Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 539 Today
» 1100 Yesterday
» 5795 Week
» 24378 Month
» 221895 Year
» 298482 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #6601
Big Four Company GWR
GWR Boiler Group 98
GWR Standard Boiler 8
Diagram HB
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5014 GOODRICH CASTLE 07/07/1932
Castle 5019 TREAGO CASTLE 09/06/1936
Castle 5050 EARL OF ST GERMANS 14/06/1940
Castle 5065 NEWPORT CASTLE 03/12/1945
Castle 5000 LAUNCESTON CASTLE 19/03/1948
Castle 4037 THE SOUTH WALES BORDERERS 04/10/1950
Castle 5011 TINTAGEL CASTLE 21/08/1952
Castle 5028 LLANTILIO CASTLE 26/01/1955
Castle 5022 WIGMORE CASTLE 11/04/1957