Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 63 Today
» 1154 Yesterday
» 4585 Week
» 25487 Month
» 25487 Year
» 1247052 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #319
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 957   15/12/1923
Q4 6132   03/03/1928
Q4 5137   01/04/1933
Q4 5092   18/05/1935
Q4 6053   07/08/1937