Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 163 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2070 Week
» 20852 Month
» 269145 Year
» 1153526 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #841
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 64   10/1903
Q4 85   11/01/1908
Q4 86   18/11/1911
Q4 5056   10/12/1927
Q4 6134   17/12/1932
B9 6108   23/02/1935
B5 5185   16/01/1937
B5 5182   20/05/1939
B9 6109   21/08/1943
Q4 3220   09/02/1946