Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 647 Today
» 1408 Yesterday
» 3292 Week
» 5874 Month
» 270507 Year
» 1492072 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #920
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sat
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 5092   12/11/1932
Q4 5092   24/07/1937
Q4 6054   11/11/1939
Q4 5142   16/05/1942
Q4 6133   20/06/1944