Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 245 Today
» 1018 Yesterday
» 5417 Week
» 16988 Month
» 265281 Year
» 1149662 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Classes with Wheel Arrangement 4-6-2T

Designer Class Pre Grouping Class Wheels Year Pre Grouping Big 4 BR Power Class Number Range First Last # Thumbnail
Worsdell/Raven A6 NER class 'W' 4-6-2T 1907 NER LNER 4P 69791 - 69799 12/1907 30/03/1953 10
Worsdell/Raven A7 NER class 'Y' 4-6-2T 1910 NER LNER 5F 69770 - 69789 10/1910 16/12/1957 20
Cooke 2665 LNWR class '5' 6" Tank (Superheated)' 4-6-2T 1910 LNWR LMS     12/1910 04/1941 47
Cooke 2665 LNWR class '2665' 4-6-2T 1910 LNWR LMS     12/1910 04/1941 47
Marsh Pacific Tanks   4-6-2T 1910   SR   32325 12/1910 06/1951 1
Robinson A5 GCR class '9N' 4-6-2T 1911 GCR LNER 4P 69800 - 69842 18/03/1911 17/11/1960 44
Marsh Pacific Tanks   4-6-2T 1912   SR   32326 03/1912 06/1951 1
Pickersgill 944 CR class '944' 4-6-2T 1917 CR LMS 4P       12
Urie H16 LSWR class 'H16' 4-6-2T 1921 LSWR SR   30516 - 30520 11/1921 29/12/1962 5
Raven/Gresley A8   4-6-2T 1931   LNER   69850 - 69894     0