Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 709 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14115 Week
» 67131 Month
» 186658 Year
» 3213511 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #913
Pre Grouping Company |
GCR |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
17Sup |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
B9 |
6109 |
|
16/02/1929 |
B9 |
6111 |
|
18/06/1932 |
Q4 |
5143 |
|
29/12/1934 |
Q4 |
5162 |
|
07/08/1937 |
Q4 |
6177 |
|
31/07/1943 |
Q4 |
5064 |
|
15/09/1945 |
Q4 |
63200 |
|
09/10/1948 |
|