Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 140 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1174 Week
» 23680 Month
» 326870 Year
» 1548435 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #649
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 14
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
L3 5340   13/03/1937
L3 5345   30/11/1940
L3 5274   22/04/1944
L3 9059   29/06/1946
L3 69050   01/04/1950