Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1325 Today
» 1117 Yesterday
» 1325 Week
» 29905 Month
» 29905 Year
» 1251470 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #530
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sat
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 5067   07/06/1924
Q4 5163   16/03/1929
Q4 5065   12/04/1930
Q4 5068   25/03/1933
Q4 5086   17/08/1935
Q4 6075   02/10/1937
Q4 5057   07/09/1940