Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 2125 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19928 Week
» 72944 Month
» 192471 Year
» 3219324 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #893
Pre Grouping Company |
GCR |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
17Sat |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Q4 |
6179 |
|
14/12/1935 |
Q4 |
5164 |
|
29/10/1938 |
Q4 |
6135 |
|
07/08/1943 |
Q4 |
5057 |
|
10/11/1945 |
Q4 |
63216 |
|
24/07/1948 |
|