Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 28 Online
» 1128 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 1128 Week
» 3710 Month
» 268343 Year
» 1489908 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #869
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 153   05/1904
Q4 64   05/02/1910
Q4 160   23/10/1915
Q4 1143   07/01/1922
Q4 5147   24/02/1934
Q4 5150   15/08/1936
Q4 5159   12/08/1939
Q4 5136   29/11/1941
Q4 6054   08/04/1944
B5 1689   14/09/1946