z Railway Companies

Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 812 Today
» 1090 Yesterday
» 3127 Week
» 31085 Month
» 65727 Year
» 1287292 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Locomotives of the Lancashire, Derbyshire and East Coast Railway
Build Date LDECR Class LNER Class First LDECR Number Wheels Designer Manufacturer Order Number Works Number Withdrawn
05/1904 D   29 0-6-4T   Kitson ?? 4246 04/03/1946
06/1904 D   30 0-6-4T   Kitson ?? 4247 09/12/1939
06/1904 D   31 0-6-4T   Kitson ?? 4248 10/08/1946
06/1904 D   32 0-6-4T   Kitson ?? 4249 04/07/1947
06/1904 D   33 0-6-4T   Kitson ?? 4250 22/02/1939
06/1904 D   34 0-6-4T   Kitson ?? 4251 18/06/1946
12/1906 D   A1 0-6-4T   Kitson ?? 4435 16/09/1941
12/1906 D   A2 0-6-4T   Kitson ?? 4436 12/07/1943
12/1906 D   A3 0-6-4T   Kitson ?? 4437 16/02/1944