Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 103 Today
» 1086 Yesterday
» 103 Week
» 21005 Month
» 21005 Year
» 1242570 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #852
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sat
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 135   01/1904
Q4 1077   04/01/1908
Q4 151   07/07/1909
Q4 5067   27/08/1932
Q4 5091   30/03/1935
Q4 5070   31/12/1937
Q4 5161   24/02/1945
Q4 3201   08/11/1947