Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 415 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 4236 Week
» 21572 Month
» 299368 Year
» 1183749 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #896
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 6139   28/01/1928
Q4 6176   05/04/1930
Q4 6054   25/06/1932
Q4 6176   08/12/1934
Q4 6054   10/04/1937
Q4 6133   20/01/1940
B9 6106   22/08/1942
Q4 3202   20/04/1946
B9 1475   29/03/1947