Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 742 Today
» 1269 Yesterday
» 9081 Week
» 6189 Month
» 113135 Year
» 1334700 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #875
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 5057   02/11/1935
B5 5183   18/06/1938
B9 6106   02/12/1939
Q4 5161   26/09/1942
B5 5180   27/10/1945
Q4 63202   18/12/1948