Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 814 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4982 Week
» 20096 Month
» 323286 Year
» 1544851 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1402
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 4Sat
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q1 412   08/1902
Q1 404   07/1909
Q4 1176   07/1910
Q4 356   14/11/1914
Q1 424   04/06/1915
Q4 56   03/03/1923
Q4 5136   10/03/1928
Q4 5151   30/05/1931