Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 102 Today
» 1086 Yesterday
» 102 Week
» 21004 Month
» 21004 Year
» 1242569 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #838
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sat
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 57   09/1903
Q4 153   30/10/1909
Q4 1179   12/06/1915
Q4 163   10/07/1920
Q4 5136   1931
Q4 5145   13/01/1934
Q4 5087   30/09/1939
Q4 5159   25/10/1941
Q4 5164   13/03/1943