Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 108 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1142 Week
» 23648 Month
» 326838 Year
» 1548403 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #891
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 5960   24/12/1927
Q4 6052   14/05/1932
B9 6105   08/12/1934
Q4 6077   13/02/1937
Q4 5962   14/12/1940
Q4 5065   11/03/1944