Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1442 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7226 Week
» 28615 Month
» 148142 Year
» 3174995 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotives of the Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway
Build Date |
LYR Class |
LMS Class |
First LYR Number |
Wheels |
Designer |
Manufacturer |
Order Number |
Works Number |
Withdrawn |
08/1876 |
25 |
|
528 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2107 |
12/1930 |
08/1876 |
25 |
|
529 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2108 |
06/1928 |
02/1877 |
25 |
|
530 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2111 |
12/1932 |
03/1877 |
25 |
|
531 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2112 |
24/01/1959 |
03/1877 |
25 |
|
532 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2113 |
11/1930 |
03/1877 |
25 |
|
533 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2114 |
03/1939 |
03/1877 |
25 |
|
534 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2115 |
23/11/1957 |
04/1877 |
25 |
|
535 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2119 |
02/1949 |
04/1877 |
25 |
|
536 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2120 |
12/1930 |
06/1877 |
25 |
|
550 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2692 |
12/1928 |
06/1877 |
25 |
|
551 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2693 |
12/1930 |
06/1877 |
25 |
|
552 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2694 |
10/1963 |
06/1877 |
25 |
|
553 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2695 |
12/1964 |
06/1877 |
25 |
|
554 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2696 |
03/1939 |
07/1877 |
25 |
|
537 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2121 |
08/02/1958 |
07/1877 |
25 |
|
538 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2122 |
27/10/1956 |
07/1877 |
25 |
|
539 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2123 |
12/1928 |
07/1877 |
25 |
|
555 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2697 |
05/11/1960 |
08/1877 |
25 |
|
540 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2124 |
10/1926 |
08/1877 |
25 |
|
541 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2125 |
05/1936 |
08/1877 |
25 |
|
542 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2126 |
12/1930 |
08/1877 |
25 |
|
543 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2127 |
12/1928 |
08/1877 |
25 |
|
556 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2702 |
04/1928 |
08/1877 |
25 |
|
557 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2703 |
11/1932 |
08/1877 |
25 |
|
558 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2704 |
12/1961 |
08/1877 |
25 |
|
559 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2705 |
03/1949 |
09/1877 |
25 |
|
560 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2706 |
11/1933 |
09/1877 |
25 |
|
561 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2707 |
14/11/1959 |
10/1877 |
25 |
|
562 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2729 |
20/07/1957 |
10/1877 |
25 |
|
563 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2730 |
05/05/1956 |
10/1877 |
25 |
|
564 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2731 |
08/11/1947 |
10/1877 |
25 |
|
565 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2732 |
06/1928 |
11/1877 |
25 |
|
566 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2733 |
10/04/1948 |
11/1877 |
25 |
|
567 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2734 |
12/1928 |
02/1878 |
25 |
|
544 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2129 |
30/01/1960 |
02/1878 |
25 |
|
545 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2130 |
04/1928 |
02/1878 |
25 |
|
546 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2131 |
12/1930 |
02/1878 |
25 |
|
547 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2132 |
27/10/1956 |
02/1878 |
25 |
|
548 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2133 |
11/1930 |
02/1878 |
25 |
|
549 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2134 |
23/10/1959 |
08/1878 |
25 |
|
240 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
483 |
06/1928 |
08/1878 |
25 |
|
242 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
484 |
01/1946 |
09/1878 |
25 |
|
143 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
487 |
02/1939 |
09/1878 |
25 |
|
238 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
486 |
09/1934 |
09/1878 |
25 |
|
257 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
485 |
11/1930 |
10/1878 |
25 |
|
122 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2226 |
07/1957 |
10/1878 |
25 |
|
124 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
488 |
12/1928 |
10/1878 |
25 |
|
128 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2227 |
04/1938 |
10/1878 |
25 |
|
164 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2228 |
25/03/1961 |
10/1878 |
25 |
|
165 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2239 |
05/09/1953 |
10/1878 |
25 |
|
245 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
489 |
06/1928 |
10/1878 |
25 |
|
277 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
490 |
10/1932 |
11/1878 |
25 |
|
168 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2230 |
10/1928 |
11/1878 |
25 |
|
172 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2231 |
06/1927 |
11/1878 |
25 |
|
174 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2232 |
10/1926 |
11/1878 |
25 |
|
178 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2233 |
10/1926 |
11/1878 |
25 |
|
180 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2234 |
03/1928 |
12/1878 |
25 |
|
182 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2235 |
12/1930 |
12/1878 |
25 |
|
236 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
491 |
06/10/1956 |
12/1878 |
25 |
|
256 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
492 |
04/1939 |
02/1879 |
25 |
|
280 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
493 |
12/1928 |
03/1879 |
25 |
|
250 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
494 |
10/1938 |
03/1879 |
25 |
|
311 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
495 |
03/1938 |
04/1879 |
25 |
|
249 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
496 |
18/09/1948 |
05/1879 |
25 |
|
131 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
498 |
10/1963 |
05/1879 |
25 |
|
248 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
497 |
05/1939 |
06/1879 |
25 |
|
153 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
499 |
08/1932 |
06/1879 |
25 |
|
268 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
500 |
12/1930 |
08/1879 |
25 |
|
314 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
501 |
11/1930 |
09/1879 |
25 |
|
258 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
502 |
12/1932 |
12/1879 |
25 |
|
126 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2272 |
12/1928 |
12/1879 |
25 |
|
132 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2273 |
11/1933 |
12/1879 |
25 |
|
133 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2274 |
12/1928 |
12/1879 |
25 |
|
136 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2275 |
09/04/1955 |
01/1880 |
25 |
|
137 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2276 |
18/09/1954 |
01/1880 |
25 |
|
138 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2277 |
23/11/1957 |
01/1880 |
25 |
|
140 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2278 |
12/1932 |
02/1880 |
25 |
|
148 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2279 |
17/02/1962 |
02/1880 |
25 |
|
149 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2280 |
09/1939 |
02/1880 |
25 |
|
615 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
503 |
04/1928 |
02/1880 |
25 |
|
663 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
504 |
10/02/1954 |
03/1880 |
25 |
|
163 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2281 |
11/1930 |
03/1880 |
25 |
|
175 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
505 |
07/1956 |
03/1880 |
25 |
|
324 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
506 |
02/1936 |
04/1880 |
25 |
|
621 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
507 |
10/1934 |
05/1880 |
25 |
|
166 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2282 |
23/09/1961 |
05/1880 |
25 |
|
167 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2283 |
12/1932 |
05/1880 |
25 |
|
266 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
508 |
12/1928 |
06/1880 |
25 |
|
144 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
509 |
03/04/1954 |
06/1880 |
25 |
|
170 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2284 |
12/1930 |
06/1880 |
25 |
|
171 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2285 |
04/1937 |
06/1880 |
25 |
|
173 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2286 |
05/1960 |
06/1880 |
25 |
|
176 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2287 |
12/1928 |
06/1880 |
25 |
|
177 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2288 |
11/1930 |
06/1880 |
25 |
|
292 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
510 |
16/05/1959 |
08/1880 |
25 |
|
179 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2289 |
12/1930 |
08/1880 |
25 |
|
284 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
511 |
25/10/1958 |
08/1880 |
25 |
|
293 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
512 |
12/1928 |
08/1880 |
|
|
568 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
871 |
20/10/1956 |
08/1880 |
|
|
569 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
872 |
02/1936 |
08/1880 |
|
|
629 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2910 |
03/1896 |
09/1880 |
25 |
|
181 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2290 |
16/04/1955 |
09/1880 |
25 |
|
194 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2291 |
08/06/1957 |
09/1880 |
25 |
|
196 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2292 |
04/1949 |
09/1880 |
25 |
|
197 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2293 |
11/12/1948 |
09/1880 |
25 |
|
204 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2294 |
03/1939 |
09/1880 |
25 |
|
207 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2295 |
10/1926 |
09/1880 |
|
|
570 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
873 |
10/1934 |
09/1880 |
|
|
571 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
874 |
20/11/1948 |
09/1880 |
|
|
572 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
875 |
02/1938 |
09/1880 |
|
|
573 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
876 |
11/1930 |
09/1880 |
|
|
574 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
877 |
21/03/1959 |
09/1880 |
|
|
630 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2911 |
11/1897 |
09/1880 |
|
|
643 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2912 |
03/1898 |
09/1880 |
|
|
644 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2913 |
05/1897 |
09/1880 |
|
|
645 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2914 |
04/1896 |
09/1880 |
|
|
646 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2915 |
11/1897 |
10/1880 |
|
|
141 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2312 |
08/1912 |
10/1880 |
25 |
|
222 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2296 |
12/1930 |
10/1880 |
25 |
|
303 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
513 |
11/1930 |
10/1880 |
25 |
|
306 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
514 |
11/1933 |
10/1880 |
|
|
575 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
880 |
12/1928 |
10/1880 |
|
|
576 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
881 |
10/1926 |
10/1880 |
|
|
577 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
878 |
12/1928 |
10/1880 |
|
|
578 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
879 |
16/10/1954 |
10/1880 |
|
|
579 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
882 |
16/02/1957 |
10/1880 |
|
|
580 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
883 |
27/10/1956 |
10/1880 |
|
|
653 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2917 |
01/1896 |
11/1880 |
|
|
142 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2313 |
12/1912 |
11/1880 |
|
|
581 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
884 |
01/1936 |
11/1880 |
|
|
582 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
885 |
12/1933 |
12/1880 |
|
|
649 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2916 |
02/1897 |
01/1881 |
|
|
123 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2314 |
1906 |
01/1881 |
|
|
145 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2315 |
08/1928 |
01/1881 |
25 |
|
254 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
515 |
26/10/1957 |
01/1881 |
25 |
|
304 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
516 |
12/1947 |
02/1881 |
|
|
146 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2316 |
1931 |
02/1881 |
|
|
229 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2317 |
12/1912 |
02/1881 |
|
|
233 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2318 |
01/1912 |
02/1881 |
25 |
|
307 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
517 |
09/1932 |
02/1881 |
|
|
593 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
1976 |
10/1939 |
03/1881 |
|
|
237 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2319 |
02/1912 |
03/1881 |
|
|
239 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2320 |
11/1911 |
03/1881 |
25 |
|
308 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
518 |
12/1930 |
03/1881 |
|
|
583 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
886 |
12/1958 |
03/1881 |
|
|
594 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
1977 |
01/1939 |
03/1881 |
|
|
595 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
1978 |
26/11/1955 |
03/1881 |
|
|
596 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
1979 |
10/03/1962 |
03/1881 |
|
|
597 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
1980 |
16/08/1957 |
03/1881 |
|
|
598 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
1981 |
01/09/1962 |
03/1881 |
|
|
599 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
1982 |
12/1939 |
04/1881 |
|
|
241 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2321 |
01/1914 |
04/1881 |
|
|
243 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2322 |
01/1912 |
04/1881 |
|
|
243 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2322 |
01/1912 |
04/1881 |
|
|
243 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2322 |
01/1912 |
04/1881 |
|
|
243 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2322 |
01/1912 |
04/1881 |
|
|
244 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2323 |
12/1932 |
04/1881 |
|
|
244 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2323 |
12/1932 |
04/1881 |
|
|
244 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2323 |
12/1932 |
04/1881 |
|
|
244 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2323 |
12/1932 |
04/1881 |
|
|
584 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
887 |
02/10/1958 |
04/1881 |
|
|
585 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
888 |
09/1960 |
04/1881 |
|
|
586 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
889 |
16/05/1959 |
04/1881 |
|
|
587 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
890 |
23/04/1955 |
04/1881 |
|
|
588 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
891 |
18/06/1960 |
04/1881 |
|
|
600 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
1983 |
12/1930 |
04/1881 |
|
|
747 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
1984 |
12/08/1961 |
04/1881 |
|
|
748 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
1985 |
26/01/1957 |
05/1881 |
|
|
246 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2324 |
06/1905 |
05/1881 |
|
|
246 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2324 |
06/1905 |
05/1881 |
|
|
246 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2324 |
06/1905 |
05/1881 |
|
|
246 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2324 |
06/1905 |
05/1881 |
|
|
247 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2325 |
08/1905 |
05/1881 |
|
|
247 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2325 |
08/1905 |
05/1881 |
|
|
247 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2325 |
08/1905 |
05/1881 |
|
|
247 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2325 |
08/1905 |
05/1881 |
|
|
251 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2326 |
12/1930 |
05/1881 |
|
|
251 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2326 |
12/1930 |
05/1881 |
|
|
251 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2326 |
12/1930 |
05/1881 |
|
|
251 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2326 |
12/1930 |
05/1881 |
25 |
|
309 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
519 |
05/1936 |
05/1881 |
|
|
589 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
892 |
10/1954 |
05/1881 |
|
|
590 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
893 |
03/1946 |
05/1881 |
|
|
591 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
894 |
11/1930 |
05/1881 |
|
|
592 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
895 |
08/10/1955 |
05/1881 |
|
|
749 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
1986 |
01/1936 |
05/1881 |
|
|
750 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
1987 |
06/1938 |
05/1881 |
|
|
751 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
1988 |
05/05/1956 |
05/1881 |
|
|
752 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
1989 |
05/1937 |
05/1881 |
|
|
753 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
1990 |
01/1939 |
06/1881 |
|
|
253 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2327 |
10/1910 |
06/1881 |
|
|
253 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2327 |
10/1910 |
06/1881 |
|
|
253 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2327 |
10/1910 |
06/1881 |
|
|
253 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2327 |
10/1910 |
06/1881 |
|
|
255 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2328 |
06/1905 |
06/1881 |
|
|
255 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2328 |
06/1905 |
06/1881 |
|
|
255 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2328 |
06/1905 |
06/1881 |
|
|
255 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2328 |
06/1905 |
06/1881 |
25 |
|
313 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
520 |
05/1928 |
06/1881 |
|
|
754 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
1991 |
05/1932 |
06/1881 |
|
|
755 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
1992 |
12/1930 |
06/1881 |
|
|
756 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
1993 |
01/1949 |
06/1881 |
|
|
757 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
1994 |
11/1933 |
06/1881 |
|
|
758 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
1995 |
11/1930 |
07/1881 |
|
|
259 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2329 |
12/1912 |
07/1881 |
|
|
260 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2330 |
05/1905 |
07/1881 |
|
|
261 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2331 |
02/1906 |
07/1881 |
|
|
263 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2332 |
08/1929 |
07/1881 |
|
|
264 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2333 |
12/1930 |
07/1881 |
25 |
|
322 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
521 |
09/1961 |
07/1881 |
|
|
627 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2992 |
11/1897 |
07/1881 |
|
|
656 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2995 |
09/1901 |
07/1881 |
|
|
658 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2996 |
11/1898 |
07/1881 |
|
|
668 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2993 |
05/1897 |
07/1881 |
|
|
681 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2994 |
11/1896 |
08/1881 |
|
|
273 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2369 |
03/1928 |
08/1881 |
|
|
275 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2370 |
10/1910 |
08/1881 |
|
|
661 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2997 |
11/1896 |
08/1881 |
|
|
664 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2998 |
10/1897 |
08/1881 |
|
|
667 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
2999 |
09/1897 |
09/1881 |
25 |
|
305 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Miles Platting (LYR) |
?? |
522 |
01/10/1955 |
09/1881 |
|
|
669 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3000 |
03/1899 |
09/1881 |
|
|
670 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3001 |
02/1896 |
09/1881 |
|
|
671 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3002 |
09/1897 |
09/1881 |
|
|
672 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3003 |
08/1892 |
09/1881 |
|
|
674 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3004 |
07/1896 |
09/1881 |
|
|
759 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
1996 |
02/1936 |
09/1881 |
|
|
760 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
1997 |
05/1949 |
09/1881 |
|
|
761 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
1998 |
21/09/1957 |
09/1881 |
|
|
762 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
1999 |
25/02/1956 |
10/1881 |
|
|
152 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3007 |
09/1899 |
10/1881 |
|
|
675 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3005 |
10/1897 |
10/1881 |
|
|
678 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
3006 |
04/1896 |
10/1881 |
|
|
763 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2000 |
06/10/1956 |
10/1881 |
|
|
764 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2001 |
06/1957 |
11/1881 |
|
|
765 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2002 |
05/1949 |
11/1881 |
|
|
766 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2003 |
03/1928 |
11/1881 |
|
|
767 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2004 |
12/03/1955 |
11/1881 |
|
|
768 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2005 |
05/1939 |
12/1881 |
|
|
769 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2006 |
08/1939 |
12/1881 |
|
|
770 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2007 |
06/1928 |
01/1882 |
|
|
771 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2008 |
12/1938 |
01/1882 |
|
|
772 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2009 |
07/1949 |
01/1882 |
|
|
773 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2010 |
05/1949 |
01/1882 |
|
|
774 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2011 |
13/11/1948 |
02/1882 |
|
|
775 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2012 |
01/1936 |
02/1882 |
|
|
776 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2013 |
12/1939 |
02/1882 |
|
|
777 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2014 |
01/1939 |
02/1882 |
|
|
778 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2015 |
06/05/1961 |
02/1882 |
|
|
779 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2016 |
10/1934 |
02/1882 |
|
|
780 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2017 |
02/1942 |
02/1882 |
|
|
781 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2018 |
12/07/1958 |
03/1882 |
|
|
783 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2020 |
07/07/1956 |
03/1882 |
|
|
784 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2021 |
11/1933 |
03/1882 |
|
|
785 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2022 |
12/1932 |
03/1882 |
|
|
786 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2023 |
11/1933 |
03/1882 |
|
|
787 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2024 |
11/04/1957 |
04/1882 |
|
|
788 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2025 |
13/06/1959 |
08/1882 |
|
|
601 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1631 |
04/1915 |
08/1882 |
|
|
603 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1632 |
10/1913 |
08/1882 |
|
|
618 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1634 |
07/1912 |
08/1882 |
|
|
679 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1633 |
11/1931 |
09/1882 |
|
|
626 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1635 |
12/1912 |
09/1882 |
|
|
631 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1636 |
02/1928 |
09/1882 |
|
|
639 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1637 |
03/1912 |
09/1882 |
|
|
640 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1638 |
03/1928 |
09/1882 |
|
|
655 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1639 |
08/1912 |
09/1882 |
|
|
657 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1640 |
12/1912 |
11/1882 |
|
|
262 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1646 |
12/1932 |
11/1882 |
|
|
265 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1647 |
04/1914 |
11/1882 |
|
|
276 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1648 |
09/1910 |
11/1882 |
|
|
278 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1649 |
08/1929 |
11/1882 |
|
|
660 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1641 |
10/1910 |
11/1882 |
|
|
673 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1642 |
03/1914 |
11/1882 |
|
|
688 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1643 |
10/1932 |
11/1882 |
|
|
691 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1644 |
09/1910 |
11/1882 |
|
|
697 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1645 |
07/1912 |
12/1882 |
|
|
160 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1657 |
06/1930 |
12/1882 |
|
|
162 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1658 |
10/1910 |
12/1882 |
|
|
188 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1659 |
09/1910 |
12/1882 |
|
|
189 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1660 |
09/1910 |
12/1882 |
|
|
203 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1661 |
12/1932 |
12/1882 |
|
|
216 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1662 |
04/1916 |
12/1882 |
|
|
279 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1650 |
06/1930 |
12/1882 |
|
|
281 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1651 |
03/1912 |
12/1882 |
|
|
282 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1652 |
08/1929 |
12/1882 |
|
|
283 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1653 |
09/1932 |
12/1882 |
|
|
285 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1654 |
09/1910 |
12/1882 |
|
|
294 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1655 |
12/1932 |
12/1882 |
|
|
295 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1656 |
03/1929 |
12/1882 |
|
|
793 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
969 |
16/06/1956 |
12/1882 |
|
|
794 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
970 |
12/1930 |
12/1882 |
|
|
795 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
971 |
04/1946 |
12/1882 |
|
|
796 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
972 |
02/1937 |
12/1882 |
|
|
797 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
973 |
23/10/1948 |
01/1883 |
|
|
150 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1669 |
02/1913 |
01/1883 |
|
|
151 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1670 |
10/1910 |
01/1883 |
|
|
185 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1664 |
11/1910 |
01/1883 |
|
|
190 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1665 |
06/1930 |
01/1883 |
|
|
23 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1663 |
10/1926 |
01/1883 |
|
|
234 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1666 |
11/1914 |
01/1883 |
|
|
235 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1667 |
03/1914 |
01/1883 |
|
|
312 |
0-6-2T |
W. Barton Wright |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1668 |
08/1914 |
01/1883 |
|
|
798 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
974 |
18/03/1961 |
01/1883 |
|
|
799 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
975 |
19/03/1959 |
01/1883 |
|
|
800 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
976 |
03/1928 |
01/1883 |
|
|
801 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
977 |
09/1958 |
02/1883 |
|
|
782 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2019 |
21/03/1959 |
02/1883 |
|
|
802 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
978 |
10/09/1960 |
03/1883 |
|
|
803 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
979 |
11/1949 |
03/1883 |
|
|
804 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
980 |
06/1939 |
03/1883 |
|
|
805 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
981 |
02/1938 |
03/1883 |
|
|
806 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
982 |
02/1939 |
03/1883 |
|
|
807 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
983 |
12/11/1949 |
04/1883 |
|
|
808 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
984 |
06/1946 |
04/1883 |
|
|
809 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
985 |
21/11/1953 |
04/1883 |
|
|
810 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
986 |
10/1955 |
04/1883 |
|
|
811 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
987 |
11/1930 |
04/1883 |
|
|
812 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
988 |
15/08/1953 |
07/1883 |
|
|
813 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2877 |
06/1905 |
08/1883 |
|
|
814 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2878 |
06/1905 |
08/1883 |
|
|
815 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2879 |
11/1908 |
08/1883 |
|
|
816 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2880 |
11/1904 |
08/1883 |
|
|
817 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2881 |
11/1909 |
08/1883 |
|
|
818 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2882 |
05/1909 |
08/1883 |
|
|
819 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2883 |
11/1904 |
08/1883 |
|
|
820 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2884 |
08/1904 |
08/1883 |
|
|
821 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2885 |
06/1905 |
09/1883 |
|
|
822 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2886 |
03/1901 |
10/1883 |
|
|
823 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2887 |
06/1905 |
10/1883 |
|
|
824 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2888 |
09/1905 |
10/1883 |
|
|
825 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2889 |
06/1905 |
11/1883 |
|
|
826 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2890 |
06/1908 |
11/1883 |
|
|
827 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2891 |
10/1901 |
11/1883 |
|
|
828 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2892 |
06/1909 |
11/1883 |
|
|
829 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2893 |
06/1906 |
11/1883 |
|
|
830 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2894 |
05/1909 |
11/1883 |
|
|
831 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2895 |
08/1904 |
12/1883 |
|
|
832 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2896 |
03/1905 |
04/1884 |
|
|
833 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2897 |
11/1904 |
04/1884 |
|
|
834 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2898 |
06/1906 |
04/1884 |
|
|
835 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2899 |
09/1903 |
04/1884 |
|
|
836 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2900 |
10/1906 |
04/1884 |
|
|
837 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2901 |
09/1903 |
05/1884 |
|
|
838 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2902 |
03/1906 |
05/1884 |
|
|
839 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2903 |
11/1904 |
05/1884 |
|
|
840 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2904 |
06/1905 |
05/1884 |
|
|
841 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2905 |
10/1904 |
05/1884 |
|
|
842 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
2906 |
11/1904 |
03/1885 |
|
|
843 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2800 |
10/1949 |
03/1885 |
|
|
844 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2801 |
18/09/1954 |
03/1885 |
|
|
845 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2802 |
10/03/1956 |
03/1885 |
|
|
846 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2803 |
18/03/1961 |
03/1885 |
|
|
847 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2804 |
13/08/1955 |
04/1885 |
|
|
848 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2805 |
18/05/1957 |
04/1885 |
|
|
849 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2806 |
12/1932 |
04/1885 |
|
|
850 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2807 |
12/1933 |
04/1885 |
|
|
851 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2808 |
26/11/1960 |
04/1885 |
|
|
852 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2809 |
23/03/1957 |
04/1885 |
|
|
853 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2810 |
11/1930 |
04/1885 |
|
|
854 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2811 |
09/1939 |
04/1885 |
|
|
855 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2812 |
06/10/1956 |
04/1885 |
|
|
856 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2813 |
08/1938 |
05/1885 |
|
|
857 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2814 |
03/1936 |
05/1885 |
|
|
858 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2815 |
11/1938 |
05/1885 |
|
|
859 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2816 |
24/08/1956 |
05/1885 |
|
|
860 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2817 |
20/10/1956 |
05/1885 |
|
|
861 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2818 |
01/1936 |
05/1885 |
|
|
862 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2819 |
05/1938 |
06/1885 |
|
|
863 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2851 |
06/1908 |
06/1885 |
|
|
864 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2852 |
01/1907 |
06/1885 |
|
|
865 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2853 |
05/1905 |
06/1885 |
|
|
866 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2854 |
10/1904 |
07/1885 |
|
|
867 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2855 |
11/1904 |
07/1885 |
|
|
868 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2856 |
09/1904 |
07/1885 |
|
|
869 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2857 |
11/1904 |
07/1885 |
|
|
870 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2858 |
10/1904 |
07/1885 |
|
|
871 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2859 |
01/1906 |
07/1885 |
|
|
872 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2860 |
03/1908 |
09/1885 |
|
|
873 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2861 |
05/1909 |
10/1885 |
|
|
874 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2862 |
12/1907 |
10/1885 |
|
|
875 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2863 |
12/1908 |
10/1885 |
|
|
876 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2864 |
06/1906 |
10/1885 |
|
|
877 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2865 |
06/1906 |
10/1885 |
|
|
878 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2866 |
03/1905 |
10/1885 |
|
|
879 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2867 |
06/1905 |
10/1885 |
|
|
880 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2868 |
10/1904 |
10/1885 |
|
|
881 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2869 |
07/1905 |
11/1885 |
|
|
882 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Kitson |
?? |
2870 |
06/1909 |
11/1885 |
|
|
886 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1140 |
06/1909 |
11/1885 |
|
|
887 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1141 |
12/1908 |
12/1885 |
|
|
888 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1142 |
12/1908 |
12/1885 |
|
|
889 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1143 |
12/1908 |
12/1885 |
|
|
890 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1144 |
08/1905 |
12/1885 |
|
|
891 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1145 |
12/1908 |
01/1886 |
|
|
892 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1146 |
06/1909 |
01/1886 |
|
|
893 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1147 |
02/1908 |
02/1886 |
|
|
894 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1148 |
07/1906 |
02/1886 |
|
|
895 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1149 |
12/1908 |
02/1886 |
|
|
896 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1150 |
06/1909 |
02/1886 |
|
|
897 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1151 |
06/1909 |
03/1886 |
|
|
898 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1152 |
10/1905 |
03/1886 |
|
|
899 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1153 |
12/1908 |
03/1886 |
|
|
900 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1154 |
04/1906 |
04/1886 |
|
|
901 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1155 |
12/1908 |
04/1886 |
|
|
902 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1156 |
09/1909 |
05/1886 |
|
|
903 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1157 |
09/1908 |
05/1886 |
|
|
904 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1158 |
12/1909 |
05/1886 |
|
|
905 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1159 |
09/1909 |
10/1886 |
916 |
|
916 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1176 |
1925 |
10/1886 |
21 |
|
916 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1176 |
1925 |
10/1886 |
|
|
936 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1206 |
08/04/1950 |
11/1886 |
916 |
|
917 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1177 |
11/1910 |
11/1886 |
21 |
|
917 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1177 |
11/1910 |
11/1886 |
916 |
|
918 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1178 |
11/1910 |
11/1886 |
21 |
|
918 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1178 |
11/1910 |
05/1887 |
|
|
209 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1182 |
12/1911 |
05/1887 |
|
|
219 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1183 |
02/1912 |
05/1887 |
|
|
271 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1184 |
10/1909 |
05/1887 |
|
|
298 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1185 |
10/1909 |
05/1887 |
|
|
300 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1186 |
12/1911 |
05/1887 |
|
|
694 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1187 |
03/1913 |
05/1887 |
|
|
698 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1188 |
10/1913 |
06/1887 |
|
|
919 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1189 |
02/1913 |
06/1887 |
|
|
920 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1190 |
02/1912 |
06/1887 |
|
|
921 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1191 |
02/1913 |
07/1887 |
|
|
922 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1192 |
11/1930 |
07/1887 |
|
|
923 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1193 |
12/1913 |
07/1887 |
|
|
924 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1194 |
11/1930 |
07/1887 |
|
|
925 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1195 |
06/1914 |
07/1887 |
|
|
948 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2831 |
11/1930 |
07/1887 |
|
|
949 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2832 |
13/11/1948 |
07/1887 |
|
|
950 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2833 |
23/08/1952 |
07/1887 |
|
|
951 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2834 |
10/1947 |
07/1887 |
|
|
952 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2835 |
06/1946 |
08/1887 |
|
|
926 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1196 |
01/1914 |
08/1887 |
|
|
927 |
4-4-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1197 |
06/1913 |
08/1887 |
|
|
928 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1198 |
12/1934 |
08/1887 |
|
|
929 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1199 |
20/10/1956 |
08/1887 |
|
|
953 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2836 |
12/1930 |
08/1887 |
|
|
954 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2837 |
14/10/1950 |
08/1887 |
|
|
955 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2838 |
04/1935 |
08/1887 |
|
|
956 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2839 |
29/08/1953 |
08/1887 |
|
|
957 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2840 |
07/1959 |
08/1887 |
|
|
958 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2841 |
13/08/1955 |
08/1887 |
|
|
959 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2842 |
07/02/1948 |
08/1887 |
|
|
960 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2843 |
21/01/1950 |
09/1887 |
|
|
930 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1200 |
12/1930 |
09/1887 |
|
|
931 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1201 |
12/1933 |
09/1887 |
|
|
932 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1202 |
03/09/1949 |
09/1887 |
|
|
933 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1203 |
11/1930 |
09/1887 |
|
|
934 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1204 |
27/08/1955 |
09/1887 |
|
|
935 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1205 |
30/09/1950 |
09/1887 |
|
|
961 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2844 |
10/1932 |
09/1887 |
|
|
962 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2845 |
09/10/1948 |
09/1887 |
|
|
963 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2846 |
04/1935 |
09/1887 |
|
|
964 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2847 |
04/02/1956 |
09/1887 |
|
|
965 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2848 |
11/1930 |
09/1887 |
|
|
966 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2849 |
07/03/1955 |
10/1887 |
|
|
937 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1207 |
22/05/1954 |
10/1887 |
|
|
938 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1208 |
05/1946 |
10/1887 |
|
|
939 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1209 |
02/1946 |
10/1887 |
|
|
940 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1210 |
04/1935 |
10/1887 |
|
|
967 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2850 |
12/1930 |
10/1887 |
|
|
968 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2851 |
11/1930 |
10/1887 |
|
|
969 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2852 |
18/08/1951 |
11/1887 |
|
|
941 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1211 |
12/1933 |
11/1887 |
|
|
942 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1212 |
12/1930 |
11/1887 |
|
|
943 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1213 |
25/10/1952 |
11/1887 |
|
|
944 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1214 |
12/1954 |
11/1887 |
|
|
945 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1215 |
10/01/1948 |
11/1887 |
|
|
970 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2853 |
11/1930 |
11/1887 |
|
|
971 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2854 |
08/1932 |
11/1887 |
|
|
972 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2855 |
26/05/1951 |
12/1887 |
|
|
946 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1216 |
12/1932 |
12/1887 |
|
|
947 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
1217 |
08/1951 |
12/1887 |
|
|
973 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2856 |
11/1930 |
12/1887 |
|
|
974 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2857 |
12/1930 |
12/1887 |
|
|
975 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2858 |
11/1930 |
12/1887 |
|
|
976 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2859 |
04/09/1948 |
12/1887 |
|
|
977 |
0-6-0 |
W. Barton Wright |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2860 |
02/12/1950 |
07/1888 |
978 |
|
978 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2872 |
08/1934 |
07/1888 |
2 |
|
978 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2872 |
08/1934 |
08/1888 |
978 |
|
979 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2873 |
12/1932 |
08/1888 |
2 |
|
979 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2873 |
12/1932 |
08/1888 |
978 |
|
980 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2874 |
11/1930 |
08/1888 |
2 |
|
980 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2874 |
11/1930 |
08/1888 |
978 |
|
981 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2875 |
11/1930 |
08/1888 |
2 |
|
981 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2875 |
11/1930 |
08/1888 |
978 |
|
982 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2876 |
02/1934 |
08/1888 |
2 |
|
982 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2876 |
02/1934 |
09/1888 |
978 |
|
983 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2877 |
11/1930 |
09/1888 |
2 |
|
983 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2877 |
11/1930 |
09/1888 |
978 |
|
984 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2878 |
03/1934 |
09/1888 |
2 |
|
984 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2878 |
03/1934 |
09/1888 |
978 |
|
985 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2879 |
11/1930 |
09/1888 |
2 |
|
985 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2879 |
11/1930 |
09/1888 |
978 |
|
986 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2880 |
10/1932 |
09/1888 |
2 |
|
986 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2880 |
10/1932 |
09/1888 |
978 |
|
987 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2881 |
11/1901 |
09/1888 |
2 |
|
987 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2881 |
11/1901 |
10/1888 |
978 |
|
988 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2882 |
11/1930 |
10/1888 |
2 |
|
988 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2882 |
11/1930 |
10/1888 |
978 |
|
989 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2883 |
12/1930 |
10/1888 |
2 |
|
989 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2883 |
12/1930 |
10/1888 |
978 |
|
990 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2884 |
1930 |
10/1888 |
2 |
|
990 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2884 |
1930 |
11/1888 |
978 |
|
991 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2885 |
12/1930 |
11/1888 |
2 |
|
991 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2885 |
12/1930 |
11/1888 |
978 |
|
992 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2886 |
10/1932 |
11/1888 |
2 |
|
992 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2886 |
10/1932 |
12/1888 |
978 |
|
993 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2887 |
06/1932 |
12/1888 |
2 |
|
993 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2887 |
06/1932 |
12/1888 |
978 |
|
994 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2888 |
02/1929 |
12/1888 |
2 |
|
994 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2888 |
02/1929 |
12/1888 |
978 |
|
995 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2889 |
12/1933 |
12/1888 |
2 |
|
995 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2889 |
12/1933 |
12/1888 |
978 |
|
996 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2890 |
06/1930 |
12/1888 |
2 |
|
996 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2890 |
06/1930 |
01/1889 |
978 |
|
997 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2891 |
06/1930 |
01/1889 |
2 |
|
997 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2891 |
06/1930 |
01/1889 |
978 |
|
998 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2892 |
06/1930 |
01/1889 |
2 |
|
998 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2892 |
06/1930 |
02/1889 |
978 |
|
1000 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2894 |
12/1934 |
02/1889 |
2 |
|
1000 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2894 |
12/1934 |
02/1889 |
978 |
|
1001 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2895 |
11/1930 |
02/1889 |
2 |
|
1001 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2895 |
11/1930 |
02/1889 |
1008 |
|
1008 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
1 |
1 |
18/09/1954 |
02/1889 |
5 |
|
1008 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
1 |
1 |
18/09/1954 |
02/1889 |
978 |
|
999 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2893 |
05/1932 |
02/1889 |
2 |
|
999 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2893 |
05/1932 |
03/1889 |
978 |
|
1002 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2896 |
01/1935 |
03/1889 |
2 |
|
1002 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2896 |
01/1935 |
03/1889 |
978 |
|
1003 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2897 |
05/1932 |
03/1889 |
2 |
|
1003 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2897 |
05/1932 |
03/1889 |
978 |
|
1004 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2898 |
06/1930 |
03/1889 |
2 |
|
1004 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2898 |
06/1930 |
03/1889 |
1008 |
|
1009 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
1 |
2 |
23/08/1952 |
03/1889 |
5 |
|
1009 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
1 |
2 |
23/08/1952 |
03/1889 |
1008 |
|
1010 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
1 |
3 |
21/06/1952 |
03/1889 |
5 |
|
1010 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
1 |
3 |
21/06/1952 |
04/1889 |
978 |
|
1005 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2899 |
12/1931 |
04/1889 |
2 |
|
1005 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2899 |
12/1931 |
04/1889 |
978 |
|
1006 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2900 |
11/1930 |
04/1889 |
2 |
|
1006 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2900 |
11/1930 |
04/1889 |
978 |
|
1007 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2901 |
11/1930 |
04/1889 |
2 |
|
1007 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
2901 |
11/1930 |
04/1889 |
1008 |
|
1011 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
1 |
4 |
01/1944 |
04/1889 |
5 |
|
1011 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
1 |
4 |
01/1944 |
05/1889 |
1008 |
|
1012 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
1 |
5 |
09/08/1952 |
05/1889 |
5 |
|
1012 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
1 |
5 |
09/08/1952 |
05/1889 |
1008 |
|
1013 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
1 |
6 |
12/1937 |
05/1889 |
5 |
|
1013 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
1 |
6 |
12/1937 |
06/1889 |
1008 |
|
1014 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
1 |
7 |
11/1935 |
06/1889 |
5 |
|
1014 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
1 |
7 |
11/1935 |
06/1889 |
1008 |
|
1015 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
1 |
8 |
08/1930 |
06/1889 |
5 |
|
1015 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
1 |
8 |
08/1930 |
07/1889 |
1008 |
|
1016 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
1 |
9 |
08/1938 |
07/1889 |
5 |
|
1016 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
1 |
9 |
08/1938 |
07/1889 |
1008 |
|
1017 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
1 |
10 |
14/10/1950 |
07/1889 |
5 |
|
1017 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
1 |
10 |
14/10/1950 |
09/1889 |
|
|
11 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
2 |
11 |
03/1938 |
09/1889 |
|
|
130 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
2 |
12 |
06/1931 |
10/1889 |
|
|
1018 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
2 |
16 |
12/1933 |
10/1889 |
|
|
252 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
2 |
13 |
06/09/1952 |
10/1889 |
|
|
367 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
2 |
14 |
10/02/1954 |
10/1889 |
|
|
484 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
2 |
15 |
10/1931 |
11/1889 |
|
|
1019 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
2 |
17 |
22/11/1947 |
11/1889 |
|
|
1020 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
2 |
18 |
23/03/1946 |
11/1889 |
|
|
1021 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
2 |
19 |
05/1939 |
11/1889 |
|
|
1022 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
2 |
20 |
23/02/1946 |
11/1889 |
|
|
1023 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
3 |
21 |
30/06/1951 |
12/1889 |
|
|
1024 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
3 |
22 |
10/11/1960 |
12/1889 |
|
|
1025 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
3 |
23 |
02/1947 |
12/1889 |
|
|
1026 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
3 |
24 |
07/1935 |
01/1890 |
|
|
1027 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
3 |
25 |
04/07/1953 |
01/1890 |
|
|
1028 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
3 |
26 |
02/04/1949 |
01/1890 |
|
|
1029 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
3 |
27 |
10/02/1951 |
02/1890 |
|
|
1030 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
3 |
28 |
01/09/1962 |
02/1890 |
|
|
1031 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
3 |
29 |
18/05/1957 |
02/1890 |
|
|
1032 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
3 |
30 |
28/11/1959 |
04/1890 |
1008 |
|
1033 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
31 |
20/11/1948 |
04/1890 |
5 |
|
1033 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
31 |
20/11/1948 |
04/1890 |
1008 |
|
1034 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
32 |
01/1939 |
04/1890 |
5 |
|
1034 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
32 |
01/1939 |
05/1890 |
1008 |
|
1035 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
33 |
08/1930 |
05/1890 |
5 |
|
1035 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
33 |
08/1930 |
05/1890 |
1008 |
|
1036 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
34 |
21/06/1952 |
05/1890 |
5 |
|
1036 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
34 |
21/06/1952 |
06/1890 |
1008 |
|
1037 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
35 |
18/10/1952 |
06/1890 |
5 |
|
1037 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
35 |
18/10/1952 |
06/1890 |
1008 |
|
1038 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
36 |
03/1930 |
06/1890 |
5 |
|
1038 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
36 |
03/1930 |
06/1890 |
1008 |
|
1039 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
37 |
19/07/1957 |
06/1890 |
5 |
|
1039 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
37 |
19/07/1957 |
06/1890 |
1008 |
|
1040 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
38 |
02/1934 |
06/1890 |
5 |
|
1040 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
38 |
02/1934 |
07/1890 |
1008 |
|
1041 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
39 |
16/02/1952 |
07/1890 |
5 |
|
1041 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
39 |
16/02/1952 |
07/1890 |
1008 |
|
1042 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
40 |
17/05/1952 |
07/1890 |
5 |
|
1042 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
40 |
17/05/1952 |
07/1890 |
1008 |
|
1043 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
41 |
19/04/1952 |
07/1890 |
5 |
|
1043 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
41 |
19/04/1952 |
07/1890 |
1008 |
|
1044 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
42 |
06/1939 |
07/1890 |
5 |
|
1044 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
42 |
06/1939 |
08/1890 |
1008 |
|
1045 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
43 |
24/03/1951 |
08/1890 |
5 |
|
1045 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
43 |
24/03/1951 |
08/1890 |
1008 |
|
1046 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
44 |
10/1958 |
08/1890 |
5 |
|
1046 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
44 |
10/1958 |
08/1890 |
1008 |
|
1047 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
45 |
25/10/1958 |
08/1890 |
5 |
|
1047 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
45 |
25/10/1958 |
08/1890 |
1008 |
|
1048 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
46 |
11/1930 |
08/1890 |
5 |
|
1048 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
46 |
11/1930 |
08/1890 |
1008 |
|
1049 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
47 |
08/11/1958 |
08/1890 |
5 |
|
1049 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
47 |
08/11/1958 |
09/1890 |
1008 |
|
1050 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
48 |
11/1929 |
09/1890 |
5 |
|
1050 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
48 |
11/1929 |
09/1890 |
1008 |
|
1051 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
49 |
03/1929 |
09/1890 |
5 |
|
1051 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
49 |
03/1929 |
09/1890 |
1008 |
|
1052 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
50 |
21/02/1959 |
09/1890 |
5 |
|
1052 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
4 |
50 |
21/02/1959 |
09/1890 |
|
|
1053 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
5 |
51 |
05/02/1955 |
09/1890 |
|
|
1054 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
5 |
52 |
01/1934 |
10/1890 |
|
|
1055 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
5 |
53 |
02/1947 |
10/1890 |
|
|
1056 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
5 |
54 |
05/1932 |
10/1890 |
|
|
1057 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
5 |
55 |
31/10/1953 |
10/1890 |
|
|
1058 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
5 |
56 |
14/01/1956 |
10/1890 |
|
|
1059 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
5 |
57 |
15/09/1951 |
10/1890 |
|
|
1060 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
5 |
58 |
23/03/1946 |
11/1890 |
|
|
1061 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
5 |
59 |
24/01/1953 |
11/1890 |
|
|
1062 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
5 |
60 |
07/05/1949 |
11/1890 |
|
|
1063 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
5 |
61 |
03/03/1956 |
11/1890 |
|
|
1064 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
5 |
62 |
25/04/1953 |
12/1890 |
|
|
1065 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
5 |
63 |
01/1947 |
12/1890 |
|
|
1066 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
5 |
64 |
07/03/1953 |
12/1890 |
|
|
1067 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
5 |
65 |
24/10/1959 |
12/1890 |
|
|
1068 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
5 |
66 |
01/1940 |
12/1890 |
|
|
1069 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
5 |
67 |
27/05/1950 |
12/1890 |
|
|
1070 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
5 |
68 |
10/03/1951 |
01/1891 |
|
|
1071 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
5 |
69 |
08/09/1951 |
01/1891 |
|
|
1072 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
5 |
70 |
11/1933 |
01/1891 |
|
|
1073 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
6 |
71 |
06/08/1949 |
02/1891 |
|
|
1074 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
6 |
72 |
09/1946 |
02/1891 |
|
|
1075 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
6 |
73 |
04/1939 |
02/1891 |
|
|
1076 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
6 |
74 |
03/01/1948 |
02/1891 |
|
|
1077 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
6 |
75 |
05/1945 |
03/1891 |
1093 |
|
1093 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
91 |
03/1926 |
03/1891 |
3 |
|
1093 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
91 |
03/1926 |
03/1891 |
1093 |
|
1094 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
92 |
07/1925 |
03/1891 |
3 |
|
1094 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
92 |
07/1925 |
04/1891 |
|
|
1078 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
6 |
76 |
04/09/1954 |
04/1891 |
|
|
1079 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
6 |
77 |
13/10/1962 |
04/1891 |
|
|
1080 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
6 |
78 |
09/07/1958 |
04/1891 |
1093 |
|
1095 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
93 |
09/1926 |
04/1891 |
3 |
|
1095 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
93 |
09/1926 |
04/1891 |
1093 |
|
1096 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
94 |
06/1927 |
04/1891 |
3 |
|
1096 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
94 |
06/1927 |
04/1891 |
1093 |
|
1097 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
95 |
04/1928 |
04/1891 |
3 |
|
1097 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
95 |
04/1928 |
05/1891 |
|
|
1081 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
6 |
79 |
08/12/1962 |
05/1891 |
|
|
1082 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
6 |
80 |
12/1937 |
05/1891 |
|
|
1083 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
6 |
81 |
07/09/1957 |
05/1891 |
|
|
1084 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
6 |
82 |
23/01/1954 |
05/1891 |
|
|
1085 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
6 |
83 |
30/11/1957 |
06/1891 |
|
|
1086 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
6 |
84 |
26/05/1951 |
06/1891 |
|
|
1087 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
6 |
85 |
19/06/1948 |
06/1891 |
|
|
1088 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
6 |
86 |
01/1947 |
06/1891 |
|
|
1089 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
6 |
87 |
02/09/1961 |
06/1891 |
|
|
1090 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
6 |
88 |
12/04/1947 |
07/1891 |
|
|
1091 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
6 |
89 |
22/11/1947 |
07/1891 |
|
|
1092 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
6 |
90 |
03/1938 |
07/1891 |
1093 |
|
1098 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
96 |
10/1926 |
07/1891 |
3 |
|
1098 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
96 |
10/1926 |
07/1891 |
1093 |
|
1099 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
97 |
07/1928 |
07/1891 |
3 |
|
1099 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
97 |
07/1928 |
07/1891 |
1093 |
|
1100 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
98 |
12/1928 |
07/1891 |
3 |
|
1100 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
98 |
12/1928 |
08/1891 |
1093 |
|
1101 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
99 |
04/1928 |
08/1891 |
3 |
|
1101 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
99 |
04/1928 |
08/1891 |
1093 |
|
1102 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
100 |
11/1929 |
08/1891 |
3 |
|
1102 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
100 |
11/1929 |
08/1891 |
1093 |
|
1103 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
101 |
09/1927 |
08/1891 |
3 |
|
1103 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
101 |
09/1927 |
08/1891 |
1093 |
|
1104 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
102 |
10/1926 |
08/1891 |
3 |
|
1104 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
102 |
10/1926 |
08/1891 |
1093 |
|
1105 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
103 |
12/1924 |
08/1891 |
3 |
|
1105 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
103 |
12/1924 |
08/1891 |
1093 |
|
1106 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
104 |
03/1927 |
08/1891 |
3 |
|
1106 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
104 |
03/1927 |
09/1891 |
1093 |
|
1107 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
105 |
09/1926 |
09/1891 |
3 |
|
1107 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
105 |
09/1926 |
09/1891 |
1093 |
|
1108 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
106 |
08/1927 |
09/1891 |
3 |
|
1108 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
106 |
08/1927 |
09/1891 |
1093 |
|
1109 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
107 |
10/1925 |
09/1891 |
3 |
|
1109 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
107 |
10/1925 |
09/1891 |
1093 |
|
1110 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
108 |
01/1926 |
09/1891 |
3 |
|
1110 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
108 |
01/1926 |
09/1891 |
1093 |
|
1111 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
109 |
10/1928 |
09/1891 |
3 |
|
1111 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
109 |
10/1928 |
10/1891 |
1093 |
|
1112 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
110 |
03/1926 |
10/1891 |
3 |
|
1112 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
110 |
03/1926 |
10/1891 |
|
|
1113 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
8 |
111 |
02/03/1957 |
10/1891 |
|
|
1114 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
8 |
112 |
28/12/1960 |
10/1891 |
|
|
1115 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
8 |
113 |
08/1939 |
10/1891 |
|
|
1116 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
8 |
114 |
03/1938 |
10/1891 |
|
|
1117 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
8 |
115 |
07/11/1959 |
10/1891 |
|
|
1118 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
8 |
116 |
31/08/1957 |
10/1891 |
|
|
1119 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
8 |
117 |
26/06/1954 |
11/1891 |
|
|
1120 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
8 |
118 |
06/03/1954 |
11/1891 |
|
|
1121 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
8 |
119 |
05/02/1960 |
11/1891 |
|
|
1122 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
8 |
120 |
16/07/1960 |
11/1891 |
|
|
1123 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
8 |
121 |
26/06/1954 |
11/1891 |
|
|
1124 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
8 |
122 |
30/04/1960 |
11/1891 |
1153 |
|
1153 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
10 |
|
09/1926 |
11/1891 |
21 |
|
1153 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
10 |
|
09/1926 |
11/1891 |
1153 |
|
1154 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
10 |
|
25/01/1958 |
11/1891 |
21 |
|
1154 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
10 |
|
25/01/1958 |
11/1891 |
1153 |
|
1155 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
10 |
|
06/1931 |
11/1891 |
21 |
|
1155 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
10 |
|
06/1931 |
12/1891 |
|
|
1125 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
8 |
123 |
08/1933 |
12/1891 |
|
|
1126 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
8 |
124 |
08/12/1962 |
12/1891 |
|
|
1127 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
8 |
125 |
04/1932 |
12/1891 |
|
|
1128 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
8 |
126 |
12/1932 |
12/1891 |
|
|
1129 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
8 |
127 |
07/1946 |
12/1891 |
1153 |
|
1156 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
10 |
|
08/09/1962 |
12/1891 |
21 |
|
1156 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
10 |
|
08/09/1962 |
12/1891 |
1153 |
|
310 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
10 |
|
15/09/1962 |
12/1891 |
21 |
|
310 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
10 |
|
15/09/1962 |
12/1891 |
1153 |
|
32 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
10 |
|
08/1935 |
12/1891 |
21 |
|
32 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
10 |
|
08/1935 |
01/1892 |
|
|
1130 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
8 |
128 |
11/1933 |
01/1892 |
|
|
1131 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
8 |
129 |
08/1934 |
01/1892 |
|
|
1132 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
8 |
130 |
15/05/1948 |
01/1892 |
|
|
1133 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
9 |
131 |
23/02/1946 |
01/1892 |
|
|
1134 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
9 |
132 |
05/03/1955 |
01/1892 |
|
|
1135 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
9 |
133 |
03/1936 |
02/1892 |
|
|
1136 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
9 |
134 |
05/1932 |
02/1892 |
|
|
1137 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
9 |
135 |
06/03/1948 |
02/1892 |
|
|
1138 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
9 |
136 |
11/1935 |
02/1892 |
|
|
1139 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
9 |
137 |
06/1937 |
02/1892 |
|
|
1140 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
9 |
138 |
01/1947 |
02/1892 |
|
|
1141 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
9 |
139 |
10/11/1960 |
03/1892 |
|
|
1142 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
9 |
140 |
20/12/1947 |
03/1892 |
|
|
1143 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
9 |
141 |
07/03/1953 |
03/1892 |
|
|
1144 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
9 |
142 |
18/04/1953 |
03/1892 |
|
|
1145 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
9 |
143 |
10/1934 |
03/1892 |
|
|
1146 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
9 |
144 |
31/05/1958 |
03/1892 |
|
|
1147 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
9 |
145 |
06/07/1957 |
04/1892 |
|
|
1148 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
9 |
146 |
01/10/1960 |
04/1892 |
|
|
1149 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
9 |
147 |
02/04/1960 |
04/1892 |
|
|
1150 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
9 |
148 |
31/08/1957 |
04/1892 |
|
|
1151 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
9 |
149 |
04/06/1955 |
04/1892 |
|
|
1152 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
9 |
150 |
06/04/1957 |
04/1892 |
|
|
1157 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
11 |
151 |
19/11/1955 |
05/1892 |
|
|
1158 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
11 |
152 |
11/1938 |
05/1892 |
|
|
1159 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
11 |
153 |
06/10/1956 |
05/1892 |
|
|
1160 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
11 |
154 |
17/12/1955 |
05/1892 |
|
|
1161 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
11 |
155 |
13/10/1956 |
05/1892 |
|
|
1162 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
11 |
156 |
04/02/1956 |
06/1892 |
|
|
10 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
11 |
161 |
03/1930 |
06/1892 |
|
|
1065 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
11 |
159 |
12/03/1955 |
06/1892 |
|
|
1066 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
11 |
160 |
08/1940 |
06/1892 |
|
|
1163 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
11 |
157 |
28/04/1951 |
06/1892 |
|
|
1164 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
11 |
158 |
11/08/1956 |
06/1892 |
|
|
1167 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
11 |
162 |
11/1938 |
07/1892 |
|
|
1168 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
11 |
163 |
29/03/1958 |
07/1892 |
|
|
1169 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
11 |
164 |
03/1946 |
07/1892 |
|
|
287 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
11 |
165 |
12/1930 |
07/1892 |
|
|
289 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
11 |
166 |
02/1937 |
07/1892 |
|
|
321 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
11 |
167 |
02/1947 |
07/1892 |
|
|
323 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
11 |
168 |
08/1949 |
07/1892 |
|
|
334 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
11 |
169 |
01/1944 |
07/1892 |
|
|
337 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
11 |
170 |
20/03/1948 |
08/1892 |
|
|
1170 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
12 |
171 |
12/1937 |
08/1892 |
|
|
1171 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
12 |
172 |
01/1947 |
08/1892 |
|
|
1172 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
12 |
173 |
04/1949 |
08/1892 |
|
|
1173 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
12 |
174 |
15/03/1952 |
09/1892 |
|
|
1174 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
12 |
175 |
12/1930 |
09/1892 |
|
|
1175 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
12 |
176 |
11/1934 |
09/1892 |
|
|
1176 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
12 |
177 |
05/1947 |
09/1892 |
|
|
1177 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
12 |
178 |
31/12/1949 |
09/1892 |
|
|
1178 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
12 |
179 |
03/1950 |
09/1892 |
|
|
1179 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
12 |
180 |
04/1945 |
09/1892 |
|
|
16 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
12 |
181 |
26/12/1953 |
09/1892 |
|
|
26 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
12 |
182 |
10/1928 |
10/1892 |
|
|
301 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
12 |
184 |
04/1934 |
10/1892 |
|
|
340 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
12 |
185 |
05/07/1952 |
10/1892 |
|
|
345 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
12 |
186 |
10/1939 |
10/1892 |
|
|
349 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
12 |
187 |
06/1939 |
10/1892 |
|
|
37 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
12 |
183 |
12/1930 |
10/1892 |
|
|
638 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
12 |
188 |
09/1930 |
11/1892 |
|
|
1180 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
13 |
191 |
27/10/1956 |
11/1892 |
|
|
651 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
12 |
189 |
11/1934 |
11/1892 |
|
|
680 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
12 |
190 |
20/08/1955 |
12/1892 |
|
|
1181 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
13 |
192 |
17/03/1956 |
12/1892 |
|
|
1182 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
13 |
193 |
01/1939 |
12/1892 |
|
|
1183 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
13 |
194 |
20/12/1952 |
12/1892 |
|
|
1184 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
13 |
195 |
18/09/1948 |
12/1892 |
|
|
1185 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
13 |
196 |
20/05/1961 |
01/1893 |
|
|
1186 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
13 |
197 |
02/11/1957 |
01/1893 |
|
|
1187 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
13 |
198 |
05/1939 |
01/1893 |
|
|
1188 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
13 |
199 |
25/09/1954 |
01/1893 |
|
|
1189 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
13 |
200 |
19/10/1957 |
02/1893 |
|
|
1190 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
13 |
201 |
27/10/1951 |
02/1893 |
|
|
1191 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
13 |
202 |
08/12/1956 |
02/1893 |
|
|
1192 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
13 |
203 |
11/1934 |
02/1893 |
|
|
1193 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
13 |
204 |
06/08/1960 |
02/1893 |
|
|
1194 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
13 |
205 |
22/11/1947 |
02/1893 |
|
|
1195 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
13 |
206 |
18/06/1949 |
02/1893 |
|
|
1196 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
13 |
207 |
13/05/1961 |
02/1893 |
|
|
1197 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
13 |
208 |
21/11/1959 |
03/1893 |
|
|
1198 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
13 |
209 |
10/12/1949 |
03/1893 |
|
|
1199 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
13 |
210 |
12/1932 |
03/1893 |
|
|
1200 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
14 |
211 |
08/08/1957 |
03/1893 |
|
|
1201 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
14 |
212 |
10/1935 |
03/1893 |
|
|
1202 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
14 |
213 |
13/04/1946 |
03/1893 |
|
|
1203 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
14 |
214 |
08/1934 |
03/1893 |
|
|
1204 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
14 |
215 |
21/08/1954 |
03/1893 |
|
|
1205 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
14 |
216 |
11/1934 |
04/1893 |
|
|
1206 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
14 |
217 |
08/12/1951 |
04/1893 |
|
|
1207 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
14 |
218 |
26/11/1949 |
04/1893 |
|
|
1208 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
14 |
219 |
11/1933 |
04/1893 |
|
|
1209 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
14 |
220 |
06/08/1955 |
05/1893 |
|
|
13 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
14 |
221 |
02/1938 |
05/1893 |
|
|
184 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
14 |
222 |
05/01/1957 |
05/1893 |
|
|
186 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
14 |
223 |
15/09/1956 |
05/1893 |
|
|
279 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
14 |
224 |
06/1937 |
05/1893 |
|
|
290 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
14 |
225 |
05/1932 |
05/1893 |
|
|
336 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
14 |
226 |
02/1934 |
05/1893 |
|
|
437 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
14 |
227 |
04/02/1961 |
06/1893 |
|
|
21 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
15 |
231 |
01/1936 |
06/1893 |
|
|
22 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
15 |
232 |
03/1933 |
06/1893 |
|
|
30 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
15 |
233 |
30/11/1945 |
06/1893 |
|
|
42 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
15 |
234 |
04/1946 |
06/1893 |
|
|
502 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
14 |
228 |
11/1933 |
06/1893 |
|
|
521 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
14 |
229 |
01/1936 |
06/1893 |
|
|
606 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
14 |
230 |
16/03/1957 |
07/1893 |
|
|
101 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
15 |
238 |
10/1934 |
07/1893 |
|
|
105 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
15 |
239 |
06/1932 |
07/1893 |
|
|
106 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
15 |
240 |
13/09/1958 |
07/1893 |
|
|
291 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
15 |
241 |
08/1934 |
07/1893 |
|
|
50 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
15 |
235 |
29/04/1961 |
07/1893 |
|
|
78 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
15 |
236 |
04/11/1950 |
07/1893 |
|
|
82 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
15 |
237 |
11/1932 |
08/1893 |
|
|
326 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
15 |
242 |
06/12/1947 |
08/1893 |
|
|
327 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
15 |
243 |
18/04/1953 |
08/1893 |
|
|
335 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
15 |
244 |
05/03/1955 |
08/1893 |
|
|
347 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
15 |
246 |
01/1936 |
08/1893 |
|
|
438 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
15 |
247 |
12/07/1957 |
08/1893 |
|
|
45 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
16 |
251 |
05/1928 |
09/1893 |
|
|
341 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
15 |
245 |
06/11/1958 |
09/1893 |
|
|
46 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
16 |
252 |
05/1953 |
09/1893 |
|
|
607 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
15 |
248 |
28/04/1962 |
09/1893 |
|
|
608 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
15 |
249 |
07/04/1951 |
09/1893 |
|
|
624 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
15 |
250 |
28/05/1955 |
10/1893 |
|
|
119 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
16 |
255 |
09/08/1952 |
10/1893 |
|
|
147 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
16 |
256 |
12/1930 |
10/1893 |
|
|
189 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
16 |
257 |
12/1937 |
10/1893 |
|
|
54 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
16 |
253 |
01/1940 |
10/1893 |
|
|
58 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
16 |
254 |
09/1927 |
11/1893 |
|
|
1210 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
16 |
261 |
19/07/1952 |
11/1893 |
|
|
1211 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
16 |
262 |
02/1949 |
11/1893 |
|
|
1212 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
16 |
263 |
17/05/1952 |
11/1893 |
|
|
206 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
16 |
258 |
10/1949 |
11/1893 |
|
|
208 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
16 |
259 |
03/1946 |
11/1893 |
|
|
299 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
16 |
260 |
04/1938 |
12/1893 |
|
|
1213 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
16 |
264 |
12/1930 |
12/1893 |
|
|
1214 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
16 |
265 |
11/1935 |
12/1893 |
|
|
1215 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
16 |
266 |
11/1936 |
12/1893 |
|
|
1216 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
16 |
267 |
11/1938 |
12/1893 |
|
|
1217 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
16 |
268 |
08/1930 |
12/1893 |
|
|
1218 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
16 |
269 |
21/03/1953 |
12/1893 |
|
|
1219 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
16 |
270 |
02/1946 |
12/1893 |
1153 |
|
1230 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
20 |
|
04/1930 |
12/1893 |
21 |
|
1230 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
20 |
|
04/1930 |
12/1893 |
1153 |
|
504 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
20 |
|
17/03/1962 |
12/1893 |
21 |
|
504 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
20 |
|
17/03/1962 |
12/1893 |
1153 |
|
654 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
20 |
|
08/1926 |
12/1893 |
21 |
|
654 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
20 |
|
08/1926 |
12/1893 |
1153 |
|
729 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
20 |
|
06/1931 |
12/1893 |
21 |
|
729 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
20 |
|
06/1931 |
01/1894 |
1093 |
|
1220 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
271 |
09/1926 |
01/1894 |
3 |
|
1220 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
271 |
09/1926 |
01/1894 |
1093 |
|
1221 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
272 |
10/1926 |
01/1894 |
3 |
|
1221 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
272 |
10/1926 |
01/1894 |
1093 |
|
1222 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
273 |
05/1927 |
01/1894 |
3 |
|
1222 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
273 |
05/1927 |
01/1894 |
1093 |
|
1223 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
274 |
10/1926 |
01/1894 |
3 |
|
1223 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
274 |
10/1926 |
01/1894 |
1153 |
|
1231 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
20 |
|
08/1932 |
01/1894 |
21 |
|
1231 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
20 |
|
08/1932 |
01/1894 |
1153 |
|
1232 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
20 |
|
24/08/1957 |
01/1894 |
21 |
|
1232 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
20 |
|
24/08/1957 |
02/1894 |
1093 |
|
1224 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
275 |
10/1927 |
02/1894 |
3 |
|
1224 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
275 |
10/1927 |
02/1894 |
1093 |
|
1225 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
276 |
09/1926 |
02/1894 |
3 |
|
1225 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
276 |
09/1926 |
02/1894 |
1093 |
|
1226 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
277 |
09/1928 |
02/1894 |
3 |
|
1226 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
277 |
09/1928 |
02/1894 |
1093 |
|
1227 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
278 |
08/1925 |
02/1894 |
3 |
|
1227 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
278 |
08/1925 |
02/1894 |
1093 |
|
1228 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
279 |
05/1927 |
02/1894 |
3 |
|
1228 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
279 |
05/1927 |
03/1894 |
1093 |
|
1229 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
280 |
10/1926 |
03/1894 |
3 |
|
1229 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
280 |
10/1926 |
03/1894 |
1093 |
|
318 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
281 |
10/1927 |
03/1894 |
3 |
|
318 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
281 |
10/1927 |
03/1894 |
1093 |
|
338 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
282 |
06/1927 |
03/1894 |
3 |
|
338 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
282 |
06/1927 |
03/1894 |
1093 |
|
339 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
283 |
08/1926 |
03/1894 |
3 |
|
339 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
283 |
08/1926 |
03/1894 |
1093 |
|
344 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
284 |
03/1927 |
03/1894 |
3 |
|
344 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
284 |
03/1927 |
03/1894 |
1093 |
|
368 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
285 |
04/1930 |
03/1894 |
3 |
|
368 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
285 |
04/1930 |
03/1894 |
1093 |
|
429 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
286 |
04/1928 |
03/1894 |
3 |
|
429 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
286 |
04/1928 |
04/1894 |
1093 |
|
430 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
287 |
06/1927 |
04/1894 |
3 |
|
430 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
287 |
06/1927 |
04/1894 |
1093 |
|
455 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
288 |
06/1926 |
04/1894 |
3 |
|
455 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
288 |
06/1926 |
04/1894 |
1093 |
|
488 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
289 |
04/1927 |
04/1894 |
3 |
|
488 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
289 |
04/1927 |
04/1894 |
1093 |
|
498 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
290 |
04/1927 |
04/1894 |
3 |
|
498 |
4-4-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
290 |
04/1927 |
04/1894 |
|
|
53 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
18 |
291 |
19/02/1955 |
04/1894 |
|
|
92 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
18 |
292 |
11/1931 |
05/1894 |
|
|
121 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
18 |
293 |
05/1933 |
05/1894 |
|
|
210 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
18 |
294 |
06/1931 |
05/1894 |
|
|
286 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
18 |
295 |
30/11/1945 |
05/1894 |
|
|
315 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
18 |
296 |
31/12/1960 |
05/1894 |
|
|
358 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
18 |
297 |
10/1931 |
06/1894 |
|
|
1233 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
18 |
299 |
01/1932 |
06/1894 |
|
|
1234 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
18 |
300 |
09/07/1949 |
06/1894 |
|
|
1235 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
18 |
301 |
22/04/1961 |
06/1894 |
|
|
1236 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
18 |
302 |
01/11/1952 |
06/1894 |
|
|
1237 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
18 |
303 |
19/09/1959 |
06/1894 |
|
|
1238 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
18 |
304 |
03/11/1951 |
06/1894 |
|
|
440 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
18 |
298 |
10/1946 |
07/1894 |
|
|
1239 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
18 |
305 |
05/1938 |
07/1894 |
|
|
1240 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
18 |
306 |
12/08/1957 |
07/1894 |
|
|
1241 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
18 |
307 |
20/09/1957 |
07/1894 |
|
|
1242 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
18 |
308 |
14/03/1959 |
07/1894 |
|
|
1243 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
19 |
311 |
15/04/1961 |
07/1894 |
|
|
445 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
18 |
309 |
14/07/1951 |
07/1894 |
|
|
469 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
18 |
310 |
18/02/1956 |
08/1894 |
|
|
1244 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
19 |
312 |
03/1947 |
08/1894 |
|
|
1245 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
19 |
313 |
06/1931 |
08/1894 |
|
|
1246 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
19 |
314 |
23/05/1953 |
08/1894 |
|
|
1247 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
19 |
315 |
10/1946 |
08/1894 |
|
|
1248 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
19 |
316 |
10/11/1960 |
08/1894 |
|
|
1249 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
19 |
317 |
20/11/1954 |
08/1894 |
|
|
1250 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
19 |
318 |
07/03/1953 |
08/1894 |
|
|
1251 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
19 |
319 |
18/10/1947 |
09/1894 |
|
|
1252 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
19 |
320 |
17/03/1962 |
09/1894 |
|
|
1253 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
19 |
321 |
11/1933 |
09/1894 |
|
|
1254 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
19 |
322 |
27/10/1951 |
09/1894 |
|
|
1255 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
19 |
323 |
06/1934 |
09/1894 |
|
|
1256 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
19 |
324 |
10/11/1960 |
10/1894 |
|
|
1257 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
19 |
325 |
26/06/1948 |
10/1894 |
|
|
161 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
19 |
327 |
29/08/1953 |
10/1894 |
27 |
|
212 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
21/02/1948 |
10/1894 |
|
|
212 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
19 |
328 |
21/02/1948 |
10/1894 |
|
|
217 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
19 |
329 |
08/1946 |
10/1894 |
|
|
410 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
19 |
330 |
07/08/1954 |
10/1894 |
|
|
44 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
21 |
331 |
01/1932 |
10/1894 |
|
|
47 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
19 |
326 |
31/01/1946 |
11/1894 |
|
|
158 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
21 |
338 |
13/12/1952 |
11/1894 |
|
|
57 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
21 |
332 |
01/04/1961 |
11/1894 |
|
|
62 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
21 |
333 |
10/1931 |
11/1894 |
|
|
66 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
21 |
334 |
14/02/1953 |
11/1894 |
|
|
72 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
21 |
335 |
02/1947 |
11/1894 |
|
|
73 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
21 |
336 |
08/1934 |
11/1894 |
|
|
77 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
21 |
337 |
31/01/1946 |
12/1894 |
|
|
187 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
21 |
339 |
11/1933 |
12/1894 |
|
|
198 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
21 |
340 |
21/03/1959 |
12/1894 |
|
|
231 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
21 |
341 |
21/11/1959 |
12/1894 |
|
|
232 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
21 |
342 |
21/01/1961 |
12/1894 |
|
|
270 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
21 |
343 |
05/08/1961 |
12/1894 |
|
|
320 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
21 |
344 |
27/06/1953 |
01/1895 |
|
|
333 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
21 |
345 |
04/1955 |
01/1895 |
|
|
343 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
21 |
346 |
27/10/1956 |
01/1895 |
|
|
355 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
21 |
347 |
07/1934 |
01/1895 |
|
|
422 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
21 |
348 |
13/10/1962 |
01/1895 |
|
|
427 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
21 |
349 |
07/1931 |
01/1895 |
|
|
474 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
21 |
350 |
08/1938 |
02/1895 |
|
|
1258 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
22 |
353 |
09/1946 |
02/1895 |
|
|
1259 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
22 |
354 |
08/1930 |
02/1895 |
|
|
1260 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
22 |
355 |
04/1938 |
02/1895 |
|
|
36 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
22 |
351 |
25/10/1958 |
02/1895 |
|
|
39 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
22 |
352 |
08/1930 |
03/1895 |
|
|
1261 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
22 |
356 |
12/1930 |
03/1895 |
|
|
1262 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
22 |
357 |
06/1949 |
03/1895 |
|
|
1263 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
22 |
358 |
03/1959 |
03/1895 |
|
|
1264 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
22 |
359 |
03/1938 |
03/1895 |
|
|
1265 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
22 |
360 |
08/1953 |
03/1895 |
|
|
1266 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
22 |
361 |
05/02/1955 |
04/1895 |
|
|
1267 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
22 |
362 |
04/1934 |
04/1895 |
|
|
1268 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
22 |
363 |
10/1947 |
04/1895 |
|
|
1269 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
22 |
364 |
03/1939 |
05/1895 |
|
|
1270 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
22 |
365 |
01/1947 |
05/1895 |
|
|
1271 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
22 |
366 |
29/12/1951 |
05/1895 |
|
|
1272 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
22 |
367 |
14/01/1961 |
05/1895 |
|
|
1273 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
22 |
368 |
12/1946 |
05/1895 |
|
|
1274 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
22 |
369 |
05/1934 |
05/1895 |
|
|
1275 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
22 |
370 |
05/1945 |
05/1895 |
|
|
1379 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
34 |
583 |
20/12/1947 |
05/1895 |
|
|
1380 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
34 |
584 |
11/1930 |
05/1895 |
|
|
25 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
23 |
371 |
11/1933 |
06/1895 |
|
|
100 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
23 |
375 |
24/03/1951 |
06/1895 |
|
|
200 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
23 |
376 |
04/1933 |
06/1895 |
|
|
205 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
23 |
377 |
18/08/1951 |
06/1895 |
|
|
40 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
23 |
372 |
18/07/1959 |
06/1895 |
|
|
51 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
23 |
373 |
28/03/1953 |
06/1895 |
|
|
52 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
23 |
374 |
06/1936 |
07/1895 |
|
|
1276 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
23 |
381 |
06/12/1952 |
07/1895 |
|
|
1277 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
23 |
382 |
11/1933 |
07/1895 |
|
|
1278 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
23 |
383 |
11/1933 |
07/1895 |
|
|
1279 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
23 |
384 |
06/10/1951 |
07/1895 |
|
|
1280 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
23 |
385 |
10/10/1959 |
07/1895 |
|
|
1281 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
23 |
386 |
19/11/1960 |
07/1895 |
|
|
1282 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
23 |
387 |
12/1931 |
07/1895 |
|
|
213 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
23 |
378 |
06/1946 |
07/1895 |
|
|
214 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
23 |
379 |
10/1934 |
07/1895 |
|
|
228 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
23 |
380 |
29/09/1951 |
08/1895 |
|
|
1283 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
23 |
388 |
12/1935 |
08/1895 |
|
|
1284 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
23 |
389 |
05/1934 |
08/1895 |
|
|
1285 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
23 |
390 |
21/09/1957 |
08/1895 |
|
|
269 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
24 |
391 |
20/08/1949 |
08/1895 |
|
|
317 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
24 |
392 |
13/04/1946 |
08/1895 |
|
|
348 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
24 |
393 |
16/06/1951 |
08/1895 |
|
|
354 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
24 |
394 |
11/1933 |
09/1895 |
|
|
364 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
24 |
395 |
10/1932 |
09/1895 |
|
|
365 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
24 |
396 |
04/09/1954 |
09/1895 |
|
|
372 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
24 |
397 |
07/01/1956 |
09/1895 |
|
|
417 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
24 |
398 |
04/1938 |
09/1895 |
|
|
420 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
24 |
399 |
05/1934 |
09/1895 |
|
|
441 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
24 |
400 |
10/1934 |
09/1895 |
|
|
444 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
24 |
401 |
24/01/1953 |
09/1895 |
|
|
449 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
24 |
402 |
12/1936 |
10/1895 |
|
|
450 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
24 |
403 |
10/11/1960 |
10/1895 |
|
|
466 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
24 |
404 |
23/03/1946 |
10/1895 |
|
|
471 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
24 |
405 |
07/1937 |
10/1895 |
|
|
472 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
24 |
406 |
08/1934 |
10/1895 |
|
|
475 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
24 |
407 |
23/01/1954 |
10/1895 |
|
|
477 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
24 |
408 |
05/1933 |
11/1895 |
1153 |
|
1286 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
26 |
|
05/1934 |
11/1895 |
21 |
|
1286 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
26 |
|
05/1934 |
11/1895 |
1153 |
|
1287 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
26 |
|
08/1930 |
11/1895 |
21 |
|
1287 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
26 |
|
08/1930 |
11/1895 |
1153 |
|
1288 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
26 |
|
04/1938 |
11/1895 |
21 |
|
1288 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
26 |
|
04/1938 |
11/1895 |
|
|
1291 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
25 |
411 |
01/1937 |
11/1895 |
|
|
1292 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
25 |
412 |
09/1934 |
11/1895 |
|
|
478 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
24 |
409 |
03/03/1962 |
11/1895 |
|
|
482 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
24 |
410 |
01/09/1962 |
12/1895 |
1153 |
|
1289 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
26 |
|
08/12/1956 |
12/1895 |
21 |
|
1289 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
26 |
|
08/12/1956 |
12/1895 |
1153 |
|
1290 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
26 |
|
03/11/1961 |
12/1895 |
21 |
|
1290 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
26 |
|
03/11/1961 |
12/1895 |
|
|
1293 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
25 |
413 |
01/1933 |
12/1895 |
|
|
1294 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
25 |
414 |
11/1933 |
12/1895 |
|
|
1295 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
25 |
415 |
04/06/1955 |
12/1895 |
|
|
1296 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
25 |
416 |
06/1934 |
12/1895 |
|
|
1297 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
25 |
417 |
10/11/1960 |
12/1895 |
|
|
1298 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
25 |
418 |
05/1932 |
12/1895 |
|
|
1299 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
25 |
419 |
27/02/1954 |
12/1895 |
|
|
1300 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
25 |
420 |
06/08/1960 |
01/1896 |
|
|
1301 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
25 |
421 |
04/1934 |
01/1896 |
|
|
1302 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
25 |
422 |
29/03/1947 |
01/1896 |
|
|
1303 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
25 |
423 |
11/1934 |
01/1896 |
|
|
1304 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
25 |
424 |
06/1935 |
01/1896 |
|
|
1305 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
25 |
425 |
31/12/1949 |
02/1896 |
|
|
1306 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
25 |
426 |
02/1933 |
02/1896 |
|
|
1307 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
25 |
427 |
17/12/1955 |
02/1896 |
|
|
1308 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
25 |
428 |
23/11/1957 |
02/1896 |
|
|
1309 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
25 |
429 |
11/1933 |
02/1896 |
|
|
1310 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
25 |
430 |
15/12/1951 |
03/1896 |
|
|
24 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
27 |
431 |
02/10/1958 |
03/1896 |
|
|
31 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
27 |
432 |
06/1934 |
03/1896 |
|
|
38 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
27 |
433 |
01/1929 |
03/1896 |
|
|
63 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
27 |
434 |
11/1934 |
03/1896 |
|
|
76 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
27 |
435 |
07/08/1948 |
03/1896 |
|
|
84 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
27 |
436 |
10/1945 |
03/1896 |
|
|
88 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
27 |
437 |
06/1937 |
04/1896 |
|
|
104 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
27 |
439 |
06/1949 |
04/1896 |
|
|
107 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
27 |
440 |
08/1937 |
04/1896 |
|
|
110 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
27 |
441 |
03/1934 |
04/1896 |
|
|
129 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
27 |
442 |
06/1952 |
04/1896 |
|
|
156 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
27 |
443 |
12/1951 |
04/1896 |
|
|
185 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
27 |
444 |
06/12/1947 |
04/1896 |
|
|
97 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
27 |
438 |
05/11/1955 |
05/1896 |
|
|
296 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
27 |
445 |
16/07/1949 |
05/1896 |
|
|
319 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
27 |
446 |
11/1939 |
05/1896 |
|
|
329 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
27 |
447 |
04/1934 |
05/1896 |
|
|
362 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
27 |
448 |
04/1937 |
05/1896 |
|
|
369 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
27 |
449 |
04/1945 |
06/1896 |
|
|
1311 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
28 |
451 |
12/1930 |
06/1896 |
|
|
1312 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
28 |
452 |
12/1930 |
06/1896 |
|
|
1313 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
28 |
453 |
18/02/1961 |
06/1896 |
|
|
1314 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
28 |
454 |
11/1936 |
06/1896 |
|
|
1315 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
28 |
455 |
09/1950 |
06/1896 |
|
|
1316 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
28 |
456 |
26/01/1952 |
06/1896 |
|
|
1317 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
28 |
457 |
10/12/1949 |
06/1896 |
|
|
415 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
27 |
450 |
06/1950 |
07/1896 |
|
|
1318 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
28 |
458 |
01/1937 |
07/1896 |
|
|
1319 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
28 |
459 |
12/08/1957 |
07/1896 |
|
|
1320 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
28 |
460 |
05/1930 |
07/1896 |
|
|
1321 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
28 |
461 |
03/1938 |
08/1896 |
|
|
1322 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
28 |
462 |
07/1950 |
08/1896 |
|
|
1323 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
28 |
463 |
11/1934 |
08/1896 |
|
|
1324 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
28 |
464 |
11/1958 |
08/1896 |
|
|
1325 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
28 |
465 |
10/1928 |
08/1896 |
|
|
1326 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
28 |
466 |
03/01/1948 |
08/1896 |
|
|
1327 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
28 |
467 |
04/1934 |
09/1896 |
|
|
1 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
29 |
471 |
29/09/1951 |
09/1896 |
|
|
1328 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
28 |
468 |
08/1938 |
09/1896 |
|
|
1329 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
28 |
469 |
19/12/1953 |
09/1896 |
|
|
1330 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
28 |
470 |
07/1938 |
09/1896 |
|
|
15 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
29 |
473 |
05/1946 |
09/1896 |
|
|
27 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
29 |
474 |
18/04/1953 |
09/1896 |
|
|
4 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
29 |
472 |
27/08/1955 |
10/1896 |
|
|
116 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
29 |
475 |
01/01/1955 |
10/1896 |
|
|
127 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
29 |
476 |
02/1938 |
10/1896 |
|
|
199 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
29 |
477 |
14/03/1957 |
10/1896 |
27 |
|
211 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
20/03/1948 |
10/1896 |
|
|
211 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
29 |
478 |
20/03/1948 |
10/1896 |
|
|
272 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
29 |
479 |
08/06/1957 |
10/1896 |
|
|
328 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
29 |
480 |
12/1933 |
10/1896 |
|
|
331 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
29 |
481 |
23/02/1946 |
11/1896 |
|
|
342 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
29 |
482 |
04/10/1952 |
11/1896 |
|
|
350 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
29 |
483 |
19/11/1960 |
11/1896 |
|
|
352 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
29 |
484 |
04/1934 |
11/1896 |
|
|
357 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
29 |
485 |
11/08/1956 |
11/1896 |
|
|
359 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
29 |
486 |
09/1934 |
12/1896 |
|
|
360 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
29 |
487 |
22/09/1962 |
12/1896 |
|
|
363 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
29 |
488 |
11/1931 |
12/1896 |
|
|
366 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
29 |
489 |
05/1932 |
12/1896 |
|
|
370 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
29 |
490 |
01/08/1959 |
01/1897 |
|
|
1331 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
30 |
491 |
07/07/1956 |
01/1897 |
|
|
1332 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
30 |
492 |
12/06/1954 |
01/1897 |
|
|
1333 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
30 |
493 |
25/08/1951 |
02/1897 |
|
|
1334 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
30 |
494 |
12/1936 |
02/1897 |
|
|
1335 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
30 |
495 |
05/1934 |
02/1897 |
|
|
1336 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
30 |
496 |
12/1930 |
02/1897 |
|
|
1337 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
30 |
497 |
12/1930 |
02/1897 |
|
|
1338 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
30 |
498 |
04/1938 |
02/1897 |
|
|
1339 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
30 |
499 |
07/1936 |
03/1897 |
|
|
1340 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
30 |
500 |
09/1930 |
03/1897 |
|
|
1341 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
30 |
501 |
06/1930 |
03/1897 |
|
|
1342 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
30 |
502 |
05/1934 |
03/1897 |
|
|
1343 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
30 |
503 |
20/12/1947 |
03/1897 |
|
|
1344 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
30 |
504 |
03/10/1958 |
03/1897 |
|
|
1345 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
30 |
505 |
07/03/1953 |
04/1897 |
|
|
1346 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
30 |
506 |
07/1937 |
04/1897 |
|
|
1347 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
30 |
507 |
06/1945 |
04/1897 |
|
|
1348 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
30 |
508 |
06/02/1960 |
04/1897 |
|
|
1349 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
30 |
509 |
01/1940 |
04/1897 |
|
|
1350 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
30 |
510 |
10/1939 |
05/1897 |
|
|
414 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
31 |
511 |
25/09/1954 |
05/1897 |
|
|
418 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
31 |
512 |
20/12/1958 |
05/1897 |
|
|
419 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
31 |
513 |
15/08/1960 |
05/1897 |
|
|
425 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
31 |
514 |
19/10/1946 |
05/1897 |
|
|
439 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
31 |
515 |
29/12/1951 |
05/1897 |
|
|
447 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
31 |
516 |
02/11/1946 |
05/1897 |
|
|
451 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
31 |
517 |
24/01/1961 |
05/1897 |
|
|
456 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
31 |
518 |
12/04/1958 |
06/1897 |
|
|
457 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
31 |
519 |
30/08/1952 |
06/1897 |
|
|
458 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
31 |
520 |
15/12/1956 |
06/1897 |
|
|
459 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
31 |
521 |
03/12/1949 |
06/1897 |
|
|
464 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
31 |
522 |
08/1938 |
06/1897 |
|
|
465 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
31 |
523 |
08/11/1958 |
07/1897 |
|
|
470 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
31 |
524 |
08/1933 |
07/1897 |
|
|
479 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
31 |
525 |
15/11/1952 |
07/1897 |
|
|
483 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
31 |
526 |
09/04/1955 |
07/1897 |
|
|
486 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
31 |
527 |
27/10/1951 |
07/1897 |
|
|
487 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
31 |
528 |
03/01/1948 |
08/1897 |
1351 |
|
1351 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
531 |
1917 |
08/1897 |
24 |
|
1351 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
531 |
1917 |
08/1897 |
|
|
489 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
31 |
529 |
13/02/1954 |
08/1897 |
|
|
491 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
31 |
530 |
12/04/1958 |
09/1897 |
1351 |
|
1352 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
532 |
09/1926 |
09/1897 |
24 |
|
1352 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
532 |
09/1926 |
09/1897 |
1351 |
|
1353 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
533 |
02/1928 |
09/1897 |
24 |
|
1353 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
533 |
02/1928 |
09/1897 |
1351 |
|
1354 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
534 |
12/1914 |
09/1897 |
24 |
|
1354 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
534 |
12/1914 |
09/1897 |
1351 |
|
1355 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
535 |
01/09/1956 |
09/1897 |
24 |
|
1355 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
535 |
01/09/1956 |
09/1897 |
1351 |
|
1356 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
536 |
02/01/1954 |
09/1897 |
24 |
|
1356 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
536 |
02/01/1954 |
10/1897 |
1351 |
|
1357 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
537 |
1917 |
10/1897 |
24 |
|
1357 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
537 |
1917 |
10/1897 |
1351 |
|
1358 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
538 |
21/09/1961 |
10/1897 |
24 |
|
1358 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
538 |
21/09/1961 |
10/1897 |
1351 |
|
1359 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
539 |
12/1932 |
10/1897 |
24 |
|
1359 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
539 |
12/1932 |
10/1897 |
1351 |
|
1360 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
540 |
09/1926 |
10/1897 |
24 |
|
1360 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
540 |
09/1926 |
10/1897 |
1351 |
|
493 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
541 |
12/1914 |
10/1897 |
24 |
|
493 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
541 |
12/1914 |
11/1897 |
1351 |
|
494 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
542 |
01/1931 |
11/1897 |
24 |
|
494 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
542 |
01/1931 |
11/1897 |
1351 |
|
495 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
543 |
07/1926 |
11/1897 |
24 |
|
495 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
543 |
07/1926 |
11/1897 |
1351 |
|
496 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
544 |
01/1931 |
11/1897 |
24 |
|
496 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
544 |
01/1931 |
11/1897 |
1351 |
|
499 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
545 |
12/1932 |
11/1897 |
24 |
|
499 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
545 |
12/1932 |
11/1897 |
1351 |
|
503 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
547 |
1914 |
11/1897 |
24 |
|
503 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
547 |
1914 |
11/1897 |
1351 |
|
601 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
546 |
07/06/1959 |
11/1897 |
24 |
|
601 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
546 |
07/06/1959 |
12/1897 |
1351 |
|
505 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
548 |
03/1936 |
12/1897 |
24 |
|
505 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
548 |
03/1936 |
12/1897 |
1351 |
|
506 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
549 |
17/01/1959 |
12/1897 |
24 |
|
506 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
549 |
17/01/1959 |
12/1897 |
1351 |
|
507 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
550 |
12/1914 |
12/1897 |
24 |
|
507 |
0-6-0T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
550 |
12/1914 |
12/1897 |
|
|
508 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
33 |
551 |
30/03/1946 |
12/1897 |
|
|
509 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
33 |
552 |
20/07/1957 |
01/1898 |
|
|
510 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
33 |
553 |
16/06/1956 |
01/1898 |
|
|
523 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
33 |
554 |
08/1932 |
01/1898 |
|
|
524 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
33 |
555 |
11/1933 |
01/1898 |
|
|
602 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
33 |
556 |
11/1931 |
01/1898 |
|
|
609 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
33 |
557 |
11/1933 |
01/1898 |
|
|
619 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
33 |
558 |
07/1939 |
01/1898 |
|
|
620 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
33 |
559 |
18/09/1948 |
01/1898 |
|
|
622 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
33 |
560 |
08/1946 |
02/1898 |
|
|
648 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
33 |
561 |
07/1935 |
02/1898 |
|
|
650 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
33 |
562 |
24/04/1957 |
02/1898 |
|
|
662 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
33 |
563 |
12/1931 |
02/1898 |
|
|
677 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
33 |
564 |
15/10/1960 |
02/1898 |
|
|
682 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
33 |
565 |
06/04/1957 |
02/1898 |
|
|
683 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
33 |
566 |
12/1933 |
02/1898 |
|
|
684 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
33 |
567 |
18/02/1956 |
03/1898 |
|
|
1361 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
34 |
571 |
07/1930 |
03/1898 |
|
|
1362 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
34 |
572 |
11/1938 |
03/1898 |
|
|
1367 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
34 |
573 |
09/1940 |
03/1898 |
|
|
685 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
33 |
568 |
02/05/1953 |
03/1898 |
|
|
690 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
33 |
569 |
23/02/1946 |
03/1898 |
|
|
692 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
33 |
570 |
06/1934 |
04/1898 |
|
|
1370 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
34 |
574 |
06/1946 |
04/1898 |
|
|
1371 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
34 |
575 |
11/08/1956 |
04/1898 |
|
|
1372 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
34 |
576 |
02/1936 |
04/1898 |
|
|
1373 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
34 |
577 |
12/1933 |
04/1898 |
|
|
1374 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
34 |
578 |
01/1934 |
04/1898 |
|
|
1375 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
34 |
579 |
12/1933 |
05/1898 |
|
|
1376 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
34 |
580 |
02/1950 |
05/1898 |
|
|
1377 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
34 |
581 |
09/1928 |
05/1898 |
|
|
1378 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
34 |
582 |
16/11/1959 |
05/1898 |
|
|
1381 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
34 |
585 |
06/1937 |
05/1898 |
|
|
1382 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
34 |
586 |
07/1950 |
06/1898 |
|
|
1383 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
34 |
587 |
16/08/1952 |
06/1898 |
|
|
1384 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
34 |
588 |
07/08/1948 |
06/1898 |
|
|
1385 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
34 |
589 |
04/12/1948 |
06/1898 |
|
|
1386 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
34 |
590 |
05/07/1952 |
06/1898 |
|
|
1387 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
35 |
591 |
10/1946 |
07/1898 |
|
|
1388 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
35 |
592 |
02/1950 |
07/1898 |
|
|
1389 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
35 |
593 |
04/1940 |
07/1898 |
|
|
1390 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
35 |
594 |
23/02/1952 |
07/1898 |
|
|
1391 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
35 |
595 |
05/1955 |
07/1898 |
|
|
686 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
35 |
596 |
12/1933 |
07/1898 |
|
|
693 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
35 |
597 |
11/1929 |
07/1898 |
|
|
696 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
35 |
598 |
06/1946 |
08/1898 |
|
|
699 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
35 |
599 |
02/1947 |
08/1898 |
|
|
701 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
35 |
600 |
10/1939 |
08/1898 |
|
|
703 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
35 |
601 |
10/05/1952 |
08/1898 |
|
|
721 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
35 |
602 |
05/1949 |
08/1898 |
|
|
723 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
35 |
603 |
12/1934 |
08/1898 |
|
|
724 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
35 |
604 |
02/1951 |
09/1898 |
|
|
725 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
35 |
605 |
02/1934 |
09/1898 |
|
|
728 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
35 |
606 |
08/1935 |
09/1898 |
|
|
730 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
35 |
607 |
03/10/1958 |
09/1898 |
|
|
732 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
35 |
608 |
20/12/1947 |
09/1898 |
|
|
733 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
35 |
609 |
06/1934 |
09/1898 |
|
|
734 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
35 |
610 |
08/1944 |
10/1898 |
|
|
120 |
2-4-2T |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
08/04/1950 |
10/1898 |
|
|
120 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
36 |
616 |
08/04/1950 |
10/1898 |
|
|
183 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
36 |
617 |
01/1944 |
10/1898 |
|
|
34 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
36 |
612 |
04/12/1948 |
10/1898 |
|
|
48 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
36 |
613 |
07/1946 |
10/1898 |
|
|
5 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
36 |
611 |
11/1945 |
10/1898 |
|
|
90 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
36 |
614 |
10/1938 |
10/1898 |
|
|
98 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
36 |
615 |
01/1947 |
11/1898 |
|
|
191 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
36 |
618 |
02/1939 |
11/1898 |
|
|
192 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
36 |
619 |
12/04/1958 |
11/1898 |
|
|
267 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
36 |
620 |
08/11/1947 |
11/1898 |
|
|
297 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
36 |
621 |
01/1937 |
11/1898 |
|
|
316 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
36 |
622 |
11/1958 |
11/1898 |
|
|
332 |
2-4-2T |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
19/06/1948 |
11/1898 |
|
|
332 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
36 |
623 |
19/06/1948 |
12/1898 |
|
|
346 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
36 |
624 |
06/1939 |
12/1898 |
|
|
351 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
36 |
625 |
02/1929 |
12/1898 |
|
|
353 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
36 |
626 |
08/1936 |
12/1898 |
|
|
356 |
2-4-2T |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
21/08/1948 |
12/1898 |
|
|
356 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
36 |
627 |
21/08/1948 |
12/1898 |
|
|
371 |
2-4-2T |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
07/08/1948 |
12/1898 |
|
|
371 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
36 |
628 |
07/08/1948 |
12/1898 |
|
|
379 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
36 |
629 |
08/1940 |
12/1898 |
|
|
380 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
36 |
630 |
12/1945 |
02/1899 |
1400 |
|
1400 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
631 |
07/1933 |
02/1899 |
7 |
|
1400 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
631 |
07/1933 |
03/1899 |
1400 |
|
1392 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
632 |
11/1927 |
03/1899 |
7 |
|
1392 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
632 |
11/1927 |
03/1899 |
1400 |
|
1393 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
633 |
10/1927 |
03/1899 |
7 |
|
1393 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
633 |
10/1927 |
04/1899 |
1400 |
|
1394 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
634 |
04/1927 |
04/1899 |
7 |
|
1394 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
634 |
04/1927 |
04/1899 |
1400 |
|
1395 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
635 |
02/1926 |
04/1899 |
7 |
|
1395 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
635 |
02/1926 |
04/1899 |
|
|
627 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
38 |
651 |
10/1928 |
04/1899 |
|
|
629 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
38 |
652 |
02/1937 |
05/1899 |
1400 |
|
1396 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
636 |
05/1928 |
05/1899 |
7 |
|
1396 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
636 |
05/1928 |
05/1899 |
1400 |
|
1397 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
637 |
08/1927 |
05/1899 |
7 |
|
1397 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
637 |
08/1927 |
05/1899 |
1400 |
|
1398 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
638 |
08/1933 |
05/1899 |
7 |
|
1398 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
638 |
08/1933 |
05/1899 |
|
|
630 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
38 |
653 |
06/1931 |
05/1899 |
|
|
643 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
38 |
654 |
03/1939 |
05/1899 |
|
|
644 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
38 |
655 |
06/1940 |
06/1899 |
1400 |
|
1399 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
639 |
04/1927 |
06/1899 |
7 |
|
1399 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
639 |
04/1927 |
06/1899 |
1400 |
|
1401 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
640 |
06/1933 |
06/1899 |
7 |
|
1401 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
640 |
06/1933 |
06/1899 |
1400 |
|
1402 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
641 |
08/1933 |
06/1899 |
7 |
|
1402 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
641 |
08/1933 |
06/1899 |
|
|
645 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
38 |
656 |
12/1939 |
06/1899 |
|
|
646 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
38 |
657 |
23/02/1952 |
06/1899 |
|
|
649 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
38 |
658 |
11/1939 |
06/1899 |
|
|
653 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
38 |
659 |
11/1946 |
07/1899 |
1400 |
|
1403 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
642 |
05/1932 |
07/1899 |
7 |
|
1403 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
642 |
05/1932 |
07/1899 |
1400 |
|
1404 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
643 |
06/1930 |
07/1899 |
7 |
|
1404 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
643 |
06/1930 |
07/1899 |
|
|
658 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
38 |
660 |
25/08/1951 |
07/1899 |
|
|
661 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
38 |
661 |
01/1944 |
07/1899 |
|
|
664 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
38 |
662 |
11/1945 |
07/1899 |
1400 |
|
700 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
644 |
12/1927 |
07/1899 |
7 |
|
700 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
644 |
12/1927 |
08/1899 |
|
|
667 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
38 |
663 |
09/1950 |
08/1899 |
|
|
668 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
38 |
664 |
07/1936 |
08/1899 |
|
|
670 |
2-4-2T |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
01/1950 |
08/1899 |
|
|
670 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
38 |
665 |
01/1950 |
08/1899 |
1400 |
|
702 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
645 |
09/1926 |
08/1899 |
7 |
|
702 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
645 |
09/1926 |
09/1899 |
|
|
671 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
38 |
666 |
06/12/1947 |
09/1899 |
|
|
672 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
38 |
667 |
04/1930 |
09/1899 |
|
|
674 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
38 |
668 |
02/1950 |
09/1899 |
|
|
675 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
38 |
669 |
11/1961 |
09/1899 |
1400 |
|
708 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
646 |
09/1930 |
09/1899 |
7 |
|
708 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
646 |
09/1930 |
09/1899 |
1400 |
|
711 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
647 |
03/1934 |
09/1899 |
7 |
|
711 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
647 |
03/1934 |
10/1899 |
|
|
678 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
38 |
670 |
10/1938 |
10/1899 |
1400 |
|
718 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
648 |
07/1931 |
10/1899 |
7 |
|
718 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
648 |
07/1931 |
10/1899 |
1400 |
|
735 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
649 |
04/1927 |
10/1899 |
7 |
|
735 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
649 |
04/1927 |
10/1899 |
1400 |
|
737 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
650 |
07/1930 |
10/1899 |
7 |
|
737 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
650 |
07/1930 |
10/1899 |
|
|
80 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
39 |
671 |
12/1933 |
11/1899 |
|
|
152 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
39 |
672 |
13/12/1952 |
11/1899 |
|
|
361 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
39 |
673 |
03/1936 |
11/1899 |
|
|
393 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
39 |
674 |
10/05/1958 |
11/1899 |
|
|
397 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
39 |
675 |
15/03/1958 |
11/1899 |
|
|
409 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
39 |
676 |
21/11/1959 |
12/1899 |
|
|
416 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
39 |
677 |
25/08/1956 |
12/1899 |
|
|
421 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
39 |
678 |
06/1938 |
12/1899 |
|
|
426 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
39 |
679 |
10/1939 |
12/1899 |
|
|
446 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
39 |
680 |
07/08/1954 |
12/1899 |
|
|
462 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
39 |
681 |
03/1936 |
12/1899 |
|
|
468 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
39 |
682 |
03/06/1961 |
12/1899 |
|
|
473 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
39 |
683 |
12/1946 |
01/1900 |
|
|
485 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
39 |
684 |
19/07/1947 |
01/1900 |
|
|
490 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
39 |
685 |
12/1933 |
01/1900 |
|
|
492 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
39 |
686 |
25/06/1955 |
01/1900 |
|
|
520 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
39 |
687 |
06/1933 |
02/1900 |
|
|
103 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
40 |
692 |
10/12/1949 |
02/1900 |
|
|
135 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
40 |
693 |
25/04/1953 |
02/1900 |
|
|
33 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
40 |
691 |
05/1934 |
02/1900 |
|
|
526 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
39 |
688 |
24/04/1958 |
02/1900 |
|
|
610 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
39 |
689 |
10/11/1960 |
02/1900 |
27 |
|
681 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
24/01/1948 |
02/1900 |
|
|
681 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
39 |
690 |
24/01/1948 |
03/1900 |
|
|
193 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
40 |
694 |
22/12/1956 |
03/1900 |
|
|
195 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
40 |
695 |
30/10/1948 |
03/1900 |
|
|
215 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
40 |
696 |
11/1933 |
03/1900 |
|
|
330 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
40 |
697 |
27/01/1951 |
03/1900 |
|
|
375 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
40 |
698 |
27/08/1955 |
03/1900 |
|
|
382 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
40 |
699 |
05/02/1955 |
04/1900 |
|
|
388 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
40 |
700 |
06/1934 |
04/1900 |
|
|
391 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
40 |
701 |
09/01/1960 |
04/1900 |
|
|
398 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
40 |
702 |
10/11/1960 |
04/1900 |
91 |
|
500 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
752 |
05/1927 |
04/1900 |
30 |
|
500 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
752 |
05/1927 |
04/1900 |
91 |
|
91 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
751 |
04/1927 |
04/1900 |
30 |
|
91 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
751 |
04/1927 |
05/1900 |
91 |
|
325 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
753 |
03/1927 |
05/1900 |
30 |
|
325 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
753 |
03/1927 |
05/1900 |
91 |
|
381 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
754 |
04/1927 |
05/1900 |
30 |
|
381 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
754 |
04/1927 |
05/1900 |
91 |
|
383 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
755 |
06/1934 |
05/1900 |
30 |
|
383 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
755 |
06/1934 |
05/1900 |
91 |
|
392 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
756 |
06/1944 |
05/1900 |
30 |
|
392 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
756 |
06/1944 |
06/1900 |
91 |
|
395 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
757 |
08/1927 |
06/1900 |
30 |
|
395 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
757 |
08/1927 |
06/1900 |
91 |
|
407 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
758 |
09/1929 |
06/1900 |
30 |
|
407 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
758 |
09/1929 |
06/1900 |
91 |
|
433 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
759 |
09/1930 |
06/1900 |
30 |
|
433 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
759 |
09/1930 |
06/1900 |
91 |
|
448 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
760 |
04/1928 |
06/1900 |
30 |
|
448 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
760 |
04/1928 |
07/1900 |
91 |
|
463 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
761 |
08/1933 |
07/1900 |
30 |
|
463 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
761 |
08/1933 |
07/1900 |
91 |
|
635 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
762 |
02/1937 |
07/1900 |
30 |
|
635 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
762 |
02/1937 |
07/1900 |
91 |
|
659 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
763 |
10/1929 |
07/1900 |
30 |
|
659 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
763 |
10/1929 |
07/1900 |
91 |
|
676 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
764 |
04/1927 |
07/1900 |
30 |
|
676 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
764 |
04/1927 |
08/1900 |
91 |
|
687 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
765 |
07/1927 |
08/1900 |
30 |
|
687 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
765 |
07/1927 |
08/1900 |
91 |
|
736 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
766 |
11/1930 |
08/1900 |
30 |
|
736 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
766 |
11/1930 |
08/1900 |
91 |
|
738 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
767 |
09/07/1949 |
08/1900 |
30 |
|
738 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
767 |
09/07/1949 |
08/1900 |
91 |
|
745 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
768 |
01/1931 |
08/1900 |
30 |
|
745 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
768 |
01/1931 |
09/1900 |
91 |
|
190 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
770 |
05/1927 |
09/1900 |
30 |
|
190 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
770 |
05/1927 |
09/1900 |
|
|
401 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
40 |
703 |
23/03/1957 |
09/1900 |
|
|
424 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
40 |
704 |
12/1962 |
09/1900 |
|
|
428 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
40 |
705 |
08/12/1951 |
09/1900 |
|
|
432 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
40 |
706 |
11/03/1961 |
09/1900 |
91 |
|
59 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
769 |
01/1928 |
09/1900 |
30 |
|
59 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
43 |
769 |
01/1928 |
10/1900 |
|
|
435 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
40 |
707 |
07/1955 |
10/1900 |
27 |
|
442 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
14/02/1948 |
10/1900 |
|
|
442 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
40 |
708 |
14/02/1948 |
10/1900 |
|
|
453 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
40 |
709 |
08/11/1952 |
10/1900 |
|
|
513 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
40 |
710 |
30/06/1951 |
10/1900 |
|
|
514 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
41 |
711 |
17/01/1953 |
11/1900 |
|
|
515 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
41 |
712 |
12/1936 |
11/1900 |
|
|
516 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
41 |
713 |
11/1939 |
11/1900 |
|
|
525 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
41 |
714 |
09/1958 |
11/1900 |
|
|
632 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
41 |
715 |
08/1947 |
11/1900 |
|
|
641 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
41 |
716 |
10/1944 |
12/1900 |
|
|
669 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
41 |
717 |
20/12/1947 |
12/1900 |
|
|
689 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
41 |
718 |
04/1940 |
12/1900 |
|
|
705 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
41 |
719 |
28/11/1953 |
12/1900 |
|
|
707 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
41 |
720 |
08/1938 |
12/1900 |
|
|
714 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
41 |
721 |
10/1946 |
12/1900 |
|
|
716 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
41 |
722 |
09/1938 |
12/1900 |
|
|
719 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
41 |
723 |
18/12/1948 |
01/1901 |
|
|
722 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
41 |
724 |
11/1938 |
01/1901 |
|
|
740 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
41 |
725 |
04/1944 |
01/1901 |
|
|
741 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
41 |
726 |
03/10/1958 |
01/1901 |
|
|
742 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
41 |
727 |
07/1936 |
02/1901 |
|
|
102 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
42 |
732 |
07/1939 |
02/1901 |
|
|
220 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
42 |
733 |
31/12/1945 |
02/1901 |
|
|
743 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
41 |
728 |
12/1938 |
02/1901 |
|
|
746 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
41 |
729 |
09/1938 |
02/1901 |
|
|
790 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
41 |
730 |
05/11/1955 |
02/1901 |
|
|
81 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
42 |
731 |
12/01/1957 |
03/1901 |
|
|
225 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
42 |
734 |
06/1938 |
03/1901 |
27 |
|
274 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
06/03/1948 |
03/1901 |
|
|
274 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
42 |
735 |
06/03/1948 |
03/1901 |
|
|
288 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
42 |
736 |
04/1937 |
03/1901 |
|
|
302 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
42 |
737 |
20/04/1946 |
03/1901 |
|
|
374 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
42 |
738 |
31/01/1953 |
03/1901 |
|
|
376 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
42 |
739 |
22/08/1953 |
04/1901 |
|
|
385 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
42 |
740 |
06/1934 |
04/1901 |
|
|
386 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
42 |
741 |
05/1934 |
04/1901 |
|
|
400 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
42 |
742 |
31/05/1958 |
04/1901 |
|
|
431 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
42 |
743 |
15/09/1951 |
04/1901 |
|
|
452 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
42 |
744 |
08/10/1960 |
04/1901 |
|
|
497 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
42 |
745 |
22/12/1951 |
05/1901 |
|
|
605 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
42 |
746 |
21/11/1959 |
05/1901 |
|
|
647 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
42 |
747 |
22/11/1958 |
05/1901 |
|
|
652 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
42 |
748 |
08/09/1951 |
05/1901 |
|
|
726 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
42 |
749 |
03/1938 |
05/1901 |
|
|
727 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
42 |
750 |
10/07/1954 |
06/1901 |
91 |
|
154 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
772 |
02/1927 |
06/1901 |
30 |
|
154 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
772 |
02/1927 |
06/1901 |
91 |
|
159 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
773 |
18/10/1947 |
06/1901 |
30 |
|
159 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
773 |
18/10/1947 |
06/1901 |
91 |
|
201 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
774 |
08/1930 |
06/1901 |
30 |
|
201 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
774 |
08/1930 |
06/1901 |
91 |
|
384 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
775 |
04/1936 |
06/1901 |
30 |
|
384 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
775 |
04/1936 |
06/1901 |
91 |
|
69 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
771 |
10/1934 |
06/1901 |
30 |
|
69 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
771 |
10/1934 |
07/1901 |
91 |
|
390 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
776 |
12/1939 |
07/1901 |
30 |
|
390 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
776 |
12/1939 |
07/1901 |
91 |
|
405 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
777 |
07/1935 |
07/1901 |
30 |
|
405 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
777 |
07/1935 |
07/1901 |
91 |
|
406 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
778 |
09/1927 |
07/1901 |
30 |
|
406 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
778 |
09/1927 |
08/1901 |
91 |
|
411 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
779 |
10/1931 |
08/1901 |
30 |
|
411 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
779 |
10/1931 |
08/1901 |
91 |
|
443 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
780 |
05/1928 |
08/1901 |
30 |
|
443 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
780 |
05/1928 |
08/1901 |
91 |
|
511 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
781 |
07/1930 |
08/1901 |
30 |
|
511 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
781 |
07/1930 |
08/1901 |
91 |
|
611 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
782 |
11/1932 |
08/1901 |
30 |
|
611 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
782 |
11/1932 |
09/1901 |
91 |
|
666 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
783 |
11/1930 |
09/1901 |
30 |
|
666 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
783 |
11/1930 |
09/1901 |
91 |
|
695 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
784 |
08/1930 |
09/1901 |
30 |
|
695 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
784 |
08/1930 |
09/1901 |
91 |
|
704 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
785 |
07/1927 |
09/1901 |
30 |
|
704 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
785 |
07/1927 |
09/1901 |
91 |
|
706 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
786 |
06/1931 |
09/1901 |
30 |
|
706 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
786 |
06/1931 |
10/1901 |
1153 |
|
68 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
46 |
811 |
07/09/1964 |
10/1901 |
21 |
|
68 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
46 |
811 |
07/09/1964 |
10/1901 |
91 |
|
709 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
787 |
09/1929 |
10/1901 |
30 |
|
709 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
787 |
09/1929 |
10/1901 |
91 |
|
710 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
788 |
06/1937 |
10/1901 |
30 |
|
710 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
788 |
06/1937 |
10/1901 |
91 |
|
715 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
789 |
04/1931 |
10/1901 |
30 |
|
715 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
789 |
04/1931 |
10/1901 |
91 |
|
717 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
790 |
06/1927 |
10/1901 |
30 |
|
717 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
44 |
790 |
06/1927 |
11/1901 |
1153 |
|
113 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
46 |
812 |
07/1930 |
11/1901 |
21 |
|
113 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
46 |
812 |
07/1930 |
11/1901 |
1153 |
|
139 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
46 |
813 |
01/1924 |
11/1901 |
21 |
|
139 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
46 |
813 |
01/1924 |
11/1901 |
1153 |
|
155 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
46 |
814 |
07/01/1960 |
11/1901 |
21 |
|
155 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
46 |
814 |
07/01/1960 |
12/1901 |
1153 |
|
377 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
46 |
815 |
06/03/1962 |
12/1901 |
21 |
|
377 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
46 |
815 |
06/03/1962 |
12/1901 |
1153 |
|
389 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
46 |
816 |
05/1933 |
12/1901 |
21 |
|
389 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
46 |
816 |
05/1933 |
12/1901 |
1153 |
|
399 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
46 |
817 |
06/1934 |
12/1901 |
21 |
|
399 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
46 |
817 |
06/1934 |
12/1901 |
1153 |
|
402 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
46 |
818 |
12/1932 |
12/1901 |
21 |
|
402 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
46 |
818 |
12/1932 |
12/1901 |
1153 |
|
403 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
46 |
819 |
06/1931 |
12/1901 |
21 |
|
403 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
46 |
819 |
06/1931 |
12/1901 |
1153 |
|
476 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
46 |
820 |
09/1960 |
12/1901 |
21 |
|
476 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
46 |
820 |
09/1960 |
01/1902 |
|
|
1405 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
791 |
08/1933 |
02/1902 |
|
|
1406 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
792 |
01/1932 |
02/1902 |
|
|
1407 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
793 |
09/1933 |
02/1902 |
|
|
1408 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
794 |
10/1929 |
03/1902 |
|
|
1409 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
795 |
04/1932 |
03/1902 |
|
|
1410 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
796 |
11/1930 |
03/1902 |
|
|
1411 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
797 |
12/1927 |
03/1902 |
|
|
1412 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
798 |
11/1929 |
04/1902 |
|
|
1413 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
799 |
11/1929 |
04/1902 |
|
|
1414 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
800 |
07/1928 |
04/1902 |
|
|
1415 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
801 |
03/1928 |
04/1902 |
|
|
1416 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
802 |
07/1930 |
05/1902 |
|
|
1417 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
803 |
11/1927 |
05/1902 |
|
|
1418 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
804 |
11/1927 |
05/1902 |
|
|
1419 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
805 |
11/1927 |
05/1902 |
|
|
1420 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
806 |
11/1933 |
06/1902 |
|
|
1421 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
807 |
10/1929 |
06/1902 |
|
|
1422 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
808 |
08/1930 |
06/1902 |
|
|
1423 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
809 |
09/1927 |
06/1902 |
|
|
1424 |
4-4-2 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
810 |
04/1932 |
07/1902 |
|
|
65 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
47 |
821 |
04/1927 |
07/1902 |
|
|
95 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
47 |
822 |
05/1930 |
08/1902 |
|
|
378 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
47 |
823 |
11/1930 |
08/1902 |
|
|
412 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
47 |
824 |
02/1932 |
08/1902 |
|
|
656 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
47 |
825 |
06/1931 |
08/1902 |
|
|
739 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
47 |
826 |
03/1931 |
09/1902 |
|
|
792 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
47 |
827 |
09/1935 |
09/1902 |
|
|
822 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
47 |
828 |
05/1934 |
09/1902 |
|
|
827 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
47 |
829 |
02/1931 |
09/1902 |
|
|
987 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
47 |
830 |
01/1947 |
10/1902 |
|
|
1425 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
47 |
831 |
03/1931 |
10/1902 |
|
|
1426 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
47 |
832 |
03/1927 |
10/1902 |
|
|
1427 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
47 |
833 |
03/1930 |
10/1902 |
|
|
1428 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
47 |
834 |
09/03/1946 |
10/1902 |
|
|
1429 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
47 |
835 |
07/1927 |
11/1902 |
|
|
1430 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
47 |
836 |
01/1937 |
11/1902 |
|
|
1431 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
47 |
837 |
08/1929 |
11/1902 |
|
|
1432 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
47 |
838 |
06/1928 |
02/1903 |
|
|
1433 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
47 |
839 |
14/10/1950 |
02/1903 |
|
|
1434 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
47 |
840 |
01/1926 |
03/1903 |
|
|
114 |
0-8-0 |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
48 |
841 |
02/09/1950 |
04/1903 |
|
|
157 |
0-8-0 |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
48 |
842 |
09/1927 |
04/1903 |
|
|
169 |
0-8-0 |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
48 |
843 |
08/1937 |
04/1903 |
|
|
373 |
0-8-0 |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
48 |
844 |
06/1934 |
05/1903 |
|
|
394 |
0-8-0 |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
48 |
845 |
08/1926 |
05/1903 |
|
|
396 |
0-8-0 |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
48 |
850 |
05/1927 |
05/1903 |
|
|
408 |
0-8-0 |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
48 |
846 |
09/1932 |
05/1903 |
|
|
423 |
0-8-0 |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
48 |
847 |
03/1927 |
05/1903 |
|
|
434 |
0-8-0 |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
48 |
848 |
05/1927 |
05/1903 |
|
|
436 |
0-8-0 |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
48 |
849 |
03/1932 |
06/1903 |
|
|
512 |
0-8-0 |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
48 |
851 |
04/1928 |
06/1903 |
|
|
522 |
0-8-0 |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
48 |
852 |
03/1927 |
06/1903 |
|
|
612 |
0-8-0 |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
48 |
853 |
06/1929 |
07/1903 |
|
|
1435 |
0-8-0 |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
48 |
855 |
05/1927 |
07/1903 |
|
|
1436 |
0-8-0 |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
48 |
856 |
10/1927 |
07/1903 |
|
|
1437 |
0-8-0 |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
48 |
857 |
10/1927 |
07/1903 |
|
|
720 |
0-8-0 |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
48 |
854 |
08/1946 |
08/1903 |
|
|
1438 |
0-8-0 |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
48 |
858 |
11/1928 |
08/1903 |
|
|
1439 |
0-8-0 |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
48 |
859 |
04/1927 |
08/1903 |
|
|
1440 |
0-8-0 |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
48 |
860 |
09/1946 |
10/1903 |
202 |
|
202 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
861 |
12/1920 |
10/1903 |
26 |
|
202 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
861 |
12/1920 |
11/1903 |
202 |
|
387 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
862 |
05/1925 |
11/1903 |
26 |
|
387 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
862 |
05/1925 |
11/1903 |
202 |
|
404 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
863 |
12/1920 |
11/1903 |
26 |
|
404 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
863 |
12/1920 |
11/1903 |
202 |
|
454 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
864 |
01/1926 |
11/1903 |
26 |
|
454 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
864 |
01/1926 |
12/1903 |
202 |
|
467 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
865 |
05/1925 |
12/1903 |
26 |
|
467 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
865 |
05/1925 |
01/1904 |
202 |
|
527 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
866 |
03/1926 |
01/1904 |
26 |
|
527 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
866 |
03/1926 |
02/1904 |
202 |
|
712 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
867 |
08/1926 |
02/1904 |
26 |
|
712 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
867 |
08/1926 |
02/1904 |
202 |
|
744 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
868 |
08/1926 |
02/1904 |
26 |
|
744 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
868 |
08/1926 |
03/1904 |
202 |
|
125 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
870 |
05/1923 |
03/1904 |
26 |
|
125 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
870 |
05/1923 |
03/1904 |
202 |
|
837 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
869 |
06/1925 |
03/1904 |
26 |
|
837 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
869 |
06/1925 |
04/1904 |
202 |
|
1441 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
871 |
08/1926 |
04/1904 |
26 |
|
1441 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
871 |
08/1926 |
04/1904 |
202 |
|
1442 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
872 |
07/1925 |
04/1904 |
26 |
|
1442 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
872 |
07/1925 |
05/1904 |
202 |
|
1443 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
873 |
06/1925 |
05/1904 |
26 |
|
1443 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
873 |
06/1925 |
05/1904 |
202 |
|
1444 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
874 |
01/1925 |
05/1904 |
26 |
|
1444 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
874 |
01/1925 |
06/1904 |
202 |
|
1445 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
875 |
09/1924 |
06/1904 |
26 |
|
1445 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
875 |
09/1924 |
06/1904 |
202 |
|
1446 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
876 |
08/1926 |
06/1904 |
26 |
|
1446 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
876 |
08/1926 |
07/1904 |
202 |
|
1447 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
877 |
07/1926 |
07/1904 |
26 |
|
1447 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
877 |
07/1926 |
07/1904 |
202 |
|
1448 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
878 |
02/1925 |
07/1904 |
26 |
|
1448 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
878 |
02/1925 |
07/1904 |
202 |
|
1449 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
879 |
1924 |
07/1904 |
26 |
|
1449 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
879 |
1924 |
08/1904 |
202 |
|
1450 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
880 |
08/1926 |
08/1904 |
26 |
|
1450 |
2-6-2T |
H. Hoy |
Horwich Works |
49 |
880 |
08/1926 |
08/1904 |
91 |
|
1451 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
881 |
01/1946 |
08/1904 |
30 |
|
1451 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
881 |
01/1946 |
09/1904 |
91 |
|
1452 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
882 |
09/1926 |
09/1904 |
30 |
|
1452 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
882 |
09/1926 |
09/1904 |
91 |
|
1453 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
883 |
07/1930 |
09/1904 |
30 |
|
1453 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
883 |
07/1930 |
09/1904 |
91 |
|
1454 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
884 |
01/1926 |
09/1904 |
30 |
|
1454 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
884 |
01/1926 |
09/1904 |
91 |
|
1455 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
885 |
12/1936 |
09/1904 |
30 |
|
1455 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
885 |
12/1936 |
10/1904 |
91 |
|
1456 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
886 |
04/1928 |
10/1904 |
30 |
|
1456 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
886 |
04/1928 |
10/1904 |
91 |
|
1457 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
887 |
08/1930 |
10/1904 |
30 |
|
1457 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
887 |
08/1930 |
10/1904 |
91 |
|
1458 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
888 |
12/1935 |
10/1904 |
30 |
|
1458 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
888 |
12/1935 |
10/1904 |
91 |
|
1459 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
889 |
11/1927 |
10/1904 |
30 |
|
1459 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
889 |
11/1927 |
11/1904 |
91 |
|
117 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
891 |
04/1936 |
11/1904 |
30 |
|
117 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
891 |
04/1936 |
11/1904 |
91 |
|
1460 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
890 |
06/1926 |
11/1904 |
30 |
|
1460 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
890 |
06/1926 |
11/1904 |
91 |
|
413 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
892 |
04/1932 |
11/1904 |
30 |
|
413 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
892 |
04/1932 |
11/1904 |
91 |
|
461 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
893 |
09/1927 |
11/1904 |
30 |
|
461 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
893 |
09/1927 |
12/1904 |
91 |
|
820 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
894 |
06/1929 |
12/1904 |
30 |
|
820 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
894 |
06/1929 |
12/1904 |
91 |
|
831 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
895 |
05/1932 |
12/1904 |
30 |
|
831 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
895 |
05/1932 |
01/1905 |
91 |
|
835 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
896 |
06/1931 |
01/1905 |
30 |
|
835 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
896 |
06/1931 |
01/1905 |
91 |
|
841 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
897 |
05/1927 |
01/1905 |
30 |
|
841 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
897 |
05/1927 |
02/1905 |
91 |
|
866 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
899 |
11/1930 |
02/1905 |
30 |
|
866 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
899 |
11/1930 |
02/1905 |
91 |
|
880 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
898 |
04/1934 |
02/1905 |
30 |
|
880 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
898 |
04/1934 |
03/1905 |
91 |
|
870 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
900 |
06/1930 |
03/1905 |
30 |
|
870 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
50 |
900 |
06/1930 |
04/1905 |
|
|
816 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
51 |
901 |
05/1943 |
04/1905 |
|
|
817 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
51 |
902 |
06/1946 |
04/1905 |
|
|
819 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
51 |
903 |
22/03/1952 |
05/1905 |
|
|
833 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
51 |
904 |
01/03/1952 |
05/1905 |
|
|
839 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
51 |
905 |
08/1946 |
05/1905 |
|
|
842 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
51 |
906 |
22/05/1948 |
05/1905 |
|
|
867 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
51 |
907 |
03/1946 |
06/1905 |
|
|
1461 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
51 |
911 |
01/1946 |
06/1905 |
|
|
1462 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
51 |
912 |
10/1949 |
06/1905 |
|
|
868 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
51 |
908 |
05/1931 |
06/1905 |
|
|
869 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
51 |
909 |
03/1945 |
06/1905 |
|
|
878 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
51 |
910 |
05/1946 |
07/1905 |
|
|
1463 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
51 |
913 |
06/1946 |
07/1905 |
|
|
1464 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
51 |
914 |
08/1944 |
07/1905 |
|
|
1465 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
51 |
915 |
10/1944 |
07/1905 |
|
|
1466 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
51 |
916 |
11/1944 |
08/1905 |
|
|
1467 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
51 |
917 |
10/1947 |
09/1905 |
|
|
1468 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
51 |
918 |
29/12/1951 |
09/1905 |
|
|
1469 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
51 |
919 |
19/10/1946 |
10/1905 |
|
|
1470 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
51 |
920 |
14/12/1957 |
12/1905 |
1153 |
|
260 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
52 |
921 |
11/1932 |
12/1905 |
21 |
|
260 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
52 |
921 |
11/1932 |
12/1905 |
1153 |
|
813 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
52 |
922 |
21/01/1961 |
12/1905 |
21 |
|
813 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
52 |
922 |
21/01/1961 |
01/1906 |
1153 |
|
814 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
52 |
923 |
12/1958 |
01/1906 |
21 |
|
814 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
52 |
923 |
12/1958 |
01/1906 |
1153 |
|
821 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
52 |
924 |
07/1959 |
01/1906 |
21 |
|
821 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
52 |
924 |
07/1959 |
02/1906 |
1153 |
|
823 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
52 |
925 |
07/1963 |
02/1906 |
21 |
|
823 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
52 |
925 |
07/1963 |
02/1906 |
1153 |
|
825 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
52 |
926 |
10/1931 |
02/1906 |
21 |
|
825 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
52 |
926 |
10/1931 |
02/1906 |
1153 |
|
832 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
52 |
927 |
19/10/1957 |
02/1906 |
21 |
|
832 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
52 |
927 |
19/10/1957 |
02/1906 |
1153 |
|
840 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
52 |
928 |
10/1958 |
02/1906 |
21 |
|
840 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
52 |
928 |
10/1958 |
03/1906 |
|
|
41 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
53 |
931 |
08/10/1949 |
03/1906 |
1153 |
|
865 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
52 |
929 |
05/1934 |
03/1906 |
21 |
|
865 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
52 |
929 |
05/1934 |
03/1906 |
1153 |
|
879 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
52 |
930 |
25/05/1963 |
03/1906 |
21 |
|
879 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
52 |
930 |
25/05/1963 |
04/1906 |
|
|
55 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
53 |
932 |
09/02/1946 |
05/1906 |
27 |
|
115 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
05/05/1956 |
05/1906 |
|
|
115 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
53 |
933 |
05/1956 |
05/1906 |
|
|
123 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
53 |
934 |
14/04/1962 |
06/1906 |
|
|
246 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
53 |
935 |
27/08/1949 |
06/1906 |
|
|
247 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
53 |
936 |
14/02/1953 |
07/1906 |
|
|
255 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
53 |
937 |
01/09/1962 |
07/1906 |
|
|
824 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
53 |
938 |
03/09/1949 |
07/1906 |
|
|
881 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
53 |
939 |
21/11/1959 |
07/1906 |
|
|
890 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
53 |
940 |
22/02/1957 |
08/1906 |
|
|
261 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
53 |
943 |
14/07/1951 |
08/1906 |
|
|
60 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
53 |
941 |
17/03/1951 |
08/1906 |
|
|
604 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
53 |
944 |
10/12/1955 |
08/1906 |
|
|
829 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
53 |
945 |
06/1946 |
08/1906 |
|
|
834 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
53 |
946 |
24/11/1951 |
08/1906 |
|
|
99 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
53 |
942 |
26/11/1960 |
09/1906 |
|
|
838 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
53 |
947 |
02/11/1957 |
09/1906 |
|
|
871 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
53 |
948 |
14/11/1953 |
11/1906 |
91 |
|
49 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
55 |
957 |
05/1937 |
11/1906 |
30 |
|
49 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
55 |
957 |
05/1937 |
11/1906 |
91 |
|
83 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
55 |
958 |
11/1928 |
11/1906 |
30 |
|
83 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
55 |
958 |
11/1928 |
11/1906 |
91 |
|
836 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
55 |
960 |
01/1937 |
11/1906 |
30 |
|
836 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
55 |
960 |
01/1937 |
11/1906 |
91 |
|
86 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
55 |
959 |
05/1931 |
11/1906 |
30 |
|
86 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
55 |
959 |
05/1931 |
11/1906 |
27 |
|
898 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
12/12/1962 |
12/1906 |
91 |
|
876 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
55 |
961 |
03/1932 |
12/1906 |
30 |
|
876 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
55 |
961 |
03/1932 |
12/1906 |
91 |
|
877 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
55 |
962 |
08/1935 |
12/1906 |
30 |
|
877 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
55 |
962 |
08/1935 |
01/1907 |
91 |
|
108 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
55 |
964 |
02/1929 |
01/1907 |
30 |
|
108 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
55 |
964 |
02/1929 |
01/1907 |
91 |
|
894 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
55 |
963 |
11/1927 |
01/1907 |
30 |
|
894 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
55 |
963 |
11/1927 |
02/1907 |
91 |
|
74 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
55 |
965 |
05/1928 |
02/1907 |
30 |
|
74 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
55 |
965 |
05/1928 |
02/1907 |
91 |
|
79 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
55 |
966 |
02/1932 |
02/1907 |
30 |
|
79 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
55 |
966 |
02/1932 |
04/1907 |
|
|
1471 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
56 |
967 |
09/1926 |
04/1907 |
|
|
1472 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
56 |
968 |
09/1926 |
04/1907 |
|
|
1473 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
56 |
969 |
07/1926 |
05/1907 |
|
|
1474 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
56 |
970 |
02/1927 |
05/1907 |
|
|
1475 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
56 |
971 |
09/1926 |
05/1907 |
|
|
1476 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
56 |
972 |
07/1926 |
06/1907 |
|
|
1477 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
56 |
973 |
09/1926 |
06/1907 |
|
|
1478 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
56 |
974 |
09/1926 |
06/1907 |
|
|
1479 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
56 |
975 |
09/1926 |
06/1907 |
|
|
1480 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
56 |
976 |
04/1927 |
07/1907 |
91 |
|
1481 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
984 |
10/1929 |
07/1907 |
30 |
|
1481 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
984 |
10/1929 |
07/1907 |
91 |
|
1482 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
985 |
12/1927 |
07/1907 |
30 |
|
1482 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
985 |
12/1927 |
07/1907 |
91 |
|
1483 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
986 |
05/1927 |
07/1907 |
30 |
|
1483 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
986 |
05/1927 |
08/1907 |
91 |
|
1484 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
987 |
06/1926 |
08/1907 |
30 |
|
1484 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
987 |
06/1926 |
08/1907 |
91 |
|
1485 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
988 |
10/1926 |
08/1907 |
30 |
|
1485 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
988 |
10/1926 |
08/1907 |
91 |
|
1486 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
989 |
12/1933 |
08/1907 |
30 |
|
1486 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
989 |
12/1933 |
09/1907 |
91 |
|
1487 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
990 |
10/1926 |
09/1907 |
30 |
|
1487 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
990 |
10/1926 |
09/1907 |
91 |
|
1488 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
991 |
10/1931 |
09/1907 |
30 |
|
1488 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
991 |
10/1931 |
09/1907 |
91 |
|
1489 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
992 |
06/1925 |
09/1907 |
30 |
|
1489 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
992 |
06/1925 |
10/1907 |
91 |
|
1490 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
993 |
08/1929 |
10/1907 |
30 |
|
1490 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
993 |
08/1929 |
10/1907 |
91 |
|
1491 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
994 |
03/1932 |
10/1907 |
30 |
|
1491 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
994 |
03/1932 |
10/1907 |
91 |
|
1492 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
995 |
02/1929 |
10/1907 |
30 |
|
1492 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
995 |
02/1929 |
11/1907 |
91 |
|
1493 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
996 |
03/1939 |
11/1907 |
30 |
|
1493 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
996 |
03/1939 |
11/1907 |
91 |
|
1494 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
997 |
02/1930 |
11/1907 |
30 |
|
1494 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
997 |
02/1930 |
11/1907 |
91 |
|
1495 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
998 |
11/1936 |
11/1907 |
30 |
|
1495 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
998 |
11/1936 |
12/1907 |
91 |
|
1496 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
999 |
03/1935 |
12/1907 |
30 |
|
1496 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
999 |
03/1935 |
12/1907 |
91 |
|
1497 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
1000 |
12/1934 |
12/1907 |
30 |
|
1497 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
1000 |
12/1934 |
12/1907 |
91 |
|
1498 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
1001 |
06/1934 |
12/1907 |
30 |
|
1498 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
1001 |
06/1934 |
01/1908 |
91 |
|
1499 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
1002 |
01/1929 |
01/1908 |
30 |
|
1499 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
1002 |
01/1929 |
01/1908 |
91 |
|
1500 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
1003 |
08/1929 |
01/1908 |
30 |
|
1500 |
0-8-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
58 |
1003 |
08/1929 |
03/1908 |
|
|
1501 |
0-8-2T |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
59 |
1004 |
08/1925 |
03/1908 |
|
|
1502 |
0-8-2T |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
59 |
1005 |
06/1927 |
03/1908 |
|
|
1503 |
0-8-2T |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
59 |
1006 |
06/1926 |
04/1908 |
|
|
1504 |
0-8-2T |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
59 |
1007 |
10/1929 |
04/1908 |
|
|
1505 |
0-8-2T |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
59 |
1008 |
02/1927 |
06/1908 |
|
|
1506 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
60 |
1009 |
09/1934 |
07/1908 |
|
|
1507 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
60 |
1010 |
05/1925 |
07/1908 |
|
|
1508 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
60 |
1011 |
01/1926 |
07/1908 |
|
|
1509 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
60 |
1012 |
11/1933 |
08/1908 |
|
|
1510 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
60 |
1013 |
07/1935 |
08/1908 |
|
|
1511 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
60 |
1014 |
06/1936 |
08/1908 |
|
|
1512 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
60 |
1015 |
01/1926 |
08/1908 |
|
|
1513 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
60 |
1016 |
08/1925 |
09/1908 |
|
|
1514 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
60 |
1017 |
01/1937 |
09/1908 |
|
|
1515 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
60 |
1018 |
08/1925 |
10/1908 |
|
|
1516 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
60 |
1019 |
02/1949 |
10/1908 |
|
|
1517 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
60 |
1020 |
03/1936 |
11/1908 |
|
|
1518 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
60 |
1021 |
01/1934 |
11/1908 |
|
|
1519 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
60 |
1022 |
01/1934 |
12/1908 |
|
|
1520 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
60 |
1023 |
05/1936 |
12/1908 |
|
|
1521 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
60 |
1024 |
12/1935 |
01/1909 |
|
|
1522 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
60 |
1025 |
11/1934 |
01/1909 |
|
|
1523 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
60 |
1026 |
11/1935 |
02/1909 |
|
|
1524 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
60 |
1027 |
10/1926 |
03/1909 |
|
|
1525 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
60 |
1028 |
11/1934 |
04/1909 |
27 |
|
85 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
05/1958 |
04/1909 |
27 |
|
89 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
02/1949 |
05/1909 |
27 |
|
109 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
24/05/1957 |
05/1909 |
|
|
863 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
62 |
1034 |
13/11/1948 |
05/1909 |
|
|
864 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
62 |
1035 |
17/03/1956 |
05/1909 |
|
|
872 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
62 |
1036 |
10/1934 |
06/1909 |
27 |
|
634 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
12/03/1955 |
06/1909 |
|
|
874 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
62 |
1037 |
23/06/1960 |
06/1909 |
|
|
875 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
62 |
1038 |
10/1935 |
07/1909 |
27 |
|
636 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
22/09/1962 |
07/1909 |
27 |
|
642 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
14/08/1954 |
07/1909 |
27 |
|
815 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
18/04/1953 |
07/1909 |
27 |
|
826 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
25/03/1961 |
07/1909 |
|
|
884 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
62 |
1044 |
03/1936 |
08/1909 |
27 |
|
61 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
22/08/1959 |
08/1909 |
|
|
885 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
62 |
1045 |
07/01/1956 |
08/1909 |
|
|
887 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
62 |
1046 |
12/12/1953 |
08/1909 |
|
|
888 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
62 |
1047 |
20/08/1949 |
08/1909 |
|
|
889 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
62 |
1048 |
12/1935 |
09/1909 |
|
|
625 |
0-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
27/11/1948 |
09/1909 |
27 |
|
633 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
02/03/1957 |
09/1909 |
|
|
873 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
62 |
1054 |
21/11/1959 |
09/1909 |
|
|
882 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
62 |
1055 |
03/05/1947 |
10/1909 |
|
|
886 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
62 |
1056 |
01/1936 |
10/1909 |
|
|
891 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
62 |
1057 |
08/1936 |
10/1909 |
|
|
892 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
62 |
1058 |
13/10/1962 |
11/1909 |
|
|
893 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
62 |
1064 |
13/03/1948 |
11/1909 |
|
|
893 |
0-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
13/03/1948 |
11/1909 |
|
|
895 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
62 |
1065 |
08/05/1948 |
11/1909 |
|
|
896 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
62 |
1066 |
05/09/1959 |
11/1909 |
|
|
897 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
62 |
1067 |
23/12/1961 |
12/1909 |
|
|
899 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
62 |
1068 |
16/06/1951 |
01/1910 |
|
|
1526 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
64 |
1072 |
03/1946 |
01/1910 |
|
|
1527 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
64 |
1073 |
10/1949 |
01/1910 |
|
|
1528 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
64 |
1074 |
03/1947 |
02/1910 |
|
|
1529 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
64 |
1075 |
10/1929 |
02/1910 |
|
|
1530 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
64 |
1076 |
03/1945 |
02/1910 |
|
|
1531 |
2-4-2T |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
04/03/1950 |
02/1910 |
|
|
1531 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
64 |
1077 |
04/03/1950 |
02/1910 |
|
|
1532 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
64 |
1078 |
05/1942 |
02/1910 |
|
|
1533 |
2-4-2T |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
14/08/1948 |
02/1910 |
|
|
1533 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
64 |
1079 |
14/08/1948 |
02/1910 |
|
|
1534 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
64 |
1080 |
07/1946 |
03/1910 |
|
|
1535 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
64 |
1081 |
05/1952 |
03/1910 |
|
|
1536 |
2-4-2T |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
09/08/1952 |
03/1910 |
|
|
1536 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
64 |
1082 |
09/08/1952 |
03/1910 |
|
|
1537 |
2-4-2T |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
29/04/1950 |
03/1910 |
|
|
1537 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
64 |
1083 |
29/04/1950 |
03/1910 |
|
|
1538 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
64 |
1084 |
08/1931 |
03/1910 |
|
|
1539 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
64 |
1085 |
03/1928 |
03/1910 |
|
|
1540 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
64 |
1086 |
04/1932 |
03/1910 |
|
|
1541 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
64 |
1087 |
04/12/1948 |
04/1910 |
|
|
1542 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
64 |
1088 |
11/1945 |
04/1910 |
|
|
1543 |
2-4-2T |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
01/1949 |
04/1910 |
|
|
1543 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
64 |
1089 |
01/1949 |
04/1910 |
|
|
1544 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
64 |
1090 |
23/02/1952 |
04/1910 |
|
|
1545 |
2-4-2T |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
64 |
1091 |
23/10/1948 |
04/1910 |
1153 |
|
2 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1092 |
1924 |
04/1910 |
21 |
|
2 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1092 |
1924 |
04/1910 |
1153 |
|
3 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1093 |
11/1935 |
04/1910 |
21 |
|
3 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1093 |
11/1935 |
05/1910 |
1153 |
|
12 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1095 |
18/01/1962 |
05/1910 |
21 |
|
12 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1095 |
18/01/1962 |
05/1910 |
1153 |
|
17 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1096 |
06/1930 |
05/1910 |
21 |
|
17 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1096 |
06/1930 |
05/1910 |
1153 |
|
19 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1097 |
09/1931 |
05/1910 |
21 |
|
19 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1097 |
09/1931 |
05/1910 |
1153 |
|
28 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1098 |
06/03/1962 |
05/1910 |
21 |
|
28 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1098 |
06/03/1962 |
05/1910 |
1153 |
|
43 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1099 |
1931 |
05/1910 |
21 |
|
43 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1099 |
1931 |
05/1910 |
1153 |
|
8 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1094 |
24/04/1957 |
05/1910 |
21 |
|
8 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1094 |
24/04/1957 |
06/1910 |
1153 |
|
118 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1104 |
08/1932 |
06/1910 |
21 |
|
118 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1104 |
08/1932 |
06/1910 |
1153 |
|
226 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1105 |
04/1933 |
06/1910 |
21 |
|
226 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1105 |
04/1933 |
06/1910 |
1153 |
|
271 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1106 |
07/1931 |
06/1910 |
21 |
|
271 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1106 |
07/1931 |
06/1910 |
1153 |
|
298 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1107 |
22/06/1963 |
06/1910 |
21 |
|
298 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1107 |
22/06/1963 |
06/1910 |
1153 |
|
481 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1108 |
08/1931 |
06/1910 |
21 |
|
481 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1108 |
08/1931 |
06/1910 |
1153 |
|
517 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1109 |
12/1934 |
06/1910 |
21 |
|
517 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1109 |
12/1934 |
06/1910 |
1153 |
|
56 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1100 |
07/10/1961 |
06/1910 |
21 |
|
56 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1100 |
07/10/1961 |
06/1910 |
1153 |
|
64 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1101 |
12/1931 |
06/1910 |
21 |
|
64 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1101 |
12/1931 |
06/1910 |
1153 |
|
71 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1102 |
09/1931 |
06/1910 |
21 |
|
71 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1102 |
09/1931 |
06/1910 |
1153 |
|
75 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1103 |
03/1936 |
06/1910 |
21 |
|
75 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1103 |
03/1936 |
07/1910 |
1153 |
|
613 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1110 |
01/1934 |
07/1910 |
21 |
|
613 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1110 |
01/1934 |
07/1910 |
1153 |
|
614 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1111 |
10/1937 |
07/1910 |
21 |
|
614 |
0-4-0ST |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
65 |
1111 |
10/1937 |
07/1910 |
|
|
9 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
66 |
1112 |
04/1928 |
08/1910 |
|
|
29 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
66 |
1113 |
09/1930 |
08/1910 |
|
|
35 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
66 |
1114 |
02/1935 |
08/1910 |
|
|
67 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
66 |
1115 |
12/1927 |
08/1910 |
|
|
87 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
66 |
1116 |
07/1928 |
09/1910 |
|
|
616 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
66 |
1118 |
10/1931 |
09/1910 |
|
|
96 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
66 |
1117 |
11/06/1949 |
10/1910 |
|
|
617 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
66 |
1119 |
04/1928 |
10/1910 |
|
|
628 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
66 |
1120 |
09/1931 |
10/1910 |
|
|
713 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
66 |
1121 |
01/1935 |
11/1910 |
|
|
902 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
66 |
1122 |
06/1929 |
11/1910 |
|
|
905 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
66 |
1123 |
02/1930 |
11/1910 |
|
|
906 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
66 |
1124 |
02/1931 |
12/1910 |
|
|
719 |
2-4-2T |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
18/12/1948 |
12/1910 |
|
|
908 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
66 |
1125 |
07/1927 |
12/1910 |
|
|
909 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
66 |
1126 |
06/1932 |
12/1910 |
|
|
910 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
66 |
1127 |
10/1929 |
01/1911 |
|
|
911 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
66 |
1128 |
03/1930 |
01/1911 |
|
|
912 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
66 |
1129 |
04/1932 |
02/1911 |
|
|
913 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
66 |
1130 |
07/1932 |
02/1911 |
|
|
914 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
66 |
1131 |
12/1929 |
03/1911 |
|
|
112 |
2-4-2T |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
14/02/1948 |
03/1911 |
|
|
70 |
2-4-2T |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
20/03/1948 |
05/1911 |
|
|
224 |
2-4-2T |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
17/03/1951 |
04/1912 |
|
|
907 |
0-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
16/07/1949 |
04/1912 |
|
|
917 |
0-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
03/1950 |
05/1912 |
|
|
1364 |
0-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
13/11/1948 |
06/1912 |
|
|
20 |
0-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
23/03/1957 |
06/1912 |
|
|
239 |
0-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
06/11/1954 |
08/1912 |
|
|
237 |
0-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
?? |
|
25/10/1952 |
11/1912 |
|
|
1546 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
70 |
1174 |
01/1935 |
12/1912 |
|
|
1547 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
70 |
1175 |
13/03/1948 |
12/1912 |
|
|
1548 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
70 |
1176 |
12/1930 |
01/1913 |
|
|
1549 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
70 |
1177 |
12/1936 |
01/1913 |
|
|
1550 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
70 |
1178 |
03/1937 |
01/1913 |
|
|
1551 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
70 |
1179 |
09/1930 |
02/1913 |
|
|
1552 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
70 |
1180 |
11/1932 |
02/1913 |
|
|
1553 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
70 |
1181 |
09/1931 |
03/1913 |
|
|
1554 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
70 |
1182 |
06/1931 |
03/1913 |
|
|
1555 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
70 |
1183 |
06/1937 |
03/1913 |
|
|
1556 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
70 |
1184 |
11/1930 |
04/1913 |
|
|
1557 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
70 |
1185 |
09/1935 |
04/1913 |
|
|
1558 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
70 |
1186 |
07/1936 |
05/1913 |
|
|
1559 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
70 |
1187 |
03/1935 |
05/1913 |
|
|
1560 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
70 |
1188 |
10/1934 |
05/1913 |
|
|
1561 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
70 |
1189 |
08/1931 |
05/1913 |
|
|
1562 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
70 |
1190 |
06/05/1950 |
06/1913 |
|
|
1563 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
70 |
1191 |
22/12/1951 |
06/1913 |
|
|
1564 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
70 |
1192 |
02/1936 |
07/1913 |
|
|
1566 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
71 |
1194 |
08/1938 |
07/1913 |
|
|
1567 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
71 |
1195 |
09/11/1946 |
07/1913 |
|
|
1656 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
70 |
1193 |
02/1935 |
08/1913 |
|
|
1568 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
71 |
1196 |
04/1932 |
08/1913 |
|
|
1569 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
71 |
1197 |
08/1931 |
09/1913 |
|
|
1570 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
71 |
1198 |
05/1935 |
09/1913 |
|
|
1571 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
71 |
1199 |
03/1937 |
09/1913 |
|
|
1572 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
71 |
1200 |
04/1936 |
10/1913 |
|
|
1573 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
71 |
1201 |
09/1931 |
10/1913 |
|
|
1574 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
71 |
1202 |
11/1935 |
10/1913 |
|
|
1575 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
71 |
1203 |
06/1934 |
11/1913 |
|
|
1576 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
71 |
1204 |
22/09/1951 |
11/1913 |
|
|
1577 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
71 |
1205 |
01/1936 |
11/1913 |
|
|
1578 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
71 |
1206 |
04/1932 |
12/1913 |
|
|
1579 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
71 |
1207 |
08/05/1948 |
12/1913 |
|
|
1580 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
71 |
1208 |
06/1931 |
12/1913 |
|
|
1581 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
71 |
1209 |
09/03/1946 |
12/1913 |
|
|
1582 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
71 |
1210 |
10/1934 |
01/1914 |
|
|
1583 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
71 |
1211 |
02/10/1948 |
01/1914 |
|
|
1584 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
71 |
1212 |
02/1937 |
02/1914 |
|
|
1585 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
71 |
1213 |
12/1935 |
03/1914 |
|
|
6 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
72 |
1214 |
04/1934 |
03/1914 |
|
|
7 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
72 |
1215 |
06/1937 |
04/1914 |
|
|
134 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
72 |
1216 |
02/1937 |
05/1914 |
|
|
141 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
72 |
1217 |
03/1935 |
06/1914 |
|
|
142 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
72 |
1218 |
08/1935 |
07/1914 |
|
|
150 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
72 |
1219 |
05/1935 |
08/1914 |
|
|
229 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
72 |
1220 |
09/07/1949 |
09/1914 |
|
|
259 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
72 |
1221 |
08/1945 |
11/1914 |
|
|
281 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
72 |
1222 |
02/1937 |
12/1914 |
|
|
460 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
72 |
1223 |
05/1935 |
09/1916 |
|
|
216 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
73 |
1224 |
20/09/1947 |
11/1916 |
|
|
235 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
73 |
1225 |
11/1933 |
11/1916 |
|
|
241 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
73 |
1226 |
12/1936 |
12/1916 |
|
|
265 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
73 |
1227 |
10/1936 |
04/1917 |
|
|
312 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
73 |
1228 |
30/09/1950 |
04/1917 |
|
|
493 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
73 |
1229 |
11/1935 |
04/1917 |
|
|
603 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
73 |
1233 |
30/09/1950 |
05/1917 |
|
|
503 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
73 |
1230 |
12/1933 |
05/1917 |
|
|
507 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
73 |
1231 |
06/1937 |
05/1917 |
|
|
601 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
73 |
1232 |
03/1937 |
06/1917 |
|
|
626 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
73 |
1234 |
06/1931 |
06/1917 |
|
|
631 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
73 |
1235 |
11/02/1950 |
06/1917 |
|
|
640 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
73 |
1236 |
03/1934 |
07/1917 |
|
|
660 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
73 |
1237 |
04/1936 |
08/1917 |
|
|
673 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
73 |
1238 |
25/11/1950 |
08/1917 |
|
|
919 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
75 |
1264 |
12/11/1962 |
09/1917 |
|
|
694 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
73 |
1239 |
10/1935 |
09/1917 |
|
|
697 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
73 |
1240 |
03/1937 |
09/1917 |
|
|
698 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
73 |
1241 |
01/1936 |
09/1917 |
|
|
921 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
75 |
1265 |
04/1938 |
10/1917 |
|
|
789 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
73 |
1242 |
08/1946 |
10/1917 |
|
|
915 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
73 |
1243 |
03/1937 |
10/1917 |
|
|
923 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
75 |
1266 |
09/08/1952 |
11/1917 |
|
|
925 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
75 |
1267 |
01/1947 |
11/1917 |
|
|
926 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
75 |
1268 |
22/04/1961 |
12/1917 |
|
|
927 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
74 |
1244 |
12/03/1949 |
01/1918 |
|
|
1351 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
74 |
1245 |
28/10/1950 |
01/1918 |
|
|
1354 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
74 |
1246 |
04/1937 |
02/1918 |
|
|
1357 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
74 |
1248 |
02/1947 |
02/1918 |
|
|
1365 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
74 |
1247 |
08/1934 |
03/1918 |
|
|
1368 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
74 |
1249 |
18/03/1950 |
03/1918 |
|
|
1369 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
74 |
1250 |
07/1936 |
04/1918 |
|
|
1586 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
74 |
1251 |
13/08/1949 |
04/1918 |
|
|
1587 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
74 |
1252 |
07/05/1949 |
05/1918 |
|
|
1588 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
74 |
1253 |
08/1935 |
06/1918 |
|
|
1589 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
74 |
1254 |
07/1939 |
07/1918 |
|
|
1590 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
74 |
1255 |
03/02/1951 |
08/1918 |
|
|
1591 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
74 |
1256 |
08/1935 |
08/1918 |
|
|
1592 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
74 |
1257 |
06/1939 |
08/1918 |
|
|
1599 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
75 |
1269 |
11/1935 |
09/1918 |
|
|
1593 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
74 |
1258 |
12/03/1949 |
09/1918 |
|
|
1594 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
74 |
1259 |
01/1937 |
09/1918 |
|
|
1600 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
75 |
1270 |
02/07/1955 |
10/1918 |
|
|
1595 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
74 |
1260 |
05/1937 |
10/1918 |
|
|
1601 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
75 |
1271 |
11/1935 |
10/1918 |
|
|
1602 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
75 |
1272 |
22/10/1960 |
11/1918 |
|
|
1596 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
74 |
1261 |
03/04/1948 |
11/1918 |
|
|
1597 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
74 |
1262 |
06/1946 |
12/1918 |
|
|
1598 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
74 |
1263 |
29/10/1949 |
12/1918 |
|
|
1603 |
0-6-0 |
J. Aspinall |
Horwich Works |
75 |
1273 |
22/05/1948 |
01/1919 |
|
|
1604 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
76 |
1274 |
08/1936 |
02/1919 |
|
|
1605 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
76 |
1275 |
04/1937 |
02/1919 |
|
|
1606 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
76 |
1276 |
07/1936 |
02/1919 |
|
|
1607 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
76 |
1277 |
10/1936 |
03/1919 |
|
|
1608 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
76 |
1278 |
06/09/1947 |
03/1919 |
|
|
1628 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
77 |
1298 |
29/11/1947 |
04/1919 |
|
|
1609 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
76 |
1279 |
02/1937 |
05/1919 |
|
|
1610 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
76 |
1280 |
11/1936 |
05/1919 |
|
|
1611 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
76 |
1281 |
11/1933 |
06/1919 |
|
|
1612 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
76 |
1282 |
03/1937 |
06/1919 |
|
|
1613 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
76 |
1283 |
07/1937 |
07/1919 |
|
|
1614 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
76 |
1284 |
01/1937 |
07/1919 |
|
|
1615 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
76 |
1285 |
26/06/1948 |
07/1919 |
|
|
1616 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
76 |
1286 |
04/1936 |
08/1919 |
|
|
1617 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
76 |
1287 |
06/1937 |
09/1919 |
|
|
1618 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
76 |
1288 |
11/1936 |
09/1919 |
|
|
1619 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
76 |
1289 |
02/1935 |
10/1919 |
|
|
1620 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
76 |
1290 |
10/1935 |
10/1919 |
|
|
1621 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
76 |
1291 |
06/1936 |
11/1919 |
|
|
1622 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
76 |
1292 |
04/1937 |
11/1919 |
|
|
1623 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
76 |
1293 |
06/1937 |
12/1919 |
|
|
1624 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
77 |
1294 |
10/1936 |
12/1919 |
|
|
1625 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
77 |
1295 |
26/05/1951 |
01/1920 |
|
|
1626 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
77 |
1296 |
09/1936 |
01/1920 |
|
|
1627 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
77 |
1297 |
05/1939 |
03/1920 |
|
|
1629 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
77 |
1299 |
07/1937 |
04/1920 |
|
|
1630 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
77 |
1300 |
06/1936 |
05/1920 |
|
|
1631 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
77 |
1301 |
06/1936 |
05/1920 |
|
|
1632 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
77 |
1302 |
02/04/1949 |
05/1920 |
|
|
1633 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
77 |
1303 |
09/1936 |
06/1920 |
|
|
1634 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
77 |
1304 |
04/1936 |
06/1920 |
|
|
1635 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
77 |
1305 |
12/1935 |
07/1920 |
|
|
1636 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
77 |
1306 |
14/01/1950 |
07/1920 |
|
|
1637 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
77 |
1307 |
04/1936 |
08/1920 |
|
|
1638 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
77 |
1308 |
11/1945 |
08/1920 |
|
|
1639 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
77 |
1309 |
07/1939 |
08/1920 |
|
|
1640 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
77 |
1310 |
10/1936 |
09/1920 |
|
|
1641 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
77 |
1311 |
10/1936 |
09/1920 |
|
|
1642 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
77 |
1312 |
01/07/1950 |
10/1920 |
|
|
1643 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
77 |
1313 |
04/1937 |
11/1920 |
|
|
1645 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
78 |
1315 |
09/1937 |
12/1920 |
|
|
1644 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
78 |
1314 |
09/03/1946 |
12/1920 |
|
|
1646 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
78 |
1316 |
09/1935 |
12/1920 |
|
|
1647 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
78 |
1317 |
04/1937 |
01/1921 |
|
|
1648 |
0-8-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
78 |
1318 |
07/1935 |
08/1921 |
|
|
1649 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
80 |
1319 |
03/1937 |
08/1921 |
|
|
1650 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
80 |
1320 |
11/1934 |
08/1921 |
|
|
1651 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
80 |
1321 |
04/1937 |
08/1921 |
|
|
1652 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
80 |
1322 |
03/07/1948 |
09/1921 |
|
|
1653 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
80 |
1323 |
06/1934 |
09/1921 |
|
|
1655 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
80 |
1325 |
08/1934 |
10/1921 |
|
|
1654 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
80 |
1324 |
04/1936 |
10/1921 |
|
|
1656 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
80 |
1326 |
10/1934 |
03/1922 |
|
|
1657 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
80 |
1327 |
12/1935 |
05/1922 |
|
|
1658 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
80 |
1328 |
10/04/1948 |
11/1922 |
|
|
1659 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
81 |
1329 |
05/1935 |
12/1922 |
|
|
1660 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
81 |
1330 |
01/1936 |
12/1922 |
|
|
1661 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
81 |
1331 |
03/1949 |
12/1922 |
|
|
1662 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
81 |
1332 |
03/1935 |
01/1923 |
|
|
1663 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
81 |
1333 |
08/1934 |
01/1923 |
|
|
1664 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
81 |
1334 |
02/1936 |
02/1923 |
|
|
1665 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
81 |
1335 |
11/1936 |
02/1923 |
|
|
1666 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
81 |
1336 |
10/1946 |
03/1923 |
|
|
1667 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
81 |
1337 |
06/1936 |
04/1923 |
|
|
1668 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
81 |
1338 |
10/1935 |
04/1923 |
|
|
1669 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
81 |
1339 |
05/1936 |
05/1923 |
|
|
1670 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
81 |
1340 |
11/1934 |
05/1923 |
|
|
1671 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
81 |
1341 |
08/1950 |
05/1923 |
|
|
1672 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
81 |
1342 |
04/1936 |
05/1923 |
|
|
1673 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
81 |
1343 |
02/1937 |
06/1923 |
|
|
1674 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
81 |
1344 |
02/1936 |
06/1923 |
|
|
1675 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
81 |
1345 |
06/1946 |
06/1923 |
|
|
1676 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
81 |
1346 |
11/1934 |
07/1923 |
|
|
1677 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
81 |
1347 |
10/1949 |
08/1923 |
|
|
10450 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
81 |
1349 |
06/1936 |
08/1923 |
|
|
10451 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
81 |
1350 |
08/1936 |
08/1923 |
|
|
10452 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
81 |
1351 |
06/1936 |
08/1923 |
|
|
1678 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
81 |
1348 |
03/1936 |
09/1923 |
|
|
10453 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
81 |
1352 |
04/1934 |
09/1923 |
|
|
10454 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
81 |
1353 |
1936 |
04/1924 |
|
|
10455 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
83 |
1364 |
06/10/1951 |
04/1924 |
|
|
10456 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
83 |
1365 |
1936 |
05/1924 |
|
|
10457 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
83 |
1366 |
1936 |
05/1924 |
|
|
10458 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
83 |
1367 |
1935 |
06/1924 |
|
|
10459 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
83 |
1368 |
1936 |
06/1924 |
|
|
10460 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
83 |
1369 |
1947 |
07/1924 |
|
|
10461 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
83 |
1370 |
1935 |
07/1924 |
|
|
10462 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
83 |
1371 |
1935 |
08/1924 |
|
|
10463 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
83 |
1372 |
1935 |
08/1924 |
|
|
10464 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
83 |
1373 |
1939 |
09/1924 |
|
|
10465 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
83 |
1374 |
1937 |
09/1924 |
|
|
10466 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
83 |
1375 |
1935 |
10/1924 |
|
|
10467 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
83 |
1376 |
1937 |
10/1924 |
|
|
10468 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
83 |
1377 |
1936 |
11/1924 |
|
|
10469 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
83 |
1378 |
1935 |
11/1924 |
|
|
10470 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
83 |
1379 |
1935 |
12/1924 |
|
|
10471 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
83 |
1380 |
1936 |
12/1924 |
|
|
10472 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
83 |
1381 |
02/1935 |
01/1925 |
|
|
10473 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
83 |
1382 |
1937 |
01/1925 |
|
|
10474 |
4-6-0 |
G. Hughes |
Horwich Works |
83 |
1383 |
1935 |