Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 961 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1995 Week
» 24501 Month
» 327691 Year
» 1549256 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #687
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 14
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
L3 5337   09/05/1936
L3 5274   10/01/1942
L3 5339   10/06/1944
L3 9065   04/01/1947