Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 466 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 1805 Week
» 31303 Month
» 368149 Year
» 1589714 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #6606
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HB
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5019 TREAGO CASTLE 24/07/1932
Castle 4016 KNIGHT OF THE GOLDEN FLEECE 06/05/1937
Castle 5000 LAUNCESTON CASTLE 27/07/1942
Castle 4091 DUDLEY CASTLE 05/04/1945
Castle 5031 TOTNES CASTLE 15/05/1947
Castle 5043 EARL OF MOUNT EDGCUMBE 21/06/1949
Castle 4083 ABBOTSBURY CASTLE 04/03/1953
Castle 5051 EARL BATHURST 30/10/1957
Castle 5015 KINGSWEAR CASTLE 13/10/1959