Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1732 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15138 Week
» 68154 Month
» 187681 Year
» 3214534 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #6602
Big Four Company |
GWR |
GWR Boiler Group |
98 |
GWR Standard Boiler |
8 |
Diagram |
HB |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5015 |
KINGSWEAR CASTLE |
09/07/1932 |
Castle |
5021 |
WHITTINGTON CASTLE |
09/03/1936 |
Castle |
5055 |
EARL OF ELDON |
01/11/1939 |
Castle |
5000 |
LAUNCESTON CASTLE |
27/03/1945 |
Castle |
5016 |
MONTGOMERY CASTLE |
29/10/1946 |
Castle |
4082 |
WINDSOR CASTLE |
31/08/1948 |
Castle |
4090 |
DORCHESTER CASTLE |
20/12/1949 |
Castle |
5070 |
SIR DANIEL GOOCH |
06/11/1951 |
Castle |
5056 |
EARL OF POWIS |
26/01/1954 |
Castle |
5017 |
THE GLOUCESTERSHIRE REGIMENT 28TH 61ST |
06/03/1957 |
Castle |
5090 |
NEATH ABBEY |
28/01/1959 |
|