Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 414 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 4235 Week
» 21571 Month
» 299367 Year
» 1183748 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #836
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 16Sat
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B18 196   01/1904
B4 1104   15/06/1912
B4 1100   30/05/1914
Q4 5160   22/10/1927
Q4 5059   09/07/1932
Q4 6054   17/11/1934
Q4 5056   03/07/1937
Q4 6139   15/06/1940