z Railway Companies

Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 530 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1629 Week
» 7763 Month
» 235647 Year
» 1457212 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Locomotives of the Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway
Build Date MSLR Class LNER Class First MSLR Number Wheels Designer Manufacturer Order Number Works Number Withdrawn
10/1871 18T Altered   271 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   05/1922
10/1871 18T Altered   272 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   07/1928
10/1871 18T Altered   273 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   01/1924
10/1871 18T Altered   275 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   06/1928
11/1871 18T Altered   274 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   06/1923
11/1871 18T Altered   276 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   02/1925
11/1871 18T Altered   277 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   11/1923
11/1871 18T Altered   278 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   12/1910
12/1871 18T Altered   279 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   05/1924
12/1871 18T Altered   280 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   06/1928
11/1873 18T Altered   336 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   12/1928
11/1873 18T Altered   337 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   10/1922
11/1873 18T Altered   338 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   11/1923
11/1873 18T Altered   339 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   01/1929
11/1873 18T Altered   6475 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   01/1929
12/1873 18T Altered   340 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   08/1924
12/1873 18T Altered   341 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   12/1919
01/1874 18T Altered   342 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   02/1927
01/1874 18T Altered   343 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   03/1921
01/1874 18T Altered   344 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   10/1920
01/1874 18T Altered   6473 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   02/1927
02/1874 18T Altered   345 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   02/1919
10/1875 18T Altered   366 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   12/1920
10/1875 18T Altered   367 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   07/1925
10/1875 18T Altered   368 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   03/1923
10/1875 18T Altered   369 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   02/1920
11/1875 18T Altered   370 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   10/1923
11/1875 18T Altered   371 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   08/1925
12/1875 18T Altered   372 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   04/1923
12/1875 18T Altered   373 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   03/1921
12/1875 18T Altered   374 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   02/1927
12/1875 18T Altered   6470 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   02/1927
04/1880 18T Altered   411 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   12/1920
04/1880 18T Altered   412 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   06/1922
05/1880 18T Altered   413 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   05/1924
05/1880 18T Altered   414 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   03/1923
06/1880 18T Altered   415 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   05/1925
08/1880 18T Altered   416 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   05/1922
03/1881 18T Altered   417 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   03/1924
04/1881 18T Altered   418 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   06/1927
04/1881 18T Altered   6453 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   06/1927
05/1881 18T Altered   419 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   10/1920
05/1881 18T Altered   420 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   02/1924
06/1881 18T Altered   421 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   01/1929
06/1881 18T Altered   422 0-6-0T C. Sacré Gorton Works ??   09/1922
11/1887     561 4-4-0 T. Parker Kitson 74 3010 09/1928
07/1888 6DB   37 4-4-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   07/1923
10/1888 6DB   400 4-4-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   11/1923
10/1888 6DB   89 4-4-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   03/1926
01/1889 9   568 0-6-0 T. Parker   ??   11/1933
02/1889 9   569 0-6-0 T. Parker   ??   08/1931
03/1889 9   570 0-6-0 T. Parker   ??   09/1934
03/1889 9   571 0-6-0 T. Parker   ??   11/1935
04/1889 9   572 0-6-0 T. Parker   ??   11/1935
04/1889 9   573 0-6-0 T. Parker   ??   10/1931
06/1889 3   574 2-4-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   09/1946
07/1889 3   575 2-4-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   10/1945
08/1889 3   576 2-4-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   05/1937
09/1889 3   577 2-4-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   23/03/1948
11/1889 3   578 2-4-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   10/1932
11/1889 3   579 2-4-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   06/1943
12/1889     161 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   01/1938
12/1889     165 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   31/12/1954
01/1890     173 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   10/1949
04/1890     562 4-4-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   08/1935
04/1890     563 4-4-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   10/1929
07/1890     564 4-4-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   12/1926
07/1890     604 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E661 4091 08/1939
07/1890     605 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E661 4092 09/11/1953
07/1890     606 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E661 4093 31/12/1954
07/1890     607 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E661 4094 04/1937
07/1890     608 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E661 4095 04/1937
07/1890     609 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E661 4096 09/1936
07/1890     610 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E661 4097 11/1938
08/1890     565 4-4-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   04/1933
08/1890     611 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E661 4098 23/06/1952
08/1890     612 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E661 4099 08/1933
08/1890     613 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E661 4100 04/1933
09/1890     566 4-4-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   08/1931
09/1890 3   586 2-4-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4126 06/1943
09/1890 3   587 2-4-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4127 06/1932
09/1890 3   588 2-4-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4128 07/1931
09/1890 3   589 2-4-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4129 06/1943
10/1890 3   590 2-4-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4130 02/1932
10/1890 3   591 2-4-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4131 03/1934
10/1890 3   592 2-4-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4132 05/1932
11/1890 3   580 2-4-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   12/1931
11/1890 3   593 2-4-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4133 07/1939
11/1890     614 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E661 4101 31/12/1954
11/1890     615 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E661 4102 12/1937
11/1890     616 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E661 4103 04/1933
11/1890     617 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E661 4104 08/1936
11/1890     618 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E661 4105 09/1937
11/1890     619 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E661 4106 10/1933
11/1890     620 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E661 4107 01/10/1954
12/1890     567 4-4-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   09/1931
12/1890     621 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E661 4108 10/1937
12/1890     622 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E661 4109 31/12/1954
12/1890     623 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E661 4110 03/12/1954
01/1891     624 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E661 4111 07/1938
01/1891     625 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E661 4112 12/01/1953
01/1891     626 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E661 4113 01/1932
01/1891     627 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E661 4114 04/1932
01/1891     628 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E661 4115 08/1954
02/1891 3   581 2-4-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   07/1945
02/1891 3   582 2-4-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   01/1949
03/1891 3   594 2-4-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4134 06/1943
03/1891 3   595 2-4-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4135 07/1930
03/1891 3   596 2-4-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4136 07/1938
03/1891 3   597 2-4-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4137 12/1931
03/1891 3   598 2-4-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4138 01/1949
04/1891 3   599 2-4-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4139 11/1937
04/1891 3   600 2-4-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4140 08/1932
04/1891     629 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E661 4116 08/11/1954
04/1891     630 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E661 4117 03/1933
04/1891     631 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E661 4118 06/1932
04/1891     632 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E661 4119 03/07/1950
04/1891     633 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E661 4120 07/1947
05/1891     601 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   10/1933
05/1891     602 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   08/1939
05/1891     634 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E661 4121 03/1940
05/1891     635 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E661 4122 24/03/1954
05/1891     636 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E661 4123 10/11/1952
05/1891     637 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E661 4124 09/1949
05/1891     638 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E661 4125 01/1932
07/1891     603 0-6-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   08/1933
11/1891     682 4-4-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   12/1931
11/1891     684 4-4-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   06/1939
12/1891     683 4-4-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   04/1937
01/1892     685 4-4-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   07/1930
02/1892     712 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E683 4356 10/1933
02/1892     713 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E683 4357 14/01/1952
02/1892     714 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E683 4358 07/1933
02/1892     715 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E683 4359 05/1937
02/1892     716 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E683 4360 10/1949
02/1892     717 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E683 4361 02/1934
02/1892     718 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E683 4362 25/02/1952
03/1892     686 4-4-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   08/1933
03/1892     719 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E683 4363 09/1936
03/1892     720 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E683 4364 30/10/1950
03/1892     721 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E683 4365 28/04/1952
03/1892     722 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E683 4366 05/1932
03/1892     723 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E683 4367 08/1939
03/1892     724 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E683 4368 05/1950
04/1892     725 0-6-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. E683 4369 02/1946
04/1892 3 Alt.   726 2-4-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4370 05/1933
04/1892 3 Alt.   727 2-4-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4371 10/1939
04/1892 3 Alt.   728 2-4-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4372 06/1933
04/1892 3 Alt.   729 2-4-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4373 06/1943
04/1892 3 Alt.   730 2-4-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4374 11/1944
04/1892 3 Alt.   731 2-4-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4375 05/1937
05/1892     687 4-4-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   08/1935
06/1892 3 Alt.   732 2-4-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4376 04/1945
06/1892 3 Alt.   733 2-4-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4377 05/1937
06/1892 3 Alt.   734 2-4-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4378 09/1931
07/1892 3 Alt.   735 2-4-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4379 07/1933
07/1892 3 Alt.   736 2-4-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4380 05/1937
07/1892 3 Alt.   737 2-4-2T T. Parker Neilson, Reid & Co. ?? 4381 03/1933
10/1892     700 4-4-0 T. Parker Kitson 131 3440 05/1936
10/1892     701 4-4-0 T. Parker Kitson 131 3441 11/1935
10/1892     702 4-4-0 T. Parker Kitson 131 3442 09/1933
10/1892     703 4-4-0 T. Parker Kitson 131 3443 05/1935
11/1892     704 4-4-0 T. Parker Kitson 131 3444 12/1939
11/1892     705 4-4-0 T. Parker Kitson 131 3445 08/1933
11/1892     706 4-4-0 T. Parker Kitson 131 3446 08/1935
11/1892     707 4-4-0 T. Parker Kitson 131 3447 05/1933
11/1892     708 4-4-0 T. Parker Kitson 131 3448 05/1937
11/1892     709 4-4-0 T. Parker Kitson 131 3449 03/1932
12/1892 3   584 2-4-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   06/12/1947
12/1892     710 4-4-0 T. Parker Kitson 131 3450 01/1930
12/1892     711 4-4-0 T. Parker Kitson 131 3451 06/1933
01/1893 3   583 2-4-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   08/1936
02/1893 3   585 2-4-2T T. Parker Gorton Works ??   07/1931
04/1894     688 4-4-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   04/1931
05/1894     689 4-4-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   02/1936
05/1894     690 4-4-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   05/1937
07/1894     691 4-4-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   07/1933
08/1894     692 4-4-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   04/1937
09/1894     693 4-4-0 T. Parker Gorton Works ??   02/1930
01/1897     882 0-6-0ST H. Pollitt Gorton Works ??   06/1937
02/1897     883 0-6-0ST H. Pollitt Gorton Works ??   19/11/1951
03/1897     884 0-6-0ST H. Pollitt Gorton Works ??   06/1937
03/1897     885 0-6-0ST H. Pollitt Gorton Works ??   01/1949
04/1897     886 0-6-0ST H. Pollitt Gorton Works ??   11/1937
05/1897     887 0-6-0ST H. Pollitt Gorton Works ??   05/1937
05/1897     888 0-6-0ST H. Pollitt Gorton Works ??   07/1937
06/1897     889 0-6-0ST H. Pollitt Gorton Works ??   12/1947
07/1897     890 0-6-0ST H. Pollitt Gorton Works ??   02/1949
07/1897     891 0-6-0ST H. Pollitt Gorton Works ??   05/1937
08/1897     892 0-6-0ST H. Pollitt Gorton Works ??   04/1935
12/1897     893 0-6-0ST H. Pollitt Gorton Works ??   05/1937