Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 609 Today
» 1408 Yesterday
» 3254 Week
» 5836 Month
» 270469 Year
» 1492034 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1920
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 960   16/10/1920
Q4 5956   31/03/1928
Q4 6139   31/12/1931
Q4 6133   22/09/1934
Q4 5956   20/03/1937
B9 6107   20/11/1937
Q4 5056   18/05/1940