Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 360 Today
» 1291 Yesterday
» 1651 Week
» 33440 Month
» 182205 Year
» 1403770 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #854
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sat
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 137   01/1904
Q4 70   07/10/1907
Q4 152   21/12/1912
Q4 1133   20/04/1918
Q4 1052   05/08/1922