Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 215 Today
» 839 Yesterday
» 1054 Week
» 17033 Month
» 212487 Year
» 1096868 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Classes with Wheel Arrangement 0-6-2T

Designer Class Pre Grouping Class Wheels Year Pre Grouping Big 4 BR Power Class Number Range First Last # Thumbnail
  N18   0-6-2T     LNER         0
Webb Coal Tank   0-6-2T   LNWR LMS 2F 58880 - 58937 06/1881 10/1958 58
Maunsell El Radials   0-6-2T 1874   SR   32094 - 32697 12/1874 11/1959 10
Worsdell N8 NER class 'B' 0-6-2T 1886 NER LNER   69371 - 69401 06/1886 10/1956 62
  B BaR class 'B' 0-6-2T 1889 BaR GWR   198 - 231 05/1889 10/1949 4
Parker N4   0-6-2T 1889 MSLR LNER 2MT 69225 - 69241 12/1889 03/12/1954 55
Parker N5   0-6-2T 1891 MLSR LNER 2MT 69250 - 69370 09/1891 12/1960 131
Worsdell N9 NER class 'N' 0-6-2T 1893 NER LNER 3MT 69410 - 69429 05/1893 07/1955 20
Billinton Small Radials   0-6-2T 1894   SR   32165 - 32462 11/1894 11/1959 16
  N6   0-6-2T 1895 LDECR LNER     09/1895 10/1938 18
Billinton Radials   0-6-2T 1897   SR   32463 - 32582 12/1897 06/1963 70
/Pettigrew   FR class 'L1' 0-6-2T 1898 FR LMS 3F       3
  Unclassified PTR class 'Unclass' 0-6-2T 1898 PTR GWR   184 09/1898 10/1948 1
Webb 18" Passenger Tank   0-6-2T 1898 LNWR LMS   46876 - 46931 09/1898 02/1953 15
Billinton E4X   0-6-2T 1898   SR   32466 - 32489 04/1898 01/1959 4
Longbottom 58 NSR class '58' 0-6-2T 1899 NSR LMS 2F       6
  B1 BaR class 'B1' 0-6-2T 1900 BaR GWR   238 - 277 06/1890 04/1951 20
Stirling N11 HBR class 'F1' 0-6-2T 1901 HBR LNER         0
Stirling N12 HBR class 'F2' 0-6-2T 1901 HBR LNER   69089 11/1901 30/08/1948 9
Worsdell N10 NER class 'U' 0-6-2T 1902 NER LNER 3F 69090 - 69109 10/1902 09/04/1962 20
Hurry Riches O3 TVR class 'O3' 0-6-2T 1902 TVR GWR   410 - 411 01/1904 03/1948 2
Billinton E5X   0-6-2T 1902   SR   32401 - 32586 11/1902 01/1956 4
Billinton Large Radials   0-6-2T 1902   SR   32399 - 32594 10/1902 01/1956 24
Whitelegg Tilbury tanks   0-6-2T 1903 LTSR LMS   41980 - 41993 06/1903 18/06/1962 14
Adams 165 NSR class '165' 0-6-2T 1903 NSR LMS 3F       6
/Pettigrew   FR class 'L3' 0-6-2T 1904 FR LMS 3F       16
/Pettigrew   FR class 'L2' 0-6-2T 1904 FR LMS 3F       16
Jenkins M RR class 'M' 0-6-2T 1904 RR GWR   33 - 51 06/1904 02/1951 3
Billinton E6X   0-6-2T 1904   SR   32407 - 32411 12/1904 02/1959 2
Billinton E6   0-6-2T 1904   SR   32408 - 32418 12/1904 23/12/1962 10
  757   0-6-2T 1907   SR   30757 - 30758 1907 12/1957 2
Hurry Riches O4 TVR class 'O4' 0-6-2T 1907 TVR GWR   200 - 420 04/1907 07/1955 42
Ivatt N1   0-6-2T 1907 GNR LNER   69430 - 69485 04/1907 04/1959 56
Hurry Riches R RR class 'R' 0-6-2T 1907 RR GWR   30 - 46 12/1907 03/1951 5
  Unclassified CarR class 'Unclass' 0-6-2T 1908 CarR GWR   155 12/1908 09/1953 1
Adams 98 NSR class '98' 0-6-2T 1908 NSR LMS 3F       32
Adams 98 NSR class '98 Belpaire' 0-6-2T 1908 NSR LMS 3F       32
Hurry Riches AP RR class 'AP' 0-6-2T 1909 RR GWR   78 - 81 08/1921 08/1955 4
Hurry Riches P RR class 'P' 0-6-2T 1909 RR GWR   76 - 83 07/1909 05/1955 4
Dunbar Unclassified   0-6-2T 1909 BMJR GWR   11 - 504 12/1909 01/1951 8
Reid N14 NBR class 'A' 0-6-2T 1909 NBR LNER 4MT 69120 - 69125 09/1909 03/1954 6
Hurry Riches A RR class 'A' 0-6-2T 1910 RR GWR   52 - 75 05/1910 07/1955 16
Reid N15 NBR class 'A' 0-6-2T 1910 NBR LNER 4MT 69126 - 69224 06/1910 29/12/1962 99
/Pettigrew   FR class 'L4' 0-6-2T 1912 FR LMS         4
Stirling N13 HBR class 'F3' 0-6-2T 1913 HBR LNER   69110 - 69119 11/1913 10/1956 10
Cameron A TVR class 'A' 0-6-2T 1914 TVR GWR   303 - 440 10/1914 01/08/1957 58
Hurry Riches A1 RR class 'A1' 0-6-2T 1914 RR GWR   63 - 70 06/1914 07/1955 8
Drummond 45 GSWR class '45' 0-6-2T 1915 GSWR LMS 3F   12/1915 11/1947 18
Dunbar 45   0-6-2T 1915 BMJR GWR     08/1915 02/1954 6
Hill N7 GER class 'L77' 0-6-2T 1915 GER LNER   69600 - 69733 01/1915 16/09/1962 134
Whitelegg 1 GSWR class '1' 0-6-2T 1919 GSWR LMS 3F   05/1919 17/04/1948 10
Gresley N2   0-6-2T 1920 GNR LNER 3MT 69490 - 69596 12/1920 23/09/1962 107
Hurry Riches R RR class 'R1' 0-6-2T 1921 RR GWR   35 - 44 07/1921 10/1957 10
Collett 56xx   0-6-2T 1924   GWR   5600 - 6699 12/1924 05/1966 200