Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2088 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19891 Week
» 72907 Month
» 192434 Year
» 3219287 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #4650
Big Four Company |
GWR |
GWR Boiler Group |
98 |
GWR Standard Boiler |
8 |
Diagram |
HA |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4074 |
CALDICOT CASTLE |
30/11/1931 |
Castle |
4080 |
POWDERHAM CASTLE |
17/05/1935 |
Castle |
4088 |
DARTMOUTH CASTLE |
26/05/1945 |
Castle |
4075 |
CARDIFF CASTLE |
14/04/1947 |
Castle |
5060 |
EARL OF BERKELEY |
28/06/1949 |
Castle |
4073 |
CAERPHILLY CASTLE |
31/05/1951 |
Castle |
5086 |
VISCOUNT HORNE |
11/05/1953 |
Castle |
5000 |
LAUNCESTON CASTLE |
28/02/1955 |
Castle |
4037 |
THE SOUTH WALES BORDERERS |
22/04/1958 |
Castle |
5053 |
EARL CAIRNS |
10/10/1960 |
|