Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 565 Today
» 1212 Yesterday
» 565 Week
» 28956 Month
» 154433 Year
» 231020 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Classes with Wheel Arrangement 4-6-0

Designer Class Pre Grouping Class Wheels Year Pre Grouping Big 4 BR Power Class Number Range First Last # Thumbnail
  Royal Scot (Scot)   4-6-0     LMS   46100 - 46170 14/08/1927 01/01/1966 71
Churchward Saint   4-6-0 1902   GWR 4P 2902 - 2989 04/1905 10/1953 77
Churchward Star   4-6-0 1907   GWR   4003 - 4062 04/1906 11/1964 73
Collett King   4-6-0 1927   GWR   6000 - 6029 06/1927 18/12/1962 30
Collett Hall   4-6-0 1928   GWR   4900 - 6958 12/1924 03/12/1965 258
Collett Castle   4-6-0 1923   GWR   100 - 7037 11/08/1923 12/1965 155
Collett Manor   4-6-0 1938   GWR   7800 - 7829 01/1938 12/1965 30
Collett Grange   4-6-0 1936   GWR   6800 - 6879 08/1936 03/12/1965 80
Cooke Claughton LNWR class 'Claughton' 4-6-0   LNWR LMS   46004 08/1920 23/04/1949 130
Cooke Prince of Wales LNWR class 'Prince of Wales' 4-6-0 1911 LNWR LMS   58000 - 58003 10/1911 01/1949 246
Cumming Highland Clan HR class 'Highland Clan' 4-6-0 1919 HR LMS 4P   04/1919 02/1950 8
Cumming Clan Goods   4-6-0     LMS   57950 - 57956 11/1916 10/1952 6
Drummond T14 LSWR class 'T14' 4-6-0 1911 LSWR SR   30443 - 30462 04/1911 06/1951 9
Drummond HR Castle   4-6-0 1900 HR LMS     06/1900 04/1947 19
Fowler Patriot   4-6-0     LMS   45500 - 45551 08/11/1930 30/10/1965 52
Hawksworth County   4-6-0 1945   GWR   1000 - 1029 08/1945 11/1964 30
Hawksworth Modified Hall   4-6-0 1944   GWR   6959 - 7929 03/1944 03/12/1965 71
Hughes 5P   4-6-0 1908 LYR LMS   50412 - 50455 10/1908 07/10/1951 7
Maunsell Lord Nelson   4-6-0     SR   30850 - 30865 08/1926 06/10/1962 16
Maunsell Rememberance   4-6-0     SR   32327 - 32333 04/1914 07/1957 7
Pickersgill 4P   4-6-0   CR LMS   54630 - 54649 07/1925 12/1953 18
Pickersgill 60   4-6-0   CR LMS   54650 - 54654 11/1916 09/1953 5
Stanier Black Five   4-6-0 1934   LMS   44658 - 45499 08/1934 08/1968 842
Stanier Jubilee   4-6-0 1934   LMS   45552 - 45742 10/05/1934 11/1967 191
Urie H15 LSWR class 'H15' 4-6-0 1914 LSWR SR   30330 - 30524 09/1905 09/12/1961 26
Urie/Maunsell King Arthur LSWR class 'N15' 4-6-0 1918 LSWR SR   30448 - 30806 09/1918 24/11/1962 74
Urie/Maunsell S15 LSWR class 'S15' 4-6-0 1920 LSWR SR   30496 - 30815 03/1920 09/1965 45
Webb 4-Cylinder Compound LNWR class '4-Cylinder Compound' 4-6-0 1903 LNWR       02/1903 09/1920 30
Whale Experiment LNWR class 'Experiment' 4-6-0 1905 LNWR LMS         105
Whale 19" Goods   4-6-0 1906 LNWR LMS 4F 48801 - 48834 12/1906 02/1950 170
Thompson B1   4-6-0 1942   LNER 5MT 61000 - 61409 12/12/1942 30/09/1967 410
Gresley/Thompson B2   4-6-0 1928   LNER   61603 - 61671     0
Robinson B3 GCR class '9P' 4-6-0 1917 GCR LNER   61497 11/1917 14/04/1949 6
Robinson B4 GCR class '8F' 4-6-0 1906 GCR LNER 4P 61482 - 61488 06/1906 24/11/1950 10
Robinson B5 GCR class '8' 4-6-0 1902 GCR LNER 3MT 61680 - 61690 11/1902 12/06/1950 14
Robinson B6 GCR class '8N' 4-6-0 1918 GCR LNER     07/1918 31/12/1947 3
Robinson B7 GCR class '9Q' 4-6-0 1921 GCR LNER 6MT 61360 - 61397 05/1921 03/07/1950 38
Robinson B8 GCR class '1A' 4-6-0 1913 GCR LNER   61353 - 61358 06/1913 23/04/1949 11
Robinson B9 GCR class '8G' 4-6-0 1906 GCR LNER 5MT 61469 - 61476 09/1906 16/05/1949 10
Holden B12 GER class 'S69' 4-6-0 1911 GER LNER   61500 - 61580 12/1911 20/09/1961 81
Worsdell B13 NER class 'S' 4-6-0 1899 NER LNER     06/1899 22/02/1951 40
Worsdell B14   4-6-0 1900 NER LNER     12/1900 14/04/1931 5
Raven B15   4-6-0 1911 NER LNER     12/1911 27/12/1947 20
Raven B16   4-6-0 1919 NER LNER   61400 - 61478 12/1919 21/07/1964 70
Gresley B17   4-6-0 1928   LNER   61600 - 61672 11/1928 22/08/1960 73
Robinson B18 GCR class '8C' 4-6-0 1903 GCR LNER n/a   12/1903 31/12/1947 2
Robinson B19 GCR class 'I' 4-6-0 1912 GCR LNER     12/1912 14/11/1947 6
Riddles Standard Class 5   4-6-0 1951       73000 - 73171 04/1951 08/1968 172
Riddles Standard Class 4   4-6-0 1951       75000 - 75079 05/1951 08/1968 80