Build Date | LBSCR Class | SR Class | First LBSCR Number | Wheels | Designer | Manufacturer | Order Number | Works Number | Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/1906 | 300 | 0-6-0 | D. Marsh | Brighton Works | ?? | 14/07/1951 | |||
06/1906 | 301 | 0-6-0 | D. Marsh | Brighton Works | ?? | 03/1951 | |||
06/1906 | 303 | 0-6-0 | D. Marsh | Brighton Works | ?? | 10/1951 | |||
07/1906 | 304 | 0-6-0 | D. Marsh | Brighton Works | ?? | 07/1936 | |||
07/1906 | 305 | 0-6-0 | D. Marsh | Brighton Works | ?? | 09/1937 | |||
08/1906 | 302 | 0-6-0 | D. Marsh | Brighton Works | ?? | 12/01/1952 | |||
08/1906 | 307 | 0-6-0 | D. Marsh | Brighton Works | ?? | 05/1949 | |||
09/1906 | 309 | 0-6-0 | D. Marsh | Brighton Works | ?? | 01/1949 | |||
11/1906 | 308 | 0-6-0 | D. Marsh | Brighton Works | ?? | 11/1948 | |||
08/1908 | 306 | 0-6-0 | D. Marsh | Brighton Works | ?? | 12/1951 | |||
04/1914 | 327 | 4-6-4T | L. Billinton | Brighton Works | ?? | 07/01/1956 | |||
09/1914 | 328 | 4-6-4T | L. Billinton | Brighton Works | ?? | 02/1955 | |||
10/1921 | 329 | 4-6-4T | L. Billinton | Brighton Works | ?? | 08/1956 | |||
12/1921 | 330 | 4-6-4T | L. Billinton | Brighton Works | ?? | 13/08/1955 | |||
12/1921 | 331 | 4-6-4T | L. Billinton | Brighton Works | ?? | 20/07/1957 | |||
04/1922 | 333 | 4-6-4T | L. Billinton | Brighton Works | ?? | 14/04/1956 | |||
09/1922 | 332 | 4-6-4T | L. Billinton | Brighton Works | ?? | 14/01/1956 |