6-0T 1869 HR LMS     02/1869 1932 3
Sacré J59 MSLR class '18T Altered' 0-6-0T 1871 MSLR LNER         41
Marsh Terriers   0-6-0T 1872   SR   32634 - 32678 09/1872 11/1963 50
Wheatley J81 NBR class 'E' 0-6-0T 1872 NBR LNER         0
  J54   0-6-0T 1874   LNER         95
Drummond J82 NBR class 'R' 0-6-0T 1875 NBR LNER         25
Stroudley Terriers   0-6-0T 1876   SR     28/02/1876 06/1962 1
  J56   0-6-0T 1877   LNER         10
Johnson 1F   0-6-0T 1878 MR LMS   41660 - 41895 05/1878 12/1966 95
  2F   0-6-0T 1879   LMS   58850 - 58863 06/1879 10/09/1960 14
Kirtley T   0-6-0T 1879 LDCR SR     12/1879 07/1951 10
Fletcher J76 NER class '124' 0-6-0T 1881 NER LNER         12
Dean 1813   0-6-0T 1882   GWR   1835 03/1883 01/1949 40
Longbottom 3 NSR class '3 Rbld' 0-6-0T 1883 NSR   2F       49
Longbottom 3 NSR class '3' 0-6-0T 1883 NSR   2F       49
Hurry Riches H TVR class 'H' 0-6-0T 1884 TVR GWR   792 - 794 12/1884 11/1953 3
Manson J90 GNSR class 'D' 0-6-0T 1884 GNSR LNER         0
Tennant J74 NER class '8' 0-6-0T 1885 NER LNER         8
Manson J91 GNSR class 'E' 0-6-0T 1885 GNSR LNER         0
Holden J66 GER class 'T18' 0-6-0T 1886 GER LNER 2F 68370 - 68389 05/1886 10/1955 50
Worsdell J71 NER class 'E' 0-6-0T 1886 NER LNER 0F 68230 - 68316 11/1886 02/1961 120
Worsdell/Worsdell Crane Engines NER class 'H1' 0-6-0T 1888 NER LNER         2
Wainwright R1   0-6-0T 1888   SR   31010 - 31340 06/1888 03/1960 13
Holden J65 GER class 'E22' 0-6-0T 1889 GER LNER 0F 68211 - 68215 02/1889 10/1956 20
  E BaR class 'E' 0-6-0T 1890 BaR GWR   783 - 784 01/1890 08/1949 2
Holden J67 GER class 'R24 RBT' 0-6-0T 1890 GER LNER   68490 - 68628 03/1890 16/09/1962 140
Holden J69 GER class 'S56' 0-6-0T 1890 GER LNER   68491 - 68636 05/1904 16/09/1962 20
Holden J67 GER class 'R24' 0-6-0T 1890 GER LNER   68490 - 68628 03/1890 16/09/1962 140
Worsdell J73 NER class 'L' 0-6-0T 1891 NER LNER   68355 - 68364   10/1960 10
Stroudley E1-1   0-6-0T 1891   SR   32160 - 32164 07/1891 12/1951 3
Stirling J80 HBR class 'G2' 0-6-0T 1892 HBR LNER         3
Adams G6   0-6-0T 1894 LSWR SR   30160 - 30354 08/1894 11/11/1961 34
McIntosh 29 CR class '29' 0-6-0T 1895 CR LMS 3F       9
Manson 14 GSWR class '14' 0-6-0T 1896 GSWR LMS     07/1896 11/1932 15
Kitson J60 LDECR class 'B' 0-6-0T 1897 LDECR LNER   68366 - 68368 02/1897 03/08/1948 4
Worsdell J79 NER class 'H2' 0-6-0T 1897 NER LNER         3
Aspinall 24   0-6-0T 1897 LYR LMS   51535 - 51546 09/1897 21/09/1961 5
Marriott J93 MGNR class 'SHUNTING' 0-6-0T 1897 MGNR LNER   68484 - 68489   20/05/1948 9
Worsdell J72 NER class 'E1' 0-6-0T 1898 NER LNER   68670 - 69028 12/1898 10/1964 113
McIntosh 782 CR class '782' 0-6-0T 1898 CR LMS 3F       138
McIntosh 782 CR class '782 Y117' 0-6-0T 1898 CR LMS 3F       138
McIntosh 782 CR class '782 Y73' 0-6-0T 1898 CR LMS 3F       138
Johnson 3F   0-6-0T 1899   LMS   47200 - 47259 12/1899 12/1966 60
Fletcher/Worsdell J77 NER class '290' 0-6-0T 1899 NER LNER   68390 - 68441   10/1960 46
Holmes J83 NBR class 'D' 0-6-0T 1900 NBR LNER 2F 68442 - 68481 08/1900 29/12/1962 40
Stirling J75 HBR class 'G3' 0-6-0T 1901 HBR LNER   68365 12/1901 01/1949 16
  W_L   0-6-0T 1902   GWR   822 - 823 09/1902 07/1962 2
Drummond Scrap Tank   0-6-0T 1903 HR LMS     10/1903 1932 3
Holden J70 GER class 'C53' 0-6-0T 1903 GER LNER   68216 - 68226 10/1903 02/08/1955 12
  J64 MSR class 'MSR 3ft 4½"' 0-6-0T 1904 MSR LNER     11/1904 12/1929 3
Reid J88 NBR class 'F' 0-6-0T 1904 NBR LNER 0F 68320 - 68354 12/1904 29/12/1962 35
Robinson J63 GCR class '5A' 0-6-0T 1906 GCR LNER 0F 68204 - 68210 08/1906 25/02/1957 7
Maryport Works 17 Rbld MCR class '17 Rbld' 0-6-0T 1907 MCR LMS         0
  756   0-6-0T 1907   SR   30756 1907 11/1951 1
Hurry Riches S RR class 'S' 0-6-0T 1908 RR GWR   93 - 611 06/1908 05/1954 4
  Unclassified   0-6-0T 1909 BPGVR GWR   2197 03/1909 10/1952 1
Wainwright P   0-6-0T 1909   SR   31027 - 31558 02/1909 06/1961 8
/Pettigrew   FR class 'G5' 0-6-0T 1910 FR LMS 1P       10
/Pettigrew   FR class 'G5' 0-6-0T 1910 FR LMS 1P       10
  Unclassified   0-6-0T 1910 BPGVR GWR   2198 12/1910 03/1959 1
  Unclassified LMMR class 'Unclass' 0-6-0T 1911 LMMR GWR   803 01/1911 03/1951 1
McIntosh 498 CR class '498 Y111' 0-6-0T 1912 CR LMS 2F       23
McIntosh 498 CR class '498' 0-6-0T 1912 CR LMS 2F       23
Hill J68 GER class 'C72' 0-6-0T 1912 GER LNER 3F 68638 - 68666 06/1912 09/1961 30
  Unclassified   0-6-0T 1913 BPGVR GWR   2162 - 2168 05/1913 05/1956 5
Gresley J51 GNR class 'J23' 0-6-0T 1913 GNR LNER     12/1913 05/1965 30
Billinton E2   0-6-0T 1913   SR   32100 - 32109 06/1913 04/1963 10
  Unclassified ANDR class 'Unclass' 0-6-0T 1917 ANDR GWR   666 - 667 08/1917 04/1955 2
  EKR   0-6-0T 1917   SR   30948 08/1917 02/1949 1
Drummond 5 GSWR class '5' 0-6-0T 1917 GSWR LMS 2F   11/1917 04/1934 3
Hurry Riches S1 RR class 'S1' 0-6-0T 1919 RR GWR   92 - 605 06/1920 06/1954 3
Connor 74 NSR class '74' 0-6-0T 1919 NSR LMS 1F       2
Gresley J50 GNR class 'J23' 0-6-0T 1922 GNR LNER   68890 - 68991 10/1922 09/1963 72
Connor 23 NSR class '23' 0-6-0T 1922 NSR LMS         1
Fowler 3F   0-6-0T 1924   LMS 3F 47260 - 47681 07/1924 10/1967 417
Fowler 2F   0-6-0T 1928   LMS   47160 - 47169 12/1928 09/1964 10
  USA   0-6-0T 1942   SR   30061 - 30074 1942 07/1967 14