Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1176 Today
» 1231 Yesterday
» 2407 Week
» 14112 Month
» 345601 Year
» 422188 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #4638
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HA
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5010 RESTORMEL CASTLE 26/07/1927
Castle 5000 LAUNCESTON CASTLE 20/06/1929
Castle 4097 KENILWORTH CASTLE 23/02/1932
Castle 4091 DUDLEY CASTLE 10/05/1935
Castle 4082 WINDSOR CASTLE 27/02/1943
Castle 5027 FARLEIGH CASTLE 17/02/1947
Castle 5028 LLANTILIO CASTLE 22/07/1949