Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1281 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7670 Week
» 28112 Month
» 364958 Year
» 1586523 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #148
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 5057   25/02/1933
B5 6067   16/11/1935
B5 6069   05/11/1938
B5 5187   20/07/1940
B5 6069   28/08/1943