Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 157 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1191 Week
» 23697 Month
» 326887 Year
» 1548452 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #833
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 16Sat
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B4 1100   25/12/1909
B4 102   19/12/1914
B18 195   20/01/1923
B4 6103   13/03/1926
Q4 5160   25/06/1938