Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1177 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6961 Week
» 28350 Month
» 147877 Year
» 3174730 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotives of the Great Northern Railway
Build Date |
GNR Class |
LNER Class |
First GNR Number |
Wheels |
Designer |
Manufacturer |
Order Number |
Works Number |
Withdrawn |
12/1873 |
J5 |
|
171 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
113 |
1923 |
12/1873 |
J5 |
|
193 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
116 |
02/1927 |
04/1874 |
J5 |
|
372 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
121 |
04/1926 |
05/1874 |
J5 |
|
373 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
122 |
01/1926 |
07/1874 |
J5 |
|
354 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
132 |
08/1926 |
08/1874 |
J5 |
|
198 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
133 |
05/1927 |
12/1874 |
J5 |
|
196 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
155 |
02/1927 |
03/1875 |
J5 |
|
173 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
156 |
1923 |
03/1875 |
J5 |
|
340 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
159 |
1923 |
04/1875 |
J5 |
|
365 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
161 |
08/1925 |
05/1875 |
J5 |
|
141 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
163 |
1923 |
05/1875 |
J5 |
|
163 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
167 |
1923 |
06/1875 |
J5 |
|
339 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
169 |
06/1928 |
08/1875 |
J5 |
|
187 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
171 |
01/1926 |
09/1875 |
J5 |
|
194 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
182 |
1923 |
09/1875 |
J5 |
|
328 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
181 |
1923 |
03/1876 |
J5 |
|
312 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
199 |
04/1926 |
04/1876 |
J5 |
|
314 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
200 |
01/1926 |
06/1878 |
J5 |
|
310 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
237 |
1923 |
06/1878 |
J5 |
|
393 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
239 |
1923 |
08/1878 |
J5 |
|
641 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
242 |
04/1926 |
10/1878 |
J5 |
|
642 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
249 |
10/1927 |
12/1878 |
J5 |
|
643 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
252 |
11/1929 |
02/1879 |
J5 |
|
644 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
258 |
02/1924 |
04/1879 |
J5 |
|
645 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
264 |
1923 |
05/1879 |
J5 |
|
160 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
267 |
1923 |
07/1879 |
J5 |
|
646 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
269 |
03/1928 |
08/1879 |
J5 |
|
133 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
270 |
1923 |
09/1879 |
J5 |
|
168 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
273 |
1923 |
10/1879 |
J5 |
|
154 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
278 |
1923 |
06/1880 |
J5 |
|
640 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
287 |
08/1929 |
09/1880 |
J5 |
|
647 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
292 |
1923 |
10/1880 |
J5 |
|
648 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
295 |
04/1926 |
11/1880 |
J5 |
|
649 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
301 |
1923 |
12/1880 |
J5 |
|
650 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
304 |
1923 |
10/1881 |
|
|
658 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
318 |
1911 |
11/1881 |
|
|
659 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
327 |
01/1924 |
12/1881 |
J5 |
|
101 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
330 |
06/1928 |
12/1881 |
J5 |
|
102 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
329 |
10/1931 |
12/1881 |
J5 |
|
651 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
308 |
1923 |
01/1882 |
|
|
660 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
328 |
|
02/1882 |
|
|
661 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
331 |
|
05/1882 |
|
|
682 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
336 |
08/1924 |
06/1882 |
|
|
683 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
337 |
|
06/1882 |
J5 |
|
731 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1607 |
05/1934 |
06/1882 |
J5 |
|
732 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1608 |
1923 |
06/1882 |
J5 |
|
733 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1609 |
1923 |
07/1882 |
|
|
697 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
372 |
1911 |
07/1882 |
J5 |
|
734 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1610 |
01/1926 |
07/1882 |
J5 |
|
735 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1611 |
1923 |
07/1882 |
J5 |
|
736 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1612 |
1923 |
07/1882 |
J5 |
|
737 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1613 |
1923 |
08/1882 |
J5 |
|
716 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
954 |
07/1931 |
08/1882 |
J5 |
|
717 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
955 |
11/1939 |
08/1882 |
J5 |
|
718 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
956 |
08/1926 |
08/1882 |
J5 |
|
738 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1614 |
1923 |
08/1882 |
J5 |
|
739 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1615 |
1923 |
08/1882 |
J5 |
|
740 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1616 |
1923 |
09/1882 |
|
|
698 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
375 |
|
09/1882 |
J5 |
|
719 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
957 |
12/1929 |
09/1882 |
J5 |
|
720 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
958 |
1923 |
09/1882 |
J5 |
|
721 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
959 |
05/1933 |
09/1882 |
J5 |
|
722 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
960 |
1923 |
09/1882 |
J5 |
|
741 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1617 |
1923 |
09/1882 |
J5 |
|
742 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1618 |
1923 |
09/1882 |
J5 |
|
743 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1619 |
1923 |
10/1882 |
J5 |
|
723 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
961 |
1923 |
10/1882 |
J5 |
|
724 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
962 |
12/1929 |
10/1882 |
J5 |
|
725 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
963 |
12/1928 |
10/1882 |
J5 |
|
726 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
964 |
08/1928 |
10/1882 |
J5 |
|
727 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
965 |
08/1926 |
10/1882 |
J5 |
|
744 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1620 |
06/1925 |
10/1882 |
J5 |
|
745 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1621 |
10/1928 |
10/1882 |
|
|
761 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
376 |
|
11/1882 |
J5 |
|
728 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
966 |
1923 |
11/1882 |
J5 |
|
729 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
967 |
08/1926 |
11/1882 |
J5 |
|
730 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
968 |
07/1930 |
11/1882 |
J5 |
|
746 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1622 |
01/1926 |
11/1882 |
J5 |
|
747 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1623 |
1923 |
11/1882 |
J5 |
|
748 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1624 |
09/1930 |
11/1882 |
J5 |
|
749 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1625 |
1923 |
11/1882 |
J5 |
|
750 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
1626 |
06/1925 |
12/1882 |
|
|
684 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
347 |
09/1930 |
12/1882 |
|
|
685 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
348 |
06/1938 |
01/1883 |
|
|
762 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
381 |
|
02/1883 |
|
|
763 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
384 |
|
03/1883 |
|
|
764 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
385 |
|
06/1883 |
J10 |
|
172 |
0-6-0 |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
357 |
02/1905 |
08/1883 |
J10 |
|
374 |
0-6-0 |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
356 |
04/1928 |
02/1884 |
|
|
694 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
363 |
10/1924 |
03/1884 |
|
|
686 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
364 |
08/1929 |
03/1884 |
|
|
687 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
366 |
11/1930 |
03/1884 |
|
|
695 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
365 |
04/1925 |
05/1884 |
|
|
696 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
369 |
04/1926 |
05/1885 |
|
|
765 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
386 |
08/1924 |
09/1885 |
J10 |
|
185 |
0-6-0 |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
395 |
08/1922 |
10/1885 |
J10 |
|
189 |
0-6-0 |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
396 |
11/1918 |
03/1886 |
J5 |
|
791 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
411 |
1923 |
04/1886 |
J5 |
|
792 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
412 |
04/1930 |
05/1886 |
J5 |
|
793 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
413 |
07/1933 |
06/1886 |
J5 |
|
794 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
414 |
1923 |
06/1886 |
J5 |
|
795 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
415 |
1923 |
07/1886 |
J5 |
|
796 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
416 |
1923 |
08/1886 |
J5 |
|
797 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
417 |
11/1927 |
09/1886 |
J5 |
|
798 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
418 |
1923 |
10/1886 |
J5 |
|
799 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
419 |
09/1930 |
11/1886 |
J5 |
|
800 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
420 |
1923 |
02/1887 |
J5 |
|
322 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
431 |
1923 |
03/1887 |
J5 |
|
307 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
432 |
10/1927 |
08/1887 |
J10 |
|
142 |
0-6-0 |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
447 |
11/1918 |
08/1887 |
J5 |
|
199 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
443 |
01/1930 |
09/1887 |
J5 |
|
176 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
449 |
1923 |
09/1887 |
J10 |
|
188 |
0-6-0 |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
448 |
10/1927 |
09/1887 |
J5 |
|
320 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
444 |
1923 |
10/1887 |
J5 |
|
183 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
450 |
1923 |
11/1887 |
J5 |
|
389 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
451 |
1923 |
12/1887 |
J5 |
|
147 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
452 |
08/1925 |
02/1888 |
J10 |
|
156 |
0-6-0 |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
457 |
11/1928 |
02/1888 |
J10 |
|
157 |
0-6-0 |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
458 |
05/1919 |
07/1888 |
J5 |
|
178 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
460 |
1923 |
07/1888 |
J5 |
|
309 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
461 |
1923 |
08/1888 |
J5 |
|
150 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
462 |
05/1929 |
08/1888 |
J5 |
|
181 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
464 |
08/1926 |
08/1888 |
J5 |
|
321 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
465 |
1923 |
08/1888 |
J5 |
|
324 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
463 |
1923 |
12/1888 |
J5 |
|
323 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
475 |
01/1930 |
12/1888 |
J5 |
|
382 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
476 |
1923 |
04/1889 |
J5 |
|
300 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
479 |
1923 |
04/1889 |
J5 |
|
301 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
480 |
1923 |
06/1889 |
J5 |
|
135 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
488 |
04/1926 |
06/1889 |
J5 |
|
330 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
487 |
1923 |
08/1889 |
J5 |
|
191 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
493 |
08/1925 |
09/1889 |
J5 |
|
195 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
494 |
05/1927 |
10/1889 |
J5 |
|
170 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
495 |
09/1925 |
12/1889 |
J5 |
|
383 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
496 |
08/1925 |
12/1889 |
|
|
766 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
499 |
02/1927 |
02/1890 |
J5 |
|
175 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
503 |
04/1926 |
02/1890 |
J5 |
|
342 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
501 |
03/1929 |
02/1890 |
J5 |
|
347 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
502 |
1923 |
02/1890 |
|
|
767 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
500 |
01/1924 |
03/1890 |
J5 |
|
391 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
505 |
1923 |
04/1890 |
|
|
768 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
504 |
|
05/1890 |
|
|
769 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
506 |
06/1924 |
06/1890 |
|
|
770 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
507 |
06/1925 |
07/1890 |
|
|
821 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
512 |
|
08/1890 |
J5 |
|
370 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
515 |
1923 |
08/1890 |
J5 |
|
378 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
514 |
09/1933 |
08/1890 |
|
|
822 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
513 |
|
09/1890 |
|
|
823 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
518 |
|
10/1890 |
|
|
140 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
517 |
10/1932 |
10/1890 |
|
|
824 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
519 |
06/1924 |
11/1890 |
|
|
134 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
516 |
03/1932 |
11/1890 |
|
|
825 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
520 |
|
12/1890 |
J5 |
|
831 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
522 |
02/1927 |
01/1891 |
|
|
826 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
525 |
|
02/1891 |
|
|
827 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
526 |
04/1925 |
02/1891 |
J5 |
|
832 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
524 |
08/1926 |
03/1891 |
|
|
828 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
528 |
11/1925 |
04/1891 |
|
|
829 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
531 |
|
04/1891 |
J5 |
|
833 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
529 |
06/1928 |
04/1891 |
J5 |
|
834 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
533 |
04/1926 |
05/1891 |
|
|
830 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
535 |
06/06/1924 |
05/1891 |
J5 |
|
835 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
537 |
1923 |
06/1891 |
J5 |
|
385 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
539 |
01/1929 |
06/1891 |
J5 |
|
836 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
541 |
1923 |
07/1891 |
J5 |
|
379 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
543 |
05/1932 |
08/1891 |
J5 |
|
837 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
545 |
12/1929 |
08/1891 |
J5 |
|
839 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
547 |
12/1929 |
09/1891 |
J5 |
|
838 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
550 |
11/1928 |
10/1891 |
J5 |
|
840 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
552 |
06/1925 |
10/1891 |
J5 |
|
841 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
554 |
1923 |
11/1891 |
J5 |
|
842 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
558 |
1923 |
11/1891 |
J5 |
|
845 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
556 |
12/1928 |
12/1891 |
J5 |
|
843 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
561 |
07/1930 |
12/1891 |
J5 |
|
846 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
560 |
03/1930 |
02/1892 |
J5 |
|
844 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
565 |
10/1928 |
02/1892 |
J5 |
|
847 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
563 |
1923 |
02/1892 |
J5 |
|
848 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
567 |
12/1928 |
03/1892 |
J5 |
|
849 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
569 |
12/1931 |
04/1892 |
J5 |
|
317 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
574 |
07/1928 |
04/1892 |
J5 |
|
341 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
575 |
1923 |
04/1892 |
J5 |
|
850 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
572 |
01/1940 |
04/1892 |
|
|
938 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
610 |
|
05/1892 |
|
|
144 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
577 |
10/1933 |
05/1892 |
|
|
939 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
614 |
06/1924 |
06/1892 |
|
|
149 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
580 |
08/1931 |
08/1892 |
J5 |
|
143 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
586 |
1923 |
08/1892 |
J5 |
|
346 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
587 |
1923 |
09/1892 |
|
|
931 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
582 |
|
10/1892 |
|
|
932 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
583 |
08/1924 |
11/1892 |
|
|
933 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
589 |
|
12/1892 |
J5 |
|
182 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
595 |
03/1928 |
12/1892 |
J5 |
|
313 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
592 |
21/01/1952 |
12/1892 |
J14 |
|
921 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
591 |
07/1939 |
12/1892 |
J14 |
|
922 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
597 |
29/11/1954 |
12/1892 |
|
|
934 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
594 |
|
01/1893 |
|
|
935 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
598 |
|
02/1893 |
J14 |
|
923 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
599 |
25/11/1955 |
02/1893 |
J14 |
|
924 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
600 |
03/1936 |
02/1893 |
|
|
936 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
601 |
|
03/1893 |
J14 |
|
925 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
603 |
19/07/1956 |
03/1893 |
J14 |
|
926 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
605 |
09/11/1954 |
03/1893 |
|
|
937 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
607 |
|
04/1893 |
J14 |
|
927 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
608 |
27/05/1957 |
05/1893 |
J14 |
|
928 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
612 |
11/1935 |
06/1893 |
J14 |
|
929 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
613 |
06/08/1951 |
06/1893 |
J14 |
|
930 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
615 |
10/1950 |
06/1893 |
|
|
940 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
617 |
08/1924 |
07/1893 |
J14 |
|
961 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
618 |
01/11/1954 |
08/1893 |
J14 |
|
962 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
619 |
09/12/1955 |
08/1893 |
J14 |
|
963 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
623 |
23/01/1952 |
10/1893 |
J5 |
|
319 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
634 |
1923 |
10/1893 |
J14 |
|
964 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
627 |
08/1939 |
11/1893 |
J5 |
|
327 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
637 |
1923 |
11/1893 |
J14 |
|
965 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
629 |
04/12/1950 |
12/1893 |
J14 |
|
966 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
630 |
25/10/1957 |
12/1893 |
J14 |
|
967 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
636 |
23/09/1955 |
01/1894 |
J5 |
|
1011 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
641 |
01/1940 |
01/1894 |
J14 |
|
968 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
640 |
05/08/1953 |
02/1894 |
J5 |
|
1012 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
645 |
06/1930 |
02/1894 |
J14 |
|
969 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
643 |
10/10/1955 |
03/1894 |
J14 |
|
970 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
647 |
06/09/1954 |
08/1894 |
J14 |
|
971 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
657 |
13/04/1953 |
09/1894 |
J14 |
|
972 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
658 |
20/07/1953 |
10/1894 |
J14 |
|
973 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
659 |
14/07/1952 |
11/1894 |
J14 |
|
974 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
660 |
26/10/1953 |
12/1894 |
J14 |
|
975 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
661 |
29/11/1954 |
12/1894 |
J14 |
|
976 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
662 |
03/07/1957 |
05/1895 |
J14 |
|
977 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
681 |
27/04/1953 |
06/1895 |
J14 |
|
978 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
682 |
25/01/1954 |
08/1895 |
|
|
941 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
688 |
|
08/1895 |
J14 |
|
979 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
683 |
13/12/1954 |
09/1895 |
|
|
942 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
689 |
1921 |
10/1895 |
|
|
943 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
690 |
06/1924 |
10/1895 |
J14 |
|
980 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
684 |
11/1936 |
11/1895 |
|
|
944 |
0-4-4T |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
691 |
1912 |
02/1896 |
J9 |
|
1021 |
0-6-0 |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
692 |
09/1932 |
02/1896 |
J9 |
|
1022 |
0-6-0 |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
693 |
06/1920 |
02/1896 |
J9 |
|
1023 |
0-6-0 |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
694 |
04/1930 |
02/1896 |
J9 |
|
1024 |
0-6-0 |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
695 |
07/1930 |
02/1896 |
J9 |
|
1025 |
0-6-0 |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
696 |
11/1922 |
03/1896 |
J9 |
|
1026 |
0-6-0 |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
697 |
01/1921 |
03/1896 |
J9 |
|
1027 |
0-6-0 |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
698 |
09/1936 |
03/1896 |
J9 |
|
1028 |
0-6-0 |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
699 |
03/1930 |
03/1896 |
J9 |
|
1029 |
0-6-0 |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
700 |
02/1931 |
04/1896 |
J9 |
|
1030 |
0-6-0 |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
701 |
05/1933 |
06/1896 |
J5 |
|
1031 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3370 |
10/1931 |
06/1896 |
J5 |
|
1032 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3371 |
01/1926 |
06/1896 |
J5 |
|
1033 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3372 |
07/1938 |
06/1896 |
J5 |
|
1034 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3373 |
07/1932 |
06/1896 |
J5 |
|
1035 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3374 |
05/1949 |
06/1896 |
J5 |
|
1036 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3375 |
16/10/1948 |
06/1896 |
J5 |
|
1037 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3376 |
02/1939 |
07/1896 |
J5 |
|
1038 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3377 |
1923 |
07/1896 |
J5 |
|
1039 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3378 |
08/1947 |
07/1896 |
J5 |
|
1040 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3379 |
10/1949 |
07/1896 |
J5 |
|
1041 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3380 |
05/1949 |
07/1896 |
J5 |
|
1042 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3381 |
1923 |
07/1896 |
J5 |
|
1043 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3382 |
04/1932 |
07/1896 |
J5 |
|
1044 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3383 |
06/1932 |
07/1896 |
J5 |
|
1045 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3384 |
10/1935 |
07/1896 |
J14 |
|
1046 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5017 |
03/10/1955 |
07/1896 |
J14 |
|
1047 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5018 |
25/11/1957 |
07/1896 |
J14 |
|
1048 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5019 |
06/01/1958 |
07/1896 |
J14 |
|
1049 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5020 |
23/11/1953 |
07/1896 |
J14 |
|
1050 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5021 |
19/10/1955 |
07/1896 |
J14 |
|
1051 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5022 |
27/12/1954 |
07/1896 |
J14 |
|
1052 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5023 |
29/04/1952 |
07/1896 |
J14 |
|
1053 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5024 |
11/07/1955 |
07/1896 |
J14 |
|
1054 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5025 |
08/11/1954 |
07/1896 |
J14 |
|
1055 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5026 |
09/06/1952 |
07/1896 |
J14 |
|
1056 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5027 |
21/05/1956 |
07/1896 |
J14 |
|
1057 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5028 |
14/12/1953 |
07/1896 |
J14 |
|
1058 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5029 |
23/11/1955 |
07/1896 |
J14 |
|
1059 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5030 |
03/11/1955 |
07/1896 |
J14 |
|
1060 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5031 |
03/11/1955 |
09/1896 |
J5 |
|
1081 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
702 |
02/1939 |
10/1896 |
J5 |
|
1082 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
703 |
04/1935 |
10/1896 |
J5 |
|
1083 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
704 |
01/1938 |
10/1896 |
J5 |
|
1084 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
705 |
03/1933 |
10/1896 |
J5 |
|
1085 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
706 |
01/1930 |
11/1896 |
J5 |
|
1086 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
707 |
08/1935 |
11/1896 |
J5 |
|
1087 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
708 |
10/1931 |
11/1896 |
J5 |
|
1088 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
709 |
08/1947 |
12/1896 |
J5 |
|
1089 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
710 |
12/1920 |
12/1896 |
J5 |
|
1090 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
711 |
10/12/1951 |
12/1896 |
D2 |
|
400 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
712 |
09/1947 |
05/1897 |
D2 |
|
1071 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
201 |
723 |
10/1948 |
05/1897 |
D2 |
|
1072 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
201 |
724 |
12/1935 |
06/1897 |
D2 |
|
1073 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
201 |
725 |
02/1946 |
06/1897 |
D2 |
|
1074 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
201 |
726 |
11/1946 |
06/1897 |
D2 |
|
1075 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
201 |
727 |
18/10/1951 |
06/1897 |
D2 |
|
1076 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
201 |
728 |
06/1936 |
06/1897 |
D2 |
|
1077 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
201 |
729 |
10/1937 |
06/1897 |
D2 |
|
1078 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
201 |
730 |
12/1935 |
06/1897 |
D2 |
|
1079 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
201 |
731 |
10/1937 |
06/1897 |
D2 |
|
1080 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
201 |
732 |
08/1947 |
06/1897 |
J14 |
|
1211 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5095 |
08/11/1954 |
06/1897 |
J14 |
|
1212 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5096 |
04/10/1954 |
06/1897 |
J14 |
|
1213 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5097 |
10/07/1958 |
06/1897 |
J14 |
|
1214 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5098 |
12/1950 |
06/1897 |
J14 |
|
1215 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
?? |
5099 |
27/12/1954 |
08/1897 |
J14 |
|
111 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
733 |
05/08/1953 |
08/1897 |
J13 |
|
1201 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
203 |
735 |
20/10/1955 |
08/1897 |
J13 |
|
1202 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
203 |
736 |
31/12/1955 |
08/1897 |
J14 |
|
155 |
0-6-0ST |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
734 |
17/10/1955 |
09/1897 |
J13 |
|
1203 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
203 |
737 |
23/09/1955 |
09/1897 |
J13 |
|
1204 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
203 |
738 |
12/04/1957 |
09/1897 |
J13 |
|
1205 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
203 |
739 |
11/09/1956 |
10/1897 |
J13 |
|
1206 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
203 |
740 |
12/11/1955 |
10/1897 |
J13 |
|
1207 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
203 |
741 |
27/05/1957 |
10/1897 |
J13 |
|
1208 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
203 |
742 |
16/09/1955 |
10/1897 |
J13 |
|
1209 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
203 |
743 |
15/10/1956 |
10/1897 |
J13 |
|
1210 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
203 |
744 |
24/11/1955 |
10/1897 |
D2 |
|
1301 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
204 |
745 |
08/1947 |
10/1897 |
D2 |
|
1302 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
204 |
746 |
02/1948 |
11/1897 |
D2 |
|
1303 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
204 |
747 |
12/1949 |
11/1897 |
D2 |
|
1304 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
204 |
748 |
11/1942 |
11/1897 |
D2 |
|
1305 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
204 |
749 |
05/1949 |
11/1897 |
D2 |
|
1306 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
204 |
750 |
11/1948 |
11/1897 |
D2 |
|
1307 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
204 |
751 |
08/1949 |
12/1897 |
J5 |
|
1091 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3546 |
11/1932 |
12/1897 |
J5 |
|
1092 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3547 |
08/1947 |
12/1897 |
J5 |
|
1093 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3548 |
10/1952 |
12/1897 |
J5 |
|
1094 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3549 |
03/1951 |
12/1897 |
D2 |
|
1308 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
204 |
752 |
10/1935 |
12/1897 |
D2 |
|
1309 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
204 |
753 |
08/1948 |
12/1897 |
D2 |
|
1310 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
204 |
754 |
05/1947 |
01/1898 |
J5 |
|
1095 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3550 |
04/1934 |
02/1898 |
C2 |
|
1009 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
205 |
755 |
13/04/1955 |
02/1898 |
C2 |
|
1010 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
205 |
756 |
12/1948 |
02/1898 |
J5 |
|
1096 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3551 |
11/1938 |
02/1898 |
J5 |
|
1097 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3552 |
02/06/1952 |
02/1898 |
J5 |
|
1098 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3553 |
05/1933 |
02/1898 |
J5 |
|
1099 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3554 |
11/1937 |
03/1898 |
C2 |
|
1014 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
205 |
758 |
12/04/1955 |
03/1898 |
J5 |
|
1100 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3555 |
06/1952 |
03/1898 |
D2 |
|
1311 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
207 |
759 |
12/1949 |
03/1898 |
D2 |
|
1312 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
207 |
760 |
02/1946 |
04/1898 |
D2 |
|
1313 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
207 |
761 |
12/1935 |
04/1898 |
D2 |
|
1315 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
207 |
763 |
04/1947 |
04/1898 |
D2 |
|
1316 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
207 |
764 |
31/10/1949 |
05/1898 |
C2 |
|
1013 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
205 |
757 |
19/11/1958 |
05/1898 |
D2 |
|
1314 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
207 |
762 |
06/1937 |
05/1898 |
D2 |
|
1317 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
207 |
765 |
12/1950 |
05/1898 |
D2 |
|
1318 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
207 |
766 |
08/1949 |
05/1898 |
C1 |
|
990 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
206 |
769 |
10/1937 |
06/1898 |
D2 |
|
1319 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
207 |
767 |
12/1946 |
06/1898 |
D2 |
|
1320 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
207 |
768 |
04/1949 |
06/1898 |
D1 |
|
1321 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
209 |
770 |
01/1949 |
06/1898 |
1321 |
|
1321 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
209 |
770 |
01/1949 |
06/1898 |
D1 |
|
1322 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
209 |
771 |
07/1939 |
06/1898 |
1321 |
|
1322 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
209 |
771 |
07/1939 |
06/1898 |
D1 |
|
1323 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
209 |
772 |
04/1949 |
06/1898 |
1321 |
|
1323 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
209 |
772 |
04/1949 |
06/1898 |
D1 |
|
1324 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
209 |
773 |
25/11/1950 |
06/1898 |
1321 |
|
1324 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
209 |
773 |
25/11/1950 |
07/1898 |
D1 |
|
1325 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
209 |
774 |
12/1937 |
07/1898 |
1321 |
|
1325 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
209 |
774 |
12/1937 |
08/1898 |
J5 |
|
315 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO208 |
775 |
11/1932 |
08/1898 |
J5 |
|
316 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO208 |
776 |
10/1931 |
08/1898 |
J5 |
|
318 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO208 |
777 |
07/1932 |
08/1898 |
J5 |
|
329 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO208 |
778 |
13/12/1954 |
08/1898 |
J5 |
|
332 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO208 |
380 |
19/01/1953 |
08/1898 |
J5 |
|
334 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO208 |
781 |
05/1929 |
09/1898 |
J5 |
|
331 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO208 |
779 |
14/06/1954 |
09/1898 |
J5 |
|
336 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO208 |
782 |
08/1947 |
09/1898 |
J5 |
|
337 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO208 |
783 |
12/1935 |
10/1898 |
C2 |
|
1015 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
205 |
788 |
22/06/1953 |
10/1898 |
C2 |
|
1016 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
205 |
789 |
03/1948 |
10/1898 |
C2 |
|
1017 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
205 |
790 |
04/1937 |
10/1898 |
C2 |
|
1019 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
205 |
796 |
22/05/1958 |
10/1898 |
D1 |
|
1326 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
211 |
785 |
26/02/1948 |
10/1898 |
1321 |
|
1326 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
211 |
785 |
26/02/1948 |
10/1898 |
D1 |
|
1327 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
211 |
786 |
01/1949 |
10/1898 |
1321 |
|
1327 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
211 |
786 |
01/1949 |
10/1898 |
D1 |
|
1328 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
211 |
792 |
10/1937 |
10/1898 |
1321 |
|
1328 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
211 |
792 |
10/1937 |
10/1898 |
J5 |
|
338 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO208 |
784 |
05/1933 |
11/1898 |
D1 |
|
1329 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
211 |
793 |
08/04/1948 |
11/1898 |
1321 |
|
1329 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
211 |
793 |
08/04/1948 |
11/1898 |
D1 |
|
1330 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
211 |
794 |
03/1946 |
11/1898 |
1321 |
|
1330 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
211 |
794 |
03/1946 |
11/1898 |
D1 |
|
1331 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
211 |
795 |
07/1947 |
11/1898 |
1321 |
|
1331 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
211 |
795 |
07/1947 |
11/1898 |
D1 |
|
1332 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
211 |
798 |
16/10/1948 |
11/1898 |
1321 |
|
1332 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
211 |
798 |
16/10/1948 |
11/1898 |
D1 |
|
1333 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
211 |
799 |
07/1950 |
11/1898 |
1321 |
|
1333 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
211 |
799 |
07/1950 |
11/1898 |
D1 |
|
1334 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
211 |
800 |
09/1936 |
11/1898 |
1321 |
|
1334 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
211 |
800 |
09/1936 |
11/1898 |
D1 |
|
1335 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
211 |
801 |
07/1947 |
11/1898 |
1321 |
|
1335 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
211 |
801 |
07/1947 |
11/1898 |
D2 |
|
1342 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
213 |
803 |
11/1936 |
12/1898 |
C2 |
|
1018 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
205 |
791 |
01/10/1951 |
12/1898 |
J5 |
|
1101 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3695 |
04/1933 |
12/1898 |
J5 |
|
1102 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3696 |
11/1932 |
12/1898 |
J13 |
|
1216 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
2921 |
15/05/1958 |
12/1898 |
D2 |
|
1341 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
213 |
802 |
07/1937 |
12/1898 |
D2 |
|
1343 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
213 |
804 |
06/02/1950 |
12/1898 |
D2 |
|
1344 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
213 |
805 |
11/1947 |
12/1898 |
D2 |
|
1345 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
213 |
806 |
01/1949 |
12/1898 |
D2 |
|
1346 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
213 |
807 |
08/1947 |
12/1898 |
D2 |
|
1347 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
213 |
808 |
06/1949 |
12/1898 |
D2 |
|
1348 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
213 |
809 |
06/1950 |
12/1898 |
D2 |
|
1349 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
213 |
810 |
11/1946 |
12/1898 |
D2 |
|
1350 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
213 |
811 |
04/1947 |
01/1899 |
J5 |
|
1103 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3697 |
02/06/1952 |
01/1899 |
J5 |
|
1104 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3698 |
10/1935 |
01/1899 |
J5 |
|
1105 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3699 |
07/1951 |
01/1899 |
J13 |
|
1217 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
2922 |
03/1956 |
02/1899 |
C2 |
|
1020 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
205 |
797 |
01/01/1948 |
02/1899 |
J5 |
|
1106 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3700 |
11/1950 |
02/1899 |
J5 |
|
1107 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3701 |
25/11/1950 |
02/1899 |
J5 |
|
1108 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3702 |
09/1935 |
02/1899 |
J5 |
|
1109 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3703 |
04/1953 |
02/1899 |
J5 |
|
1110 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3704 |
08/1938 |
02/1899 |
J13 |
|
1218 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
2923 |
04/04/1958 |
02/1899 |
J13 |
|
1219 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
2924 |
16/11/1955 |
02/1899 |
J13 |
|
1220 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
2925 |
18/06/1956 |
02/1899 |
C2 |
|
1501 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
212 |
812 |
08/1949 |
03/1899 |
J5 |
|
1111 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3705 |
06/1937 |
03/1899 |
J5 |
|
1112 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3706 |
07/1932 |
03/1899 |
J5 |
|
1113 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3707 |
21/05/1951 |
03/1899 |
J5 |
|
1114 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3708 |
10/1951 |
03/1899 |
J5 |
|
1115 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3709 |
01/1933 |
03/1899 |
J13 |
|
1221 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
2926 |
16/12/1955 |
03/1899 |
J13 |
|
1222 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
2927 |
14/03/1956 |
03/1899 |
C2 |
|
1502 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
212 |
813 |
24/01/1955 |
03/1899 |
C2 |
|
1503 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
212 |
814 |
15/04/1955 |
03/1899 |
C2 |
|
1504 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
212 |
815 |
11/01/1958 |
04/1899 |
J5 |
|
1116 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3710 |
01/1936 |
04/1899 |
J5 |
|
1117 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3711 |
04/1933 |
04/1899 |
J5 |
|
1118 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3712 |
03/1934 |
04/1899 |
J5 |
|
1119 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3713 |
07/1932 |
04/1899 |
J5 |
|
1120 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3714 |
11/1932 |
04/1899 |
J5 |
|
1121 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3715 |
02/1935 |
04/1899 |
J5 |
|
1122 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3716 |
09/1933 |
04/1899 |
J5 |
|
1123 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3717 |
03/1934 |
04/1899 |
J5 |
|
1124 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3718 |
04/1936 |
04/1899 |
J13 |
|
1223 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
2928 |
11/10/1956 |
04/1899 |
J13 |
|
1224 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
2929 |
24/06/1957 |
04/1899 |
J13 |
|
1225 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
?? |
2930 |
27/05/1959 |
04/1899 |
J13 |
|
1226 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4471 |
10/08/1953 |
04/1899 |
J13 |
|
1227 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4472 |
11/03/1957 |
04/1899 |
J13 |
|
1228 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4473 |
03/01/1956 |
04/1899 |
J13 |
|
1229 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4474 |
03/02/1958 |
04/1899 |
J13 |
|
1230 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4475 |
10/02/1958 |
04/1899 |
J13 |
|
1231 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4476 |
13/07/1956 |
04/1899 |
J13 |
|
1232 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4477 |
20/01/1959 |
04/1899 |
J13 |
|
1233 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4478 |
21/10/1957 |
04/1899 |
J13 |
|
1234 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4479 |
20/02/1956 |
04/1899 |
J13 |
|
1235 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4480 |
22/02/1960 |
04/1899 |
J13 |
|
1236 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4481 |
10/02/1958 |
04/1899 |
J13 |
|
1237 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4482 |
03/10/1956 |
04/1899 |
J13 |
|
1238 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4483 |
23/02/1959 |
04/1899 |
J13 |
|
1239 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4484 |
07/08/1956 |
04/1899 |
J13 |
|
1240 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4485 |
12/04/1958 |
04/1899 |
C2 |
|
1505 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
212 |
816 |
20/11/1958 |
04/1899 |
C2 |
|
1506 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
212 |
817 |
25/05/1956 |
04/1899 |
C2 |
|
1507 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
212 |
818 |
22/05/1958 |
05/1899 |
J5 |
|
1125 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3719 |
31/12/1953 |
05/1899 |
J5 |
|
1126 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3720 |
02/1946 |
05/1899 |
J5 |
|
1127 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3721 |
03/1936 |
05/1899 |
J5 |
|
1128 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3722 |
02/1936 |
05/1899 |
J5 |
|
1129 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3723 |
04/1949 |
05/1899 |
J5 |
|
1130 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3724 |
07/1932 |
05/1899 |
J5 |
|
1131 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3725 |
25/11/1950 |
05/1899 |
J5 |
|
1132 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3726 |
08/1935 |
05/1899 |
J5 |
|
1133 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3727 |
01/09/1952 |
05/1899 |
J5 |
|
1134 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3728 |
08/1947 |
05/1899 |
J5 |
|
1135 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3729 |
02/1932 |
05/1899 |
J13 |
|
1241 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4486 |
27/01/1958 |
05/1899 |
J13 |
|
1242 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4487 |
01/04/1957 |
05/1899 |
J13 |
|
1243 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4488 |
26/07/1958 |
05/1899 |
J13 |
|
1244 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4489 |
22/04/1957 |
05/1899 |
J13 |
|
1245 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4490 |
25/10/1954 |
05/1899 |
J13 |
|
1246 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4491 |
02/1958 |
05/1899 |
J13 |
|
1247 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4492 |
08/05/1959 |
05/1899 |
J13 |
|
1248 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4493 |
01/08/1958 |
05/1899 |
J13 |
|
1249 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4494 |
24/07/1958 |
05/1899 |
J13 |
|
1250 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Sharp Stewart |
?? |
4495 |
16/12/1957 |
05/1899 |
C2 |
|
1508 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
212 |
819 |
03/04/1958 |
05/1899 |
C2 |
|
1509 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
212 |
820 |
06/08/1958 |
05/1899 |
C2 |
|
1510 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
212 |
821 |
26/10/1955 |
06/1899 |
J5 |
|
348 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO217 |
825 |
12/1932 |
06/1899 |
J5 |
|
349 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO217 |
826 |
07/1934 |
06/1899 |
J5 |
|
353 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO217 |
830 |
07/1932 |
07/1899 |
J5 |
|
343 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO217 |
822 |
04/1933 |
07/1899 |
J5 |
|
344 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO217 |
823 |
04/1933 |
07/1899 |
J5 |
|
345 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO217 |
824 |
01/1951 |
07/1899 |
J5 |
|
350 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO217 |
827 |
25/03/1948 |
07/1899 |
J5 |
|
351 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO217 |
828 |
02/1932 |
07/1899 |
J5 |
|
352 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO217 |
829 |
09/1934 |
07/1899 |
J5 |
|
359 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO217 |
831 |
02/1932 |
08/1899 |
C2 |
|
1511 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
214 |
832 |
19/07/1954 |
08/1899 |
C2 |
|
1512 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
214 |
833 |
04/1937 |
08/1899 |
C2 |
|
1513 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
214 |
834 |
01/01/1948 |
08/1899 |
J5 |
|
360 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO217 |
842 |
1923 |
08/1899 |
J5 |
|
361 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO217 |
843 |
05/1932 |
08/1899 |
J5 |
|
362 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO217 |
844 |
07/1932 |
08/1899 |
J5 |
|
363 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO217 |
845 |
1923 |
08/1899 |
J5 |
|
371 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO217 |
849 |
10/1935 |
09/1899 |
D1 |
|
1336 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
216 |
852 |
05/1937 |
09/1899 |
1321 |
|
1336 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
216 |
852 |
05/1937 |
09/1899 |
C2 |
|
1514 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
214 |
835 |
04/04/1955 |
09/1899 |
J5 |
|
364 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO217 |
846 |
1923 |
09/1899 |
J5 |
|
367 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO217 |
847 |
1923 |
09/1899 |
J5 |
|
368 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO217 |
848 |
11/1932 |
09/1899 |
J5 |
|
375 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO217 |
850 |
26/02/1951 |
09/1899 |
J5 |
|
381 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO217 |
851 |
10/1932 |
10/1899 |
D1 |
|
1337 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
216 |
853 |
16/10/1948 |
10/1899 |
1321 |
|
1337 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
216 |
853 |
16/10/1948 |
10/1899 |
D1 |
|
1338 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
216 |
854 |
02/1946 |
10/1899 |
1321 |
|
1338 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
216 |
854 |
02/1946 |
10/1899 |
D1 |
|
1339 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
216 |
855 |
03/1949 |
10/1899 |
1321 |
|
1339 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
216 |
855 |
03/1949 |
10/1899 |
D1 |
|
1340 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
216 |
856 |
07/1947 |
10/1899 |
1321 |
|
1340 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
216 |
856 |
07/1947 |
10/1899 |
D1 |
|
1362 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
216 |
858 |
06/1937 |
10/1899 |
1321 |
|
1362 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
216 |
858 |
06/1937 |
10/1899 |
D1 |
|
1363 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
216 |
859 |
06/1939 |
10/1899 |
1321 |
|
1363 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
216 |
859 |
06/1939 |
10/1899 |
C2 |
|
1515 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
214 |
836 |
06/1937 |
10/1899 |
C2 |
|
1516 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
214 |
837 |
11/1937 |
10/1899 |
C2 |
|
1517 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
214 |
838 |
18/05/1953 |
10/1899 |
C2 |
|
1518 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
214 |
839 |
05/03/1951 |
11/1899 |
D2 |
|
1351 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
219 |
862 |
03/1948 |
11/1899 |
D2 |
|
1352 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
219 |
863 |
08/1948 |
11/1899 |
D2 |
|
1353 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
219 |
864 |
04/1936 |
11/1899 |
D1 |
|
1361 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
216 |
857 |
02/1949 |
11/1899 |
1321 |
|
1361 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
216 |
857 |
02/1949 |
11/1899 |
D1 |
|
1364 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
216 |
860 |
12/1947 |
11/1899 |
1321 |
|
1364 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
216 |
860 |
12/1947 |
11/1899 |
D1 |
|
1365 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
216 |
861 |
02/07/1948 |
11/1899 |
1321 |
|
1365 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
216 |
861 |
02/07/1948 |
11/1899 |
C2 |
|
1519 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
214 |
840 |
02/04/1958 |
11/1899 |
C2 |
|
1520 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
214 |
841 |
05/04/1955 |
12/1899 |
D2 |
|
1354 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
219 |
865 |
10/1937 |
12/1899 |
D2 |
|
1355 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
219 |
866 |
01/1949 |
12/1899 |
D2 |
|
1356 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
219 |
867 |
06/1946 |
12/1899 |
D2 |
|
1357 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
219 |
868 |
06/1947 |
12/1899 |
D2 |
|
1358 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
219 |
869 |
08/1937 |
12/1899 |
D2 |
|
1359 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
219 |
870 |
11/1950 |
12/1899 |
D2 |
|
1360 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
219 |
871 |
10/1935 |
03/1900 |
C1 |
|
949 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
218 |
872 |
08/1938 |
04/1900 |
J5 |
|
1136 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Kitson |
?? |
3924 |
09/1936 |
04/1900 |
J5 |
|
1137 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Kitson |
?? |
3925 |
02/03/1948 |
04/1900 |
J5 |
|
165 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO220 |
882 |
08/1933 |
04/1900 |
C1 |
|
950 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
218 |
873 |
12/1937 |
05/1900 |
J5 |
|
1138 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Kitson |
?? |
3926 |
06/1939 |
05/1900 |
J5 |
|
1139 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Kitson |
?? |
3927 |
06/11/1947 |
05/1900 |
J5 |
|
1140 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Kitson |
?? |
3928 |
05/1928 |
05/1900 |
J5 |
|
1141 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Kitson |
?? |
3929 |
08/1936 |
05/1900 |
J5 |
|
1142 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Kitson |
?? |
3930 |
09/1940 |
05/1900 |
J5 |
|
1143 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Kitson |
?? |
3931 |
26/10/1946 |
05/1900 |
J5 |
|
1144 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Kitson |
?? |
3932 |
05/1937 |
05/1900 |
J5 |
|
1145 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Kitson |
?? |
3933 |
08/1938 |
05/1900 |
J5 |
|
177 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO220 |
883 |
04/1936 |
05/1900 |
J5 |
|
180 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO220 |
885 |
02/1933 |
05/1900 |
J5 |
|
192 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO220 |
886 |
10/1933 |
05/1900 |
J5 |
|
302 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO220 |
887 |
08/1947 |
05/1900 |
J5 |
|
303 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO220 |
888 |
04/1936 |
05/1900 |
C1 |
|
982 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
218 |
874 |
11/1935 |
05/1900 |
C1 |
|
983 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
218 |
875 |
04/1936 |
05/1900 |
C1 |
|
986 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
218 |
878 |
10/1937 |
06/1900 |
J5 |
|
1146 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Kitson |
?? |
3934 |
30/04/1951 |
06/1900 |
J5 |
|
1147 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Kitson |
?? |
3935 |
10/1936 |
06/1900 |
J5 |
|
1148 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Kitson |
?? |
3936 |
1923 |
06/1900 |
J5 |
|
1149 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Kitson |
?? |
3937 |
02/1939 |
06/1900 |
J5 |
|
1150 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Kitson |
?? |
3938 |
03/1933 |
06/1900 |
J5 |
|
1151 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Kitson |
?? |
3939 |
28/11/1947 |
06/1900 |
J5 |
|
1152 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Kitson |
?? |
3940 |
11/1936 |
06/1900 |
J5 |
|
1153 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Kitson |
?? |
3941 |
06/1951 |
06/1900 |
J5 |
|
1154 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Kitson |
?? |
3942 |
11/1942 |
06/1900 |
J5 |
|
1155 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Kitson |
?? |
3943 |
06/1938 |
06/1900 |
J5 |
|
179 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO220 |
884 |
08/1947 |
06/1900 |
J5 |
|
304 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO220 |
889 |
10/1935 |
06/1900 |
J5 |
|
306 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO220 |
890 |
22/12/1954 |
06/1900 |
J5 |
|
396 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO220 |
899 |
05/1933 |
06/1900 |
C1 |
|
984 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
218 |
876 |
10/1937 |
06/1900 |
C1 |
|
985 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
218 |
877 |
05/1936 |
06/1900 |
C1 |
|
987 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
218 |
879 |
08/1936 |
06/1900 |
C1 |
|
988 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
218 |
880 |
12/1935 |
06/1900 |
C1 |
|
989 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
218 |
881 |
04/1938 |
07/1900 |
J5 |
|
1156 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Kitson |
?? |
3944 |
03/1933 |
07/1900 |
J5 |
|
1157 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Kitson |
?? |
3945 |
07/1937 |
07/1900 |
J5 |
|
1158 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Kitson |
?? |
3946 |
11/1933 |
07/1900 |
J5 |
|
1159 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Kitson |
?? |
3947 |
01/1936 |
07/1900 |
J5 |
|
1160 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Kitson |
?? |
3948 |
03/1951 |
07/1900 |
J5 |
|
308 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO220 |
891 |
09/1932 |
07/1900 |
J5 |
|
386 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO220 |
893 |
05/1932 |
07/1900 |
J5 |
|
387 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO220 |
894 |
28/09/1953 |
07/1900 |
J5 |
|
390 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO220 |
896 |
07/1936 |
07/1900 |
J5 |
|
394 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO220 |
898 |
02/1932 |
07/1900 |
J5 |
|
398 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO220 |
900 |
09/1947 |
08/1900 |
J5 |
|
384 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO220 |
892 |
01/1936 |
08/1900 |
J5 |
|
388 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO220 |
895 |
30/07/1951 |
08/1900 |
J5 |
|
392 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO220 |
897 |
02/1932 |
08/1900 |
J5 |
|
399 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
EO220 |
901 |
08/1947 |
10/1900 |
D1 |
|
1366 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
903 |
08/1947 |
10/1900 |
1321 |
|
1366 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
903 |
08/1947 |
10/1900 |
D1 |
|
1367 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
904 |
06/1939 |
10/1900 |
1321 |
|
1367 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
904 |
06/1939 |
10/1900 |
D1 |
|
1368 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
905 |
04/1947 |
10/1900 |
1321 |
|
1368 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
905 |
04/1947 |
10/1900 |
D1 |
|
1369 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
906 |
19/06/1951 |
10/1900 |
1321 |
|
1369 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
906 |
19/06/1951 |
10/1900 |
J5 |
|
81 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3933 |
09/1947 |
10/1900 |
J5 |
|
82 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3934 |
08/1947 |
10/1900 |
J5 |
|
83 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3935 |
07/1951 |
10/1900 |
J5 |
|
84 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3936 |
08/1947 |
10/1900 |
J5 |
|
85 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3937 |
03/12/1951 |
10/1900 |
J5 |
|
86 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3938 |
09/1947 |
10/1900 |
J5 |
|
87 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3939 |
12/1950 |
10/1900 |
J5 |
|
88 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3940 |
01/1949 |
10/1900 |
J5 |
|
89 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3941 |
08/1947 |
10/1900 |
J5 |
|
91 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3943 |
01/1946 |
11/1900 |
D1 |
|
1370 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
907 |
05/1950 |
11/1900 |
1321 |
|
1370 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
907 |
05/1950 |
11/1900 |
D1 |
|
1371 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
908 |
09/1947 |
11/1900 |
1321 |
|
1371 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
908 |
09/1947 |
11/1900 |
D1 |
|
1372 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
909 |
12/1938 |
11/1900 |
1321 |
|
1372 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
909 |
12/1938 |
11/1900 |
D1 |
|
1373 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
910 |
25/11/1948 |
11/1900 |
1321 |
|
1373 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
910 |
25/11/1948 |
11/1900 |
D1 |
|
1380 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
911 |
03/1949 |
11/1900 |
1321 |
|
1380 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
911 |
03/1949 |
11/1900 |
D1 |
|
1382 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
913 |
05/1937 |
11/1900 |
1321 |
|
1382 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
913 |
05/1937 |
11/1900 |
J5 |
|
90 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3942 |
07/1946 |
11/1900 |
J5 |
|
92 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3944 |
02/07/1948 |
12/1900 |
D1 |
|
1374 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
912 |
01/1947 |
12/1900 |
1321 |
|
1374 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
912 |
01/1947 |
12/1900 |
D1 |
|
1375 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
916 |
12/1939 |
12/1900 |
1321 |
|
1375 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
916 |
12/1939 |
12/1900 |
D1 |
|
1376 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
917 |
11/1937 |
12/1900 |
1321 |
|
1376 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
917 |
11/1937 |
12/1900 |
D1 |
|
1383 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
914 |
25/11/1950 |
12/1900 |
1321 |
|
1383 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
914 |
25/11/1950 |
12/1900 |
D1 |
|
1384 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
915 |
03/1946 |
12/1900 |
1321 |
|
1384 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
915 |
03/1946 |
12/1900 |
D1 |
|
1385 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
922 |
07/1947 |
12/1900 |
1321 |
|
1385 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
922 |
07/1947 |
01/1901 |
D1 |
|
1377 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
918 |
10/1949 |
01/1901 |
1321 |
|
1377 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
918 |
10/1949 |
01/1901 |
D1 |
|
1378 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
919 |
06/1937 |
01/1901 |
1321 |
|
1378 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
919 |
06/1937 |
01/1901 |
D1 |
|
1379 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
920 |
07/1947 |
01/1901 |
1321 |
|
1379 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
920 |
07/1947 |
01/1901 |
D1 |
|
1381 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
921 |
05/1950 |
01/1901 |
1321 |
|
1381 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
221 |
921 |
05/1950 |
02/1901 |
K1 |
|
401 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
226 |
923 |
20/06/1929 |
06/1901 |
C2 |
|
1521 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
223 |
924 |
22/05/1958 |
06/1901 |
C2 |
|
1522 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
223 |
925 |
06/1937 |
06/1901 |
C2 |
|
1523 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
223 |
926 |
07/1949 |
06/1901 |
C2 |
|
1527 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
223 |
930 |
30/05/1958 |
07/1901 |
J5 |
|
1161 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3945 |
08/1933 |
07/1901 |
J5 |
|
1162 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3946 |
12/04/1948 |
07/1901 |
J5 |
|
1163 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3947 |
06/1938 |
07/1901 |
J5 |
|
1164 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3948 |
07/1934 |
07/1901 |
J5 |
|
1165 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3949 |
09/1933 |
08/1901 |
J5 |
|
1166 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3950 |
19/05/1952 |
08/1901 |
J5 |
|
1167 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3951 |
07/1932 |
08/1901 |
J5 |
|
1168 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3952 |
02/1935 |
08/1901 |
J5 |
|
1169 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3953 |
08/1936 |
08/1901 |
J5 |
|
1170 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3954 |
08/1933 |
08/1901 |
J5 |
|
1171 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3955 |
02/11/1946 |
08/1901 |
J5 |
|
1172 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3956 |
03/1936 |
08/1901 |
J5 |
|
1173 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Dübs & Co |
?? |
3957 |
06/1947 |
08/1901 |
C2 |
|
1525 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
223 |
928 |
10/06/1958 |
09/1901 |
C2 |
|
1526 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
223 |
929 |
04/1937 |
10/1901 |
C2 |
|
1524 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
223 |
927 |
01/01/1948 |
10/1901 |
C2 |
|
1529 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
223 |
932 |
06/04/1955 |
11/1901 |
C2 |
|
1528 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
223 |
931 |
21/01/1952 |
11/1901 |
C2 |
|
1530 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
223 |
933 |
01/1955 |
12/1901 |
J13 |
|
1251 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
227 |
944 |
25/10/1954 |
12/1901 |
J13 |
|
1252 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
227 |
945 |
06/05/1957 |
12/1901 |
J13 |
|
1253 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
227 |
946 |
31/12/1955 |
12/1901 |
J13 |
|
1254 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
227 |
947 |
12/07/1956 |
12/1901 |
J13 |
|
1255 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
227 |
948 |
19/07/1954 |
12/1901 |
J13 |
|
1256 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
227 |
949 |
14/11/1956 |
12/1901 |
J13 |
|
1257 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
227 |
950 |
23/11/1955 |
12/1901 |
J13 |
|
1258 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
227 |
951 |
14/04/1958 |
12/1901 |
J13 |
|
1259 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
227 |
952 |
16/12/1955 |
01/1902 |
J13 |
|
1261 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
227 |
954 |
23/12/1957 |
02/1902 |
J13 |
|
1260 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
227 |
953 |
02/08/1954 |
02/1902 |
J13 |
|
1262 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
227 |
955 |
10/1955 |
02/1902 |
J13 |
|
1263 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
227 |
956 |
13/10/1958 |
03/1902 |
J13 |
|
1264 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
227 |
957 |
08/05/1958 |
03/1902 |
J13 |
|
1265 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
227 |
958 |
19/10/1955 |
03/1902 |
J13 |
|
1266 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
227 |
959 |
27/10/1955 |
03/1902 |
J13 |
|
1267 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
227 |
960 |
02/09/1958 |
03/1902 |
J13 |
|
1269 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
227 |
962 |
28/10/1955 |
03/1902 |
J13 |
|
1270 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
227 |
963 |
20/03/1961 |
03/1902 |
K1 |
|
402 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
229 |
964 |
13/09/1927 |
04/1902 |
J13 |
|
1268 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
227 |
961 |
10/02/1958 |
04/1902 |
K1 |
|
403 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
229 |
968 |
10/06/1929 |
04/1902 |
K1 |
|
405 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
229 |
965 |
26/06/1935 |
04/1902 |
K1 |
|
406 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
229 |
966 |
03/02/1934 |
04/1902 |
K1 |
|
407 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
229 |
967 |
16/06/1934 |
05/1902 |
K1 |
|
404 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
229 |
972 |
26/04/1929 |
06/1902 |
K1 |
|
409 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
229 |
970 |
05/08/1931 |
07/1902 |
|
|
271 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
224 |
974 |
06/1936 |
07/1902 |
K1 |
|
408 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
229 |
969 |
02/09/1927 |
07/1902 |
K1 |
|
410 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
229 |
971 |
18/10/1935 |
07/1902 |
K1 |
|
411 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
229 |
973 |
08/12/1930 |
08/1902 |
K1 |
|
412 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
231 |
976 |
23/07/1928 |
09/1902 |
K1 |
|
413 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
231 |
982 |
16/05/1927 |
09/1902 |
K1 |
|
414 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
231 |
978 |
31/12/1929 |
10/1902 |
K1 |
|
415 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
231 |
983 |
18/05/1929 |
12/1902 |
C1 |
|
251 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
232 |
991 |
28/07/1947 |
12/1902 |
K1 |
|
416 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
231 |
985 |
17/12/1935 |
01/1903 |
D1 |
|
1386 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
975 |
03/1939 |
01/1903 |
1321 |
|
1386 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
975 |
03/1939 |
01/1903 |
K1 |
|
417 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
231 |
984 |
17/12/1935 |
01/1903 |
K1 |
|
418 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
231 |
986 |
30/11/1929 |
01/1903 |
K1 |
|
419 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
231 |
987 |
13/09/1928 |
01/1903 |
K1 |
|
420 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
231 |
988 |
10/02/1937 |
01/1903 |
K1 |
|
421 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
231 |
989 |
19/05/1934 |
02/1903 |
D1 |
|
1387 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
981 |
12/1947 |
02/1903 |
1321 |
|
1387 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
981 |
12/1947 |
02/1903 |
D1 |
|
1388 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
977 |
07/1947 |
02/1903 |
1321 |
|
1388 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
977 |
07/1947 |
02/1903 |
D1 |
|
1389 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
980 |
04/1937 |
02/1903 |
1321 |
|
1389 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
980 |
04/1937 |
02/1903 |
D1 |
|
1393 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
995 |
10/1949 |
02/1903 |
1321 |
|
1393 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
995 |
10/1949 |
03/1903 |
D1 |
|
1395 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
993 |
09/1949 |
03/1903 |
1321 |
|
1395 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
993 |
09/1949 |
04/1903 |
D1 |
|
1392 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
994 |
01/10/1948 |
04/1903 |
1321 |
|
1392 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
994 |
01/10/1948 |
05/1903 |
D1 |
|
1390 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
990 |
05/1947 |
05/1903 |
1321 |
|
1390 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
990 |
05/1947 |
05/1903 |
D1 |
|
1394 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
992 |
25/11/1948 |
05/1903 |
1321 |
|
1394 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
992 |
25/11/1948 |
05/1903 |
C1 |
|
252 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
230 |
996 |
07/1945 |
05/1903 |
C1 |
|
253 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
230 |
997 |
05/1937 |
05/1903 |
C1 |
|
255 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
230 |
999 |
08/1938 |
05/1903 |
C1 |
|
256 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
230 |
998 |
03/1943 |
06/1903 |
D1 |
|
1391 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
979 |
08/1938 |
06/1903 |
1321 |
|
1391 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
?? |
979 |
08/1938 |
06/1903 |
C1 |
|
250 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
230 |
1003 |
06/1944 |
06/1903 |
C1 |
|
254 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
230 |
1000 |
04/1943 |
06/1903 |
C1 |
|
257 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
230 |
1001 |
03/1936 |
06/1903 |
C1 |
|
258 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
230 |
1006 |
04/1937 |
06/1903 |
C1 |
|
259 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
230 |
1002 |
10/1943 |
06/1903 |
C1 |
|
260 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
230 |
1005 |
09/1936 |
06/1903 |
K1 |
|
424 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
233 |
1010 |
10/10/1927 |
07/1903 |
K1 |
|
423 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
233 |
1007 |
27/06/1928 |
08/1903 |
K1 |
|
422 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
233 |
1008 |
01/08/1928 |
09/1903 |
K1 |
|
425 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
233 |
1009 |
27/06/1928 |
09/1903 |
K1 |
|
426 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
233 |
1011 |
09/09/1931 |
09/1903 |
K1 |
|
427 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
233 |
1012 |
11/04/1929 |
09/1903 |
K1 |
|
428 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
233 |
1015 |
10/04/1926 |
09/1903 |
K1 |
|
429 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
233 |
1013 |
06/12/1930 |
09/1903 |
K1 |
|
430 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
233 |
1014 |
03/10/1931 |
10/1903 |
K1 |
|
431 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
233 |
1016 |
28/11/1931 |
12/1903 |
C2 |
|
1531 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
234 |
1017 |
07/05/1956 |
12/1903 |
C2 |
|
1532 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
234 |
1018 |
04/1937 |
12/1903 |
C2 |
|
1533 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
234 |
1019 |
12/1937 |
12/1903 |
C2 |
|
1534 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
234 |
1020 |
01/04/1955 |
12/1903 |
C2 |
|
1535 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
234 |
1021 |
01/1939 |
12/1903 |
C2 |
|
1536 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
234 |
1022 |
03/04/1958 |
12/1903 |
C2 |
|
1537 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
234 |
1023 |
07/02/1955 |
12/1903 |
C2 |
|
1538 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
234 |
1024 |
07/1948 |
12/1903 |
C2 |
|
1540 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
234 |
1026 |
15/06/1953 |
01/1904 |
C2 |
|
1539 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
234 |
1025 |
15/04/1955 |
01/1904 |
K1 |
|
432 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
233 |
1027 |
27/10/1931 |
03/1904 |
K1 |
|
433 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
233 |
1028 |
08/02/1930 |
03/1904 |
K1 |
|
434 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
233 |
1029 |
27/06/1928 |
03/1904 |
K1 |
|
435 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
233 |
1050 |
17/05/1929 |
03/1904 |
K1 |
|
436 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
233 |
1051 |
08/02/1930 |
04/1904 |
C1 |
|
272 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
236 |
1030 |
08/08/1947 |
04/1904 |
C1 |
|
273 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
236 |
1031 |
30/01/1947 |
04/1904 |
C1 |
|
274 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
236 |
1032 |
02/05/1946 |
04/1904 |
K1 |
|
437 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
233 |
1052 |
01/03/1928 |
05/1904 |
C1 |
|
275 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
236 |
1033 |
05/05/1945 |
05/1904 |
C1 |
|
276 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
236 |
1034 |
05/01/1946 |
05/1904 |
C1 |
|
277 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
236 |
1035 |
31/01/1945 |
05/1904 |
C1 |
|
278 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
236 |
1036 |
26/07/1945 |
06/1904 |
C1 |
|
279 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
236 |
1037 |
14/02/1948 |
06/1904 |
C1 |
|
280 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
236 |
1038 |
26/10/1946 |
06/1904 |
C1 |
|
281 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
236 |
1039 |
27/05/1949 |
06/1904 |
C1 |
|
282 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
236 |
1042 |
30/01/1947 |
06/1904 |
C1 |
|
283 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
236 |
1040 |
21/08/1947 |
06/1904 |
C1 |
|
285 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
236 |
1041 |
02/05/1946 |
06/1904 |
C1 |
|
286 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
236 |
1043 |
17/10/1947 |
07/1904 |
C1 |
|
284 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
236 |
1044 |
26/01/1946 |
07/1904 |
C1 |
|
287 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
236 |
1045 |
06/10/1945 |
07/1904 |
C1 |
|
289 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
236 |
1046 |
20/12/1945 |
08/1904 |
C1 |
|
288 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
236 |
1047 |
08/05/1950 |
08/1904 |
C1 |
|
290 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
236 |
1048 |
09/11/1945 |
08/1904 |
C1 |
|
291 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
236 |
1049 |
21/04/1945 |
08/1904 |
K1 |
|
438 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
233 |
1053 |
17/05/1929 |
08/1904 |
K1 |
|
439 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
233 |
1054 |
09/02/1927 |
09/1904 |
K1 |
|
440 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
233 |
1055 |
28/11/1931 |
03/1905 |
|
|
292 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
239 |
1066 |
05/01/1927 |
05/1905 |
C1 |
|
293 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
240 |
1067 |
02/07/1948 |
05/1905 |
C1 |
|
294 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
240 |
1070 |
27/11/1950 |
05/1905 |
C1 |
|
295 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
240 |
1071 |
08/08/1947 |
05/1905 |
C1 |
|
296 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
240 |
1069 |
07/12/1945 |
05/1905 |
C1 |
|
297 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
240 |
1068 |
05/02/1947 |
05/1905 |
C1 |
|
298 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
240 |
1072 |
04/04/1945 |
06/1905 |
C1 |
|
1400 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
240 |
1076 |
06/12/1947 |
06/1905 |
C1 |
|
1401 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
241 |
1077 |
16/11/1946 |
06/1905 |
C1 |
|
1402 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
241 |
1078 |
05/08/1947 |
06/1905 |
C1 |
|
1403 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
241 |
1079 |
04/07/1947 |
06/1905 |
C1 |
|
1404 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
241 |
1081 |
08/08/1947 |
06/1905 |
C1 |
|
1405 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
241 |
1080 |
14/08/1947 |
06/1905 |
C1 |
|
1406 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
241 |
1082 |
16/02/1946 |
06/1905 |
C1 |
|
299 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
240 |
1073 |
25/05/1945 |
06/1905 |
C1 |
|
300 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
240 |
1075 |
29/08/1949 |
06/1905 |
C1 |
|
301 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
240 |
1074 |
22/07/1948 |
07/1905 |
|
|
1300 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Vulcan Foundry |
?? |
2025 |
25/10/1924 |
07/1905 |
C1 |
|
1407 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
241 |
1083 |
06/06/1944 |
07/1905 |
C1 |
|
1408 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
241 |
1084 |
26/07/1945 |
07/1905 |
C1 |
|
1409 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
241 |
1085 |
23/01/1950 |
08/1905 |
C1 |
|
1410 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
241 |
1086 |
29/04/1947 |
10/1905 |
J13 |
|
1271 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
242 |
1087 |
22/03/1958 |
10/1905 |
J13 |
|
1272 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
242 |
1088 |
10/02/1958 |
10/1905 |
J13 |
|
1273 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
242 |
1089 |
21/08/1956 |
10/1905 |
J13 |
|
1274 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
242 |
1090 |
30/09/1955 |
11/1905 |
J13 |
|
1275 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
242 |
1091 |
16/10/1957 |
11/1905 |
J13 |
|
1276 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
242 |
1092 |
20/03/1961 |
11/1905 |
J13 |
|
1277 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
242 |
1093 |
05/03/1956 |
11/1905 |
J13 |
|
1278 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
242 |
1094 |
20/11/1956 |
11/1905 |
J13 |
|
1279 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
242 |
1095 |
25/05/1956 |
12/1905 |
J13 |
|
1280 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
242 |
1096 |
20/09/1955 |
03/1906 |
C1 |
|
1411 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
245 |
1109 |
08/08/1947 |
03/1906 |
C1 |
|
1412 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
245 |
1110 |
20/05/1947 |
03/1906 |
C1 |
|
1413 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
245 |
1111 |
04/01/1946 |
03/1906 |
C1 |
|
1414 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
245 |
1112 |
28/10/1944 |
04/1906 |
C1 |
|
1415 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
245 |
1113 |
29/04/1947 |
04/1906 |
C1 |
|
1416 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
245 |
1114 |
20/10/1945 |
04/1906 |
C1 |
|
1417 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
245 |
1115 |
21/04/1945 |
05/1906 |
C1 |
|
1418 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
245 |
1116 |
20/02/1945 |
05/1906 |
C1 |
|
1419 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
245 |
1117 |
19/07/1948 |
05/1906 |
C1 |
|
1420 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
245 |
1118 |
05/08/1947 |
12/1906 |
K1 |
|
441 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
247 |
1139 |
11/06/1930 |
12/1906 |
K1 |
|
443 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
247 |
1141, |
02/01/1929 |
12/1906 |
K1 |
|
444 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
247 |
1142 |
12/07/1932 |
12/1906 |
K1 |
|
445 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
247 |
1143 |
27/06/1928 |
01/1907 |
K1 |
|
442 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
247 |
1140 |
27/09/1930 |
03/1907 |
C1 |
|
1422 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
249 |
1144 |
28/09/1946 |
04/1907 |
C1 |
|
1423 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
249 |
1146 |
27/05/1947 |
04/1907 |
C1 |
|
1424 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
249 |
1147 |
03/04/1950 |
04/1907 |
C1 |
|
1425 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
249 |
1148 |
01/01/1947 |
04/1907 |
|
|
190 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
251 |
1145 |
10/12/1956 |
05/1907 |
C1 |
|
1426 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
249 |
1151 |
29/02/1944 |
05/1907 |
C1 |
|
1427 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
249 |
1149 |
20/02/1945 |
05/1907 |
C1 |
|
1428 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
249 |
1150 |
15/06/1946 |
05/1907 |
C1 |
|
1429 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
249 |
1152 |
08/08/1947 |
06/1907 |
C1 |
|
1430 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
249 |
1153 |
03/02/1944 |
06/1907 |
C1 |
|
1431 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
249 |
1154 |
21/10/1944 |
07/1907 |
C2 |
|
1541 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
250 |
1155 |
10/01/1958 |
07/1907 |
C2 |
|
1542 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
250 |
1156 |
19/10/1956 |
07/1907 |
C2 |
|
1543 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
250 |
1157 |
20/04/1953 |
07/1907 |
C2 |
|
1544 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
250 |
1158 |
16/06/1958 |
07/1907 |
C2 |
|
1545 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
250 |
1159 |
16/03/1957 |
08/1907 |
D1 |
|
1396 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
252 |
1165 |
08/1938 |
08/1907 |
1321 |
|
1396 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
252 |
1165 |
08/1938 |
08/1907 |
|
|
1421 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
248 |
1166 |
05/08/1947 |
08/1907 |
C2 |
|
1546 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
250 |
1160 |
06/1947 |
08/1907 |
C2 |
|
1547 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
250 |
1161 |
06/12/1958 |
08/1907 |
C2 |
|
1548 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
250 |
1162 |
04/11/1958 |
08/1907 |
C2 |
|
1549 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
250 |
1163 |
11/1949 |
09/1907 |
D1 |
|
1397 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
252 |
1167 |
11/1938 |
09/1907 |
1321 |
|
1397 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
252 |
1167 |
11/1938 |
09/1907 |
C2 |
|
1550 |
4-4-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
250 |
1164 |
12/1938 |
10/1907 |
D1 |
|
1180 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
252 |
1170 |
06/1949 |
10/1907 |
1321 |
|
1180 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
252 |
1170 |
06/1949 |
10/1907 |
D1 |
|
1398 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
252 |
1168 |
06/1947 |
10/1907 |
1321 |
|
1398 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
252 |
1168 |
06/1947 |
10/1907 |
D1 |
|
1399 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
252 |
1169 |
05/1946 |
10/1907 |
1321 |
|
1399 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
252 |
1169 |
05/1946 |
11/1907 |
C1 |
|
1432 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
253 |
1171 |
26/07/1945 |
11/1907 |
C1 |
|
1433 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
253 |
1172 |
02/05/1946 |
11/1907 |
C1 |
|
1434 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
253 |
1173 |
26/04/1945 |
11/1907 |
C1 |
|
1435 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
253 |
1174 |
20/12/1945 |
11/1907 |
C1 |
|
1436 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
253 |
1175 |
05/08/1947 |
12/1907 |
|
|
1551 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
254 |
1176 |
07/03/1955 |
12/1907 |
|
|
1552 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
254 |
1177 |
08/11/1954 |
12/1907 |
|
|
1553 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
254 |
1178 |
27/12/1954 |
12/1907 |
|
|
1554 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
254 |
1179 |
10/03/1959 |
12/1907 |
|
|
1555 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
254 |
1180 |
21/03/1955 |
12/1907 |
|
|
1556 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
254 |
1181 |
11/07/1955 |
12/1907 |
|
|
1557 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
254 |
1182 |
19/07/1954 |
12/1907 |
|
|
1558 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
254 |
1183 |
02/1947 |
12/1907 |
|
|
1559 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
254 |
1184 |
11/11/1955 |
02/1908 |
|
|
1560 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
254 |
1185 |
18/03/1957 |
03/1908 |
C1 |
|
1437 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
253 |
1186 |
11/03/1944 |
03/1908 |
C1 |
|
1438 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
253 |
1187 |
08/08/1947 |
03/1908 |
C1 |
|
1439 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
253 |
1188 |
02/01/1947 |
03/1908 |
C1 |
|
1440 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
253 |
1189 |
14/02/1948 |
03/1908 |
C1 |
|
1441 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
253 |
1190 |
21/05/1948 |
04/1908 |
C1 |
|
1443 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
255 |
1191 |
02/05/1946 |
04/1908 |
C1 |
|
1444 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
255 |
1192 |
02/10/1945 |
05/1908 |
C1 |
|
1442 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
255 |
1193 |
23/01/1947 |
05/1908 |
C1 |
|
1445 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
255 |
1194 |
22/01/1949 |
05/1908 |
C1 |
|
1446 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
255 |
1195 |
03/01/1948 |
06/1908 |
C1 |
|
1447 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
255 |
1196 |
07/11/1949 |
07/1908 |
C1 |
|
1448 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
255 |
1197 |
15/06/1946 |
07/1908 |
C1 |
|
1449 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
255 |
1200 |
04/07/1947 |
07/1908 |
C1 |
|
1450 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
255 |
1199 |
15/06/1946 |
07/1908 |
C1 |
|
1451 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
255 |
1201 |
29/04/1949 |
08/1908 |
J21 |
|
1 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
256 |
1198 |
08/1947 |
09/1908 |
J21 |
|
2 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
256 |
1202 |
08/1947 |
09/1908 |
J21 |
|
3 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
256 |
1203 |
21/08/1954 |
09/1908 |
J21 |
|
4 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
256 |
1204 |
12/01/1953 |
09/1908 |
J21 |
|
5 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
256 |
1205 |
17/11/1952 |
09/1908 |
J21 |
|
6 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
256 |
1206 |
19/05/1952 |
10/1908 |
J21 |
|
10 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
256 |
1210 |
31/03/1952 |
10/1908 |
J21 |
|
11 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
256 |
1211 |
19/01/1953 |
10/1908 |
J21 |
|
7 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
256 |
1207 |
07/1951 |
10/1908 |
J21 |
|
8 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
256 |
1208 |
04/02/1952 |
10/1908 |
J21 |
|
9 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
256 |
1209 |
24/03/1952 |
11/1908 |
J21 |
|
12 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
256 |
1212 |
08/1947 |
11/1908 |
J21 |
|
13 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
256 |
1213 |
08/1947 |
11/1908 |
J21 |
|
14 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
256 |
1214 |
22/11/1954 |
11/1908 |
J21 |
|
15 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
256 |
1215 |
05/08/1953 |
12/1908 |
J13 |
|
1281 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
257 |
1216 |
17/08/1956 |
12/1908 |
J13 |
|
1282 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
257 |
1217 |
09/12/1955 |
12/1908 |
J13 |
|
1283 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
257 |
1218 |
27/01/1958 |
12/1908 |
J13 |
|
1284 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
257 |
1219 |
26/09/1955 |
01/1909 |
J13 |
|
1285 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
257 |
1220 |
14/09/1955 |
02/1909 |
J13 |
|
1286 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
257 |
1221 |
18/09/1956 |
02/1909 |
J13 |
|
1287 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
257 |
1222 |
25/11/1957 |
02/1909 |
J13 |
|
1288 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
257 |
1223 |
26/08/1957 |
02/1909 |
J13 |
|
1289 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
257 |
1224 |
21/10/1957 |
03/1909 |
J13 |
|
1290 |
0-6-0ST |
P. Stirling |
Doncaster Works |
257 |
1225 |
30/05/1955 |
04/1909 |
D1 |
|
41 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
258 |
1226 |
06/1949 |
04/1909 |
1321 |
|
41 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
258 |
1226 |
06/1949 |
04/1909 |
D1 |
|
42 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
258 |
1227 |
26/02/1948 |
04/1909 |
1321 |
|
42 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
258 |
1227 |
26/02/1948 |
04/1909 |
D1 |
|
43 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
258 |
1228 |
06/1938 |
04/1909 |
1321 |
|
43 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
258 |
1228 |
06/1938 |
05/1909 |
D1 |
|
44 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
258 |
1229 |
05/1947 |
05/1909 |
1321 |
|
44 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
258 |
1229 |
05/1947 |
05/1909 |
D1 |
|
45 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
258 |
1230 |
01/1949 |
05/1909 |
1321 |
|
45 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
258 |
1230 |
01/1949 |
06/1909 |
D1 |
|
46 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
258 |
1231 |
11/1938 |
06/1909 |
1321 |
|
46 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
258 |
1231 |
11/1938 |
06/1909 |
D1 |
|
47 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
258 |
1232 |
27/08/1948 |
06/1909 |
1321 |
|
47 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
258 |
1232 |
27/08/1948 |
06/1909 |
D1 |
|
48 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
258 |
1233 |
07/1949 |
06/1909 |
1321 |
|
48 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
258 |
1233 |
07/1949 |
06/1909 |
D1 |
|
49 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
258 |
1234 |
07/1946 |
06/1909 |
1321 |
|
49 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
258 |
1234 |
07/1946 |
06/1909 |
D1 |
|
50 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
258 |
1235 |
07/1947 |
06/1909 |
1321 |
|
50 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
258 |
1235 |
07/1947 |
07/1909 |
K1 |
|
446 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
259A |
1236 |
27/02/1932 |
07/1909 |
K1 |
|
447 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
259A |
1237 |
18/10/1935 |
07/1909 |
K1 |
|
448 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
259A |
1238 |
12/02/1932 |
08/1909 |
K1 |
|
449 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
259A |
1239 |
27/08/1930 |
08/1909 |
K1 |
|
450 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
259A |
1240 |
15/06/1933 |
10/1909 |
J22 |
|
31 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
|
260 |
1242 |
11/10/1954 |
10/1909 |
K1 |
|
451 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
259B |
1241 |
09/1933 |
11/1909 |
J22 |
|
32 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
|
260 |
1243 |
12/10/1953 |
11/1909 |
J22 |
|
33 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
|
260 |
1246 |
28/09/1953 |
11/1909 |
J22 |
|
34 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
|
260 |
1247 |
02/08/1954 |
11/1909 |
K1 |
|
452 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
259B |
1244 |
02/1934 |
11/1909 |
K1 |
|
453 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
259B |
1245 |
05/1933 |
12/1909 |
J22 |
|
35 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
|
260 |
1249 |
20/01/1955 |
12/1909 |
J22 |
|
36 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
|
260 |
1252 |
09/08/1954 |
12/1909 |
J22 |
|
37 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
|
260 |
1251 |
08/02/1954 |
12/1909 |
J22 |
|
38 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
|
260 |
1253 |
23/11/1953 |
12/1909 |
J22 |
|
39 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
|
260 |
1254 |
30/12/1955 |
12/1909 |
K1 |
|
454 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
259B |
1248 |
02/1934 |
12/1909 |
K1 |
|
455 |
0-8-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
259B |
1250 |
08/1933 |
01/1910 |
J22 |
|
40 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
|
260 |
1255 |
20/04/1953 |
03/1910 |
|
|
1561 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
261 |
1256 |
30/05/1955 |
03/1910 |
|
|
1562 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
261 |
1257 |
06/09/1953 |
03/1910 |
|
|
1563 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
261 |
1258 |
11/03/1959 |
03/1910 |
|
|
1564 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
261 |
1259 |
22/10/1956 |
04/1910 |
|
|
1565 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
261 |
1260 |
17/01/1955 |
04/1910 |
|
|
1566 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
261 |
1261 |
15/06/1953 |
04/1910 |
|
|
1567 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
261 |
1262 |
26/10/1956 |
05/1910 |
|
|
1568 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
261 |
1263 |
12/01/1953 |
05/1910 |
|
|
1569 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
261 |
1264 |
19/04/1955 |
05/1910 |
|
|
1570 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
261 |
1265 |
10/03/1959 |
06/1910 |
J22 |
|
21 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
|
262 |
1266 |
25/10/1954 |
06/1910 |
J22 |
|
22 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
|
262 |
1267 |
26/10/1953 |
06/1910 |
J22 |
|
23 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
|
262 |
1268 |
02/11/1953 |
06/1910 |
J22 |
|
24 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
|
262 |
1269 |
31/12/1955 |
06/1910 |
J22 |
|
25 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
|
262 |
1270 |
09/03/1953 |
06/1910 |
J22 |
|
27 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
|
262 |
1272 |
13/12/1954 |
07/1910 |
J22 |
|
26 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
|
262 |
1271 |
06/12/1954 |
07/1910 |
J22 |
|
28 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
|
262 |
1273 |
08/06/1953 |
07/1910 |
J22 |
|
29 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
|
262 |
1274 |
19/10/1953 |
07/1910 |
J22 |
|
30 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
|
262 |
1275 |
07/12/1953 |
08/1910 |
|
|
1452 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
263 |
1276 |
27/02/1946 |
08/1910 |
|
|
1453 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
263 |
1277 |
27/07/1946 |
08/1910 |
|
|
1454 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
263 |
1278 |
07/09/1946 |
08/1910 |
|
|
1455 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
263 |
1279 |
23/01/1950 |
09/1910 |
|
|
1456 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
263 |
1280 |
05/08/1947 |
09/1910 |
|
|
1457 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
263 |
1281 |
30/03/1946 |
10/1910 |
|
|
1458 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
263 |
1282 |
29/04/1947 |
10/1910 |
|
|
1459 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
263 |
1283 |
16/07/1943 |
10/1910 |
|
|
1460 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
263 |
1284 |
27/10/1945 |
11/1910 |
|
|
1461 |
4-4-2 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
263 |
1285 |
31/08/1945 |
12/1910 |
|
|
1571 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
264 |
1286 |
12/10/1955 |
12/1910 |
|
|
1572 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
264 |
1287 |
13/03/1959 |
12/1910 |
|
|
1573 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
264 |
1288 |
29/04/1958 |
12/1910 |
|
|
1574 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
264 |
1289 |
07/02/1955 |
12/1910 |
|
|
1575 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
264 |
1290 |
16/05/1955 |
12/1910 |
|
|
1576 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
264 |
1291 |
15/11/1954 |
01/1911 |
|
|
1577 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
264 |
1292 |
23/04/1957 |
02/1911 |
|
|
1578 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
264 |
1293 |
04/11/1955 |
02/1911 |
|
|
1579 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
264 |
1294 |
28/03/1955 |
03/1911 |
|
|
1580 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
264 |
1295 |
22/08/1955 |
03/1911 |
D1 |
|
51 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
265 |
1296 |
02/1946 |
04/1911 |
D1 |
|
52 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
265 |
1297 |
31/08/1950 |
04/1911 |
D1 |
|
53 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
265 |
1298 |
03/1946 |
04/1911 |
D1 |
|
54 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
265 |
1299 |
08/11/1948 |
05/1911 |
D1 |
|
55 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
265 |
1300 |
06/1946 |
05/1911 |
D1 |
|
56 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
265 |
1301 |
08/11/1948 |
05/1911 |
D1 |
|
57 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
265 |
1302 |
13/07/1950 |
05/1911 |
D1 |
|
58 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
265 |
1303 |
11/11/1950 |
06/1911 |
D1 |
|
59 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
265 |
1304 |
12/1947 |
06/1911 |
D1 |
|
60 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
265 |
1305 |
12/1946 |
06/1911 |
D1 |
|
61 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
265 |
1306 |
07/1947 |
06/1911 |
D1 |
|
62 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
265 |
1307 |
06/1946 |
06/1911 |
D1 |
|
63 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
265 |
1308 |
10/1949 |
07/1911 |
D1 |
|
64 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
265 |
1309 |
10/02/1950 |
08/1911 |
J22 |
|
521 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
266 |
1311 |
03/07/1961 |
08/1911 |
D1 |
|
65 |
4-4-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
265 |
1310 |
09/1947 |
09/1911 |
J22 |
|
522 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
266 |
1312 |
20/09/1961 |
09/1911 |
J22 |
|
523 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
266 |
1313 |
07/03/1960 |
10/1911 |
J22 |
|
524 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
266 |
1314 |
11/01/1961 |
10/1911 |
J22 |
|
525 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
266 |
1315 |
20/09/1961 |
10/1911 |
J22 |
|
526 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
266 |
1316 |
01/06/1960 |
11/1911 |
J22 |
|
527 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
266 |
1317 |
24/03/1959 |
11/1911 |
J22 |
|
528 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
266 |
1318 |
21/02/1962 |
11/1911 |
J22 |
|
529 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
266 |
1319 |
27/04/1960 |
11/1911 |
J22 |
|
530 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
266 |
1320 |
05/05/1960 |
11/1911 |
J22 |
|
531 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
266 |
1321 |
03/03/1960 |
11/1911 |
J22 |
|
532 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
266 |
1322 |
01/08/1959 |
12/1911 |
|
|
1581 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
267 |
1326 |
07/06/1954 |
12/1911 |
|
|
1582 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
267 |
1327 |
03/04/1959 |
12/1911 |
|
|
1583 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
267 |
1328 |
28/10/1955 |
12/1911 |
J22 |
|
533 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
266 |
1323 |
29/11/1960 |
12/1911 |
J22 |
|
534 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
266 |
1324 |
08/11/1958 |
12/1911 |
J22 |
|
535 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
266 |
1325 |
20/11/1959 |
02/1912 |
|
|
1584 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
267 |
1329 |
08/08/1955 |
02/1912 |
|
|
1585 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
267 |
1330 |
10/12/1955 |
02/1912 |
|
|
1586 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
267 |
1331 |
04/07/1955 |
03/1912 |
|
|
1587 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
267 |
1332 |
02/07/1956 |
03/1912 |
|
|
1588 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
267 |
1333 |
08/03/1954 |
03/1912 |
|
|
1589 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
267 |
1334 |
15/04/1957 |
04/1912 |
|
|
1590 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
267 |
1335 |
06/08/1956 |
04/1912 |
|
|
1591 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
267 |
1336 |
16/01/1956 |
04/1912 |
|
|
1592 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
267 |
1337 |
01/09/1952 |
04/1912 |
|
|
1593 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
267 |
1338 |
21/08/1958 |
04/1912 |
|
|
1594 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
267 |
1339 |
13/03/1959 |
05/1912 |
|
|
1595 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
267 |
1340 |
11/04/1955 |
05/1912 |
|
|
1596 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
268 |
1341 |
14/03/1955 |
06/1912 |
|
|
1597 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
268 |
1342 |
02/04/1959 |
06/1912 |
|
|
1598 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
268 |
1343 |
12/12/1956 |
06/1912 |
|
|
1599 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
268 |
1344 |
27/10/1952 |
06/1912 |
|
|
1600 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
268 |
1345 |
06/1951 |
06/1912 |
|
|
1601 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
268 |
1346 |
28/05/1956 |
06/1912 |
|
|
1602 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
268 |
1347 |
30/08/1954 |
06/1912 |
|
|
1603 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
268 |
1348 |
07/03/1955 |
06/1912 |
|
|
1604 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
268 |
1349 |
30/09/1957 |
06/1912 |
|
|
1605 |
0-6-2T |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
268 |
1350 |
01/11/1954 |
08/1912 |
H2 |
|
1630 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
270 |
1354 |
12/06/1956 |
08/1912 |
J21 |
|
71 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
269 |
1351 |
14/12/1953 |
08/1912 |
J21 |
|
72 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
269 |
1352 |
19/10/1953 |
08/1912 |
J21 |
|
73 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
269 |
1353 |
01/1954 |
09/1912 |
J21 |
|
74 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
269 |
1355 |
16/11/1953 |
09/1912 |
J21 |
|
75 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
269 |
1356 |
02/03/1953 |
09/1912 |
J21 |
|
76 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
269 |
1357 |
12/07/1954 |
09/1912 |
J21 |
|
77 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
269 |
1358 |
11/1950 |
10/1912 |
J21 |
|
78 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
269 |
1359 |
14/12/1953 |
10/1912 |
J21 |
|
79 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
269 |
1360 |
09/11/1953 |
10/1912 |
J21 |
|
80 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
269 |
1361 |
07/1946 |
11/1912 |
|
|
536 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
271 |
1362 |
05/04/1961 |
11/1912 |
|
|
537 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
271 |
1363 |
03/01/1958 |
11/1912 |
|
|
538 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
271 |
1364 |
02/01/1958 |
11/1912 |
|
|
539 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
271 |
1365 |
05/10/1959 |
11/1912 |
|
|
540 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
271 |
1366 |
22/10/1958 |
11/1912 |
|
|
541 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
271 |
1367 |
14/09/1959 |
11/1912 |
|
|
542 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
271 |
1368 |
21/02/1962 |
12/1912 |
|
|
543 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
271 |
1369 |
12/04/1960 |
12/1912 |
|
|
544 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
271 |
1370 |
24/12/1957 |
12/1912 |
|
|
545 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
271 |
1371 |
25/11/1955 |
02/1913 |
H2 |
|
1631 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
272 |
1372 |
30/12/1959 |
02/1913 |
H2 |
|
1632 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
272 |
1373 |
22/09/1955 |
02/1913 |
H2 |
|
1633 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
272 |
1374 |
04/11/1959 |
02/1913 |
H2 |
|
1634 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
272 |
1375 |
03/01/1958 |
03/1913 |
H2 |
|
1635 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
272 |
1376 |
26/01/1958 |
03/1913 |
H2 |
|
1636 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
272 |
1377 |
07/05/1957 |
03/1913 |
H2 |
|
1637 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
272 |
1378 |
06/06/1956 |
04/1913 |
H2 |
|
1638 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
272 |
1379 |
06/12/1960 |
04/1913 |
H2 |
|
1639 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
272 |
1380 |
25/06/1957 |
05/1913 |
|
|
546 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
273 |
1381 |
29/01/1958 |
05/1913 |
|
|
547 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
273 |
1382 |
12/09/1960 |
05/1913 |
|
|
548 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
273 |
1383 |
13/10/1959 |
05/1913 |
|
|
549 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
273 |
1384 |
18/03/1959 |
05/1913 |
|
|
550 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
273 |
1385 |
21/04/1958 |
06/1913 |
|
|
551 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
273 |
1386 |
10/02/1958 |
06/1913 |
|
|
552 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
273 |
1387 |
03/11/1958 |
06/1913 |
|
|
553 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
273 |
1388 |
25/09/1958 |
06/1913 |
|
|
554 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
273 |
1389 |
19/06/1962 |
06/1913 |
|
|
555 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
273 |
1390 |
23/12/1957 |
06/1913 |
|
|
556 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
273 |
1391 |
31/10/1958 |
06/1913 |
|
|
557 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
273 |
1392 |
27/09/1960 |
07/1913 |
|
|
558 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
273 |
1393 |
10/10/1959 |
07/1913 |
|
|
559 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
273 |
1394 |
24/04/1961 |
07/1913 |
|
|
560 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
273 |
1395 |
12/09/1960 |
07/1913 |
|
|
561 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
273 |
1396 |
15/05/1959 |
08/1913 |
|
|
562 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
273 |
1397 |
19/03/1958 |
08/1913 |
|
|
563 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
273 |
1398 |
14/12/1955 |
08/1913 |
|
|
564 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
273 |
1399 |
18/02/1960 |
08/1913 |
|
|
565 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
273 |
1400 |
19/10/1959 |
08/1913 |
|
|
566 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
275 |
1401 |
24/03/1959 |
09/1913 |
|
|
567 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
275 |
1402 |
12/12/1958 |
09/1913 |
|
|
568 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
275 |
1403 |
01/01/1959 |
09/1913 |
|
|
569 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
275 |
1404 |
18/09/1958 |
09/1913 |
|
|
570 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
275 |
1405 |
13/11/1961 |
09/1913 |
|
|
571 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
275 |
1406 |
09/06/1958 |
09/1913 |
|
|
572 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
275 |
1407 |
01/01/1958 |
10/1913 |
|
|
573 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
275 |
1408 |
26/11/1960 |
10/1913 |
|
|
574 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
275 |
1409 |
12/04/1961 |
10/1913 |
|
|
575 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
275 |
1410 |
14/05/1959 |
12/1913 |
J23 |
|
157 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
276 |
1414 |
20/03/1961 |
12/1913 |
O1 |
|
456 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
274 |
1411 |
24/07/1951 |
12/1913 |
O1 |
|
457 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
274 |
1412 |
17/03/1952 |
01/1914 |
O1 |
|
458 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
274 |
1413 |
08/10/1951 |
01/1914 |
O1 |
|
459 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
274 |
1415 |
15/10/1951 |
02/1914 |
J23 |
|
158 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
276 |
1416 |
27/07/1961 |
02/1914 |
J23 |
|
159 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
276 |
1417 |
23/09/1963 |
02/1914 |
J23 |
|
160 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
276 |
1420 |
05/10/1959 |
02/1914 |
J23 |
|
161 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
276 |
1419 |
22/09/1961 |
02/1914 |
J23 |
|
162 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
276 |
1421 |
28/03/1960 |
02/1914 |
O1 |
|
460 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
274 |
1418 |
16/05/1951 |
03/1914 |
J23 |
|
163 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
276 |
1422 |
23/08/1961 |
03/1914 |
J23 |
|
164 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
276 |
1424 |
05/11/1960 |
03/1914 |
J23 |
|
166 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
276 |
1423 |
04/01/1960 |
04/1914 |
H3 |
|
1640 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
277 |
1425 |
20/08/1957 |
04/1914 |
H3 |
|
1641 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
277 |
1426 |
22/06/1959 |
04/1914 |
H3 |
|
1642 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
277 |
1428 |
10/04/1957 |
04/1914 |
H3 |
|
1643 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
277 |
1429 |
17/10/1957 |
04/1914 |
H3 |
|
1644 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
277 |
1430 |
25/07/1956 |
04/1914 |
J23 |
|
167 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
276 |
1427 |
04/12/1960 |
05/1914 |
H3 |
|
1645 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
277 |
1431 |
21/01/1957 |
05/1914 |
H3 |
|
1646 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
277 |
1432 |
07/05/1957 |
05/1914 |
H3 |
|
1647 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
277 |
1433 |
22/11/1956 |
06/1914 |
H3 |
|
1648 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
277 |
1434 |
03/07/1959 |
06/1914 |
H3 |
|
1649 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
277 |
1435 |
27/02/1959 |
07/1914 |
|
|
576 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
278 |
1436 |
08/07/1958 |
07/1914 |
|
|
577 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
278 |
1437 |
20/06/1962 |
07/1914 |
|
|
578 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
278 |
1438 |
28/07/1958 |
07/1914 |
|
|
579 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
278 |
1439 |
15/08/1959 |
07/1914 |
|
|
580 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
278 |
1440 |
09/10/1959 |
07/1914 |
|
|
581 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
278 |
1441 |
27/01/1958 |
07/1914 |
|
|
582 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
278 |
1442 |
14/02/1961 |
08/1914 |
|
|
583 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
278 |
1443 |
24/01/1961 |
08/1914 |
|
|
584 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
278 |
1444 |
07/07/1961 |
08/1914 |
|
|
585 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
278 |
1445 |
19/12/1959 |
09/1914 |
|
|
586 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
279 |
1446 |
03/12/1959 |
09/1914 |
|
|
587 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
279 |
1447 |
13/04/1961 |
10/1914 |
|
|
588 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
279 |
1448 |
30/11/1959 |
10/1914 |
|
|
589 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
279 |
1449 |
01/10/1959 |
10/1914 |
|
|
590 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
279 |
1450 |
31/10/1959 |
10/1914 |
|
|
591 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
279 |
1451 |
01/08/1960 |
11/1914 |
|
|
592 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
279 |
1452 |
26/11/1959 |
11/1914 |
|
|
593 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
279 |
1453 |
29/08/1955 |
11/1914 |
|
|
594 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
279 |
1454 |
02/06/1958 |
11/1914 |
|
|
595 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
279 |
1455 |
21/05/1958 |
12/1914 |
|
|
168 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
280 |
1456 |
22/01/1962 |
12/1914 |
|
|
169 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
280 |
1457 |
08/10/1960 |
12/1914 |
|
|
170 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
280 |
1458 |
30/09/1960 |
02/1915 |
|
|
171 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
280 |
1459 |
14/04/1961 |
02/1915 |
|
|
172 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
280 |
1460 |
23/09/1963 |
03/1915 |
|
|
173 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
280 |
1461 |
04/12/1960 |
04/1915 |
|
|
174 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
280 |
1462 |
06/05/1959 |
04/1915 |
|
|
175 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
280 |
1463 |
26/04/1961 |
06/1915 |
|
|
176 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
280 |
1464 |
23/09/1963 |
06/1915 |
|
|
178 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
280 |
1465 |
04/04/1960 |
01/1916 |
H3 |
|
1650 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
281 |
1466 |
03/01/1961 |
02/1916 |
H3 |
|
1651 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
281 |
1467 |
11/03/1960 |
05/1916 |
H3 |
|
1652 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
281 |
1469 |
15/05/1962 |
06/1916 |
H3 |
|
1653 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
281 |
1468 |
22/06/1959 |
07/1916 |
H3 |
|
1654 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
281 |
1470 |
07/01/1957 |
10/1916 |
H3 |
|
1655 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
281 |
1471 |
25/11/1960 |
11/1916 |
H3 |
|
1656 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
281 |
1472 |
27/02/1959 |
11/1916 |
H3 |
|
1657 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
281 |
1473 |
05/12/1960 |
12/1916 |
H3 |
|
1658 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
281 |
1474 |
22/06/1959 |
12/1916 |
H3 |
|
1659 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
281 |
1475 |
27/01/1959 |
10/1917 |
|
|
596 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
282 |
1476 |
20/02/1962 |
10/1917 |
|
|
597 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
282 |
1477 |
06/06/1959 |
10/1917 |
|
|
598 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
282 |
1478 |
09/10/1959 |
01/1918 |
|
|
599 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
284 |
1479 |
04/03/1959 |
01/1918 |
|
|
600 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
284 |
1480 |
27/10/1958 |
05/1918 |
|
|
461 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
283 |
1481 |
21/05/1948 |
06/1918 |
H3 |
|
1660 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L698 |
21971 |
22/06/1959 |
06/1918 |
H3 |
|
1661 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L698 |
21972 |
22/06/1959 |
06/1918 |
H3 |
|
1662 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L698 |
21973 |
11/12/1959 |
06/1918 |
H3 |
|
1670 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L699 |
21981 |
13/12/1960 |
06/1918 |
H3 |
|
1671 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L699 |
21982 |
19/01/1961 |
06/1918 |
H3 |
|
1672 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L699 |
21983 |
22/06/1959 |
06/1918 |
H3 |
|
1673 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L699 |
21984 |
06/02/1961 |
07/1918 |
H3 |
|
1663 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L698 |
21974 |
28/09/1959 |
07/1918 |
H3 |
|
1664 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L698 |
21975 |
30/12/1959 |
07/1918 |
H3 |
|
1665 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L698 |
21976 |
18/11/1959 |
07/1918 |
H3 |
|
1666 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L698 |
21977 |
22/06/1962 |
07/1918 |
H3 |
|
1674 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L699 |
21985 |
07/09/1961 |
07/1918 |
H3 |
|
1675 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L699 |
21986 |
01/05/1958 |
08/1918 |
H3 |
|
1667 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L698 |
21978 |
24/02/1959 |
08/1918 |
H3 |
|
1668 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L698 |
21979 |
01/06/1959 |
08/1918 |
H3 |
|
1669 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L698 |
21980 |
01/01/1960 |
08/1918 |
H3 |
|
1676 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L699 |
21987 |
23/01/1961 |
08/1918 |
H3 |
|
1677 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L699 |
21988 |
06/01/1961 |
08/1918 |
H3 |
|
1678 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L699 |
21989 |
26/01/1959 |
08/1918 |
H3 |
|
1679 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L699 |
21990 |
02/09/1960 |
10/1918 |
|
|
601 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
285 |
1482 |
08/10/1959 |
11/1918 |
|
|
602 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
285 |
1483 |
04/10/1960 |
11/1918 |
|
|
603 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
285 |
1484 |
08/07/1958 |
02/1919 |
|
|
604 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
285 |
1485 |
14/05/1962 |
02/1919 |
|
|
605 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
285 |
1486 |
21/10/1959 |
03/1919 |
|
|
606 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
285 |
1487 |
18/08/1958 |
04/1919 |
O1 |
|
462 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L705 |
22060 |
26/03/1951 |
04/1919 |
O1 |
|
463 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L705 |
22061 |
02/04/1951 |
04/1919 |
|
|
607 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
285 |
1488 |
29/04/1960 |
04/1919 |
|
|
608 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
285 |
1489 |
06/06/1960 |
04/1919 |
|
|
609 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
285 |
1490 |
13/05/1959 |
05/1919 |
O1 |
|
464 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L705 |
22062 |
21/01/1952 |
05/1919 |
O1 |
|
465 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L705 |
22063 |
02/04/1951 |
05/1919 |
O1 |
|
466 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L705 |
22064 |
16/12/1952 |
05/1919 |
|
|
610 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
285 |
1491 |
31/08/1959 |
06/1919 |
|
|
211 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
289 |
1492 |
26/11/1962 |
06/1919 |
|
|
212 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
289 |
1493 |
22/11/1960 |
06/1919 |
O1 |
|
467 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L705 |
22065 |
26/09/1951 |
06/1919 |
O1 |
|
468 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L705 |
22066 |
05/02/1951 |
06/1919 |
O1 |
|
469 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L705 |
22067 |
04/07/1947 |
06/1919 |
O1 |
|
470 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L705 |
22068 |
22/02/1952 |
06/1919 |
O1 |
|
471 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L705 |
22069 |
22/07/1948 |
07/1919 |
|
|
213 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
289 |
1494 |
14/09/1959 |
07/1919 |
|
|
214 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
289 |
1495 |
29/08/1960 |
07/1919 |
|
|
215 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
289 |
1496 |
12/11/1960 |
07/1919 |
|
|
216 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
289 |
1497 |
04/10/1960 |
07/1919 |
|
|
217 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
289 |
1498 |
10/04/1961 |
08/1919 |
|
|
218 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
289 |
1499 |
05/1965 |
08/1919 |
|
|
219 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
289 |
1500 |
20/07/1961 |
08/1919 |
|
|
220 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
289 |
1501 |
21/09/1959 |
10/1919 |
O1 |
|
472 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L709 |
22099 |
19/06/1947 |
10/1919 |
O1 |
|
473 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L709 |
22100 |
18/12/1950 |
10/1919 |
O1 |
|
474 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L709 |
22101 |
10/05/1947 |
10/1919 |
O1 |
|
475 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L709 |
22102 |
19/02/1951 |
10/1919 |
O1 |
|
476 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L709 |
22103 |
05/03/1948 |
12/1919 |
|
|
621 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
287 |
1502 |
01/03/1961 |
12/1919 |
|
|
622 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
287 |
1503 |
26/03/1959 |
12/1919 |
|
|
623 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
287 |
1504 |
16/02/1959 |
12/1919 |
|
|
624 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
287 |
1505 |
08/07/1958 |
01/1920 |
|
|
625 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
287 |
1506 |
28/01/1958 |
02/1920 |
|
|
626 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
287 |
1507 |
07/07/1961 |
02/1920 |
|
|
627 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
287 |
1508 |
29/04/1959 |
03/1920 |
H4 |
|
1000 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
290 |
1509 |
13/07/1962 |
03/1920 |
|
|
628 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
287 |
1510 |
28/07/1958 |
05/1920 |
|
|
629 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
287 |
1511 |
18/01/1961 |
05/1920 |
|
|
630 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
287 |
1512 |
31/10/1959 |
06/1920 |
H4 |
|
1001 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
290 |
1513 |
17/04/1962 |
09/1920 |
H4 |
|
1002 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
290 |
1514 |
07/03/1960 |
10/1920 |
H4 |
|
1003 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
290 |
1515 |
13/07/1961 |
12/1920 |
H4 |
|
1004 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
290 |
1516 |
31/03/1962 |
12/1920 |
H4 |
|
1005 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
290 |
1517 |
16/09/1962 |
12/1920 |
|
|
1606 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
292 |
1518 |
06/07/1959 |
12/1920 |
|
|
1721 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22577 |
01/08/1957 |
12/1920 |
|
|
1722 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22578 |
20/11/1957 |
12/1920 |
|
|
1723 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22579 |
12/05/1958 |
12/1920 |
|
|
1724 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22580 |
03/01/1957 |
12/1920 |
|
|
1725 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22581 |
23/09/1962 |
12/1920 |
|
|
1726 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22582 |
10/11/1960 |
12/1920 |
|
|
1727 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22583 |
31/05/1961 |
12/1920 |
|
|
1728 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22584 |
22/04/1960 |
01/1921 |
|
|
1729 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22585 |
03/12/1959 |
01/1921 |
|
|
1730 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22586 |
22/10/1960 |
01/1921 |
|
|
1731 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22587 |
04/11/1959 |
01/1921 |
|
|
1732 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22588 |
15/12/1960 |
01/1921 |
|
|
1733 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22589 |
24/07/1962 |
01/1921 |
|
|
1734 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22590 |
29/05/1961 |
02/1921 |
|
|
1735 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22591 |
22/09/1955 |
02/1921 |
|
|
1736 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22592 |
22/07/1959 |
02/1921 |
|
|
1737 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22593 |
26/01/1961 |
02/1921 |
|
|
1738 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22594 |
08/08/1959 |
02/1921 |
|
|
1739 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22595 |
16/01/1961 |
02/1921 |
|
|
1740 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22596 |
10/1957 |
02/1921 |
|
|
1741 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22597 |
23/09/1962 |
02/1921 |
|
|
1742 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22598 |
01/06/1961 |
02/1921 |
|
|
1743 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22599 |
23/11/1959 |
02/1921 |
|
|
1744 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22600 |
16/09/1962 |
02/1921 |
|
|
1745 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22601 |
02/11/1959 |
02/1921 |
|
|
1746 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22602 |
04/03/1959 |
03/1921 |
|
|
1747 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22603 |
10/08/1959 |
03/1921 |
|
|
1748 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22604 |
11/06/1958 |
03/1921 |
|
|
1749 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22605 |
25/11/1959 |
03/1921 |
|
|
1750 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22606 |
23/09/1962 |
03/1921 |
|
|
1751 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22607 |
12/1959 |
03/1921 |
|
|
1752 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22608 |
07/07/1961 |
03/1921 |
|
|
1753 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22609 |
02/06/1959 |
03/1921 |
|
|
1754 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22610 |
26/09/1961 |
03/1921 |
|
|
1755 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22611 |
09/02/1959 |
03/1921 |
|
|
1756 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22612 |
16/09/1962 |
03/1921 |
|
|
1757 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22613 |
02/06/1959 |
03/1921 |
|
|
1758 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22614 |
27/04/1959 |
04/1921 |
H4 |
|
1006 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
290 |
1520 |
07/03/1960 |
04/1921 |
|
|
1607 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
292 |
1519 |
26/01/1959 |
04/1921 |
|
|
1759 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22615 |
16/09/1962 |
04/1921 |
|
|
1760 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22616 |
06/07/1959 |
04/1921 |
|
|
1761 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22617 |
21/07/1960 |
04/1921 |
|
|
1762 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22618 |
06/08/1959 |
04/1921 |
|
|
1763 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22619 |
06/04/1959 |
04/1921 |
|
|
1764 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22620 |
11/09/1961 |
04/1921 |
|
|
1765 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22621 |
08/12/1958 |
04/1921 |
|
|
1766 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22622 |
20/07/1959 |
04/1921 |
|
|
1767 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22623 |
23/09/1962 |
04/1921 |
|
|
1768 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22624 |
10/06/1959 |
04/1921 |
|
|
1769 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22625 |
24/07/1959 |
04/1921 |
|
|
1770 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L734 |
22626 |
12/09/1961 |
04/1921 |
|
|
477 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L742 |
22691 |
05/11/1962 |
04/1921 |
|
|
478 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L742 |
22692 |
29/12/1962 |
05/1921 |
H4 |
|
1007 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
290 |
1522 |
04/11/1962 |
05/1921 |
|
|
1608 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
292 |
1521 |
26/11/1959 |
06/1921 |
|
|
1609 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
292 |
1523 |
09/12/1958 |
06/1921 |
|
|
1610 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
292 |
1524 |
13/01/1958 |
06/1921 |
H3 |
|
1680 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Kitson |
492T |
5330 |
08/07/1959 |
06/1921 |
H3 |
|
1681 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Kitson |
492T |
5331 |
16/12/1960 |
06/1921 |
H3 |
|
1682 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Kitson |
492T |
5332 |
25/11/1959 |
06/1921 |
H3 |
|
1683 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Kitson |
492T |
5333 |
23/12/1960 |
06/1921 |
H3 |
|
1684 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Kitson |
492T |
5334 |
16/04/1958 |
06/1921 |
H3 |
|
1685 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Kitson |
492T |
5335 |
02/05/1958 |
06/1921 |
H3 |
|
1686 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Kitson |
492T |
5336 |
23/03/1959 |
06/1921 |
H3 |
|
1687 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Kitson |
492T |
5337 |
11/05/1959 |
06/1921 |
|
|
479 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L742 |
22693 |
03/11/1963 |
06/1921 |
|
|
480 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L742 |
22694 |
08/09/1963 |
06/1921 |
|
|
481 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L742 |
22695 |
22/09/1963 |
06/1921 |
|
|
482 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L742 |
22696 |
22/09/1963 |
07/1921 |
H4 |
|
1008 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
290 |
1526 |
25/09/1961 |
07/1921 |
|
|
1611 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
292 |
1525 |
25/09/1958 |
07/1921 |
H3 |
|
1688 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Kitson |
492T |
5338 |
09/10/1959 |
07/1921 |
H3 |
|
1689 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Kitson |
492T |
5339 |
13/05/1960 |
07/1921 |
H3 |
|
1690 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Kitson |
492T |
5340 |
21/10/1959 |
07/1921 |
H3 |
|
1691 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Kitson |
492T |
5341 |
12/12/1958 |
07/1921 |
H3 |
|
1692 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Kitson |
492T |
5342 |
13/06/1960 |
07/1921 |
H3 |
|
1693 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Kitson |
492T |
5343 |
17/06/1959 |
07/1921 |
H3 |
|
1694 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Kitson |
492T |
5344 |
24/03/1961 |
07/1921 |
H3 |
|
1695 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Kitson |
492T |
5345 |
23/04/1959 |
07/1921 |
H3 |
|
1696 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Kitson |
492T |
5346 |
07/12/1959 |
07/1921 |
|
|
483 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L742 |
22697 |
08/09/1963 |
07/1921 |
|
|
484 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L742 |
22698 |
09/07/1962 |
07/1921 |
|
|
485 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L742 |
22699 |
29/12/1962 |
07/1921 |
|
|
486 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L742 |
22700 |
22/09/1963 |
08/1921 |
H4 |
|
1009 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
290 |
1529 |
03/03/1962 |
08/1921 |
|
|
1612 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
292 |
1527 |
14/04/1958 |
08/1921 |
|
|
1613 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
292 |
1528 |
17/03/1958 |
08/1921 |
|
|
1614 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
292 |
1530 |
11/09/1961 |
08/1921 |
|
|
1615 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
292 |
1531 |
15/09/1958 |
08/1921 |
H3 |
|
1697 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Kitson |
492T |
5347 |
29/10/1959 |
08/1921 |
H3 |
|
1698 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Kitson |
492T |
5348 |
26/06/1961 |
08/1921 |
H3 |
|
1699 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Kitson |
492T |
5349 |
30/09/1959 |
08/1921 |
H3 |
|
1700 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Kitson |
492T |
5350 |
03/11/1959 |
08/1921 |
H3 |
|
1701 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Kitson |
492T |
5351 |
22/03/1960 |
08/1921 |
H3 |
|
1702 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Kitson |
492T |
5352 |
02/09/1960 |
08/1921 |
H3 |
|
1703 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Kitson |
492T |
5353 |
11/02/1959 |
09/1921 |
H3 |
|
1704 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Kitson |
492T |
5354 |
29/07/1960 |
12/1921 |
|
|
631 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
291 |
1532 |
11/04/1960 |
12/1921 |
|
|
632 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
291 |
1533 |
03/10/1958 |
12/1921 |
|
|
633 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
291 |
1534 |
02/09/1959 |
03/1922 |
|
|
634 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
291 |
1535 |
19/12/1959 |
11/04/1922 |
|
|
1470 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
293 |
1536 |
19/11/1962 |
06/1922 |
|
|
635 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
291 |
1537 |
02/12/1958 |
06/1922 |
|
|
636 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
291 |
1538 |
04/08/1958 |
07/1922 |
|
|
637 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
291 |
1540 |
24/10/1958 |
10/07/1922 |
|
|
1471 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
293 |
1539 |
14/11/1961 |
08/1922 |
|
|
638 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
291 |
1541 |
20/06/1962 |
08/1922 |
|
|
639 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
291 |
1542 |
02/03/1961 |
09/1922 |
|
|
640 |
0-6-0 |
H. Ivatt |
Doncaster Works |
291 |
1543 |
31/08/1959 |
10/1922 |
|
|
221 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
296 |
1544 |
20/07/1961 |
11/1922 |
|
|
222 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
296 |
1545 |
26/04/1961 |
11/1922 |
|
|
223 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
296 |
1546 |
23/09/1963 |
11/1922 |
|
|
224 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
296 |
1547 |
13/12/1961 |
11/1922 |
|
|
225 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
296 |
1548 |
14/02/1961 |
12/1922 |
|
|
226 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
296 |
1549 |
18/03/1963 |
12/1922 |
|
|
227 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
296 |
1550 |
13/02/1962 |
12/1922 |
|
|
228 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
296 |
1551 |
17/04/1961 |
12/1922 |
|
|
229 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
296 |
1552 |
09/1962 |
12/1922 |
|
|
230 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
296 |
1553 |
02/05/1961 |
24/02/1923 |
|
|
1472 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
297 |
1564 |
15/01/1963 |
17/03/1923 |
|
|
1473 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
297 |
1565 |
07/12/1959 |
24/03/1923 |
|
|
1474 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
297 |
1566 |
16/06/1963 |
28/04/1923 |
|
|
1475 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
297 |
1567 |
26/12/1964 |
26/05/1923 |
|
|
1476 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
297 |
1568 |
01/09/1963 |
16/06/1923 |
|
|
1477 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
297 |
1569 |
19/10/1963 |
30/06/1923 |
|
|
1478 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
297 |
1570 |
29/12/1962 |
25/07/1923 |
|
|
1479 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
297 |
1571 |
23/05/1963 |
17/08/1923 |
|
|
1480 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
297 |
1572 |
29/12/1962 |
08/09/1923 |
|
|
1481 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
297 |
1573 |
26/12/1964 |
01/11/1923 |
|
|
487 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1574 |
22/09/1963 |
03/11/1923 |
|
|
488 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1575 |
29/12/1962 |
14/11/1923 |
|
|
489 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1576 |
16/07/1962 |
30/11/1923 |
|
|
490 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1577 |
08/09/1963 |
05/12/1923 |
|
|
491 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1578 |
22/09/1963 |
15/12/1923 |
|
|
492 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1579 |
08/09/1963 |
22/12/1923 |
|
|
493 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1580 |
08/09/1963 |
29/12/1923 |
|
|
494 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1581 |
22/09/1963 |
02/1924 |
|
|
3231 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
300 |
1583 |
06/02/1961 |
02/1924 |
|
|
3232 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
300 |
1586 |
25/08/1961 |
06/02/1924 |
|
|
495 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1582 |
22/09/1963 |
23/02/1924 |
|
|
3496 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1584 |
03/09/1963 |
03/1924 |
|
|
3233 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
300 |
1585 |
12/12/1961 |
03/1924 |
|
|
3234 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
300 |
1588 |
12/12/1961 |
03/1924 |
|
|
3235 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
300 |
1590 |
23/09/1963 |
22/03/1924 |
|
|
3497 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1587 |
08/09/1963 |
29/03/1924 |
|
|
3498 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1589 |
22/09/1963 |
04/1924 |
|
|
3236 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
300 |
1591 |
23/09/1963 |
04/1924 |
|
|
3237 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
300 |
1593 |
26/04/1961 |
26/04/1924 |
|
|
3499 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1592 |
03/04/1961 |
05/1924 |
|
|
3238 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
300 |
1596 |
23/09/1963 |
05/1924 |
|
|
3239 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
300 |
1597 |
05/10/1959 |
22/05/1924 |
|
|
500 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1594 |
22/09/1963 |
06/1924 |
|
|
3240 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
300 |
1599 |
29/10/1962 |
07/06/1924 |
|
|
3501 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1595 |
07/04/1963 |
28/06/1924 |
|
|
2543 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
301 |
1598 |
16/06/1963 |
09/07/1924 |
|
|
2563 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L787 |
23101 |
04/09/1961 |
14/07/1924 |
|
|
2564 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L787 |
23102 |
28/06/1964 |
16/07/1924 |
|
|
2565 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L787 |
23103 |
08/09/1963 |
26/07/1924 |
|
|
2544 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
301 |
1600 |
23/11/1964 |
08/1924 |
H4 |
|
17 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1235 |
15/08/1962 |
08/1924 |
H4 |
|
28 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1236 |
04/11/1962 |
08/1924 |
H4 |
|
32 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1237 |
16/09/1962 |
09/08/1924 |
|
|
2545 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
301 |
1601 |
16/06/1963 |
14/08/1924 |
|
|
2566 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L787 |
23104 |
29/12/1962 |
14/08/1924 |
|
|
2567 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L787 |
23105 |
27/08/1962 |
30/08/1924 |
|
|
2546 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
301 |
1602 |
08/04/1963 |
30/08/1924 |
|
|
2547 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
301 |
1603 |
08/09/1963 |
09/1924 |
H4 |
|
33 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1238 |
09/04/1962 |
09/1924 |
H4 |
|
36 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1239 |
27/12/1961 |
19/09/1924 |
|
|
2568 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L787 |
23106 |
01/10/1962 |
24/09/1924 |
|
|
2569 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L787 |
23107 |
04/05/1964 |
27/09/1924 |
|
|
2548 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
301 |
1604 |
29/12/1962 |
27/09/1924 |
|
|
2570 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L787 |
23108 |
12/10/1964 |
30/09/1924 |
|
|
2571 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L787 |
23109 |
22/10/1962 |
10/1924 |
H4 |
|
38 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1240 |
11/07/1960 |
10/1924 |
H4 |
|
39 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1241 |
31/05/1962 |
10/1924 |
H4 |
|
46 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1242 |
16/09/1962 |
10/1924 |
H4 |
|
52 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1243 |
05/03/1962 |
10/1924 |
H4 |
|
53 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1244 |
17/12/1962 |
10/1924 |
H4 |
|
58 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1245 |
04/11/1962 |
10/1924 |
H4 |
|
69 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1246 |
16/09/1962 |
10/1924 |
H4 |
|
73 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1247 |
04/11/1962 |
03/10/1924 |
|
|
2572 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L787 |
23110 |
19/08/1963 |
08/10/1924 |
|
|
2573 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L787 |
23111 |
08/04/1963 |
11/10/1924 |
|
|
2574 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L787 |
23112 |
13/01/1964 |
14/10/1924 |
|
|
2575 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L787 |
23113 |
29/10/1962 |
19/10/1924 |
|
|
2576 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L787 |
23114 |
13/07/1964 |
24/10/1924 |
|
|
2577 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L787 |
23115 |
22/10/1962 |
25/10/1924 |
|
|
2549 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
301 |
1605 |
11/06/1963 |
29/10/1924 |
|
|
2578 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L787 |
23116 |
11/09/1961 |
11/1924 |
H4 |
|
109 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1252 |
16/09/1962 |
11/1924 |
H4 |
|
111 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1253 |
20/03/1961 |
11/1924 |
H4 |
|
75 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1248 |
29/12/1959 |
11/1924 |
H4 |
|
80 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1249 |
05/07/1961 |
11/1924 |
H4 |
|
91 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1250 |
16/09/1962 |
11/1924 |
H4 |
|
92 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1251 |
16/09/1962 |
03/11/1924 |
|
|
2579 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L787 |
23117 |
12/10/1964 |
09/11/1924 |
|
|
2580 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L787 |
23118 |
01/10/1962 |
12/11/1924 |
|
|
2550 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
301 |
1606 |
23/11/1964 |
29/11/1924 |
|
|
2551 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
301 |
1607 |
17/01/1966 |
30/11/1924 |
|
|
2581 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L787 |
23119 |
02/09/1963 |
12/1924 |
H4 |
|
112 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1254 |
28/02/1962 |
12/1924 |
H4 |
|
113 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1255 |
04/11/1962 |
12/1924 |
H4 |
|
114 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1256 |
16/09/1962 |
12/1924 |
H4 |
|
116 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1257 |
03/11/1962 |
12/1924 |
H4 |
|
118 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1258 |
20/09/1961 |
12/1924 |
H4 |
|
120 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1259 |
15/05/1962 |
06/12/1924 |
|
|
2582 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L787 |
23120 |
18/05/1964 |
11/12/1924 |
|
|
2552 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
301 |
1608 |
27/05/1963 |
31/12/1924 |
|
|
2553 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
302 |
1609 |
28/06/1964 |
31/12/1924 |
|
|
2554 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
302 |
1610 |
04/09/1961 |
01/1925 |
H4 |
|
121 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1260 |
16/09/1962 |
01/1925 |
H4 |
|
125 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1261 |
08/02/1960 |
01/1925 |
H4 |
|
126 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1262 |
27/04/1962 |
01/1925 |
H4 |
|
127 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1263 |
21/03/1960 |
01/1925 |
H4 |
|
134 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1264 |
09/01/1962 |
02/1925 |
H4 |
|
135 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1265 |
16/09/1962 |
02/1925 |
H4 |
|
140 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1266 |
31/03/1962 |
02/1925 |
H4 |
|
141 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1267 |
21/08/1961 |
02/1925 |
H4 |
|
143 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1268 |
03/11/1962 |
02/1925 |
H4 |
|
146 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1269 |
05/06/1961 |
02/1925 |
H4 |
|
153 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1270 |
16/09/1962 |
02/1925 |
H4 |
|
156 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1271 |
17/12/1962 |
02/1925 |
H4 |
|
158 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1272 |
10/12/1962 |
02/1925 |
|
|
2584 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
6211 |
03/12/1958 |
07/02/1925 |
|
|
2555 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
302 |
1611 |
13/05/1963 |
18/02/1925 |
|
|
2556 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
302 |
1612 |
28/10/1963 |
28/02/1925 |
|
|
2557 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
302 |
1613 |
19/06/1963 |
03/1925 |
H4 |
|
159 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1273 |
16/09/1962 |
03/1925 |
H4 |
|
163 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1274 |
17/04/1961 |
03/1925 |
H4 |
|
167 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1275 |
30/06/1961 |
03/1925 |
H4 |
|
170 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1276 |
25/11/1961 |
03/1925 |
H4 |
|
178 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1277 |
18/07/1961 |
03/1925 |
H4 |
|
180 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1278 |
18/12/1962 |
03/1925 |
H4 |
|
184 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1279 |
29/10/1962 |
03/1925 |
H4 |
|
186 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1280 |
06/07/1959 |
03/1925 |
H4 |
|
188 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1281 |
17/12/1962 |
03/1925 |
|
|
2585 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
6212 |
09/05/1960 |
03/1925 |
|
|
2586 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
6213 |
03/12/1959 |
03/1925 |
|
|
2587 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
6214 |
10/06/1958 |
03/1925 |
|
|
2588 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
6215 |
06/04/1959 |
03/1925 |
|
|
2589 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
6216 |
18/12/1959 |
03/1925 |
|
|
2591 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
6218 |
03/06/1957 |
03/1925 |
|
|
2592 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
6219 |
18/07/1957 |
25/03/1925 |
|
|
2558 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
302 |
1614 |
17/12/1962 |
28/03/1925 |
|
|
2559 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
302 |
1615 |
23/09/1963 |
04/1925 |
H4 |
|
191 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1282 |
03/12/1962 |
04/1925 |
H4 |
|
195 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1283 |
26/04/1961 |
04/1925 |
H4 |
|
200 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1284 |
04/11/1962 |
04/1925 |
|
|
2590 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
6217 |
17/06/1957 |
04/1925 |
|
|
2593 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
6220 |
18/10/1960 |
04/1925 |
|
|
2594 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
6221 |
25/05/1961 |
17/04/1925 |
|
|
2560 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
302 |
1616 |
08/09/1963 |
05/1925 |
|
|
2583 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
?? |
6210 |
02/09/1958 |
30/05/1925 |
|
|
256l |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
302 |
1617 |
26/12/1964 |
27/06/1925 |
|
|
2562 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
302 |
1618 |
28/06/1964 |
08/1925 |
H4 |
|
202 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1286 |
12/01/1962 |
08/1925 |
H4 |
|
203 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1285 |
16/11/1961 |
08/1925 |
H4 |
|
204 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1287 |
16/01/1962 |
09/1925 |
H4 |
|
206 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1288 |
06/06/1960 |
09/1925 |
H4 |
|
207 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1289 |
16/09/1962 |
09/1925 |
H4 |
|
208 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1290 |
06/1961 |
10/1925 |
H4 |
|
227 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1291 |
19/10/1961 |
10/1925 |
H4 |
|
228 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1292 |
04/11/1962 |
10/1925 |
H4 |
|
229 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1293 |
10/05/1962 |
11/1925 |
|
|
892 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
305 |
1622 |
12/01/1956 |
11/1925 |
|
|
893 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
305 |
1623 |
22/04/1960 |
11/1925 |
|
|
894 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
305 |
1625 |
24/06/1961 |
12/1925 |
H4 |
|
231 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1294 |
03/12/1962 |
12/1925 |
|
|
895 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
305 |
1628 |
17/04/1958 |
12/1925 |
|
|
896 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
305 |
1629 |
17/06/1957 |
12/1925 |
|
|
897 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
305 |
1632 |
28/04/1959 |
03/1926 |
|
|
583 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
306 |
1637 |
15/09/1958 |
03/1926 |
|
|
586 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
306 |
1638 |
13/12/1961 |
04/1926 |
|
|
588 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
306 |
1639 |
19/09/1958 |
04/1926 |
|
|
589 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
306 |
1640 |
20/02/1961 |
04/1926 |
|
|
591 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
306 |
1641 |
17/09/1960 |
04/1926 |
|
|
593 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
306 |
1642 |
21/04/1961 |
04/1926 |
|
|
594 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
306 |
1643 |
23/02/1961 |
05/1926 |
|
|
596 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
306 |
1644 |
20/02/1961 |
05/1926 |
|
|
601 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
306 |
1645 |
15/11/1961 |
06/1926 |
|
|
603 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
306 |
1646 |
14/04/1959 |
08/1926 |
|
|
609 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
307 |
1647 |
23/09/1961 |
08/1926 |
|
|
610 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
307 |
1648 |
03/07/1961 |
08/1926 |
|
|
616 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
307 |
1649 |
17/08/1960 |
08/1926 |
|
|
617 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
307 |
1650 |
24/07/1959 |
08/1926 |
|
|
618 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
307 |
1651 |
18/08/1960 |
09/1926 |
|
|
621 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
307 |
1652 |
08/12/1959 |
09/1926 |
|
|
622 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
307 |
1653 |
17/08/1960 |
09/1926 |
|
|
635 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
307 |
1654 |
24/08/1960 |
10/1926 |
|
|
636 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
307 |
1655 |
21/03/1960 |
11/1926 |
|
|
1037 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
308 |
1656 |
31/08/1961 |
11/1926 |
|
|
1041 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
308 |
1657 |
25/07/1961 |
11/1926 |
|
|
1045 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
308 |
1658 |
09/1962 |
12/1926 |
|
|
1058 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
308 |
1659 |
16/06/1961 |
12/1926 |
|
|
1063 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
308 |
1660 |
13/02/1962 |
12/1926 |
|
|
1068 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
308 |
1661 |
01/10/1962 |
12/1926 |
|
|
1069 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
308 |
1662 |
23/09/1963 |
12/1926 |
|
|
1070 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
308 |
1663 |
01/08/1961 |
01/1927 |
|
|
1074 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
308 |
1664 |
16/06/1959 |
01/1927 |
|
|
1079 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
308 |
1665 |
26/04/1961 |
03/1927 |
|
|
1081 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
309 |
1666 |
22/02/1960 |
04/1927 |
|
|
1082 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
309 |
1667 |
19/04/1961 |
05/1927 |
|
|
1086 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
309 |
1668 |
09/1962 |
22/08/1928 |
|
|
2743 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
314 |
1693 |
14/10/1963 |
23/08/1928 |
|
|
2744 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
314 |
1694 |
28/10/1963 |
09/1928 |
|
|
2682 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Yorkshire Engine Company |
?? |
2220 |
29/02/1960 |
08/09/1928 |
|
|
2745 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
314 |
1695 |
12/10/1964 |
10/1928 |
|
|
2662 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Hawthorn Leslie |
?? |
3691 |
16/09/1962 |
10/1928 |
|
|
2663 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Hawthorn Leslie |
?? |
3692 |
23/03/1959 |
10/1928 |
|
|
2664 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Hawthorn Leslie |
?? |
3693 |
15/12/1959 |
10/1928 |
|
|
2683 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Yorkshire Engine Company |
?? |
2221 |
07/03/1960 |
26/10/1928 |
|
|
2746 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
314 |
1700 |
12/10/1964 |
11/1928 |
|
|
2665 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Hawthorn Leslie |
?? |
3694 |
01/06/1961 |
11/1928 |
|
|
2666 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Hawthorn Leslie |
?? |
3695 |
11/03/1961 |
11/1928 |
|
|
2667 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Hawthorn Leslie |
?? |
3696 |
24/11/1958 |
11/1928 |
|
|
2668 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Hawthorn Leslie |
?? |
3697 |
14/02/1961 |
11/1928 |
|
|
2669 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Hawthorn Leslie |
?? |
3698 |
16/09/1962 |
11/1928 |
|
|
2684 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Yorkshire Engine Company |
?? |
2222 |
03/06/1957 |
24/11/1928 |
|
|
2747 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
314 |
1703 |
28/04/1962 |
12/1928 |
|
|
2670 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Hawthorn Leslie |
?? |
3699 |
22/07/1959 |
12/1928 |
|
|
2671 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Hawthorn Leslie |
?? |
3700 |
05/05/1959 |
12/1928 |
|
|
2685 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Yorkshire Engine Company |
?? |
2223 |
05/08/1959 |
12/1928 |
|
|
2686 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Yorkshire Engine Company |
?? |
2224 |
23/09/1961 |
20/12/1928 |
|
|
2748 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
314 |
1705 |
24/02/1964 |
01/1929 |
|
|
2672 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Hawthorn Leslie |
?? |
3701 |
25/11/1959 |
01/1929 |
|
|
2687 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Yorkshire Engine Company |
?? |
2225 |
16/09/1962 |
01/1929 |
|
|
2688 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Yorkshire Engine Company |
?? |
2226 |
02/01/1960 |
26/01/1929 |
|
|
2749 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
314 |
1707 |
10/04/1961 |
02/1929 |
|
|
2673 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Hawthorn Leslie |
?? |
3702 |
16/09/1962 |
02/1929 |
|
|
2689 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Yorkshire Engine Company |
?? |
2227 |
19/10/1957 |
23/02/1929 |
|
|
2750 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
314 |
l708 |
09/09/1963 |
03/1929 |
|
|
2674 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Hawthorn Leslie |
?? |
3703 |
11/09/1961 |
03/1929 |
|
|
2675 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Hawthorn Leslie |
?? |
3704 |
01/12/1960 |
03/1929 |
|
|
2676 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Hawthorn Leslie |
?? |
3705 |
26/09/1960 |
03/1929 |
|
|
2677 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Hawthorn Leslie |
?? |
3706 |
16/09/1962 |
03/1929 |
|
|
2678 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Hawthorn Leslie |
?? |
3707 |
10/07/1959 |
03/1929 |
|
|
2690 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Yorkshire Engine Company |
?? |
2228 |
02/09/1960 |
07/03/1929 |
|
|
2751 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
314 |
1709 |
24/08/1963 |
04/1929 |
H4 |
|
1300 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
315 |
1711 |
12/07/1962 |
04/1929 |
|
|
2679 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Hawthorn Leslie |
?? |
3708 |
23/09/1961 |
20/04/1929 |
|
|
2752 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
314 |
l7l0 |
28/10/1963 |
05/1929 |
H4 |
|
1312 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
315 |
1712 |
03/12/1962 |
05/1929 |
|
|
2680 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Hawthorn Leslie |
?? |
3709 |
03/03/1961 |
05/1929 |
|
|
2681 |
0-6-2T |
N. Gresley |
Hawthorn Leslie |
?? |
3710 |
11/07/1960 |
06/1929 |
H4 |
|
1318 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
315 |
1713 |
03/12/1962 |
06/1929 |
H4 |
|
1331 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
315 |
1714 |
08/05/1962 |
07/1929 |
H4 |
|
1345 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
315 |
1715 |
22/05/1961 |
07/1929 |
H4 |
|
1364 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
315 |
1716 |
10/12/1962 |
07/1929 |
H4 |
|
1365 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
315 |
1717 |
17/09/1959 |
08/1929 |
H4 |
|
1367 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
315 |
1718 |
24/07/1962 |
08/1929 |
H4 |
|
1368 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
315 |
1719 |
06/08/1959 |
09/1929 |
H4 |
|
1386 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
315 |
1720 |
16/06/1959 |
10/1929 |
H4 |
|
1387 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
316 |
1721 |
16/09/1962 |
10/1929 |
H4 |
|
1388 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
316 |
1722 |
21/04/1960 |
10/1929 |
H4 |
|
1389 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
316 |
1723 |
28/05/1960 |
10/1929 |
H4 |
|
1391 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
316 |
1724 |
03/12/1962 |
11/1929 |
H4 |
|
1392 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
316 |
1725 |
23/07/1962 |
11/1929 |
H4 |
|
1394 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
316 |
1726 |
03/11/1959 |
11/1929 |
H4 |
|
1395 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
316 |
1727 |
16/09/1962 |
11/1929 |
H4 |
|
1396 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
316 |
1728 |
02/03/1962 |
12/1929 |
H4 |
|
1397 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
316 |
1729 |
25/09/1961 |
12/1929 |
H4 |
|
1398 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
316 |
1730 |
04/11/1962 |
22/02/1930 |
|
|
2595 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
317 |
1731 |
23/11/1964 |
22/02/1930 |
|
|
2596 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
317 |
1733 |
12/10/1964 |
03/1930 |
|
|
2789 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
318 |
1732 |
16/09/1962 |
03/1930 |
|
|
2790 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
318 |
1734 |
21/07/1959 |
03/1930 |
|
|
2791 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
318 |
1735 |
03/08/1959 |
04/1930 |
|
|
2792 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
318 |
1737 |
29/07/1961 |
04/1930 |
|
|
2793 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
318 |
1739 |
09/1962 |
04/1930 |
|
|
2794 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
318 |
1740 |
23/09/1963 |
07/04/1930 |
|
|
2597 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
317 |
1736 |
18/11/1963 |
19/04/1930 |
|
|
2795 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
317 |
1738 |
28/10/1963 |
17/05/1930 |
|
|
2796 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
317 |
1741 |
19/06/1965 |
04/06/1930 |
|
|
2797 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
317 |
1742 |
11/04/1963 |
14/06/1930 |
|
|
2598 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
317 |
1743 |
28/10/1963 |
07/1930 |
H4 |
|
2761 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1495 |
16/09/1962 |
07/1930 |
H4 |
|
2762 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1496 |
12/09/1961 |
07/1930 |
H4 |
|
2763 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1497 |
30/10/1961 |
07/1930 |
H4 |
|
2764 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1498 |
17/12/1962 |
07/1930 |
H4 |
|
2765 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1499 |
30/10/1961 |
07/1930 |
H4 |
|
2766 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1500 |
18/07/1962 |
12/07/1930 |
|
|
2599 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
317 |
1744 |
14/10/1963 |
08/1930 |
H4 |
|
2767 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1501 |
14/05/1962 |
08/1930 |
H4 |
|
2768 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1502 |
17/12/1962 |
08/1930 |
H4 |
|
2769 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1503 |
07/02/1959 |
03/1931 |
H4 |
|
1100 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L86 |
1111 |
18/12/1962 |
03/1931 |
H4 |
|
1101 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L86 |
1112 |
04/03/1960 |
03/1931 |
H4 |
|
1102 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L86 |
1113 |
27/12/1961 |
03/1931 |
H4 |
|
1106 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L86 |
1114 |
03/07/1961 |
03/1931 |
H4 |
|
1117 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L86 |
1116 |
05/06/1961 |
03/1931 |
H4 |
|
1118 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L86 |
1117 |
04/11/1962 |
04/1931 |
H4 |
|
1108 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L86 |
1115 |
23/11/1961 |
04/1931 |
H4 |
|
1119 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L86 |
1118 |
17/12/1962 |
04/1931 |
H4 |
|
1121 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L86 |
1119 |
16/09/1962 |
04/1931 |
H4 |
|
1125 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L86 |
1120 |
19/01/1962 |
04/1931 |
H4 |
|
1133 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L86 |
1121 |
01/04/1960 |
04/1931 |
H4 |
|
1135 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L86 |
1122 |
21/07/1962 |
05/1931 |
H4 |
|
1137 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L86 |
1123 |
30/11/1959 |
05/1931 |
H4 |
|
1141 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L86 |
1124 |
16/09/1962 |
05/1931 |
H4 |
|
1154 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L86 |
1125 |
17/02/1962 |
05/1931 |
H4 |
|
1156 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L86 |
1126 |
23/08/1962 |
05/1931 |
H4 |
|
1158 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L86 |
1127 |
16/09/1962 |
05/1931 |
H4 |
|
1162 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L86 |
1128 |
31/12/1960 |
05/1931 |
H4 |
|
1164 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L86 |
1129 |
26/11/1962 |
06/1931 |
H4 |
|
1166 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L86 |
1130 |
28/03/1962 |
23/04/1932 |
|
|
2954 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1773 |
28/04/1961 |
19/05/1932 |
|
|
2955 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1774 |
16/10/1962 |
28/05/1932 |
|
|
2956 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1775 |
08/09/1963 |
23/06/1932 |
|
|
2957 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1776 |
08/11/1960 |
07/07/1932 |
|
|
2958 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1777 |
25/06/1962 |
11/07/1932 |
|
|
2959 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1778 |
27/04/1961 |
29/07/1932 |
|
|
2960 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1779 |
08/11/1960 |
17/08/1932 |
|
|
2961 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1780 |
14/03/1961 |
29/11/1933 |
|
|
2430 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1781 |
07/05/1962 |
08/12/1933 |
|
|
2431 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1782 |
08/09/1963 |
15/12/1933 |
|
|
2432 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1783 |
04/07/1961 |
28/12/1933 |
|
|
2433 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1784 |
04/05/1961 |
20/01/1934 |
|
|
2434 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1785 |
19/10/1960 |
27/01/1934 |
|
|
2435 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1786 |
08/09/1963 |
20/02/1934 |
|
|
2436 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1787 |
29/12/1962 |
15/03/1934 |
|
|
2437 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1788 |
22/09/1963 |
07/1934 |
H4 |
|
1302 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L88 |
1156 |
29/06/1961 |
07/1934 |
H4 |
|
1304 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L88 |
1157 |
18/09/1961 |
07/1934 |
H4 |
|
1308 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L88 |
1158 |
25/07/1961 |
09/07/1934 |
|
|
2501 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
331 |
1791 |
23/11/1964 |
10/07/1934 |
|
|
2500 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
331 |
1790 |
04/09/1961 |
25/07/1934 |
|
|
2502 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
331 |
1792 |
12/12/1963 |
08/1934 |
H4 |
|
1310 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L88 |
1159 |
07/05/1962 |
08/1934 |
H4 |
|
1324 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L88 |
1160 |
30/04/1962 |
08/1934 |
H4 |
|
1325 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
E152 |
4075 |
04/07/1962 |
11/08/1934 |
|
|
2503 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
331 |
1793 |
18/11/1963 |
09/1934 |
H4 |
|
1306 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L88 |
1161 |
20/12/1960 |
09/1934 |
H4 |
|
1332 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
E152 |
4076 |
17/12/1962 |
09/1934 |
H4 |
|
1333 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
E152 |
4077 |
24/07/1959 |
09/1934 |
H4 |
|
1339 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
E152 |
4078 |
12/02/1962 |
09/1934 |
H4 |
|
1399 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
E152 |
4079 |
04/11/1962 |
09/1934 |
H4 |
|
2934 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L88 |
1162 |
24/07/1961 |
09/1934 |
H4 |
|
2935 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L88 |
1163 |
10/04/1962 |
09/09/1934 |
|
|
2504 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
331 |
1794 |
14/03/1963 |
27/10/1934 |
|
|
2505 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
331 |
1795 |
06/07/1964 |
01/12/1934 |
|
|
2507 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
331 |
1798 |
13/07/1964 |
19/12/1934 |
|
|
2506 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
331 |
1797 |
04/12/1965 |
01/1935 |
H4 |
|
1307 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
E152 |
4081 |
26/11/1962 |
01/1935 |
H4 |
|
1322 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
E152 |
4080 |
23/07/1962 |
01/1935 |
H4 |
|
2936 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L88 |
1164 |
17/07/1961 |
01/1935 |
H4 |
|
2937 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L88 |
1165 |
05/02/1960 |
01/1935 |
H4 |
|
2938 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
E152 |
4082 |
25/11/1961 |
01/1935 |
H4 |
|
2939 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
E152 |
4083 |
12/03/1960 |
01/1935 |
H4 |
|
2940 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
E152 |
4084 |
29/12/1961 |
09/02/1935 |
|
|
2508 |
4-6-2 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
331 |
1500 |
14/05/1964 |
08/1935 |
H4 |
|
2425 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L890 |
24225 |
04/11/1962 |
08/1935 |
H4 |
|
2426 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L890 |
24226 |
04/05/1962 |
08/1935 |
H4 |
|
2427 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L890 |
24227 |
31/07/1961 |
08/1935 |
H4 |
|
2428 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L890 |
24228 |
16/09/1962 |
08/1935 |
H4 |
|
2438 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L890 |
24229 |
09/1962 |
09/1935 |
H4 |
|
2439 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L890 |
24230 |
16/09/1962 |
09/1935 |
H4 |
|
2440 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L890 |
24231 |
26/02/1962 |
09/1935 |
H4 |
|
2442 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L890 |
24232 |
14/06/1962 |
09/1935 |
H4 |
|
2443 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L890 |
24233 |
01/08/1962 |
09/1935 |
H4 |
|
2447 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L890 |
24234 |
28/03/1962 |
09/1935 |
H4 |
|
2448 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L890 |
24235 |
10/04/1962 |
09/1935 |
H4 |
|
2449 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L890 |
24236 |
04/11/1962 |
10/1935 |
H4 |
|
2450 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L890 |
24237 |
04/11/1962 |
10/1935 |
H4 |
|
2451 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L890 |
24238 |
06/12/1962 |
10/1935 |
H4 |
|
2459 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L890 |
24239 |
14/03/1962 |
10/1935 |
H4 |
|
2461 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L890 |
24240 |
16/09/1962 |
10/1935 |
H4 |
|
2463 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L890 |
24241 |
27/05/1960 |
10/1935 |
H4 |
|
2466 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L890 |
24242 |
16/09/1962 |
11/1935 |
H4 |
|
2467 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L890 |
24243 |
16/09/1962 |
11/1935 |
H4 |
|
2468 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
North British |
L890 |
24244 |
31/05/1962 |
05/1936 |
H4 |
|
2417 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L92 |
1270 |
13/11/1961 |
05/1936 |
H4 |
|
2429 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L92 |
1271 |
16/09/1962 |
05/1936 |
H4 |
|
2445 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L92 |
1272 |
02/10/1961 |
05/1936 |
H4 |
|
2446 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L92 |
1273 |
19/12/1962 |
06/1936 |
H4 |
|
2453 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L92 |
1274 |
16/09/1962 |
06/1936 |
H4 |
|
2455 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L92 |
1275 |
07/07/1961 |
06/1936 |
H4 |
|
2458 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L92 |
1276 |
03/12/1962 |
06/1936 |
H4 |
|
2465 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L92 |
1277 |
19/02/1962 |
07/1936 |
H4 |
|
2471 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L92 |
1278 |
03/04/1961 |
08/1936 |
H4 |
|
2472 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Armstrong Whitworth |
L92 |
1279 |
23/10/1961 |
10/1936 |
H4 |
|
2470 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1678 |
17/12/1962 |
10/1936 |
H4 |
|
2473 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1679 |
04/11/1962 |
10/1936 |
H4 |
|
2498 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1680 |
20/03/1961 |
10/1936 |
H4 |
|
2499 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1681 |
16/09/1962 |
11/1936 |
H4 |
|
3813 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1682 |
04/11/1962 |
11/1936 |
H4 |
|
3814 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1683 |
02/07/1962 |
11/1936 |
H4 |
|
3815 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1684 |
04/09/1961 |
11/1936 |
H4 |
|
3816 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1685 |
04/01/1962 |
11/1936 |
H4 |
|
3817 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1686 |
16/09/1962 |
11/1936 |
H4 |
|
3818 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1687 |
17/08/1961 |
12/1936 |
H4 |
|
3819 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1688 |
16/10/1961 |
12/1936 |
H4 |
|
3820 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1689 |
17/12/1962 |
12/1936 |
H4 |
|
3821 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1690 |
04/11/1962 |
12/1936 |
H4 |
|
3822 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1691 |
16/09/1962 |
12/1936 |
H4 |
|
3823 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1692 |
10/07/1959 |
12/1936 |
H4 |
|
3824 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1693 |
02/11/1962 |
01/1937 |
H4 |
|
3825 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1694 |
21/12/1962 |
01/1937 |
H4 |
|
3826 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1696 |
28/05/1962 |
01/1937 |
H4 |
|
3827 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1697 |
19/03/1962 |
01/1937 |
H4 |
|
3828 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1698 |
16/11/1959 |
02/1937 |
H4 |
|
3829 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1699 |
19/06/1962 |
02/1937 |
H4 |
|
3830 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1700 |
13/10/1960 |
02/1937 |
H4 |
|
3831 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1701 |
07/05/1959 |
02/1937 |
H4 |
|
3832 |
2-6-0 |
N. Gresley |
Darlington Works |
?? |
1702 |
06/06/1960 |
11/1938 |
|
|
599 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
19/11/1958 |
11/1938 |
|
|
600 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
06/02/1961 |
12/1938 |
|
|
602 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
22/02/1960 |
12/1938 |
|
|
605 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
19/04/1961 |
12/1938 |
|
|
606 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
16/09/1962 |
01/1939 |
|
|
608 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
24/04/1962 |
02/1939 |
|
|
611 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
25/03/1963 |
04/1939 |
|
|
584 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
02/07/1962 |
04/1939 |
|
|
615 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
16/11/1959 |
05/1939 |
|
|
585 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
24/04/1962 |
06/1939 |
|
|
587 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
23/09/1963 |
07/1939 |
|
|
590 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
11/07/1962 |
07/1939 |
|
|
595 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
21/04/1961 |
08/1939 |
|
|
598 |
0-6-0T |
N. Gresley |
Gorton Works |
?? |
|
30/08/1961 |
22/05/1942 |
|
|
3833 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1931 |
08/09/1963 |
10/06/1942 |
|
|
3834 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1932 |
22/09/1963 |
26/06/1942 |
|
|
3835 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1933 |
10/10/1962 |
31/07/1942 |
|
|
3836 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1934 |
29/12/1962 |
21/08/1942 |
|
|
3837 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1935 |
26/11/1962 |
02/09/1942 |
|
|
3838 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1936 |
22/09/1963 |
12/09/1942 |
|
|
3839 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1937 |
03/11/1963 |
21/09/1942 |
|
|
3840 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1938 |
09/05/1960 |
05/10/1942 |
|
|
3841 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1939 |
29/12/1962 |
10/10/1942 |
|
|
3842 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1940 |
04/05/1963 |
23/10/1942 |
|
|
3843 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1941 |
22/09/1963 |
03/11/1942 |
|
|
3844 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1942 |
22/09/1963 |
06/11/1942 |
|
|
3845 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1943 |
03/11/1963 |
18/11/1942 |
|
|
3846 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1944 |
22/09/1963 |
21/11/1942 |
|
|
3847 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1945 |
22/09/1963 |
28/11/1942 |
|
|
3848 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1946 |
07/05/1963 |
04/12/1942 |
|
|
3849 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1947 |
10/09/1962 |
11/12/1942 |
|
|
3850 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1948 |
22/09/1963 |
17/12/1942 |
|
|
3851 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1949 |
03/11/1963 |
21/12/1942 |
|
|
3852 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1950 |
09/12/1962 |
26/12/1942 |
|
|
3853 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1951 |
02/07/1963 |
31/12/1942 |
|
|
3854 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1952 |
03/11/1963 |
02/01/1943 |
|
|
3855 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1953 |
22/09/1963 |
07/01/1943 |
|
|
3856 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1954 |
07/06/1963 |
21/01/1943 |
|
|
3857 |
2-8-0 |
N. Gresley |
Doncaster Works |
- |
1955 |
22/09/1963 |