Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 1235 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7624 Week
» 28066 Month
» 364912 Year
» 1586477 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #837
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sat
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 56   09/1903
Q4 138   28/09/1907
Q4 56   17/08/1912
Q4 44   29/09/1917
Q4 5159   01/08/1931
Q4 5071   07/07/1934
Q4 5151   10/10/1936