Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 576 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3719 Week
» 13889 Month
» 291685 Year
» 1176066 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #851
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 92   11/1903
Q4 56   07/07/1907
Q4 135   14/12/1912
Q4 6182   09/06/1928
Q4 5142   21/02/1931
Q4 5959   13/01/1934
Q4 5147   01/08/1936
Q4 5067   20/05/1939
Q4 5147   16/05/1942
Q4 5152   20/01/1945