z Railway Companies

Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1259 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 5219 Week
» 34805 Month
» 408818 Year
» 1630383 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Locomotives of the Great North of Scotland Railway
Build Date GNSR Class LNER Class First GNSR Number Wheels Designer Manufacturer Order Number Works Number Withdrawn
12/1878 C   1 4-4-0 W. Cowan Neilson, Reid & Co. E490 2360 08/1925
01/1879 C   2 4-4-0 W. Cowan Neilson, Reid & Co. E490 2361 06/1926
01/1879 C   3 4-4-0 W. Cowan Neilson, Reid & Co. E490 2362 02/1927
08/1890 Q   75 4-4-0 J. Manson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd ?? 2698 01/1938
08/1890 Q   76 4-4-0 J. Manson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd ?? 2699 02/1931
09/1890 Q   77 4-4-0 J. Manson Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd ?? 2700 09/1937
11/1893     84 0-4-4T J. Johnson Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4631 11/1937
11/1893     85 0-4-4T J. Johnson Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4632 10/1937
11/1893     86 0-4-4T J. Johnson Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4633 11/1937
11/1893     87 0-4-4T J. Johnson Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4634 08/1947
11/1893     88 0-4-4T J. Johnson Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4635 08/1937
12/1893     78 4-4-0 J. Johnson Neilson, Reid & Co. E711 4640 20/02/1953
12/1893     79 4-4-0 J. Johnson Neilson, Reid & Co. E711 4641 07/1946
12/1893     80 4-4-0 J. Johnson Neilson, Reid & Co. E711 4642 19/03/1951
12/1893     81 4-4-0 J. Johnson Neilson, Reid & Co. E711 4643 05/02/1952
12/1893     82 4-4-0 J. Johnson Neilson, Reid & Co. E711 4644 17/12/1951
12/1893     83 4-4-0 J. Johnson Neilson, Reid & Co. E711 4645 18/03/1952
12/1893     89 0-4-4T J. Johnson Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4636 01/1940
12/1893     90 0-4-4T J. Johnson Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4637 08/1937
12/1893     91 0-4-4T J. Johnson Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4638 10/1937
12/1893     92 0-4-4T J. Johnson Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4639 05/1939
12/1895     93 4-4-0 J. Johnson Neilson, Reid & Co. E747 4877 12/1946
12/1895     94 4-4-0 J. Johnson Neilson, Reid & Co. E747 4878 27/08/1948
12/1895     95 4-4-0 J. Johnson Neilson, Reid & Co. E747 4879 31/12/1947
12/1895     96 4-4-0 J. Johnson Neilson, Reid & Co. E747 4880 29/10/1949
12/1895     97 4-4-0 J. Johnson Neilson, Reid & Co. E747 4881 23/02/1953
12/1895     98 4-4-0 J. Johnson Neilson, Reid & Co. E747 4882 23/02/1953
12/1895     99 4-4-0 J. Johnson Neilson, Reid & Co. E747 4883 16/01/1951
02/1896     19 4-4-0 J. Johnson Neilson, Reid & Co. E747 4885 21/11/1952
02/1896     20 4-4-0 J. Johnson Neilson, Reid & Co. E747 4886 16/10/1951
02/1896     22 4-4-0 J. Johnson Neilson, Reid & Co. E747 4888 10/11/1949
03/1896     23 4-4-0 J. Johnson Neilson, Reid & Co. E747 4889 27/05/1950
09/1897     102 4-4-0 J. Johnson Neilson, Reid & Co. E787 5213 22/08/1951
09/1897     103 4-4-0 J. Johnson Neilson, Reid & Co. E787 5214 20/10/1950
09/1897     104 4-4-0 J. Johnson Neilson, Reid & Co. E787 5215 13/10/1952
09/1897     105 4-4-0 J. Johnson Neilson, Reid & Co. E787 5216 10/10/1950
02/1898     107 4-4-0 J. Johnson Neilson, Reid & Co. E787 5218 18/06/1951
02/1898     108 4-4-0 J. Johnson Neilson, Reid & Co. E787 5219 09/11/1951
02/1898     111 4-4-0 J. Johnson Neilson, Reid & Co. E787 5222 27/05/1952
02/1898     112 4-4-0 J. Johnson Neilson, Reid & Co. E787 5223 02/12/1952
10/1899     113 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill Neilson, Reid & Co. E827 5602 19/10/1955
10/1899     114 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill Neilson, Reid & Co. E827 5603 03/1946
10/1899     115 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill Neilson, Reid & Co. E827 5604 05/03/1957
10/1899     25 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill Neilson, Reid & Co. E827 5605 13/08/1953
10/1899     26 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill Neilson, Reid & Co. E827 5606 03/1953
04/1909     27 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill Inverurie Works IV1501   01/1957
07/1909     29 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill Inverurie Works IV1501   10/08/1956
06/1910     31 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill Inverurie Works IV1501   06/07/1956
08/1910     36 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill Inverurie Works IV1501   04/1955
03/1913     28 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill Inverurie Works ??   01/1947
09/1913     33 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill Inverurie Works ??   09/09/1955
09/1914     35 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill Inverurie Works ??   12/1956
03/1915     34 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill Inverurie Works ??   24/09/1953
09/1920     47 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill North British L730 22561 23/12/1955
10/1920     48 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill North British L730 22562 09/1966
10/1920     49 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill North British L730 22563 23/06/1958
10/1920     50 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill North British L730 22564 08/1955
10/1920     52 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill North British L730 22565 19/05/1955
10/1920     54 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill North British L730 22566 01/1947
06/1921     45 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill Inverurie Works ??   14/01/1955
09/1921     46 4-4-0 W. Pickersgill Inverurie Works ??   20/09/1955