Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 344 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 5949 Week
» 17496 Month
» 417178 Year
» 493765 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Classes with Wheel Arrangement 4-6-2

Designer Class Pre Grouping Class Wheels Year Pre Grouping Big 4 BR Power Class Number Range First Last # Thumbnail
Bulleid West Country/Battle of Britain   4-6-2 1945   SR 6MT 34001 - 34110 06/1945 07/1967 110
Bulleid Merchant Navy   4-6-2 1941   SR   35001 - 35030 06/1941 07/1967 30
Churchward Great Bear   4-6-2 1908   GWR   111 - 111 02/1908 13/07/1953 1
Stanier Coronation (Semi)   4-6-2 1937   LMS   46220 - 46257 06/1937 10/1964 38
Stanier Princess Royal   4-6-2 1933   LMS   46200 - 46212 27/06/1933 17/11/1962 13
Peppercorn A1   4-6-2 1948   LNER 7P 60114 - 60163 06/08/1948 19/06/1966 50
Gresley A1/1   4-6-2 1945   LNER   60113     0
Thompson A2   4-6-2 1944   LNER 6MT 60500 - 60524 13/05/1944 19/06/1965 19
Peppercorn A2   4-6-2 1947   LNER 7MT 60525 - 60539 24/12/1947 31/12/1966 15
Raven A2   4-6-2 1922 NER LNER   2400 - 2404 12/1922 21/05/1937 5
Gresley A3   4-6-2 1922 GNR LNER   60035 - 60112 22/08/1928 04/12/1965 27
Gresley A4   4-6-2 1935   LNER 7P 60001 - 60034 07/09/1935 05/09/1966 35
Riddles Britannia   4-6-2 1951       70000 - 70054 05/01/1951 17/08/1968 55
Riddles Duke   4-6-2 1954       71000 05/1954 24/11/1962 1
Riddles Clan   4-6-2 1951       72000 - 72009 12/1951 21/05/1966 10