Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 165 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2072 Week
» 20854 Month
» 269147 Year
» 1153528 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #336
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sat
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 1053   11/1902
Q4 1052   07/01/1907
Q4 87   15/08/1908
Q4 146   07/01/1911
Q4 135   17/02/1917
Q4 5401   02/02/1924
Q4 5139   27/07/1929
Q4 5960   19/03/1932