z Railway Companies | Great Western | Great Central | LNER | GNR | GCR | NER | NBR | GNOSR | GSWR | LMS | SR | Midland | LNWR | GER

Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 580 Today
» 1285 Yesterday
» 3102 Week
» 31493 Month
» 156970 Year
» 233557 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Locomotives of the Great Central Railway
Build Date GCR Class LNER Class First GCR Number Wheels Designer Manufacturer Order Number Works Number Withdrawn
07/1895 11 D5 694 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Gorton Works ??   10/1932
08/1895 11 D5 695 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Gorton Works ??   07/1931
10/1895 11 D5 696 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Gorton Works ??   07/1930
10/1895 11 D5 697 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Gorton Works ??   10/1932
11/1895 11 D5 698 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Gorton Works ??   10/1931
12/1895 11 D5 699 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Gorton Works ??   03/1933
09/1897 11A D6 268 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Gorton Works ??   07/1933
12/1897 11A D6 269 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Gorton Works ??   11/1932
04/1898 9G F2 782 2-4-2T H. Pollitt   ?? 3700 10/1947
04/1898 11A D6 852 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Gorton Works ??   06/1938
05/1898 11A D6 853 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Gorton Works ??   04/1946
06/1898 11A D6 854 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Gorton Works ??   05/1931
07/1898 11A D6 855 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Gorton Works ??   12/1947
08/1898 11A D6 856 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Gorton Works ??   01/1939
08/1898 11A D6 857 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Gorton Works ??   08/1931
09/1898 11A D6 858 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Gorton Works ??   11/1931
10/1898 11A D6 859 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Gorton Works ??   09/1945
11/1898 11A D6 860 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Gorton Works ??   11/1931
11/1898 11A D6 861 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Gorton Works ??   04/1931
12/1898 11A D6 270 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Gorton Works ??   04/1945
12/1898 11A D6 862 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3980 05/1933
12/1898 11A D6 863 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3981 04/1937
01/1899 11A D6 864 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3982 10/1938
01/1899 11A D6 865 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3983 12/1946
01/1899 11A D6 866 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3984 09/1930
01/1899 11A D6 867 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3985 09/1932
01/1899 11A D6 868 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3986 04/1933
02/1899 11A D6 869 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3987 06/1943
02/1899 11A D6 870 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3988 06/1931
02/1899 11A D6 871 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3989 06/1946
02/1899 11A D6 872 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3990 03/1933
03/1899 11A D6 873 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3991 06/1930
03/1899 11A D6 874 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3992 12/1947
03/1899 11A D6 875 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3993 11/1935
03/1899 11A D6 876 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3994 05/1939
03/1899 11A D6 877 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3995 07/1932
03/1899 11A D6 878 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3996 10/1938
04/1899 11A D6 879 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3997 11/1943
04/1899 11A D6 880 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3998 04/1939
04/1899 11A D6 881 4-4-0 H. Pollitt Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3999 12/1932
03/1900 9G F2 776 2-4-2T H. Pollitt Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3694 05/1949
03/1900 9G F2 777 2-4-2T H. Pollitt Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3695 27/08/1948
03/1900 9G F2 778 2-4-2T H. Pollitt Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3696 12/1948
03/1900 9G F2 779 2-4-2T H. Pollitt Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3697 02/1949
04/1900 9G F2 780 2-4-2T H. Pollitt Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3698 07/1950
04/1900 9G F2 781 2-4-2T H. Pollitt Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3699 11/1949
04/1900 9G F2 783 2-4-2T H. Pollitt Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3701 12/1950
05/1900 9G F2 784 2-4-2T H. Pollitt Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3702 05/1949
06/1900 9G F2 785 2-4-2T H. Pollitt Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 3703 04/1949
09/1901 9J   973 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6035 06/1959
09/1901 9J   974 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6036 29/11/1958
09/1901 9J   975 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6037 11/04/1955
09/1901 9J   976 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6038 24/04/1959
09/1901 9J   977 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6039 25/07/1962
09/1901 9J   978 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6040 04/08/1958
09/1901 9J   979 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6041 10/10/1955
09/1901 9J   980 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6042 08/05/1959
09/1901 9J   981 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6043 05/11/1960
09/1901 9J   982 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6044 27/06/1955
10/1901 11D   1013 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182a 4784 11/1949
10/1901 11B   1013 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182a 4784 11/1949
10/1901 11C   1013 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182a 4784 11/1949
10/1901 11D   1014 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182a 4785 04/1950
10/1901 11B   1014 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182a 4785 04/1950
10/1901 11C   1014 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182a 4785 04/1950
10/1901 11C   1015 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182a 4786 03/1950
10/1901 11D   1015 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182a 4786 03/1950
10/1901 11B   1015 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182a 4786 03/1950
10/1901 11C   1016 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182a 4787 08/1949
10/1901 11D   1016 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182a 4787 08/1949
10/1901 11B   1016 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182a 4787 08/1949
10/1901 11B   1017 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182a 4788 01/1950
10/1901 11C   1017 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182a 4788 01/1950
10/1901 11D   1017 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182a 4788 01/1950
10/1901 9J   983 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6045 26/05/1958
10/1901 9J   984 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6046 07/11/1955
12/1901 9J   985 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6047 20/07/1962
12/1901 9J   986 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6048 23/12/1957
12/1901 9J   987 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6049 09/1959
12/1901 9J   988 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6050 09/1957
12/1901 9J   989 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6051 07/07/1958
12/1901 9J   990 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6052 20/06/1959
12/1901 9J   991 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6053 26/12/1959
12/1901 9J   992 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6054 10/11/1955
12/1901 9J   993 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6055 16/09/1957
12/1901 9J   994 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6056 02/05/1955
1902 8A   1054 0-8-0 J. Robinson Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 6253 22/01/1951
01/1902 9J   995 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6057 09/1958
01/1902 9J   996 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6058 25/02/1957
02/1902 11D   1018 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4828 07/1950
02/1902 11B   1018 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4828 07/1950
02/1902 11C   1018 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4828 07/1950
02/1902 11D   1019 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4829 01/1949
02/1902 11B   1019 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4829 01/1949
02/1902 11C   1019 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4829 01/1949
02/1902 11C   1020 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4830 02/1943
02/1902 11D   1020 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4830 02/1943
02/1902 11B   1020 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4830 02/1943
02/1902 11C   1021 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4831 06/1950
02/1902 11D   1021 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4831 06/1950
02/1902 11B   1021 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4831 06/1950
02/1902 11D   1022 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4832 08/1942
02/1902 11B   1022 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4832 08/1942
02/1902 11C   1022 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4832 08/1942
02/1902 11D   1023 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4833 08/1949
02/1902 11B   1023 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4833 08/1949
02/1902 11C   1023 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4833 08/1949
02/1902 11C   1024 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4834 11/1949
02/1902 11D   1024 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4834 11/1949
02/1902 11B   1024 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4834 11/1949
03/1902 11C   1025 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4835 11/1945
03/1902 11D   1025 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4835 11/1945
03/1902 11B   1025 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4835 11/1945
03/1902 11B   1026 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4836 07/1949
03/1902 11C   1026 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4836 07/1949
03/1902 11D   1026 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4836 07/1949
03/1902 11D   1027 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4837 04/1950
03/1902 11B   1027 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4837 04/1950
03/1902 11C   1027 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4837 04/1950
03/1902 11D   1028 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4838 05/1939
03/1902 11B   1028 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4838 05/1939
03/1902 11C   1028 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4838 05/1939
03/1902 11C   1029 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4839 10/1949
03/1902 11D   1029 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4839 10/1949
03/1902 11B   1029 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4839 10/1949
03/1902 11B   1030 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4840 05/1949
03/1902 11C   1030 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4840 05/1949
03/1902 11D   1030 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4840 05/1949
03/1902 11D   1031 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4841 07/1949
03/1902 11B   1031 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4841 07/1949
03/1902 11C   1031 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4841 07/1949
03/1902 11D   1032 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4842 03/1945
03/1902 11B   1032 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4842 03/1945
03/1902 11C   1032 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4842 03/1945
03/1902 11C   1033 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4843 07/1949
03/1902 11D   1033 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4843 07/1949
03/1902 11B   1033 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4843 07/1949
03/1902 11C   1034 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4844 11/1949
03/1902 11D   1034 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4844 11/1949
03/1902 11B   1034 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4844 11/1949
03/1902 9J   997 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6059 04/1959
03/1902 9J   998 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6060 20/07/1962
04/1902 9J   1000 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6062 04/07/1955
04/1902 9J   1001 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6063 08/09/1961
04/1902 9J   1002 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6064 27/08/1956
04/1902 9J   1003 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6065 04/03/1961
04/1902 9J   1004 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6066 14/01/1961
04/1902 9J   1005 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6067 02/02/1957
04/1902 9J   1006 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6068 18/05/1961
04/1902 9J   1007 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6069 23/09/1962
04/1902 9J   1008 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6070 19/04/1960
04/1902 11B   1035 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4845 07/1949
04/1902 11C   1035 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4845 07/1949
04/1902 11D   1035 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4845 07/1949
04/1902 11D   1036 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4846 01/1946
04/1902 11B   1036 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4846 01/1946
04/1902 11C   1036 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4846 01/1946
04/1902 9J   999 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6061 23/08/1958
05/1902 9J   1009 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6071 29/08/1961
05/1902 9J   1010 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6072 15/03/1961
05/1902 9J   1011 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6073 15/08/1962
05/1902 9J   1012 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6074 17/08/1959
05/1902 11D   1037 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4847 10/1949
05/1902 11B   1037 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4847 10/1949
05/1902 11C   1037 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1182b 4847 10/1949
10/1902 9J   1043 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6226 19/10/1957
10/1902 9J   1044 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6227 20/07/1959
10/1902 9J   1045 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6228 07/10/1957
10/1902 9J   1046 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6229 27/10/1955
10/1902 9J   1047 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6230 23/09/1962
10/1902 9J   1048 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6231 08/11/1960
10/1902 9J   1049 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6232 08/08/1955
11/1902 9J   1050 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6233 02/02/1957
11/1902 9J   1051 0-6-0 J. Robinson   ?? 6234 20/03/1959
11/1902 8A   1052 0-8-0 J. Robinson Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 6251 05/09/1949
11/1902 8A   1053 0-8-0 J. Robinson Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 6252 28/02/1939
11/1902 8 B5 1067 4-6-0 J. Robinson Neilson, Reid & Co. E884 6235 20/11/1947
11/1902 8 B5 1068 4-6-0 J. Robinson Neilson, Reid & Co. E884 6236 23/12/1947
11/1902 8 B5 1069 4-6-0 J. Robinson Neilson, Reid & Co. E884 6237 13/11/1948
11/1902 8 B5 1070 4-6-0 J. Robinson Neilson, Reid & Co. E884 6238 06/03/1939
11/1902 8 B5 1071 4-6-0 J. Robinson Neilson, Reid & Co. E884 6239 23/06/1948
11/1902 8 B5 1072 4-6-0 J. Robinson Neilson, Reid & Co. E884 6240 14/08/1947
03/1903 11C   1038 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1198 4964 01/1949
03/1903 11D   1038 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1198 4964 01/1949
03/1903 11B   1038 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1198 4964 01/1949
03/1903 11B   1039 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1198 4965 01/1946
03/1903 11C   1039 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1198 4965 01/1946
03/1903 11D   1039 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1198 4965 01/1946
03/1903 11D   1040 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1198 4966 11/1949
03/1903 11B   1040 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1198 4966 11/1949
03/1903 11C   1040 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1198 4966 11/1949
03/1903 11D   1041 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1198 4967 02/1950
03/1903 11B   1041 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1198 4967 02/1950
03/1903 11C   1041 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1198 4967 02/1950
03/1903 11C   1042 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1198 4968 07/1939
03/1903 11D   1042 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1198 4968 07/1939
03/1903 11B   1042 4-4-0 J. Robinson Sharp Stewart E1198 4968 07/1939
03/1903 9K   1055 4-4-2T J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1874 12/1956
03/1903 9K   1056 4-4-2T J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1875 12/1955
04/1903 9K   1057 4-4-2T J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1876 08/1954
04/1903 9K   1058 4-4-2T J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1877 04/1955
05/1903 9K   1059 4-4-2T J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1878 02/1953
05/1903 9K   1060 4-4-2T J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1870 02/05/1955
05/1903 9K   1061 4-4-2T J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1880 03/1953
05/1903 9K   171 4-4-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   05/1954
05/1903 9K   178 4-4-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   12/1957
06/1903 9K   1062 4-4-2T J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1881 09/1956
06/1903 9K   1063 4-4-2T J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1882 05/1954
06/1903 9K   1064 4-4-2T J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1883 12/1956
06/1903 9K   1065 4-4-2T J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1884 03/1953
06/1903 9K   1066 4-4-2T J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1885 02/05/1955
06/1903 9K   179 4-4-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   06/1955
07/1903 9K   188 4-4-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   02/1956
08/1903 9K   190 4-4-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   12/1958
08/1903 9K   191 4-4-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   01/1960
09/1903 9K   193 4-4-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   12/1958
09/1903 9J   198 0-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4521 24/08/1962
09/1903 9K   199 4-4-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   06/1957
09/1903 8A   56 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4202 25/09/1951
09/1903 8A   57 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4203 06/11/1950
10/1903 9J   201 0-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4522 08/02/1957
10/1903 9J   203 0-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4523 30/01/1960
10/1903 9J   205 0-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4524 23/09/1962
10/1903 9J   206 0-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4525 09/08/1962
10/1903 9J   209 0-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4526 07/11/1955
10/1903 9J   210 0-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4527 13/09/1954
10/1903 9J   211 0-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4528 13/07/1959
10/1903 8A   58 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4204 13/08/1954
10/1903 8A   59 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4205 25/06/1951
10/1903 8A   64 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4206 26/12/1950
10/1903 8A   65 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4207 26/02/1949
10/1903 8A   67 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4208 07/08/1950
11/1903 9J   177 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 21/10/1962
11/1903 9J   214 0-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4529 24/06/1961
11/1903 9J   215 0-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4530 20/10/1958
11/1903 8A   68 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4209 20/08/1959
11/1903 8A   70 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4210 28/08/1959
11/1903 8A   71 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4211 07/06/1939
11/1903 8A   85 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4212 10/10/1949
11/1903 8A   86 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4213 10/04/1937
11/1903 8A   87 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4214 11/12/1958
11/1903 8A   91 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4215 17/11/1937
11/1903 8A   92 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4216 23/05/1949
12/1903 8B C4 192 4-4-2 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. 9034 4539 09/11/1950
12/1903 8B C4 194 4-4-2 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. 9034 4540 28/11/1950
12/1903 8C B1 195 4-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4541 31/12/1947
12/1903 8C B18 195 4-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4541 31/12/1947
12/1903 9J   197 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 25/07/1962
12/1903 9J   202 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 15/08/1955
01/1904 8A   135 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4217 10/06/1937
01/1904 8A   136 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4218 19/06/1950
01/1904 8A   137 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4219 16/05/1949
01/1904 8 B5 180 4-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. 9032 4531 23/12/1947
01/1904 8 B5 181 4-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. 9032 4532 01/05/1947
01/1904 8 B5 182 4-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. 9032 4533 06/03/1948
01/1904 8C B18 196 4-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4542 31/12/1947
01/1904 8C B1 196 4-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4542 31/12/1947
01/1904 9J   204 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 09/04/1960
02/1904 8A   138 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4220 05/11/1956
02/1904 8A   139 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4221 18/08/1934
02/1904 8A   140 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4222 27/11/1937
02/1904 8 B5 183 4-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. 9032 4534 12/06/1950
02/1904 8 B5 184 4-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. 9032 4535 04/07/1947
02/1904 8 B5 185 4-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. 9032 4536 31/10/1949
02/1904 8 B5 186 4-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. 9032 4537 19/10/1949
28/02/1904 9J   207 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 24/10/1955
28/02/1904 9J   208 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 15/04/1961
28/02/1904 9J   216 0-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4543 18/10/1954
28/02/1904 9J   218 0-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4544 04/08/1958
28/02/1904 9J   219 0-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4545 04/02/1961
03/1904 11C   104 4-4-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1917 09/1944
03/1904 11D   104 4-4-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1917 09/1944
03/1904 11B   104 4-4-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1917 09/1944
03/1904 11B   105 4-4-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1918 06/1945
03/1904 11C   105 4-4-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1918 06/1945
03/1904 11D   105 4-4-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1918 06/1945
03/1904 8A   142 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4223 05/09/1949
03/1904 8A   143 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4224 17/11/1939
03/1904 8A   144 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4225 14/05/1938
03/1904 8A   145 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4226 21/09/1936
03/1904 8A   146 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4227 14/03/1951
03/1904 8A   147 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4228 03/09/1959
03/1904 8 B5 187 4-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. 9032 4538 20/04/1948
03/1904 9J   217 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 11/07/1955
03/1904 9J   220 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 25/03/1959
03/1904 9J   221 0-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4546 14/03/1955
03/1904 9J   222 0-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4547 17/11/1958
03/1904 9J   223 0-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4548 02/06/1958
03/1904 9J   224 0-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4549 17/12/1958
03/1904 9J   253 0-6-0 J. Robinson Yorkshire Engine Company ?? 765 20/03/1959
03/1904 9J   254 0-6-0 J. Robinson Yorkshire Engine Company ?? 766 10/1959
03/1904 9J   255 0-6-0 J. Robinson Yorkshire Engine Company ?? 767 26/03/1960
03/1904 9J   256 0-6-0 J. Robinson Yorkshire Engine Company ?? 768 06/1961
04/1904 11D   106 4-4-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1919 03/1947
04/1904 11B   106 4-4-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1919 03/1947
04/1904 11C   106 4-4-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1919 03/1947
04/1904 11D   107 4-4-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1920 02/1949
04/1904 11B   107 4-4-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1920 02/1949
04/1904 11C   107 4-4-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1920 02/1949
04/1904 11C   108 4-4-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1921 08/1949
04/1904 11D   108 4-4-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1921 08/1949
04/1904 11B   108 4-4-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1921 08/1949
04/1904 11B   109 4-4-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1922 09/1946
04/1904 11C   109 4-4-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1922 09/1946
04/1904 11D   109 4-4-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1922 09/1946
04/1904 8A   148 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4229 29/10/1938
04/1904 8A   149 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4230 09/12/1939
04/1904 8A   150 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4231 06/03/1939
04/1904 9J   225 0-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4550 23/09/1962
04/1904 9J   226 0-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4551 21/03/1955
04/1904 9J   227 0-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4552 11/03/1960
04/1904 9J   228 0-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4553 16/10/1957
04/1904 9J   229 0-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4554 08/08/1955
04/1904 9J   230 0-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4555 30/10/1959
04/1904 9J   231 0-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4556 29/08/1961
04/1904 9J   232 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 23/09/1962
04/1904 9J   234 0-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4557 10/02/1958
04/1904 9J   257 0-6-0 J. Robinson Yorkshire Engine Company ?? 769 05/10/1961
05/1904 11D   110 4-4-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1923 03/1942
05/1904 11B   110 4-4-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1923 03/1942
05/1904 11C   110 4-4-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1923 03/1942
05/1904 11D   111 4-4-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1924 09/1949
05/1904 11B   111 4-4-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1924 09/1949
05/1904 11C   111 4-4-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1924 09/1949
05/1904 11C   112 4-4-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1925 12/1949
05/1904 11D   112 4-4-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1925 12/1949
05/1904 11B   112 4-4-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1925 12/1949
05/1904 8A   151 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4232 16/05/1939
05/1904 8A   152 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4233 26/12/1949
05/1904 8A   153 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4234 14/03/1951
05/1904 9J   233 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 11/02/1961
06/1904 11C   113 4-4-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1926 06/1939
06/1904 11D   113 4-4-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1926 06/1939
06/1904 11B   113 4-4-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1926 06/1939
06/1904 9J   235 0-6-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1927 21/12/1956
06/1904 9J   236 0-6-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1928 25/01/1954
06/1904 9J   237 0-6-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1929 28/05/1960
06/1904 9J   238 0-6-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1930 27/10/1955
06/1904 9J   239 0-6-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1931 20/06/1955
07/1904 9J   240 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 25/07/1961
07/1904 9J   241 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 17/08/1959
07/1904 9J   242 0-6-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1932 30/01/1961
07/1904 9J   243 0-6-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1933 07/10/1957
07/1904 9J   244 0-6-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1934 23/09/1962
07/1904 9J   245 0-6-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1935 11/07/1955
07/1904 9J   246 0-6-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1936 15/09/1962
07/1904 9J   247 0-6-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1937 09/11/1959
07/1904 9J   248 0-6-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1938 20/07/1962
07/1904 9J   249 0-6-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1939 03/12/1956
07/1904 8B C4 263 4-4-2 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. 9233 4597 01/04/1949
07/1904 8B C4 264 4-4-2 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. 9233 4598 15/06/1949
07/1904 8B C4 265 4-4-2 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. 9233 4599 12/1947
07/1904 8B C4 266 4-4-2 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. 9233 4600 10/1943
07/1904 8B C4 267 4-4-2 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. 9233 4601 11/1947
08/1904 9J   1080 0-6-0 J. Robinson Yorkshire Engine Company ?? 822 12/03/1959
08/1904 9K   2 4-4-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   12/1958
08/1904 9J   250 0-6-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1940 23/09/1962
08/1904 9J   252 0-6-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 1941 06/08/1956
09/1904 9K   18 4-4-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   09/1954
09/1904 9K   9 4-4-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   12/1958
10/1904 9K   20 4-4-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   10/1957
10/1904 9K   27 4-4-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   11/1958
11/1904 9K   28 4-4-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   08/1956
11/1904 9K   47 4-4-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   12/1954
12/1904 9K   29 4-4-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   01/1958
12/1904 9K   50 4-4-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   11/1957
12/1904 9K   55 4-4-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   18/12/1954
01/1905 9K   457 4-4-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   04/1956
02/1905 9K   454 4-4-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   10/1956
02/1905 9K   455 4-4-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   12/1954
03/1905 9K   456 4-4-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   01/1958
04/1905 9K   310 4-4-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   10/1957
04/1905 9K   357 4-4-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   12/1952
04/1905 9K   359 4-4-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   02/1956
05/1905 9K   114 4-4-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   08/1957
07/1905 8A   1073 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4335 10/12/1935
07/1905 8A   1074 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4336 20/01/1936
07/1905 9K   115 4-4-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   01/1958
08/1905 8A   1075 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4337 06/01/1940
08/1905 8A   1076 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4338 26/12/1950
08/1905 8A   1077 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4339 02/10/1958
08/1905 9J   1078 0-6-0 J. Robinson Yorkshire Engine Company ?? 820 23/09/1962
08/1905 9J   1079 0-6-0 J. Robinson Yorkshire Engine Company ?? 821 28/06/1960
08/1905 9K   453 4-4-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   11/1958
09/1905 9J   1081 0-6-0 J. Robinson Yorkshire Engine Company ?? 823 23/01/1960
09/1905 9J   1082 0-6-0 J. Robinson Yorkshire Engine Company ?? 824 02/05/1955
10/1905 8B C4 1083 4-4-2 J. Robinson North British L130 16933 12/1947
10/1905 8B C4 1084 4-4-2 J. Robinson North British L130 16934 22/11/1950
10/1905 8B C4 1085 4-4-2 J. Robinson North British L130 16935 17/11/1950
10/1905 8B C4 1086 4-4-2 J. Robinson North British L130 16936 12/02/1949
10/1905 8B C4 1087 4-4-2 J. Robinson North British L130 16937 11/1944
10/1905 8B C4 1088 4-4-2 J. Robinson North British L130 16938 07/08/1949
11/1905 8B C4 1089 4-4-2 J. Robinson North British L130 16939 04/1947
11/1905 8B C4 1090 4-4-2 J. Robinson North British L130 16940 11/1939
11/1905 8B C4 1091 4-4-2 J. Robinson North British L130 16941 20/03/1948
11/1905 8B C4 1092 4-4-2 J. Robinson North British L130 16942 08/06/1949
11/1905 8B C4 1093 4-4-2 J. Robinson North British L130 16943 13/11/1948
11/1905 8B C4 1094 4-4-2 J. Robinson North British L130 16944 12/05/1949
12/1905 8D   258 4-4-2 J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   31/12/1946
12/1905 8E   258 4-4-2 J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   31/12/1946
02/1906 8D   259 4-4-2 J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   11/04/1947
02/1906 8E   259 4-4-2 J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   11/04/1947
02/1906 8B C4 260 4-4-2 J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   02/12/1950
03/1906 8B C4 261 4-4-2 J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   22/11/1950
04/1906 8B C4 262 4-4-2 J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   03/02/1948
05/1906 8B C4 358 4-4-2 J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   05/04/1948
06/1906 8F B4 102 4-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. 9458 4823 10/12/1947
06/1906 8F B4 1095 4-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. 9458 4816 10/02/1944
06/1906 8F B4 1096 4-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. 9458 4817 04/07/1947
06/1906 8F B4 1097 4-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. 9458 4818 24/11/1950
06/1906 8F B4 1098 4-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. 9458 4819 26/09/1949
06/1906 8F B4 1099 4-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. 9458 4820 20/11/1947
06/1906 8F B4 1100 4-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. 9458 4821 04/06/1949
06/1906 8F B4 1101 4-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. 9458 4822 07/10/1947
06/1906 9J   1115 0-6-0 J. Robinson Yorkshire Engine Company ?? 854 17/01/1955
06/1906 9J   1116 0-6-0 J. Robinson Yorkshire Engine Company ?? 855 02/12/1958
06/1906 8B C4 360 4-4-2 J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   23/06/1948
06/1906 8B C4 362 4-4-2 J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   30/01/1948
07/1906 8F B4 1103 4-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. 9458 4824 07/10/1948
07/1906 8F B4 1104 4-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. 9458 4825 04/07/1947
07/1906 9J   1117 0-6-0 J. Robinson Yorkshire Engine Company ?? 856 26/06/1962
07/1906 8B C4 361 4-4-2 J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   04/02/1949
08/1906 9J   1118 0-6-0 J. Robinson Yorkshire Engine Company ?? 857 24/08/1962
08/1906 9J   1119 0-6-0 J. Robinson Yorkshire Engine Company ?? 858 31/01/1962
08/1906 8B C4 363 4-4-2 J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   14/04/1949
08/1906 5A   60 0-6-0T J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   04/1956
09/1906 8G B9 1105 4-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4806 02/04/1949
09/1906 8G B9 1106 4-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4807 19/11/1948
09/1906 8G B9 1107 4-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4808 20/11/1947
09/1906 8G B9 1108 4-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4809 02/06/1947
09/1906 8G B9 1109 4-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4810 31/12/1947
09/1906 5A   61 0-6-0T J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   04/1956
10/1906 8G B9 1110 4-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4811 07/10/1947
10/1906 8G B9 1111 4-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4812 16/05/1949
10/1906 8G B9 1112 4-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4813 19/08/1948
10/1906 8G B9 1113 4-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4814 25/08/1947
10/1906 8G B9 1114 4-6-0 J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4815 10/12/1947
10/1906 5A   157 0-6-0T J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   04/1956
10/1906 5A   89 0-6-0T J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   03/1955
11/1906 5A   321 0-6-0T J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   10/1953
11/1906 5A   538 0-6-0T J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   01/1955
12/1906 9J   281 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 12/02/1960
12/1906 9J   282 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 06/05/1960
12/1906 8D   364 4-4-2 J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   31/12/1947
12/1906 8E   364 4-4-2 J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   31/12/1947
12/1906 8E   365 4-4-2 J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   25/08/1947
12/1906 8D   365 4-4-2 J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   25/08/1947
01/1907 9J   283 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 05/11/1956
02/1907 8A   1132 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4475 11/06/1951
02/1907 8A   1133 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4476 26/02/1949
02/1907 8A   1134 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4477 25/09/1951
02/1907 9J   284 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 28/10/1957
02/1907 9J   285 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 10/11/1955
02/1907 9J   286 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 14/10/1957
03/1907 8A   1135 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4478 16/10/1950
03/1907 8A   1136 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4479 26/05/1951
03/1907 8A   1137 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4480 28/02/1939
03/1907 8A   1138 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4481 05/12/1934
03/1907 8A   1139 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4482 18/04/1956
03/1907 8A   1140 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4483 15/08/1949
03/1907 8A   1141 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4484 31/01/1939
03/1907 8A   1142 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4485 22/05/1937
03/1907 9J   287 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 25/07/1961
03/1907 9J   288 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 11/07/1960
03/1907 9J   289 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 06/02/1961
03/1907 9J   290 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 23/04/1960
04/1907 8A   1143 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4486 16/05/1936
04/1907 8A   1144 0-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson ?? 4487 07/01/1938
04/1907 9J   291 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 23/09/1962
04/1907 9J   292 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 11/12/1959
04/1907 9J   293 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 05/11/1956
05/1907 9L   1120 4-4-2T J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4926 07/1957
05/1907 9L   1121 4-4-2T J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4927 08/1957
05/1907 9L   1122 4-4-2T J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4928 11/1957
05/1907 9L   1123 4-4-2T J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4929 06/1957
05/1907 9L   1124 4-4-2T J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4930 07/1957
05/1907 9L   1125 4-4-2T J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4931 12/1959
05/1907 9J   294 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 13/12/1958
05/1907 9J   295 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 29/12/1956
05/1907 9J   296 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 28/10/1957
06/1907 9L   1126 4-4-2T J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4932 05/1957
06/1907 9L   1127 4-4-2T J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4933 12/1958
06/1907 9L   1128 4-4-2T J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4934 06/1959
06/1907 9L   1129 4-4-2T J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4935 12/1957
06/1907 9L   1130 4-4-2T J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4936 01/1960
06/1907 9L   1131 4-4-2T J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. ?? 4937 01/1957
06/1907 9J   297 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 14/10/1957
06/1907 9J   298 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 04/11/1955
06/1907 9J   299 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 22/07/1957
07/1907 9J   300 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 26/10/1955
07/1907 9J   301 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 21/11/1958
08/1907 9J   302 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 29/08/1961
08/1907 9J   303 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 25/11/1961
08/1907 9J   304 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 10/08/1962
09/1907 9J   305 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 09/06/1962
09/1907 9J   306 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 11/12/1959
10/1907 9J   307 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 01/09/1958
10/1907 9J   308 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 30/03/1962
10/1907 9J   309 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 27/01/1958
11/1907 9J   311 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 08/11/1960
11/1907 9J   312 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 09/01/1956
11/1907 9J   313 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 25/07/1961
11/1907 9J   314 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 04/04/1959
11/1907 9J   315 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 22/12/1959
12/1907 8H   1170 0-8-4T J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. 9655 5002 01/1956
12/1907 8H   1171 0-8-4T J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. 9655 5003 01/1957
12/1907 9J   316 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 21/05/1959
12/1907 9J   317 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 24/10/1956
12/1907 9J   318 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 28/01/1957
01/1908 8H   1172 0-8-4T J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. 9655 5004 01/1956
01/1908 8H   1173 0-8-4T J. Robinson Beyer Peacock Ltd. 9655 5005 03/1954
01/1908 9J   319 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 17/02/1960
01/1908 9J   320 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 08/10/1960
28/02/1908 9J   322 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 05/08/1961
28/02/1908 9J   323 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 10/11/1955
03/1908 9J   324 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 09/06/1962
04/1908 9J   325 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 11/01/1960
05/1908 9J   326 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 25/02/1961
06/1908 9J   327 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 03/12/1960
09/1908 9J   328 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 10/02/1961
10/1908 9J   329 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 23/09/1962
11/1908 9J   330 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 19/04/1962
02/1909 8A   39 0-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 04/12/1950
04/1909 9J   16 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 18/05/1961
04/1909 8A   44 0-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 26/11/1958
05/1909 8A   48 0-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 20/08/1959
06/1909 8A   49 0-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 17/11/1939
06/1909 8A   62 0-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 08/05/1937
07/1909 8A   63 0-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 22/06/1936
08/1909 8A   5212 0-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 12/03/1938
09/1909 8A   213 0-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 13/07/1938
10/1909 8A   159 0-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 20/03/1950
10/1909 8A   356 0-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 08/05/1937
11/1909 8A   160 0-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 05/06/1950
11/1909 8A   161 0-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 06/02/1950
12/1909 8A   162 0-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 05/03/1951
12/1909 8A   163 0-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 07/05/1951
12/1909 8A   164 0-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 26/05/1951
1910 8A   1177 0-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 17/04/1950
1910 8A   963 0-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 03/10/1936
01/1910 9J   947 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 24/08/1962
02/1910 9J   948 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 29/03/1961
02/1910 9J   949 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 21/04/1961
03/1910 9J   950 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 07/02/1957
03/1910 9J   951 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 22/10/1956
04/1910 9J   952 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 06/04/1962
04/1910 9J   953 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 22/12/1959
04/1910 9J   954 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 05/1960
05/1910 9J   955 0-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 07/10/1957
06/1910 8A   1174 0-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 05/06/1936
06/1910 8A   1175 0-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 19/07/1943
06/1910 8A   401 0-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 22/12/1937
07/1910 8A   1176 0-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 13/06/1951
08/1910 8A   956 0-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 04/07/1939
08/1910 8A   957 0-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 28/04/1936
08/1910 8A   958 0-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 05/03/1937
09/1910 8A   959 0-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 12/11/1958
10/1910 8A   1178 0-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 15/08/1939
10/1910 8A   960 0-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 02/05/1936
11/1910 8A   1179 0-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 15/09/1959
11/1910 8A   961 0-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 03/02/1958
11/1910 8A   962 0-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 06/02/1950
12/1910 8A   964 0-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 30/08/1938
12/1910 8A   965 0-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 29/10/1938
01/1911 8A   1180 0-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 15/10/1951
01/1911 8A   1181 0-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 16/03/1939
02/1911 8A   1182 0-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 16/05/1939
18/03/1911 9N   165 4-6-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 24/08/1959
15/04/1911 9N   166 4-6-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 01/03/1960
06/05/1911 9N   167 4-6-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 24/12/1958
20/05/1911 9N   168 4-6-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 23/06/1959
27/05/1911 9N   169 4-6-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 07/04/1958
10/06/1911 9N   170 4-6-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 23/09/1959
24/06/1911 9N   23 4-6-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 03/03/1960
01/07/1911 9N   24 4-6-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 14/07/1958
15/07/1911 9N   447 4-6-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 21/12/1942
12/08/1911 9N   448 4-6-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 17/11/1960
09/1911 8K   966 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 340 18/11/1959
10/1911 8K   331 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 340 19/12/1963
10/1911 8K   332 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 340 03/10/1965
11/1911 8K   333 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 340 21/04/1964
11/1911 8K   334 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 340 03/11/1962
11/1911 8K   335 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 340 03/11/1962
12/1911 8K   26 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 340 03/12/1963
12/1911 8K   69 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 340 03/12/1963
12/1911 8K   93 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 340 21/08/1959
01/1912 8K   102 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 340 16/06/1963
01/1912 8K   133 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 340 05/09/1965
02/1912 8K   155 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 340 25/05/1961
02/1912 8K   400 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 340 09/12/1962
02/1912 8K   402 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 340 26/10/1941
03/1912 8K   403 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 340 14/09/1959
03/1912 8K   404 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 340 23/09/1962
04/1912 8K   405 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 340 14/11/1960
05/1912 8K   406 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 340 13/06/1965
05/1912 8K   407 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 340 02/03/1962
05/1912 8K   408 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 340 18/07/1963
06/1912 8K   346 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 404 04/10/1941
06/1912 8K   347 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 404 12/12/1962
06/1912 8K   348 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 404 16/04/1959
07/1912 8K   1183 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 415X 4891 10/09/1941
07/1912 8K   1184 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 415X 4892 09/09/1959
07/1912 8K   1185 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 415X 4893 14/09/1941
07/1912 8K   1186 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 415X 4894 07/03/1965
07/1912 8K   1187 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 415X 4895 12/12/1963
07/1912 8K   1188 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 415X 4896 09/12/1962
07/1912 8K   1189 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 415X 4897 14/02/1965
07/1912 8K   1190 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 415X 4898 19/11/1962
07/1912 8K   349 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 404 16/01/1964
07/1912 8K   350 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 404 23/09/1962
08/1912 8K   1191 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 415X 4899 09/12/1962
08/1912 8K   1192 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 415X 4900 20/12/1960
08/1912 8K   1193 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 415X 4901 11/07/1965
08/1912 8K   1203 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19859 29/08/1963
08/1912 8K   1204 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19860 19/09/1941
08/1912 8K   1205 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19861 09/12/1962
08/1912 8K   1206 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19862 09/06/1962
08/1912 8K   1207 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19863 16/04/1959
08/1912 8K   1208 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19864 24/11/1961
08/1912 8K   1209 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19865 18/06/1959
08/1912 8K   1210 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19866 16/03/1962
08/1912 8K   1211 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19867 03/03/1963
08/1912 8K   1212 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19868 10/09/1941
08/1912 8K   1213 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19869 18/10/1964
08/1912 8K   351 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 404 09/05/1962
08/1912 8K   352 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 404 04/05/1959
08/1912 8K   353 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 404 30/11/1960
09/1912 8K   1194 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 415X 4902 13/07/1959
09/1912 8K   1195 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 415X 4903 17/11/1962
09/1912 8K   1196 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 415X 4904 12/09/1941
09/1912 8K   1197 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 415X 4905 04/10/1941
09/1912 8K   1198 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 415X 4906 01/08/1961
09/1912 8K   1199 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 415X 4907 24/09/1963
09/1912 8K   1214 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19870 27/10/1962
09/1912 8K   1215 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19871 22/02/1952
09/1912 8K   1216 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19872 17/11/1962
09/1912 8K   1217 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19873 19/09/1941
09/1912 8K   1218 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19874 27/02/1959
09/1912 8K   354 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 404 10/09/1941
10/1912 8K   1200 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 415X 4908 09/11/1959
10/1912 8K   1201 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 415X 4909 01/02/1964
10/1912 8K   1202 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 415X 4910 19/09/1941
10/1912 8K   1219 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19875 24/11/1961
10/1912 8K   1220 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19876 17/03/1963
10/1912 8K   1221 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19877 03/11/1962
10/1912 8K   1222 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19878 22/02/1952
10/1912 8K   1223 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19879 22/12/1961
10/1912 8K   1224 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19880 13/12/1964
10/1912 8K   355 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 404 22/06/1959
19/10/1912 9N   449 4-6-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 04/05/1959
11/1912 8K   1225 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19881 14/09/1941
11/1912 8K   1226 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19882 27/04/1961
11/1912 8K   1227 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19883 23/09/1962
11/1912 8K   1228 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19884 03/11/1962
11/1912 8K   1229 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19885 29/11/1963
11/1912 8K   1230 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19886 18/10/1941
11/1912 8K   1231 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19887 17/11/1962
11/1912 8K   1232 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19888 24/11/1962
11/1912 8K   1233 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19889 19/09/1941
11/1912 8K   1234 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19890 10/02/1959
11/1912 8K   1235 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19891 04/10/1941
11/1912 8K   1236 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19892 30/06/1959
11/1912 8K   1237 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19893 08/08/1962
02/11/1912 9N   450 4-6-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 23/10/1958
16/11/1912 9N   451 4-6-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 06/10/1958
30/11/1912 9N   452 4-6-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 07/07/1959
12/1912 8K   1238 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19894 19/09/1941
12/1912 8K   1239 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19895 21/09/1941
12/1912 8K   1240 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19896 23/09/1962
12/1912 8K   1241 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19897 08/08/1962
12/1912 8K   1242 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19898 11/07/1965
12/1912 8K   1243 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19899 11/07/1965
12/1912 8K   1244 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19900 17/11/1962
12/1912 8K   1245 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19901 23/07/1963
12/1912 8K   1246 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19902 03/10/1965
12/1912 8K   1247 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19903 04/10/1941
12/1912 8K   1248 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19904 21/04/1961
12/1912 8K   1249 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19905 29/08/1963
12/1912 8K   1250 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19906 18/05/1961
12/1912 I B19 423 4-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works GO615 19/04/1947
12/1912 I B2 423 4-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works GO615 19/04/1947
21/12/1912 9N   128 4-6-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 01/03/1960
28/12/1912 9N   129 4-6-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 14/11/1960
01/1913 8K   1251 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19907 04/10/1941
01/1913 8K   1252 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L496 19908 09/02/1962
01/1913 I B2 424 4-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works GO615 01/12/1945
01/1913 I B19 424 4-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works GO615 01/12/1945
02/1913 I B2 425 4-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works GO615 04/07/1947
02/1913 I B19 425 4-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works GO615 04/07/1947
03/1913 I B2 426 4-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works GO615 22/12/1944
03/1913 I B19 426 4-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works GO615 22/12/1944
03/1913 I B19 427 4-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works GO615 14/11/1947
03/1913 I B2 427 4-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works GO615 14/11/1947
04/1913 8K   375 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 413 11/10/1941
04/1913 8K   376 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 413 10/09/1941
05/1913 8K   377 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 413 29/12/1962
05/1913 8K   378 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 413 21/07/1962
06/1913 8K   379 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 413 01/05/1964
06/1913 8K   380 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 413 08/08/1962
06/1913 1A B8 4 4-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 28/11/1947
07/1913 8K   381 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 413 13/06/1965
07/1913 8K   382 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 413 10/09/1941
08/1913 11E     4-4-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   02/1954
08/1913 8K   383 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 413 10/09/1941
09/1913 11E     4-4-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   03/1953
09/1913 8K   384 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 413 23/09/1962
10/1913 11E     4-4-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   09/1953
10/1913 11E     4-4-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   05/1954
10/1913 11E     4-4-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   08/10/1955
11/1913 11E     4-4-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   08/1955
11/1913 11E     4-4-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   01/1955
11/1913 11E     4-4-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   03/1953
11/1913 11E     4-4-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   08/1953
12/1913 11E     4-4-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   27/11/1954
12/1913 8K   385 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 435 24/11/1962
12/1913 I B19 428 4-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works GO615 19/04/1947
12/1913 I B2 428 4-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works GO615 19/04/1947
01/1914 8K   386 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 435 26/03/1964
01/1914 8K   387 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 435 14/11/1965
02/1914 8K   388 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 435 25/07/1965
02/1914 8K   389 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 435 28/04/1959
02/1914 8K   390 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 435 07/09/1964
03/1914 8K   391 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 435 23/09/1962
03/1914 8K   392 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 435 19/09/1941
03/1914 8K   393 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 435 24/02/1963
04/1914 8K   394 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 435 21/10/1963
04/1914 8K   395 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 435 23/02/1959
05/1914 8K   396 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 435 23/09/1962
05/1914 8K   397 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 435 01/05/1963
05/1914 8K   398 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 435 09/02/1962
06/1914 5A   277 0-6-0T J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   25/02/1957
06/1914 8K   399 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 435 09/12/1962
07/1914 1A B8 439 4-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 14/08/1947
08/1914 8K   271 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 435 05/10/1941
08/1914 1A B8 440 4-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 23/10/1947
09/1914 1A B8 441 4-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 06/05/1947
09/1914 1A B8 442 4-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 24/03/1949
10/1914 1A B8 443 4-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 15/03/1948
10/1914 1A B8 444 4-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 02/09/1948
11/1914 1A B8 445 4-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 14/08/1947
11/1914 1A B8 446 4-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 23/04/1949
12/1914 1B L1 272 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 12/03/1955
12/1914 1B L3 272 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 12/03/1955
12/1914 1B L3 273 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 14/05/1951
12/1914 1B L1 273 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 14/05/1951
12/1914 1A B8 279 4-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 13/08/1948
01/1915 1A B8 280 4-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 25/03/1947
02/1915 1B L3 274 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 09/08/1954
02/1915 1B L1 274 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 09/08/1954
03/1915 1B L1 275 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 17/07/1950
03/1915 1B L3 275 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 17/07/1950
04/1915 1B L1 276 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 29/08/1949
04/1915 1B L3 276 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 29/08/1949
04/1915 1B L1 336 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 23/07/1951
04/1915 1B L3 336 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 23/07/1951
05/1915 1B L3 337 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 22/01/1951
05/1915 1B L1 337 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 22/01/1951
06/1915 1B L3 338 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 10/10/1949
06/1915 1B L1 338 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 10/10/1949
11/1915 1B L1 339 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 29/08/1949
11/1915 1B L3 339 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 29/08/1949
12/1915 1B L1 340 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 29/08/1949
12/1915 1B L3 340 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 29/08/1949
06/1916 1B L1 341 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 07/06/1954
06/1916 1B L3 341 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 07/06/1954
06/1916 1B L1 342 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 09/02/1953
06/1916 1B L3 342 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 09/02/1953
06/1916 1B L3 343 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 14/05/1951
06/1916 1B L1 343 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 14/05/1951
08/1916 1B L3 344 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 25/07/1947
08/1916 1B L1 344 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 25/07/1947
1917 1B L1 370 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 07/07/1955
1917 1B L3 370 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 07/07/1955
01/1917 1B L1 345 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 24/01/1955
01/1917 1B L3 345 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 24/01/1955
02/1917 1B L1 366 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 10/05/1954
02/1917 1B L3 366 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 10/05/1954
03/1917 1B L1 367 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 17/04/1950
03/1917 1B L3 367 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 17/04/1950
03/1917 1B L3 368 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 19/02/1951
03/1917 1B L1 368 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 19/02/1951
04/1917 1B L3 369 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 05/06/1950
04/1917 1B L1 369 2-6-4T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 05/06/1950
30/06/1917 9N   371 4-6-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 15/07/1957
28/07/1917 9N   372 4-6-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 19/01/1959
25/08/1917 9N   373 4-6-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 04/04/1960
09/1917 8K   1651 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E104 3695 04/06/1964
09/1917 8K   1652 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E104 3696 09/09/1941
09/1917 8K   1805 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L689 21772 29/12/1962
09/1917 8K   1806 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L689 21773 18/10/1941
09/1917 8K   1807 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L689 21774 09/12/1962
09/1917 8K   1809 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L689 21776 09/09/1941
29/09/1917 9N   374 4-6-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 16/12/1958
10/1917 8K   1653 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E104 3697 05/12/1963
10/1917 8K   1654 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E104 3698 08/05/1959
10/1917 8K   1655 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E104 3699 15/01/1966
10/1917 8K   1656 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E104 3700 15/01/1966
10/1917 8K   1811 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L689 21778 03/10/1965
10/1917 8K   1812 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L689 21779 17/11/1962
10/1917 8K   1815 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L689 21782 04/04/1965
10/1917 8K   1816 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L689 21783 10/02/1963
10/1917 8K   1817 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L689 21784 21/09/1941
10/1917 8K   1819 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L689 21786 19/07/1963
10/1917 8K   1820 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L689 21787 19/09/1941
10/1917 8K   1821 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L689 21788 27/02/1964
27/10/1917 9N   411 4-6-2T J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 03/03/1958
11/1917 9P B3 1169 4-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 06/12/1947
11/1917 8K   1657 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E104 3701 24/11/1962
11/1917 8K   1658 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E104 3702 05/10/1941
11/1917 8K   1659 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E104 3703 19/09/1941
11/1917 8K   1824 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L689 21791 18/05/1961
11/1917 8K   1827 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L689 21794 19/11/1962
11/1917 8K   1829 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L689 21796 31/10/1959
11/1917 8K   1831 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L689 21798 09/03/1964
12/1917 8K   1661 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E104 3705 23/05/1965
12/1917 8K   1662 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E104 3706 27/09/1941
12/1917 8K   1663 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E104 3707 24/02/1962
12/1917 8K   1664 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E104 3708 06/03/1959
12/1917 8K   1701 2-8-0 J. Robinson Nasmyth Wilson L926 1244 10/02/1959
12/1917 8K   1833 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L689 21800 12/03/1959
12/1917 8K   1834 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L689 21801 17/11/1962
12/1917 8K   1836 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L689 21803 02/12/1959
12/1917 8K   1839 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L689 21806 07/02/1964
12/1917 8K   1840 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L689 21807 26/11/1962
12/1917 8K   1847 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L692 21824 24/05/1962
12/1917 8K   1848 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L692 21825 23/09/1962
01/1918 8K   1601 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 477Z 5183 25/10/1941
01/1918 8K   1603 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 477Z 5185 15/01/1966
01/1918 8K   1665 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E104 3709 20/09/1941
01/1918 8K   1666 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E104 3710 14/09/1941
01/1918 8K   1667 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E104 3711 31/03/1964
01/1918 8K   1841 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L689 21808 18/06/1959
01/1918 8K   1845 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L692 21822 13/09/1941
01/1918 8M   412 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 555 11/04/1965
02/1918 8K   1604 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 477Z 5186 14/04/1964
02/1918 8K   1605 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 477Z 5187 11/07/1965
02/1918 8K   1606 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 477Z 5188 06/05/1964
02/1918 8K   1607 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 477Z 5189 26/01/1962
02/1918 8K   1668 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E104 3712 15/09/1962
02/1918 8K   1669 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E104 3713 16/10/1963
02/1918 8K   1670 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E104 3714 26/09/1965
02/1918 8K   1712 2-8-0 J. Robinson Nasmyth Wilson L926 1255 11/07/1965
02/1918 8K   1849 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L692 21826 26/11/1962
02/1918 8K   1892 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L693 21869 12/03/1959
02/1918 8K   1894 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L693 21871 05/09/1965
02/1918 8K   1895 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L693 21872 27/10/1962
02/1918 8K   1896 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L693 21873 09/05/1965
02/1918 8K   1898 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L693 21875 03/11/1962
02/1918 8K   1899 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L693 21876 30/10/1963
03/1918 8K   1608 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 477Z 5190 24/03/1961
03/1918 8K   1609 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 477Z 5191 27/06/1965
03/1918 8K   1610 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 477Z 5192 11/07/1965
03/1918 8K   1611 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 477Z 5193 11/11/1963
03/1918 8K   1671 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E105 3715 17/11/1962
03/1918 8K   1672 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E105 3716 20/09/1941
03/1918 8K   1854 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L692 21831 20/09/1941
03/1918 8K   1855 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L692 21832 11/10/1941
03/1918 8K   1856 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L692 21833 08/02/1964
03/1918 8K   1857 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L692 21834 27/02/1966
03/1918 8K   1858 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L692 21835 11/10/1964
03/1918 8K   1859 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L692 21836 26/08/1962
03/1918 8K   1860 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L692 21837 03/11/1962
03/1918 8K   1861 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L692 21838 11/07/1965
03/1918 8K   1902 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L693 21879 27/10/1962
03/1918 8K   1903 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L693 21880 13/09/1941
03/1918 8K   1904 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L693 21881 24/05/1962
03/1918 8K   1905 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L693 21882 05/10/1941
03/1918 8K   1907 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L693 21884 16/05/1964
03/1918 8K   1908 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L693 21885 16/07/1963
03/1918 8M   413 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 555 08/11/1941
04/1918 8K   1612 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 477Z 5194 17/04/1966
04/1918 8K   1673 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E105 3717 20/06/1965
04/1918 8K   1674 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E105 3718 14/09/1941
04/1918 8K   1675 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E105 3719 30/10/1959
04/1918 8K   1862 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L692 21839 06/03/1959
04/1918 8K   1863 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L692 21840 19/12/1965
04/1918 8K   1864 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L692 21841 25/11/1962
04/1918 8K   1866 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L692 21843 19/09/1941
04/1918 8K   1867 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L692 21844 20/09/1941
04/1918 8K   1868 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L692 21845 10/03/1963
04/1918 8K   1869 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L692 21846 24/03/1962
04/1918 8K   1870 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L692 21847 29/12/1962
04/1918 8K   1910 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L693 21887 23/06/1964
04/1918 8K   1911 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L693 21888 19/09/1941
04/1918 8K   1913 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L693 21890 11/12/1959
04/1918 8M   414 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 555 23/11/1961
05/1918 8K   1614 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 479C 5200 19/09/1941
05/1918 8K   1676 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E105 3720 05/10/1941
05/1918 8K   1677 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E105 3721 09/12/1962
05/1918 8K   1678 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E105 3722 24/04/1959
05/1918 8K   1873 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L692 21850 19/09/1941
05/1918 8K   1874 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L692 21851 14/09/1941
05/1918 8K   1875 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L692 21852 13/04/1962
05/1918 8K   1876 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L692 21853 07/07/1963
05/1918 8K   1878 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L692 21855 17/04/1966
05/1918 8K   1879 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L692 21856 25/05/1961
05/1918 8K   1880 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L692 21857 09/12/1962
05/1918 8K   1881 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L692 21858 29/08/1963
05/1918 8K   1882 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L692 21859 27/03/1966
05/1918 8K   1914 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L693 21891 14/09/1941
05/1918 8K   1915 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L693 21892 24/11/1962
05/1918 8K   1916 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L693 21893 25/09/1964
05/1918 8K   1917 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L693 21894 17/11/1962
05/1918 8K   1920 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L693 21897 04/10/1941
05/1918 8K   1921 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L693 21898 18/10/1941
05/1918 8K   1922 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L693 21899 09/09/1941
05/1918 8M   415 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 555 08/04/1959
06/1918 8K   1616 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 479C 5202 29/12/1962
06/1918 8K   1617 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 479C 5203 19/11/1962
06/1918 8K   1618 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 479C 5204 23/09/1962
06/1918 8K   1679 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E105 3723 29/08/1965
06/1918 8K   1680 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E105 3724 19/09/1941
06/1918 8K   1682 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E105 3726 08/06/1959
06/1918 8K   1713 2-8-0 J. Robinson Nasmyth Wilson L926 1256 15/09/1962
06/1918 8K   1884 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L692 21861 27/09/1964
06/1918 8K   1885 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L692 21862 08/06/1962
06/1918 8K   1886 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L692 21863 02/01/1966
06/1918 8K   1923 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L693 21900 08/05/1959
06/1918 8K   1925 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L693 21902 07/03/1965
06/1918 8K   1927 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L693 21904 19/09/1941
06/1918 8K   1928 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L693 21905 04/10/1941
06/1918 8K   1929 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L693 21906 15/01/1966
06/1918 8M   417 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 555 03/01/1965
07/1918 8K   1619 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 479C 5205 13/09/1941
07/1918 8K   1620 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 479C 5206 09/12/1962
07/1918 8K   1621 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 479C 5207 05/10/1941
07/1918 8K   1622 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 479C 5208 08/08/1965
07/1918 8K   1683 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E105 3727 13/09/1941
07/1918 8K   1684 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E105 3728 01/08/1965
07/1918 8K   1685 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E105 3729 19/09/1964
07/1918 8K   1716 2-8-0 J. Robinson Nasmyth Wilson L926 1259 13/09/1941
07/1918 8K   1717 2-8-0 J. Robinson Nasmyth Wilson L926 1260 08/08/1962
07/1918 8K   1887 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L692 21864 13/09/1941
07/1918 8K   1933 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L693 21910 17/11/1962
07/1918 8K   1936 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L693 21913 17/04/1966
07/1918 8K   1937 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L693 21914 07/11/1965
07/1918 8N B6 416 4-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 28/11/1947
08/1918 8K   1624 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 479C 5210 18/05/1961
08/1918 8K   1625 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 479C 5211 01/11/1964
08/1918 8K   1626 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 479C 5212 19/09/1941
08/1918 8K   1686 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E105 3730 31/01/1965
08/1918 8K   1718 2-8-0 J. Robinson Nasmyth Wilson L926 1261 19/09/1941
08/1918 8K   1719 2-8-0 J. Robinson Nasmyth Wilson L926 1262 19/09/1941
08/1918 8K   1939 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L693 21916 20/09/1941
08/1918 8M   418 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 555 22/05/1964
09/1918 8K   1627 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 479C 5213 17/12/1963
09/1918 8K   1628 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 479C 5214 15/12/1962
09/1918 8K   1629 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 479C 5215 19/01/1959
09/1918 8M   419 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 555 01/10/1963
10/1918 8K   1631 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 479C 5217 02/12/1958
10/1918 8K   1632 2-8-0 J. Robinson Kitson 479C 5218 18/10/1941
10/1918 8K   1647 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E106 3731 17/03/1963
10/1918 8K   1649 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E106 3733 14/04/1963
10/1918 8K   1650 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E106 3734 26/09/1965
10/1918 8K   1721 2-8-0 J. Robinson Nasmyth Wilson L926 1264 20/12/1964
10/1918 8K   1722 2-8-0 J. Robinson Nasmyth Wilson L926 1265 09/12/1962
10/1918 8K   1723 2-8-0 J. Robinson Nasmyth Wilson L926 1266 12/03/1959
10/1918 8K   1724 2-8-0 J. Robinson Nasmyth Wilson L926 1267 19/12/1965
10/1918 8K   1943 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L703 22001 29/12/1962
10/1918 8K   1948 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L703 22006 20/03/1964
10/1918 8K   1949 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L703 22007 08/08/1962
10/1918 8K   1975 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L704 22033 13/10/1941
10/1918 8K   1976 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L704 22034 23/02/1959
10/1918 8K   1978 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L704 22036 29/04/1964
11/1918 8K   1687 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E106 3735 13/09/1941
11/1918 8K   1688 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E106 3736 23/09/1962
11/1918 8K   1952 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L703 22010 16/06/1963
11/1918 8K   1953 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L703 22011 05/10/1941
11/1918 8K   1954 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L703 22012 13/09/1941
11/1918 8K   1956 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L703 22014 12/01/1964
11/1918 8K   1979 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L704 22037 29/12/1962
11/1918 8K   1981 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L704 22039 27/10/1962
12/1918 8K   1689 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E107 3737 23/02/1961
12/1918 8K   1690 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E107 3738 19/09/1941
12/1918 8K   1957 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L703 22015 29/08/1965
12/1918 8K   1959 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L703 22017 12/03/1964
12/1918 8K   1991 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L704 22049 03/04/1959
01/1919 8K   1691 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E107 3739 18/10/1941
01/1919 8K   1692 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E107 3740 26/11/1962
01/1919 8K   1693 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E107 3741 10/08/1962
01/1919 8K   1694 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E107 3742 20/03/1959
01/1919 8K   1962 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L703 22020 20/09/1941
01/1919 8K   1963 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L703 22021 20/09/1941
01/1919 8K   1993 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L704 22051 18/09/1963
01/1919 8K   2005 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 653 22/06/1961
02/1919 8K   1695 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E107 3743 28/01/1964
02/1919 8K   1696 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E107 3744 06/07/1960
02/1919 8K   1969 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L703 22027 29/12/1962
02/1919 8K   1971 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L703 22029 19/01/1962
02/1919 8K   1995 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L704 22053 01/03/1964
02/1919 8K   1998 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L704 22056 04/04/1965
02/1919 8K   2000 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L704 22058 07/11/1965
02/1919 8K   2001 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L704 22059 19/09/1941
03/1919 8K   1697 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E107 3745 04/04/1965
03/1919 8K   1699 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E107 3747 29/12/1962
03/1919 8K   2006 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 653 22/02/1952
03/1919 8K   2007 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 653 05/09/1965
04/1919 8K   1700 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E107 3748 19/09/1941
04/1919 8K   1800 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L707 22093 29/12/1962
04/1919 8M   420 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 555 14/09/1941
05/1919 8K   1643 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E108 3751 05/03/1964
05/1919 8K   2043 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L712 22137 22/06/1961
05/1919 8K   2044 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L712 22138 02/06/1964
05/1919 8K   2046 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L712 22139 04/05/1959
05/1919 8K   2047 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L712 22140 03/11/1962
05/1919 8K   2094 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L713 22184 30/01/1964
05/1919 8K   2095 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L713 22185 15/01/1966
05/1919 8K   2144 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L714 22234 17/03/1963
05/1919 8K   2145 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L714 22235 13/09/1961
06/1919 8K   1645 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E108 3753 03/11/1962
06/1919 8K   2048 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L712 22141 22/02/1952
06/1919 8K   2052 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L712 22143 20/06/1965
06/1919 8K   2053 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L712 22144 16/04/1959
06/1919 8K   2054 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L712 22145 30/01/1964
06/1919 8K   2055 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L712 22146 26/11/1963
06/1919 8K   2056 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L712 22147 17/11/1962
06/1919 8K   2059 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L712 22150 31/03/1959
06/1919 8K   2062 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L712 22153 26/11/1962
06/1919 8K   2096 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L713 22186 26/11/1962
06/1919 8K   2098 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L713 22188 18/10/1941
06/1919 8K   2099 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L713 22189 10/03/1959
06/1919 8K   2101 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L713 22191 21/03/1965
06/1919 8K   2104 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L713 22194 14/03/1965
06/1919 8K   2147 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L714 22237 18/10/1941
06/1919 8K   2148 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L714 22238 20/06/1965
06/1919 8K   2149 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L714 22239 11/07/1960
06/1919 8K   2150 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L714 22240 21/07/1962
06/1919 8K   2152 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L714 22242 13/09/1941
06/1919 8K   2153 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L714 22243 22/05/1963
06/1919 8K   2157 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L714 22247 02/05/1963
06/1919 8M   422 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 622 09/12/1962
07/1919 8K   1636 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E109 3756 11/10/1941
07/1919 8K   1638 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E109 3757 19/09/1941
07/1919 8K   1729 2-8-0 J. Robinson Nasmyth Wilson L1550 1285 18/11/1959
07/1919 8K   2063 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L712 22154 08/08/1962
07/1919 8K   2064 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L712 22155 17/04/1966
07/1919 8K   2065 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L712 22156 18/10/1963
07/1919 8K   2066 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L712 22157 05/10/1961
07/1919 8K   2068 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L712 22159 21/02/1965
07/1919 8K   2110 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L713 22200 11/07/1965
07/1919 8K   2112 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L713 22202 17/03/1963
07/1919 8K   2116 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L713 22206 09/12/1962
07/1919 8M   421 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 555 11/10/1941
08/1919 8M   10 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 622 09/12/1962
08/1919 8M   11 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 622 06/06/1965
08/1919 8K   1640 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E109 3758 08/08/1962
08/1919 8K   1641 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E109 3759 11/07/1965
08/1919 8K   2073 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L712 22164 03/11/1962
08/1919 8K   2074 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L712 22165 20/06/1965
08/1919 8K   2075 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L712 22166 08/08/1962
08/1919 8K   2076 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L712 22167 17/11/1962
08/1919 8K   2078 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L712 22169 13/09/1941
08/1919 8K   2079 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L712 22170 17/11/1962
08/1919 8K   2081 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L712 22172 11/07/1965
08/1919 8K   2082 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L712 22173 17/11/1962
08/1919 8K   2121 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L713 22211 23/05/1965
08/1919 8K   2126 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L713 22216 09/06/1964
09/1919 8M   12 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 622 28/05/1964
09/1919 8K   1727 2-8-0 J. Robinson Nasmyth Wilson L1550 1283 13/09/1941
09/1919 8K   1728 2-8-0 J. Robinson Nasmyth Wilson L1550 1284 15/09/1962
09/1919 8K   2084 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L712 22175 26/01/1962
09/1919 8K   2132 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L713 22222 08/08/1962
09/1919 8K   2133 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L713 22223 27/10/1962
09/1919 8K   2134 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L713 22224 02/03/1963
09/1919 8K   2135 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L713 22225 01/04/1960
09/1919 8K   2136 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L713 22226 02/12/1959
10/1919 8M   13 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 622 23/06/1961
10/1919 8K   1737 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E109 3764 23/04/1964
10/1919 8K   1738 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E109 3765 18/10/1941
10/1919 8K   1739 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E109 3766 20/12/1964
10/1919 8K   2087 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L712 22177 18/10/1941
10/1919 8K   2160 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L714 22250 25/05/1963
11/1919 8K   1741 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E109 3768 31/03/1959
11/1919 8K   1743 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E109 3770 02/01/1966
11/1919 8K   2162 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L714 22252 23/09/1962
12/1919 8K   1746 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E109 3773 29/10/1963
12/1919 8K   1747 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E109 3774 05/09/1965
12/1919 8K   2165 2-8-0 J. Robinson North British L714 22255 17/11/1962
12/1919 11F   506 4-4-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   11/1960
02/1920 11F   507 4-4-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   18/11/1960
03/1920 11F   508 4-4-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   08/1960
03/1920 11F   509 4-4-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   05/1960
04/1920 8K   1748 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E109 3775 14/01/1960
04/1920 8K   1749 2-8-0 J. Robinson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd E109 3776 08/08/1965
05/1920 11F   510 4-4-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ??   08/1960
06/1920 9P B3 1164 4-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 27/09/1947
07/1920 9P B3 1165 4-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 31/12/1947
08/1920 9P B3 1166 4-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 14/04/1949
09/1920 9P B3 1167 4-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 31/12/1947
10/1920 9P B3 1168 4-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 28/09/1946
11/1920 8M   14 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 622 25/10/1941
12/1920 8M   15 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 622 05/06/1962
12/1920 8M   17 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 622 18/10/1941
01/1921 8M   19 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 622 14/09/1941
02/1921 8M   22 2-8-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works 622 08/08/1962
03/1921 8N B6 52 4-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 31/12/1947
04/1921 8N B6 53 4-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 31/12/1947
05/1921 9Q B7 72 4-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 10/09/1948
06/1921 9Q B7 73 4-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 04/03/1949
07/1921 9Q B7 78 4-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 20/04/1949
08/1921 9Q B7 465 4-6-0 J. Robinson Gorton Works ?? 19/08/1948
09/1921 9Q B7 36 4-6-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 3478 12/06/1948
10/1921 9Q B7 37 4-6-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 3479 12/06/1948
10/1921 9Q B7 38 4-6-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 3480 13/06/1949
10/1921 9Q B7 458 4-6-0 J. Robinson Vulcan Foundry ?? 3481 31/12/1948
10/1921 9Q B7 459 4-6-0 J. Robinson