Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1327 Today
» 1117 Yesterday
» 1327 Week
» 29907 Month
» 29907 Year
» 1251472 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #835
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 16Sat
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B18 195   12/1903
B4 1095   22/11/1913
Q4 6142   03/09/1927
Q4 6134   01/11/1930
Q4 6144   07/01/1933
Q4 5058   29/02/1936
Q4 5044   01/04/1939
Q4 5065   29/11/1941
Q4 5146   22/04/1944