Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1684 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15090 Week
» 68106 Month
» 187633 Year
» 3214486 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #1267
Pre Grouping Company |
GCR |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
17Sat |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Q4 |
1137 |
|
03/1907 |
Q4 |
1052 |
|
25/11/1911 |
Q4 |
1176 |
|
06/07/1918 |
Q4 |
1137 |
|
27/01/1923 |
Q4 |
5062 |
|
06/11/1926 |
|