Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1299 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14705 Week
» 67721 Month
» 187248 Year
» 3214101 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #7618
Big Four Company |
GWR |
GWR Boiler Group |
98 |
GWR Standard Boiler |
8 |
Diagram |
HC |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
7025 |
SUDELEY CASTLE |
04/08/1949 |
Castle |
7026 |
TENBY CASTLE |
30/04/1951 |
Castle |
7027 |
THORNBURY CASTLE |
19/03/1953 |
Castle |
5000 |
LAUNCESTON CASTLE |
18/06/1957 |
Castle |
5092 |
TRESCO ABBEY |
24/11/1959 |
Castle |
5042 |
WINCHESTER CASTLE |
13/06/1962 |
|