Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 455 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 1794 Week
» 31292 Month
» 368138 Year
» 1589703 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #4628
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HA
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5000 LAUNCESTON CASTLE 28/08/1926
Castle 4099 KILGERRAN CASTLE 05/12/1929
Castle 4095 HARLECH CASTLE 14/05/1931
Castle 4084 ABERYSTWYTH CASTLE 17/03/1933
Castle 5073 BLENHEIM 19/05/1943
Castle 5066 WARDOUR CASTLE 01/07/1948
Castle 4016 THE SOMERSET LIGHT INFANTRY (PRINCE ALBERT'S) 01/03/1950
Castle 4074 CALDICOT CASTLE 27/11/1952